Moore et al v. Verizon Communications, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Desiree Moore and Karen Jones
Defendant: Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon California, Inc., Verizon Northwest, Inc. and Verizon West Coast, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2009cv01823
Filed: April 27, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Wayne D. Brazil
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER ADOPTING 211 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RE 123 , 212 . Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 2/13/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2014)
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong granting 217 Motion to Amend/Correct; and 218 Stipulation. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2014)
October 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 208 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 10/30/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2013)
September 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER RE: SUBMISSION OF PLAINTIFFS BILLING RECORDS. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on September 5, 2013. (jsclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2013)
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER.***Civil Case Terminated.*** Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 8/28/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2013) Modified on 8/28/2013 (ndr, COURT STAFF).
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 123 MOTION for Attorney Fees. Motion Hearing set for 7/9/2013 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 5/29/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2013)
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 165 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 164 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Final Approval Hearing and Setting Briefing Schedule filed by Karen Jones, Desiree Moore, Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Data Services, Inc., Verizon Servic es Corp., Verizon Corporate Services Group Inc., Verizon Services Group, Verizon Services Organization, Inc., Verizon Services Operations Inc., Verizon Corporate Services Corp., Verizon California, Inc., Set/Reset Deadlines as to 164 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Final Approval Hearing and Setting Briefing Schedule. Motion Hearing set for 7/16/2003 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 4/10/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2013)
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 163 STIPULATION AND ORDER, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 123 MOTION for Attorney Fees. Responses due by 3/26/2013. Replies due by 4/16/2013. MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL DUE 3/26/13. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 3/18/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2013)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 123 MOTION for Attorney Fees. FAIRNESS Hearing set for 5/9/2013 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 3/13/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2013)
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 157 AMENDED ORDER re 156 Order on Stipulation. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 2/20/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2013)
February 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 102 Motion to Intervene; denying 129 Motion for Leave to File (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2013)
January 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 152 STIPULATION AND ORDER, Set/Reset Deadlines as to Final Approval Motion and response to objections due by 2/12/13.Responses to motion for attorneys' fees due by 2/12/2013. Replies in support of motion for attorneys' fees due by 2/26/2013. Motion Hearing set for 3/12/2013 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 1/10/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2013)
October 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 147 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Final Approval Hearing to February 19, 2013. Motion Hearing set for 2/19/2013 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/27/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2012)
August 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 136 Motion for Leave to File (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2012)
August 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 102 MOTION to Intervene Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 24. Motion Hearing set for 8/24/2012 11:00 AM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 8/17/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2012)
April 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 112 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2012)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 109 STIPULATION AND ORDER, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 102 MOTION to Intervene Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 24. Responses due by 4/6/2012. Replies due by 4/13/2012.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 3/29/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2012)
February 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 91 Motion for Settlement (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2012)
December 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 12/22/2010. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2010)
December 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER re 72 Stipulation,, filed by Karen Jones, Desiree Moore, Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon Data Services, Inc., Verizon Services Corp., Verizon Corporate Services Group Inc., Verizon Services Group, Verizon Services Organization, Inc., Verizon Services Operations Inc., Verizon Corporate Services Corp., Verizon California, Inc.. Signed by Judge Laporte on 12/20/10. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2010)
September 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting in part and denying in part 43 Motion to Dismiss; granting 53 Motion FILE ADDITIONAL AUTHORITY; granting 56 Motion for Leave to File (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2010)
December 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION AND ORDER Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/2/2010 01:00 PM.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 12/8/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2009)
September 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER: That the Case Management Conference has been CONTINUED to 12/17/2009 at 03:00 PM., via telephone. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 9/18/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2009) Modified on 9/23/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re 17 Stipulation extending time for answer/response to 7/16/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 6/18/2009. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2009) Modified on 6/22/2009 (kk, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re 14 Stipulation to Extend the Deadline for Defendant's to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint filed by Verizon Northwest, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Verizon West Coast, Inc., Verizon California, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 5/14/2009. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2009) Modified on 5/15/2009 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore et al v. Verizon Communications, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desiree Moore
Represented By: Bryan G. Kolton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Jones
Represented By: Bryan G. Kolton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Rosemarie Theresa Ring, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon California, Inc.
Represented By: Rosemarie Theresa Ring, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Northwest, Inc.
Represented By: Rosemarie Theresa Ring, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon West Coast, Inc.
Represented By: Rosemarie Theresa Ring, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?