March 19, 2019 |
Filing 524
Acknowledgment Receipt from defendant National Collegiat Athletic Association re trial exhibits (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2019)
|
March 15, 2019 |
Filing 523
Acknowledgment Receipt of trial exhibits by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2019)
|
March 14, 2019 |
Filing 522
NOTICE by National Collegiate Athletic Association of Withdrawal Of Exhibits Pursuant To Civil L. R. 79-4(b) (Raphael, Justin) (Filed on 3/14/2019)
|
February 27, 2019 |
Filing 521
NOTICE re Withdrawal of Exhibits Pursuant to Civil L. R. 79-4(b) by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. re #520 Clerk's Notice (Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 2/27/2019) Modified on 2/28/2019 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
February 13, 2019 |
Filing 520
CLERK'S NOTICE re withdrawal of exhibit in accordance with Local Rule 79-4(b). (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2019)
|
July 25, 2018 |
Filing 519
Order by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #518 Stipulation Releasing Supersedeas Bond and Approving Satisfaction of Judgment.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2018)
|
July 24, 2018 |
Filing 518
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Releasing Supersedeas Bond and Approving Satisfaction of Judgment filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association, Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr, et al. (Curtner, Gregory) (Filed on 7/24/2018) Modified on 7/24/2018 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
July 23, 2018 |
Filing 517
MANDATE of USCA as to #483 Notice of Appeal, filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2018)
|
June 29, 2018 |
Filing 516
USCA Memorandum as to #483 Notice of Appeal, filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2018)
|
May 25, 2017 |
Filing 515
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 5/25/2017) Modified on 5/26/2017 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
|
May 12, 2017 |
Filing 514
MANDATE of USCA as to (1303) in 4:09-cv-01967-CW, #494 in 4:09-cv-03329-CW) Notice of Appeal, (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2017)
|
April 20, 2017 |
Filing 513
ORDER of USCA: Appeal is dismissed as to ((1303) in 4:09-cv-01967-CW, (494) in 4:09-cv-03329-CW) Notice of Appeal, (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2017)
|
October 24, 2016 |
Filing 512
Receipt #44611013758 for Attorney-in-Fact (Karen D. Zelinski) re Supersedeas Bond (Dkt. #508 -2). (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2016)
|
October 18, 2016 |
Filing 511
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Thomas Micheletti (Micheletti, Christopher) (Filed on 10/18/2016)
|
October 12, 2016 |
Filing 510
ORDER GRANTING NCAA'S MOTION TO APPROVE SUPERSEDEAS BOND AND STAY ENFORCEMENT OF JUDGMENT PENDING APPEAL by Hon. Claudia Wilken.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2016)
|
October 11, 2016 |
Filing 509
RESPONSE (re #508 MOTION to Approve Supersedeas Bond and Stay Enforcement of Judgment Pending Appeal ) filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 10/11/2016)
|
October 7, 2016 |
Filing 508
MOTION to Approve Supersedeas Bond and Stay Enforcement of Judgment Pending Appeal filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. Responses due by 10/11/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gregory L. Curtner, #2 Exhibit A to GLC Declaration (Bond), #3 Exhibit B to GLC Declaration (email), #4 Proposed Order Granting the NCAA's Motion)(Curtner, Gregory) (Filed on 10/7/2016) Modified on 10/11/2016 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
|
September 22, 2016 |
Filing 507
ORDER of USCA: appellants motion to stay or modify the district courts order is denied as to #483 Notice of Appeal, filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2016)
|
September 19, 2016 |
Filing 506
NOTICE of Change of Address of Attorney Daniel Cohen, filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Cohen, Daniel) (Filed on 9/19/2016) Modified on 9/20/2016 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
August 8, 2016 |
Filing 505
NOTICE by Collegiate Licensing Company Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney Cindy D. Hanson (Hanson, Cindy) (Filed on 8/8/2016)
|
August 5, 2016 |
Filing 504
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF CRONIN'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Re: Dkt. No. 1301 in 4:09-cv-01967 CW ( #458 in 4:09-cv-03329-CW). Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2016)
|
July 19, 2016 |
Filing 503
NOTICE by National Collegiate Athletic Association of Withdrawal of Attorney (Nathan "Thane" Rehn) (Klaus, Kelly) (Filed on 7/19/2016)
|
July 18, 2016 |
Filing 502
NOTICE by National Collegiate Athletic Association of Withdrawal of Attorney (Kefalas, Kimberly) (Filed on 7/18/2016)
|
June 20, 2016 |
Filing 501
Transcript Designation Form. Not Designating transcript filed by Kevin B. Cronin, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2016)
|
June 17, 2016 |
Filing 500
AMENDED ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANT NCAAS #493 MOTION FOR STAY WITHOUT BOND. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/17/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2016)
|
June 17, 2016 |
Filing 499
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken ON NCAAS #496 MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2016) Modified on 6/17/2016 (ndrS, COURT STAFF).
