June 8, 2012 |
Filing
355
STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 6/3/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2012)
|
April 9, 2012 |
Filing
352
ORDER Vacating Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 4/9/2012. (hlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2012)
|
March 29, 2012 |
Filing
349
ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 345 Stipulation (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
|
March 14, 2012 |
Filing
339
Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting in part and denying in part 324 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2012)
|
March 12, 2012 |
Filing
331
ORDER re 324 Request to File Joint Discovery Letter Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 03/12/2012. (dmrlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2012)
|
March 9, 2012 |
Filing
327
ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 322 Stipulation (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2012)
|
March 7, 2012 |
Filing
323
Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 321 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Without Prejudice.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2012)
|
March 2, 2012 |
Filing
320
Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu denying 319 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Without Prejudice.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2012)
|
January 17, 2012 |
Filing
318
STIPULATION AND CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/24/2012.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 1/17/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2012)
|
January 9, 2012 |
Filing
314
ORDER REOPENING CASE, CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/20/2012. Jury Trial set for 9/5/2012 08:30 AM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Motions due by 6/19/2012. Pretrial Conference set for 7/31/2012 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 1/6/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2012)
|
December 28, 2011 |
Filing
309
ORDER CONDITIONALLY DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 12/28/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2011)
|
December 23, 2011 |
Filing
307
ORDER SCHEDULING FINAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/23/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2011)
|
December 22, 2011 |
Filing
305
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/22/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2011)
|
December 20, 2011 |
Filing
303
ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. Telephone Conference set for 12/22/2011 at 08:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/20/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2011)
|
December 13, 2011 |
Filing
300
ORDER granting 299 Applied Signal Technology, Inc.'s and Comtech EF Data Corp's Application to Bring Electronic Items into the Courthouse. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/12/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2011)
|
December 12, 2011 |
Filing
298
ORDER granting 297 Application to Bring Electronic Items Into the Courthouse filed by Emerging Markets Communications, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/12/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
|
November 29, 2011 |
Filing
295
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting 294 Motion to Appear by Telephone (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2011)
|
November 16, 2011 |
Filing
292
ORDER, Motions terminated: 287 Joint Motion for Extension of Relief from the Case Management Scheduling Conference Order and Status Report on the Progress of Settlement filed by Emerging Markets Communications, Inc., Comtech EF Data Corporation, EMC Satcom Technologies, Inc., Applied Signal Technology, Inc.. Case Management Conference set for 1/12/2012 03:45 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 11/15/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2011)
|
November 15, 2011 |
Filing
291
ORDER re 282 10/7/2011 Joint Discovery Letter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 11/15/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2011)
|
October 26, 2011 |
Filing
286
ORDER Setting Phone Conference re 282 Joint Discovery Letter. Telephonic Discovery Hearing set for 11/14/2011 1:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/26/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2011)
|
October 13, 2011 |
Filing
284
ORDER re 283 Joint MOTION for Extension of Relief from the Case Management Scheduling Conference Order and Joint Status Report on the Progress of Settlement filed by Emerging Markets Communications, Inc., Comtech EF Data Corporation, EMC Satcom Technologies, Inc., Applied Signal Technology, Inc.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 10/12/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2011)
|
August 30, 2011 |
Filing
278
ORDER re 276 Joint MOTION Joint Status Report of the Progress of Settlement Between Applied Signal, Comtech EF Data, Emerging Markets Communications, and EMC Satcom Technologies, and Request for Extension of Relief from the Case Management Scheduling Conference Orde filed by Emerging Markets Communications, Inc., Comtech EF Data Corporation, EMC Satcom Technologies, Inc., Applied Signal Technology, Inc.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 8/30/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2011)
|
June 14, 2011 |
Filing
262
ORDER re 261 Joint MOTION Status Report on the Progress of Settlement Between Applied Signal, Comtech EF Data, Emerging Markets Communications, and EMC Satcom Technologies, and Request for Extension of Relief from the Case Management Scheduling Conference Order filed by Emerging Markets Communications, Inc., Comtech EF Data Corporation, EMC Satcom Technologies, Inc., Applied Signal Technology, Inc.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 6/13/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2011)
|
May 24, 2011 |
Filing
258
ORDER re 251 MOTION for Extension of Relief from the Case Management Scheduling Conference; Joint Status Report on the Progress of Settlement filed by Emerging Markets Communications, Inc., Comtech EF Data Corporation, EMC Satcom Technologies, Inc., Applied Signal Technology, Inc.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 5/19/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2011)
|
May 16, 2011 |
Filing
252
ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 5/16/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2011)
|
May 12, 2011 |
Filing
247
ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 245 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2011)
|
May 9, 2011 |
Filing
243
ORDER RE JOINT STATUS REPORT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Zimmerman for Settlement. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 5/9/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2011)
|
May 5, 2011 |
Filing
238
ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 237 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2011)
|
May 3, 2011 |
Filing
234
ORDER re 233 Status Report, filed by Emerging Markets Communications, Inc., Comtech EF Data Corporation, EMC Satcom Technologies, Inc., Applied Signal Technology, Inc.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 5/2/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2011)
|
March 18, 2011 |
Filing
228
ORDER re 227 Status Report, filed by Emerging Markets Communications, Inc., Comtech EF Data Corporation, EMC Satcom Technologies, Inc., Applied Signal Technology, Inc.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 3/17/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2011)
|
February 18, 2011 |
Filing
219
ORDER re 218 Status Report filed by Emerging Markets Communications, Inc., Comtech EF Data Corporation, EMC Satcom Technologies, Inc., Applied Signal Technology, Inc.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 2/18/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
|
February 9, 2011 |
Filing
217
