Shahpor Ghobadi v. State of California
Petitioner: Shahpor Ghobadi
Respondent: State of California
Case Number: 4:2009cv02459
Filed: June 3, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING 18 SECOND MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2011)
January 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER STAYING HABEAS PROCEEDINGS; DIRECTING PETITIONER TO FILE QUARTERLY STATUS REPORTS; AND DIRECTING CLERK TO ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE THIS CASE UNTIL THE COURT ISSUES ORDER LIFTING STAY. 16 Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/6/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2011) (Entered on 1/7/2011)
December 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING RESPONDENT'S 12 MOTION TO DISMISS PETITION AS UNEXHAUSTED; AND REQUIRING PETITIONER'S ELECTION REGARDING MIXED PETITION (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2010)
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/23/10. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2010)
May 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF TRANSFER signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 5/27/2009, CASE TRANSFERRED to Northern District of California. (Sant Agata, S)
April 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DENYING 5 Motion for Appointment of Counsel, Signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 4/27/2009. (Arellano, S.)
March 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Authorizing In Forma Pauperis Status, signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa A. Goldner on 3/27/2009. (Scrivner, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shahpor Ghobadi v. State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Shahpor Ghobadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?