|
June 16, 2016 |
Filing 498
REPLY (re #496 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for clarification of Dkt. 493 (and for any other relief the Court deems appropriate) re #493 Order on Motion to Stay ) Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to NCAA's Motion for Clarification filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Curtner, Gregory) (Filed on 6/16/2016)
|
June 15, 2016 |
Filing 497
RESPONSE (re #496 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for clarification of Dkt. 493 (and for any other relief the Court deems appropriate) re #493 Order on Motion to Stay ) filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sathya S. Gosselin, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Sathya S. Gosselin)(Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 6/15/2016)
|
June 13, 2016 |
Filing 496
ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for clarification of Dkt. 493 (and for any other relief the Court deems appropriate) re #493 Order on Motion to Stay filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. Responses due by 6/17/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gregory L. Curtner in Support of Defendant NCAA's Motion for Clarification, #2 Exhibit "A" to Declaration of Gregory L. Curtner in Support of Defendant NCAA's Motion for Clarification, #3 Proposed Order Clarifying the Court's Order Granting in Part the NCAA's Motion for Stay Without Bond, Dkt. 493)(Curtner, Gregory) (Filed on 6/13/2016)
|
May 24, 2016 |
Filing 495
USCA Case Number 16-15922 Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals for #494 Notice of Appeal. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2016)
|
May 20, 2016 |
Filing 493
ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANT NCAAS MOTION FOR STAY WITHOUT BOND by Hon. Claudia Wilken granting in part and denying in part #480 Motion to Stay.(napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2016)
|
May 19, 2016 |
Filing 492
TRANSCRIPT ORDER - CJA for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Curtner, Gregory) (Filed on 5/19/2016)
|
May 18, 2016 |
Filing 494
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals. Appeal of Order (1300 in 4:09-cv-01967-CW, 481 in 4:09-cv-03329-CW) filed by Kevin B. Cronin (FEE PAID: Receipt #54611016249.) (Attachments: #1 receipt)(cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2016) Modified on 5/20/2016 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
May 17, 2016 |
Filing 490
NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Allan Steyer (Steyer, Allan) (Filed on 5/17/2016)
|
May 16, 2016 |
Filing 491
USCA Case Number 15-1388 U.S. Supreme Court. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2016)
|
May 10, 2016 |
Filing 489
REPLY (re #480 MOTION to Stay Enforcement of Judgment re #477 Order Pending Appeal Without Bond, or Alternatively, for Temporary Pending Approval of Supersedeas Bond ) filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Curtner, Gregory) (Filed on 5/10/2016)
|
May 9, 2016 |
Filing 488
RESPONSE (re #485 MOTION to Amend/Correct (481 in 4:09-cv-03329-CW) Order ) filed bySamuel Michael Keller. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Carey, Robert) (Filed on 5/9/2016)
|
May 3, 2016 |
Filing 487
RESPONSE (re #480 MOTION to Stay Enforcement of Judgment re #477 Order Pending Appeal Without Bond, or Alternatively, for Temporary Pending Approval of Supersedeas Bond ) filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 5/3/2016)
|
May 2, 2016 |
Filing 486
USCA Case Number 16-15803 Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals for #483 Notice of Appeal, filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2016)
|
April 29, 2016 |
Filing 485
MOTION TO AMEND ORDER TO CORRECT ERRORS OF FACT AND GRANT APPEAL AS TIMELY, and MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE NOTICE OF APPEAL (re 481 in 4:09-cv-03329-CW) filed by Kevin B. Cronin. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2016)
|
April 28, 2016 |
Filing 484
Representation Statement re dkt. #483 Notice of Appeal by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Curtner, Gregory) (Filed on 4/28/2016) Modified on 4/29/2016 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
April 28, 2016 |
Filing 483
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. Appeal of Order #477 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-10407172 paid.) (Curtner, Gregory) (Filed on 4/28/2016) Modified on 4/29/2016 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
April 27, 2016 |
Filing 482
CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING hearing as to #480 MOTION to Stay Enforcement of Judgment. The motion will be decided on the papers. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2016). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
|
April 19, 2016 |
Filing 481
ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL CLAIM AS UNTIMELY. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 4/19/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2016)
|
April 19, 2016 |
Filing 480
MOTION to Stay Enforcement of Judgment re #477 Order Pending Appeal Without Bond, or Alternatively, for Temporary Pending Approval of Supersedeas Bond; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. Motion Hearing set for 5/24/2016 02:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 5/3/2016. Replies due by 5/10/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gregory L. Curtner in Support of Motion to Stay Enforcement of Judgment Pending Appeal Without Bond, #2 Declaration of Kathleen McNeely in Support of Motion to Stay Enforcement of Judgment Pending Appeal Without Bond, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Kathleen McNeely in Support of Motion to Stay Enforcement of Judgment Pending Appeal Without Bond, #4 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Stay Enforcement of Judgment Pending Appeal Without Bond)(Curtner, Gregory) (Filed on 4/19/2016) Modified on 4/20/2016 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
April 6, 2016 |
Filing 479
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting (478) Request for Approval of Additional Solicitation of W-9s from Claimants in case 4:09-cv-03329-CW; granting (1298) Request for Approval of Additional Solicitation of W-9s from Claimants in case 4:09-cv-01967-CW. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2016)
|
April 5, 2016 |
Filing 478
Class Counsel's Request for Approval of Additional Solicitation of W-9s from Claimants by Samuel Michael Keller (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Carey, Robert) (Filed on 4/5/2016) Modified on 4/6/2016 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
March 31, 2016 |
Filing 477
ORDER GRANTING THE NCAAS MOTION FOR DE NOVO REVIEW AND ADOPTING IN PART MAGISTRATE JUDGE COUSINS ORDER ON ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS by Judge Claudia Wilken granting in part #415 Motion ; granting #416 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting #420 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting #425 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2016)
|
March 23, 2016 |
Filing 476
ORDER RESOLVING CLAIM APPEALS. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 3/23/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2016)
|
March 22, 2016 |
Filing 475
