Hopkins v. Oakland Police Dept et al
Plaintiff: Kevin L. Hopkins
Defendant: Oakland Police Dept and Bergeron
Case Number: 4:2009cv00722
Filed: February 18, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S 53 MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY AND STAY SUMMARY JUDGMENT; GRANTING DEFENDANTS' 30 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/30/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2011)
January 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER VACATING HEARING. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/25/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2011)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER re 28 EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE DISPOSITIVE MOTION. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/25/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hopkins v. Oakland Police Dept et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin L. Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakland Police Dept
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bergeron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?