Smart v. Harrington
Petitioner: Alvin Smart
Respondent: Kelly Harrington
Case Number: 4:2009cv03127
Filed: July 10, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/7/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
October 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR SECOND EXTENSION OF TIME FOR PETITIONER TO FILE TRAVERSE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/19/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2010)
September 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME FOR PETITIONER TO FILE TRAVERSE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/10/10. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smart v. Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alvin Smart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kelly Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?