Class Counsel Findings from Investigation of Claim Appeals and Recommendations for Resolution by Samuel Michael Keller. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carey, Robert) (Filed on 3/22/2016) Modified on 3/23/2016 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
March 20, 2016 |
Filing 473
ORDER FOLLOWING STATUS CONFERENCE. Plaintiffs are ordered to file an updated settlement process status report by 3/30/2016. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 3/20/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2016)
|
March 17, 2016 |
Filing 474
USCA Case Number 15-1167 US Supreme Court. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2016)
|
March 16, 2016 |
Filing 472
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins: Telephone hearing re: settlement claim forms held on 3/16/2016. Plaintiffs' Attorneys: Swathi Bojedla, Celeste Boyd, Leonard Aragon, Arthur Owens. Attorney for Defendant NCAA: Greg Curtner. (FTR: 2:08pm - 2:21pm.) Attachment Minute order. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/16/2016)
|
March 14, 2016 |
Filing 471
Letter from Celeste H.G. Boyd for Class Counsel re Summary of Claim Process. (Boyd, Celeste) (Filed on 3/14/2016)
|
February 29, 2016 |
Filing 470
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC HEARING RE: SETTLEMENT CLAIM FORMS. Counsel are ordered to attend a telephonic hearing 3/16/2016 02:00 PM to discuss the procedural mechanisms for resolution of the claims forms. Counsel must contact deputy Lili Harrell at 408.535.5343 to provide contact information. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 2/29/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2016)
|
January 25, 2016 |
Filing 469
Supplemental Response in Opposition to re #415 MOTION for De Novo Determination of Dispositive Matter Referred to Magistrate Judge re #405 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Related document(s) #415 ) (Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 1/25/2016) Modified on 1/26/2016 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
January 20, 2016 |
Filing 468
ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR RELEASE OF FUNDS by Judge Claudia Wilken granting (464) Motion for Release of Funds in case 4:09-cv-03329-CW; granting (1288) Motion for Release of Funds in case 4:09-cv-01967-CW. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2016)
|
January 19, 2016 |
Filing 467
Statement of Non-Opposition re #464 MOTION for Release of Funds filed bySamuel Michael Keller. (Related document(s) #464 ) (Aragon, Leonard) (Filed on 1/19/2016)
|
January 8, 2016 |
Filing 466
Supplemental Brief re #415 MOTION for De Novo Determination of Dispositive Matter Referred to Magistrate Judge re #405 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Related document(s) #415 ) (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 1/8/2016)
|
January 8, 2016 |
Filing 465
CLERK'S NOTICE. You are hereby notified that the motion hearing previously set for 2/9/16 is vacated. The Court shall decide the Motion for Release of Funds on the papers. Plaintiffs shall respond to the motion or file a statement of non-opposition by 1/19/16, according to the briefing schedule previously set by counsel. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2016)
|
January 8, 2016 |
Filing 464
MOTION for Release of Funds filed by Nathan Harris. Motion Hearing set for 2/9/2016 02:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 1/22/2016. Replies due by 1/29/2016. (Kron, Scott) (Filed on 1/8/2016)
|
December 28, 2015 |
Filing 463
MANDATE of USCA as to #316 Notice of Appeal, filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association, #299 Notice of Appeal filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2015)
|
December 21, 2015 |
Filing 462
STIPULATION AND ORDER TO MODIFY BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING REGARDING NCAA'S MOTION FOR DE NOVO REVIEW OF DISPOSITIVE MATTER REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Hon. Claudia Wilken granting #461 Stipulation. Supplemental brief due January 8, 2016, and response brief shall be filed on January 25, 2016. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2015)
|
December 18, 2015 |
Filing 461
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Modify Briefing Schedule for Supplemental Briefing Regarding NCAA's Motion for De Novo Review of Dispositive Matter Referred to Magistrate Judge filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 12/18/2015)
|
December 16, 2015 |
Filing 460
ORDER of USCA: Appellees petition for rehearing en banc filed October 14, 2015, is DENIED as to #316 Notice of Appeal, filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association, #299 Notice of Appeal filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2015)
|
December 15, 2015 |
Filing 459
CORRECTED ORDER FOR ATTORNEYS FEES. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/15/15. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2015)
|
December 15, 2015 |
Filing 458
ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION OF COURTS ORDER FOR ATTORNEYS FEES by Hon. Claudia Wilken granting #457 Motion. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2015)
|
December 14, 2015 |
Filing 457
Joint MOTION for Clarification of the Court's Order for Attorneys' Fees re #456 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. Motion Hearing set for 1/19/2016 02:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 12/28/2015. Replies due by 1/4/2016. (Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 12/14/2015) Modified on 12/15/2015 (kk, COURT STAFF).
|
December 10, 2015 |
Filing 456
ORDER FOR ATTORNEYS FEES by Judge Claudia Wilken granting in part (365) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 4:09-cv-03329-CW; granting in part (1193) Motion for Attorney Fees; granting in part (1194) Motion for Attorney Fees; granting in part (1196) Motion for Attorney Fees; granting (1197) Motion for Attorney Fees; granting in part (1207) Motion for Attorney Fees in case 4:09-cv-01967-CW. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2015)
|
December 1, 2015 |
Filing 455
ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANT NCAA'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FURTHER BRIEFING by Hon. Claudia Wilken granting in part #449 Motion for Leave to File. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2015)
|
November 30, 2015 |
Filing 454
ORDER APPROVING REVISIONS TO FIRST LETTER TO CLAIMANTS by Judge Claudia Wilken granting (450) Motion in case 4:09-cv-03329-CW (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2015)
|
November 25, 2015 |
Filing 453
RESPONSE (re #449 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memoranda on Motion for De Novo Determination of Attorneys' Fees ) filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 11/25/2015)
|
November 25, 2015 |
Filing 452
CLERK'S NOTICE. You are hereby notified of the following deadline: Motion for De Novo Determination of Attorneys' Fees, Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Administrative Motion due by 11/27/2015 re #449 . Motion Hearing Vacated re #449 .(This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2015)
|
November 24, 2015 |
Filing 451
***Please disregard, entered in error*** ORDER ON STATUS OF ASHKER SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/24/15. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2015) Modified on 11/24/2015 (jebS, COURT STAFF).
