Quintanilla v. Preferred Financial Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jose Quintanilla
Defendant: Preferred Financial Group, Inc., Mayan Holdings, Central Mortgage Loan Servicing Company and MTC Financial Inc.
Case Number: 4:2009cv02312
Filed: May 26, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER OF DISMISSAL as to Defendants Preferred Financial Group, Inc., and Mayan Holdings. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/9/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2009)
August 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER RE SERVICE. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 8/18/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2009)
August 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/3/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quintanilla v. Preferred Financial Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Quintanilla
Represented By: Reuben Lagbao Nocos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preferred Financial Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayan Holdings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Mortgage Loan Servicing Company
Represented By: William Guy Malcolm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTC Financial Inc.
Represented By: Richard Joseph Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?