ORDER re 213 Claims Construction / Markman Hearing,. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 2/9/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2011)
|
January 20, 2011 |
Filing
211
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu GRANTING 178 Defendants Viasat, Inc. and Paradise Datacom LLC's Motion for Protective Order. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2011)
|
November 12, 2010 |
Filing
193
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 191 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 191 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 178 MOTION for Protective Order and Proposed Order, 178 MOTI ON for Protective Order Applied Signal Technology, Inc. and Comtech EF Data Corp's Responses due by 11/18/2010. ViaSat, Inc. and Paradise Datacom, LLC's Replies due by 11/30/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu 11/12/10. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2010)
|
October 27, 2010 |
Filing
188
ORDER re 185 Status Report, filed by Emerging Markets Communications, Inc., Comtech EF Data Corporation, EMC Satcom Technologies, Inc., Applied Signal Technology, Inc.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 10/27/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2010)
|
October 25, 2010 |
Filing
186
NOTICE AND ORDER VACATING AND RESETTING HEARING DATE ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER, AND ORDER RE MOTION PROCEDURES. Previously-noticed hearing date of 1/11/2011 on Defendants' Motion for Protective Order 178 has been reset before Magistrate Judge Ryu for 1/13/2011 at 11:00 AM, Courtroom 4, 3rd Fl., Oakland. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/25/2010. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2010)
|
September 28, 2010 |
Filing
172
ORDER re 169 Status Report, filed by Emerging Markets Communications, Inc., Comtech EF Data Corporation, EMC Satcom Technologies, Inc., Applied Signal Technology, Inc.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/27/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2010)
|
September 15, 2010 |
Filing
168
STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/14/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
|
September 13, 2010 |
Filing
166
ORDER re 160 Status Report, filed by Emerging Markets Communications, Inc., Comtech EF Data Corporation, EMC Satcom Technologies, Inc., Applied Signal Technology, Inc.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/13/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2010)
|
August 24, 2010 |
Filing
157
ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 156 Motion TO DESIGNATE ADDITIONAL TERMS (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
|
August 12, 2010 |
Filing
153
ORDER granting 151 Stipulation to Relieve Emerging Markets Communications, Inc. and EMC Satcom Technologies, Inc., from Compliance with Case Management Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 8/12/10. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2010)
|
July 29, 2010 |
Filing
145
ORDER SEALING TRANSCRIPT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 7/29/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2010)
|
July 21, 2010 |
Filing
135
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman GRANTING 133 Motion to Bring Electronics Into Courthouse (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2010) Modified on 7/22/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
July 16, 2010 |
Filing
128
ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 7/16/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2010)
|
June 10, 2010 |
Filing
121
ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 6/10/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2010)
|
May 19, 2010 |
Filing
109
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 6/1/2010.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 5/19/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2010)
|
May 17, 2010 |
Filing
103
ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR STATUS CONFERENCE re 98 Letter, filed by Emerging Markets Communications, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 5/17/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2010)
|
April 27, 2010 |
Filing
92
STIPULATION AND CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Claims Construction Hearing set for 12/2/2010 09:00 AM. Case Management Conference set for 12/2/2010 09:00 AM.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 4/26/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2010)
|
March 24, 2010 |
Filing
78
ORDER VACATING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE set for 03/26/10. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/24/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2010) Modified on 3/25/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
March 10, 2010 |
Filing
75
STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE to 05/20/2010 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/9/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2010) Modified on 3/11/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
March 9, 2010 |
Filing
74
ORDER SCHEDULING FURTHER TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE RE: VIASAT AND PARADISE DATECOM. Telephonic Conference set for 03/12/10 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman, on 3/9/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2010) Modified on 3/10/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
March 3, 2010 |
Filing
68
ORDER FOR FURTHER NEGOTIATIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/3/2010. (ahy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2010)
|
March 2, 2010 |
Filing
67
ORDER DIRECTING COMTECH'S ATTENDANCE AT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/2/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2010)
|
February 25, 2010 |
Filing
61
ORDER SCHEDULING FURTHER TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE to 03/02/2010 at 8:45 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman, on 2/25/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2010) Modified on 2/26/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
February 23, 2010 |
Filing
58
ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE: Telephonic Conference set for 03/02/10 at 4:00 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 2/23/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2010) Modified on 2/24/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
February 19, 2010 |
Filing
53
ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE for 02/25/10 at 1:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 2/19/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2010) Modified on 2/22/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
February 9, 2010 |
Filing
51
ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE to 02/23/2010 at 3:00 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 2/8/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2010) Modified on 2/10/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
December 22, 2009 |
Filing
41
SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - PATENT CASE - RE: VIASAT AND PARADISE. A Telephonic Conference is set for 02/08/10 at 3:00 PM and Settlement Conference is set for 03/25/10 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/22/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2009) Modified on 12/23/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
December 1, 2009 |
Filing
36
ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE RE DEVISING A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULE FOR PATENT CASE: Telephonic hearing set for 12/10/09 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman, on 12/1/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2009) Modified on 12/3/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
September 2, 2009 |
Filing
16
STIPULATION AND ORDER Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2009 03:00 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/2/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2009)
|