|
November 24, 2015 |
Filing 450
Joint Request for Order Approving Revisions to First Letter to Claimants re #448 Notice; (Proposed) Order by Samuel Michael Keller. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Carey, Robert) (Filed on 11/24/2015) Modified on 11/25/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
November 24, 2015 |
***Please disregard, entered in error. SEE CORRECTED DEADLINES BELOW*** Set/Reset Deadlines as to #449 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memoranda on Motion for De Novo Determination of Attorneys' Fees. Responses due by 12/7/2015. Replies due by 12/14/2015. Motion Hearing set for 1/5/2016 02:30 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2015) Modified on 11/25/2015 (jebS, COURT STAFF).
|
November 24, 2015 |
Motion Hearing Vacated re #449 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memoranda on Motion for De Novo Determination of Attorneys' Fees, Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Administrative Motion due by 11/27/2015 re #449 . (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2015)
|
November 23, 2015 |
Filing 449
MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Memoranda on Motion for De Novo Determination of Attorneys' Fees filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gregory L. Curtner, #2 Proposed Order)(Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 11/23/2015)
|
November 16, 2015 |
Filing 448
Joint Notice of Revisions to First Letter to Claimants by Samuel Michael Keller (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2)(Carey, Robert) (Filed on 11/16/2015) Modified on 11/17/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
November 16, 2015 |
Filing 447
ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS FOR ATTORNEYS FEES. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/16/15. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2015)
|
November 9, 2015 |
Filing 446
MANDATE of USCA: Granting Stipulated Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Appeals as to (434 in 4:09-cv-03329-CW) Notice of Appeal filed by Darrin Duncan, (1247 in 4:09-cv-01967-CW) Notice of Appeal filed by Nathan Harris (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2015)
|
November 3, 2015 |
Filing 445
ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS FOR ATTORNEYS FEES re (1193 in 4:09-cv-01967-CW) MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Conditionally to Intervene filed by Timothy J McIlwain, (1207 in 4:09-cv-01967-CW) Amended MOTION for Attorney Fees , Expenses and Incentive Award filed by Ryan Hart. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/3/15. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2015)
|
November 2, 2015 |
Filing 444
Bond Receipt in the amount of $5,000.00 from Kron and Card on behalf of the Objectors/Appellants Nathan Harris and Darrin Duncan. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2015) Modified on 11/3/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
October 31, 2015 |
Filing 443
NOTICE of Deposit by Darrin Duncan, Nathan Harris re #442 Order on Motion for Bond (Kron, Scott) (Filed on 10/31/2015) Modified on 11/2/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
October 21, 2015 |
Filing 442
ORDER GRANTING IN PART CLASS PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR APPEAL BOND by Judge Claudia Wilken granting in part (1250) Motion for Bond in case 4:09-cv-01967-CW and in case 4:09-cv-03329-CW. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2015)
|
October 15, 2015 |
Filing 441
TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Darrin Duncan for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Tucker, Caroline) (Filed on 10/15/2015)
|
October 9, 2015 |
Filing 440
Opposition to Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Imposition of Appeal Bond Against Objector Appellants filed by Nathan Harris, Darrin Duncan (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration)(Tucker, Caroline) (Filed on 10/9/2015) Modified on 10/13/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/13/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
October 6, 2015 |
Filing 439
CLERK'S NOTICE. As stated in the Court's order dated October 5, 2015, at Docket No. 1253, Plaintiffs' Motion for Appeal Bond will be decided on the papers. The November 12, 2015 hearing is vacated. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2015)
|
October 5, 2015 |
Filing 438
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO EXPEDITE BRIEFING by Judge Claudia Wilken, in case 4:09-cv-03329-CW; granting (1251) Motion to Expedite in case 4:09-cv-01967-CW. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2015)
|
September 30, 2015 |
Filing 437
OPINION of USCA as to #316 Notice of Appeal, filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association, #299 Notice of Appeal filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2015)
|
September 18, 2015 |
Filing 436
USCA Case Number 15-16860 Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals for #434 Notice of Appeal filed by Darrin Duncan. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2015)
|
September 16, 2015 |
Filing 435
Representation Statement by Darrin Duncan (Tucker, Caroline) (Filed on 9/16/2015) Modified on 9/17/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
September 16, 2015 |
Filing 434
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Darrin Duncan. (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-9841323 paid.) (Tucker, Caroline) (Filed on 9/16/2015)
|
September 3, 2015 |
Filing 433
Letter from Celeste H.G. Boyd, Class Counsel re Request by Robert Sack for Relief from Claims Deadline. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-3, #2 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Aragon, Leonard) (Filed on 9/3/2015)
|
August 26, 2015 |
Filing 432
Letter from Robert C. Sack Requesting Claim Filing Relief. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2015)
|
August 20, 2015 |
Filing 431
CLERK'S NOTICE. YOU ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED that the September 8, 2015 hearing on Defendant NCAA's MOTION for De Novo Determination of Dispositive Matter Referred to Magistrate Judge is VACATED. The motion will be decided on the papers. The stipulation and proposed order (docket no. 430) to extend the hearing date is terminated as moot. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2015)
|
August 20, 2015 |
Filing 430
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Concerning Extension of Hearing Date re #415 MOTION for De Novo Determination of Dispositive Matter Referred to Magistrate Judge re #405 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association, Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gregory L. Curtner)(Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 8/20/2015) Modified on 8/21/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/21/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
August 19, 2015 |
Filing 429
ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/18/15. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2015)
|
August 17, 2015 |
Filing 428
Letter from C. Tate George re: request from the court on the ruling on the E.A. Sports settlement dollars on July 16, 2015. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2015)
|
August 17, 2015 |
Filing 427
REPLY (re #415 MOTION for De Novo Determination of Dispositive Matter Referred to Magistrate Judge re #405 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees ) filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 8/17/2015)
|
August 14, 2015 |
Filing 426
NOTICE of Change of Address by Derek G. Howard one of the attorneys for Plaintiff O'Bannon (Howard, Derek) (Filed on 8/14/2015)
|
August 12, 2015 |
Filing 425
Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration Declaration of Paul Bateman In Support of NCAA's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #3 Exhibit 1 - Redacted Amended Declaration of Paul Bateman In Support of NCAA's Motion for De Novo Determination, #4 Exhibit Filed Under Seal - Unredacted Amended Declaration of Paul Bateman in Support of NCAA's Motion for De Novo Determination)(Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 8/12/2015)
|
August 12, 2015 |
Filing 424
NOTICE of Filing of Amended Declaration of Paul E. Bateman, Jr. in support of re #415 MOTION for De Novo Determination of Dispositive Matter Referred to Magistrate Judge re #405 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees by National Collegiate Athletic Association (Attachments: #1 Declaration Amended Declaration of Paul Bateman In Support of NCAA's Motion for De Novo Determination)(Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 8/12/2015) Modified on 8/13/2015 (cp, COURT STAFF).
