Muniz v. United Parcel Service, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kim Muniz
Defendant: United Parcel Service, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2009cv01987
Filed: May 6, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relations
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 316 Stipulation. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2014)
December 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 315 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Responses due by 1/16/2014.Replies due by 1/30/2014. Replies due by 2/6/2014. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 12/31/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2013)
November 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING 297 MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SUPERSEDEAS BOND AND TO STAY ENFORCEMENT, PENDING APPEAL, OF AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND NON-STATUTORY COSTS TO PLAINTIFF KIM MUNIZ. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2011)
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER Granting 282 Stipulation TO EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE SUPPLEMENT DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/19/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2011)
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER Granting 279 Stipulation MODIFYING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR FURTHER SUBMISSIONS RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS FOR ATTORNEY FEES. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/5/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2011)
March 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER ALLOWING FURTHER SUBMISSIONS ON 184 Plaintiff's MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs. Plaintiff's Supplementary Material due 4/8/2011. UPS's Response due 4/22/2011. Plaintiff's Reply, if necessary, due 4/29/2011. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/25/2011. (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2011)
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER STRIKING DEFENDANT'S OBJECTIONS TO DECLARATIONS FILED IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/10/2011. (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
January 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO QUASH THIRD PARTY SUBPOENA ON THE CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS FOR THE JAFFE LAW FIRM, AND DENYING RELATED MOTIONS. Motion to Quash 180 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The following are DENIED: 179 , 193 , 214 , 223 , 226 , 235 , 238 , 218 , 247 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 1/28/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2011)
January 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER Granting 190 MOTION to Continue Hearing on Plaintiff Kim Muniz's Motion for Attorneys' Fees filed by United Parcel Service, Inc., Set/Reset Deadlines as to 184 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs. Motion Hearing set for 3/3/2011 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/3/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2011)
November 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 155 Motion to Continue; denying 159 Motion to Strike (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2010)
November 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/2/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2010)
October 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 141 Motion for Extension of Time to File (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2010)
October 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 116 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2010)
September 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER GRANTING PERMISSION TO ENTER FEDERAL COURTHOUSE BUILDING WITH FOOD AND BEVERAGES. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/21/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2010)
September 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 102 VERDICT FORM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/20/2010. (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2010)
September 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 97 PRELIMINARY JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/16/2010. (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
August 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER re 57 Granting Stipulation To (1) Permit Private Mediation; (2) Continue Deadline to File Pretrial Materials; and (3) Continue Pretrial Conference. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/14/2010 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/5/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2010)
June 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER re 54 Granting Stipulation to Extend Case Management Dates. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/23/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2010)
April 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER re 40 Granting Stipulation TO CONTINUE HEARING ON MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT and BRIEFING SCHEDULE- AS MODIFIED. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 04/30/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2010)
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER re 24 Grating Joint Stipulation for Mental Examination. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 04/15/2010. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2010)
April 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re 21 Granting STIPULATION FOR DEPOSITIONS AFTER DISCOVERY CUT-OFF. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 04/05/2010. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2010)
July 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re 13 granting STIPULATION to Extend Time to Make Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(A). Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/21/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muniz v. United Parcel Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Muniz
Represented By: Stephen R. Jaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Parcel Service, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine C Huibonhoa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?