|
August 11, 2015 |
Filing 423
STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO FILE AMENDED DECLARATION by Hon. Claudia Wilken granting #419 Stipulation.(jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2015)
|
August 10, 2015 |
Filing 422
Proposed Order Joint Filing of Proposed Final Approval Orders by Samuel Michael Keller, Electronic Arts Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Carey, Robert) (Filed on 8/10/2015) Modified on 8/11/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
August 10, 2015 |
Filing 421
RESPONSE (re #415 MOTION for De Novo Determination of Dispositive Matter Referred to Magistrate Judge re #405 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees ) filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 8/10/2015)
|
August 6, 2015 |
Filing 420
Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Robert Wierenga, #3 Exhibit Redacted Declaration of Paul Bateman, #4 Exhibit Sealed Amended Declaration of Paul Bateman)(Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 8/6/2015)
|
August 6, 2015 |
Filing 419
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER For Leave To File Amended Declaration of Paul Bateman In Support of NCAA's Motion for De Novo Determination filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association, Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Proposed Amended Declaration of Paul Bateman In Support of NCAA Motion for De Novo Determination)(Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 8/6/2015) Modified on 8/7/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
July 31, 2015 |
Filing 418
ORDER of USCA: The court grants a stay of the district courts injunction in this case, dated August 8, 2014, to preserve the status quo until this courts mandate has issued as to #316 Notice of Appeal, filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association, #299 Notice of Appeal filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2015)
|
July 28, 2015 |
Filing 417
Renotice motion hearing re #415 MOTION for De Novo Determination of Dispositive Matter Referred to Magistrate Judge re #405 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. Motion Hearing set for 9/8/2015 02:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 8/10/2015. Replies due by 8/17/2015. (Related document(s) #415 ) (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 7/28/2015)
|
July 28, 2015 |
Set/Reset Deadlines as to #415 MOTION for De Novo Determination of Dispositive Matter Referred to Magistrate Judge. Responses due by 8/10/2015. Replies due by 8/17/2015. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2015)
|
July 27, 2015 |
Filing 416
Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Robert Wierenga, #3 Exhibit 1 - Redacted Declaration of Paul Bateman, #4 Exhibit 1 - Sealed Declaration of Paul Bateman)(Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 7/27/2015)
|
July 27, 2015 |
Filing 415
MOTION for De Novo Determination of Dispositive Matter Referred to Magistrate Judge re #405 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Paul Bateman)(Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 7/27/2015) Modified on 7/28/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
July 27, 2015 |
Filing 414
ORDER GRANTING Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Provisionally Filed Under Seal filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. #360 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2015)
|
July 27, 2015 |
Filing 413
ORDER GRANTING NCAA'S ADMINISTRATIVE Motion to File Materials Provisionally Filed Under Seal #354 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2015)
|
July 27, 2015 |
Filing 412
ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL Time-Detail Exhibits to the Declarations in Support of Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Expenses #340 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2015)
|
July 27, 2015 |
Filing 411
ORDER GRANTING Motion to Seal Time-Detail Exhibits to the Declarations in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Expenses #320 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2015)
|
July 24, 2015 |
Filing 410
Transcript of Proceedings held on July 16, 2015, before Judge Claudia Wilken. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (1232 in 4:09-cv-01967-CW) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/22/2015. (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 7/24/2015)
|
July 17, 2015 |
Filing 408
SCHEDULING ORDER. Objections due by 7/27/2015. Opposition due by 8/10/2015. Reply due by 8/17/2015. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/17/2015. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2015)
|
July 16, 2015 |
Filing 409
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Claudia Wilken: Motion Hearing Re: Motion for Attorney Fees (dkt nos. 1193, 1194, 1196, 1197, 1207) and Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement (dkt nos. 1222, 1224) in case no. 09-cv-01967-CW held on 7/16/2015. Motion Hearing Re: Motion for Attorney Fees (dkt no. 365) and Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement (dkt no. 401) in case no. 09-cv-03329-CW held on 7/16/2015.Court Reporter: Diane Skillman. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/16/2015)
|
July 15, 2015 |
Filing 407
Proposed Order re #401 Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement with Electronic Arts. Inc. by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 7/15/2015)
|
July 15, 2015 |
Filing 406
Declaration of Kenneth Jue in Support of #401 Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement with Electronic Arts. Inc. filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Related document(s) #401 ) (Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 7/15/2015)
|
July 13, 2015 |
Filing 405
ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES Re: Dkt. No. #341 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2015)
|
July 6, 2015 |
Filing 404
ORDER GRANTING NCAA'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE RE: MOTION ON ATTORNEYS' FEES, Dkt. No. #389 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 7/6/2015. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2015)
|
July 2, 2015 |
Filing 402
Declaration of Kenneth Jue on Behalf of Settlement Administrator Regarding Notice and Administration filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 7/2/2015)
|
July 2, 2015 |
Filing 401
Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement with Electronic Arts. Inc. filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. Motion Hearing set for 7/16/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 7/16/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael D. Hausfeld, #2 Declaration of Steve W. Berman, #3 Declaration of Leonard W. Aragon)(Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 7/2/2015) Modified on 7/6/2015 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
|
June 26, 2015 |
Filing 400
ORDER Denying Request for Transcripts and Court Documents. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 06/26/2015. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2015)
|
June 22, 2015 |
Filing 399
Letter from C. Tate George requesting forms. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2015)
|
June 8, 2015 |
Filing 398
NOTICE of Change of Address by Kimberly Ann Kralowec and The Kralowec Law Group (Kralowec, Kimberly) (Filed on 6/8/2015)
|
June 3, 2015 |
Filing 397
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #369 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; denying #393 Motion to Submit Documents for In Camera Review. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2015) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/23/2015: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tmiS, COURT STAFF).
|
May 29, 2015 |
Filing 396
REPLY in support of re #389 Request for Judicial Notice of Antitrust Plaintiffs' Fee Petition Filings in the EA Settlement Proceedings filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Related document(s) #389 ) (Curtner, Gregory) (Filed on 5/29/2015) Modified on 6/1/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
May 26, 2015 |
Filing 395
RESPONSE (re #369 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Tate George ) filed by C. Tate George (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2015)
|
May 22, 2015 |
Filing 394
RESPONSE re #389 Request for Judicial Notice of Antitrust Plaintiffs' Fee Petition Filings in the EA Settlement Proceedings filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Related document(s) #389 ) (Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 5/22/2015) Modified on 5/26/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
May 18, 2015 |
Filing 393
MOTION Administrative Motion to Submit Document In Camera re #369 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Tate George filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. Responses due by 6/1/2015. Replies due by 6/8/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Scherrer, Hilary) (Filed on 5/18/2015)
|
May 18, 2015 |
Filing 392
Notice of Filing of Document by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. re #369 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Tate George (Scherrer, Hilary) (Filed on 5/18/2015) Modified on 5/19/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
May 18, 2015 |
Electronic filing error. Document filed in wrong case. Document is showing as Case No. 4:09-cv-1967 CW Re: #390 Notice filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2015)
|
May 18, 2015 |
Electronic filing error. Document filed in wrong case. Document is showing as Case No. 4:09-cv-1967 CW Re: #391 MOTION Administrative Motion to Submit Document In Camera re #369 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Tate George filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2015)
|
May 15, 2015 |
Filing 391
MOTION Administrative Motion to Submit Document In Camera re #369 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Tate George filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. Responses due by 5/29/2015. Replies due by 6/5/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hilary K. Scherrer, #2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion)(Scherrer, Hilary) (Filed on 5/15/2015)
|
May 15, 2015 |
Filing 390
NOTICE by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. re #369 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Tate George Notice of Filing of Document (Scherrer, Hilary) (Filed on 5/15/2015)
|
May 11, 2015 |
Filing 389
Request for Judicial Notice re #341 Amended MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, and Expenses filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gregory L. Curtner, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Gregory L. Curtner, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Gregory L. Curtner, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Gregory L. Curtner, #5 Proposed Order Granting NCAA' Request for Judicial Notice)(Related document(s) #341 ) (Curtner, Gregory) (Filed on 5/11/2015)
|
May 8, 2015 |
Filing 388
TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Bojedla, Swathi) (Filed on 5/8/2015)
|
May 8, 2015 |
Filing 387
Transcript of Proceedings held on 04/29/2015, before Judge Cousins. Court Reporter Irene L. Rodriguez, Telephone number (408)947-8160 Irene_Rodriguez@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #377 Transcript Order, #376 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/6/2015. (Related documents(s) #377 , #376 ) (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 5/8/2015)
|
May 8, 2015 |
Filing 386
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. re #369 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Tate George, #384 Order (Scherrer, Hilary) (Filed on 5/8/2015)
|
May 8, 2015 |
Electronic filing error. Please re-file in its entirety docket #385 Certificate of Service filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. Document not filed in compliance with LR 3-4(a)(1), first page requirement. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2015)
|
May 7, 2015 |
Filing 385
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. re #369 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Tate George, #384 Order (Scherrer, Hilary) (Filed on 5/7/2015)
|
May 7, 2015 |
Filing 384
ORDER Regarding #369 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 05/07/2015. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2015)
|
May 6, 2015 |
Filing 383
Letter from C. Tate George. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2015)
|
May 6, 2015 |
Filing 382
CLERK'S NOTICE Vacating Hearing. #369 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney, which has been noticed for Thursday, 06/04/2015, will be decided on papers submitted without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing is hereby VACATED. This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2015)
|
May 4, 2015 |
Filing 381
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S ADMINISTATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL SUPPLEMENTAL EXHIBIT USED DURING HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES, COSTS, AND EXPENSES #380 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins.(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2015)
|
May 1, 2015 |
Filing 380
Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gregory Curtner, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit NCAA Supplemental Hearing Exhibit)(Curtner, Gregory) (Filed on 5/1/2015)
|
May 1, 2015 |
Filing 379
OBJECTIONS to Proposed Class Action Settlement by Darrin Duncan. (Tucker, Caroline) (Filed on 5/1/2015)
|
May 1, 2015 |
Filing 378
NOTICE of Appearance by Caroline Victoria Tucker (Tucker, Caroline) (Filed on 5/1/2015)
|
April 30, 2015 |
Filing 377
TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Timothy J McIlwain for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Geibelson, Michael) (Filed on 4/30/2015)
|
April 30, 2015 |
Filing 376
TRANSCRIPT ORDER by National Collegiate Athletic Association for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Curtner, Gregory) (Filed on 4/30/2015)
|
April 29, 2015 |
Filing 375
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins: Motion for Attorney Fees, Costs, and Expenses #341 held on 4/29/2015. Court takes motion under submission. Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez (2:00pm - 3:27pm) Plaintiffs' Attorneys Bonny Sweeney, Swathi Bojedla. NCAA Attorney Gregory Curtner. This is a text only Minute Entry. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/29/2015)
|
April 29, 2015 |
Filing 374
ORDER GRANTING REQUEST to Attend Hearing by Telephone filed by Right of Publicity Plaintiffs #372 . Counsel must contact the Courtroom Deputy at 408.535.5343 to provide a direct dial number. Signed Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2015)
|
April 29, 2015 |
Filing 373
CLERK'S NOTICE CONFIRMING Hearing re Motion for Attorney Fees, Costs, and Expenses #341 is set for 02:00 PM on 4/29/2015 in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. This is a text-only entry generated by the Court. There is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2015)
|
April 28, 2015 |
Filing 372
MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Samuel Michael Keller. (Aragon, Leonard) (Filed on 4/28/2015)
|
April 28, 2015 |
Filing 371
ORDER TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 4/28/2015. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2015)
|
April 24, 2015 |
Filing 370
ORDER DENYING NCAA'S MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON ATTORNEYS' FEES, Dkt. No. #362 . The April 29 hearing will proceed as scheduled. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2015).
|
April 24, 2015 |
Filing 369
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Tate George filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. Motion Hearing set for 6/4/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 5/8/2015. Replies due by 5/15/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Hilary Scherrer, #2 Proposed Order)(Scherrer, Hilary) (Filed on 4/24/2015) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/7/2015: #3 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tmi, COURT STAFF).
|
April 17, 2015 |
Filing 368
RESPONSE (re #362 MOTION to Defer Hearing On Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs re #341 ) filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Swathi Bojedla)(Bojedla, Swathi) (Filed on 4/17/2015)
|
April 14, 2015 |
Filing 367
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Timothy J McIlwain re #365 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Conditionally to Intervene Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 24 (Geibelson, Michael) (Filed on 4/14/2015)
|
April 14, 2015 |
Filing 366
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO SHORTEN TIME FOR PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO NCAA'S MOTION TO DEFER HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS #363 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2015)
|
April 13, 2015 |
Filing 365
MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs and Conditionally to Intervene Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 24; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Timothy J McIlwain. Motion Hearing set for 7/16/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 4/27/2015. Replies due by 5/4/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Rubin, #2 Declaration of Eugene Egdorf, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Declaration of Timothy J. McIlwain, #10 Exhibit A, #11 Exhibit B, #12 Exhibit C, #13 Exhibit D, #14 Declaration of Michael A. Geibelson, #15 Exhibit A, #16 Exhibit B, #17 Exhibit C, #18 Exhibit D, #19 Exhibit E, #20 Exhibit F, #21 Exhibit G, #22 Exhibit H, #23 Exhibit I, #24 Exhibit J, #25 Proposed Order)(Geibelson, Michael) (Filed on 4/13/2015) Modified on 4/14/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
April 13, 2015 |
Filing 364
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Geibelson (Geibelson, Michael) (Filed on 4/13/2015)
|
April 13, 2015 |
Filing 363
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Shorten Time for plaintiffs' opposition re #362 MOTION to Defer Hearing On Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs re #341 filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association, Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gregory L. Curtner)(Curtner, Gregory) (Filed on 4/13/2015) Modified on 4/13/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
April 13, 2015 |
Filing 362
MOTION to Defer Hearing On Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs re #341 > filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. Responses due by 4/27/2015. Replies due by 5/4/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Curtner, Gregory) (Filed on 4/13/2015) Modified on 4/13/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
March 9, 2015 |
Filing 361
REPLY (re #341 Amended MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, and Expenses ) filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Swathi Bojedla)(Bojedla, Swathi) (Filed on 3/9/2015)
|
March 9, 2015 |
Filing 360
Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Provisionally Filed under Seal filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sathya S. Gosselin, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Bojedla Declaration, #4 Unredacted Version of Bojedla Declaration)(Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 3/9/2015)
|
February 11, 2015 |
Filing 359
Declaration of Swathi Bojedla in Support of #354 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Related document(s) #354 ) (Bojedla, Swathi) (Filed on 2/11/2015)
|
February 11, 2015 |
Filing 358
AMENDED ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION Concerning Extension of Hearing Date #356 . Motion for Attorney Fees, Costs, and Expenses #319 set for 4/29/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 2/11/2015. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2015)
|
February 11, 2015 |
Filing 357
**PLEASE SEE DOCKET NUMBER 358**. Modified on 2/11/2015 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
|
February 11, 2015 |
Filing 356
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Concerning Extension of Hearing Date on Amended Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs and Expenses filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association, Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 2/11/2015) Modified on 2/11/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
February 6, 2015 |
Filing 355
RESPONSE (re #341 Amended MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, and Expenses ) filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Kimberly Kefalas, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1-Summary of Lodestar Reduction, #4 Exhibit 2-Summary of Expenses Reductions, #5 Exhibit 3-Block Bill Entries, #6 Exhibit 4-Vague Entries, #7 Exhibit 5-Billing Entries Removed by Redaction, #8 Exhibit 6-Billing Entries Impaired by Redaction, #9 Exhibit 7-Quarter Hour Billing Entries, #10 Exhibit 8-Rounded Quarter Hour Billing Entries, #11 Exhibit 9-Jury Trial Preparation Entries, #12 Exhibit 10-Media Interaction and Public Relations Entries, #13 Exhibit 11-Damages Entries, #14 Exhibit 12-Pre August 31 2012 Entries for Unrelated Claims, #15 Exhibit 13-Rascher Excerpt, #16 Exhibit 14-Unsuccessful Class Certification Entries, #17 Exhibit 15-Entries for Unrelated Claims, #18 Exhibit 16-State Law Claims Entries, #19 Exhibit 17-EA/CLC Entries Identified by Plaintiffs, #20 Exhibit 18-EA/CLC ENtries Not Identified by Plaintiffs, #21 Exhibit 19-Total EA/CLC Entries, #22 Exhibit 20-Solicitation of Clients Entries, #23 Exhibit 21-Lead Counsel Administation Entries, #24 Exhibit 22-Clerical Entries, #25 Exhibit 23-Associate Level Work Billed by Partners, #26 Exhibit 24-Document Review Entries, #27 Exhibit 25-Excessive Dep Attendance and Overstaffing Entries, #28 Exhibit 26-Excessive Hearing Attendance and Overstaffing Entries, #29 Exhibit 27-Excessive Trial Attendance and Overstaffing Entries, #30 Exhibit 28-Conferencing Entries, #31 Exhibit 29-Excessive and Duplicative Time Entries, #32 Exhibit 30-Excessive Overstaffing Dep Prep Entries, #33 Exhibit 31-Excessive Work on Dep of G. Shaheen Entries, #34 Exhibit 32-Pro Hac Vice Entries, #35 Exhibit 33-Copycat Complaint Entries, #36 Exhibit 34-Confidentiality Challenge Assigned Project Entries, #37 Exhibit 35-Privilege Challenge Assigned Project Entries, #38 Exhibit 36-Churning Entries, #39 Exhibit 37-Non Contributing Work ENtries, #40 Exhibit 38-List of Timekeepers and Submitted Hours, #41 Exhibit 39-Non Recoverable Expert Fees, #42 Exhibit 40-Non Recoverable Expenses Claimed as Witness Fees, #43 Exhibit 41-Non Recoverable Pro Hac VIce Application Fees, #44 Exhibit 42-Unsupported Copying and Printing Expenses, #45 Exhibit 43-Unsupported Long Distance Travel Expenses, #46 Exhibit 44-Excessive Long Distance Travel Expenses, #47 Exhibit 45-Non Recoverable Legal Research Expenses, #48 Exhibit 46-Non Recoverable Local Travel Expenses, #49 Exhibit 47-Vague Expenses)(Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 2/6/2015) Modified on 2/9/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
February 6, 2015 |
Filing 354
Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Robert Wierenga, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1-Summary of Lodestar Reduction, #4 Exhibit 3-Block Bill Entries, #5 Exhibit 4-Vague Entries, #6 Exhibit 5-Billing Entries Removed by Redaction, #7 Exhibit 6-Billing Entries Impaired by Redaction, #8 Exhibit 7-Quarter Hour BIlling Entries, #9 Exhibit 8-Rounded Quarter Hour Billing Entries, #10 Exhibit 9-Jury Trial Preparation Entries, #11 Exhibit 10-Media Interaction & Public Relations Entries, #12 Exhibit 11-Damages Entries, #13 Exhibit 12-Pre August 31, 2012 Entries for Unrelated Claims, #14 Exhibit 13-Rascher Excerpt, #15 Exhibit 14-Unsuccessful Class Certification Entries, #16 Exhibit 15-Entries for Unrelated Claims, #17 Exhibit 16-State Law Claims Entries, #18 Exhibit 17-EA/CLC Entries Identified by Plaintiffs, #19 Exhibit 18-EA/CLC Entries Not Identified by Plaintiffs, #20 Exhibit 19-Total EA/CLC Entries, #21 Exhibit 20-Solicitation of Clients Entries, #22 Exhibit 21-Lead CounselAdministration Entries, #23 Exhibit 22-Clerical Entries, #24 Exhibit 23-Associate Level Work Billed by Partners, #25 Exhibit 24-Document Review Entries, #26 Exhibit 25-Excessive Dep Attendance and Overstaffing Entries, #27 Exhibit 26-Excessive Hearing Attendance and Overstaffing Entries, #28 Exhibit 27-Excessive Trial Attendance and Overstaffing Entries, #29 Exhibit 28-Conferencing Entries, #30 Exhibit 29-Excessive and Duplicative Time Entries, #31 Exhibit 30-Excessive Overstaffing Dep Prep Entries, #32 Exhibit 31-Excessive Work on Dep of G. Shaheen Entries, #33 Exhibit 32-Pro Hac Vice Entries, #34 Exhibit 33-Copycat Complaint Entries, #35 Exhibit 34-Confidentiality Challenge Assigned Project Entries, #36 Exhibit 35-Privilege Challenge Assigned Project Entries, #37 Exhibit 36-CHurning Entries, #38 Exhibit 37-Non Contributing Work Entries, #39 Exhibit 38-List of Timekeepers and Submitted Hours, #40 Exhibit 48-Brief in Opposition - Redacted, #41 Exhibit 49- Brief in Opposition - Unredacted)(Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 2/6/2015)
|
January 28, 2015 |
Filing 353
NOTICE of Appearance by Bonny E. Sweeney for Plaintiff Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. (Sweeney, Bonny) (Filed on 1/28/2015)
|
January 5, 2015 |
Filing 352
CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING Amended Motion for Attorney Fees, Costs, and Expenses #341 for 4/1/2015 01:00 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. The briefing schedule remains unchanged. This is a text-only entry generated by the Court. There is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2015)
|
December 29, 2014 |
Filing 351
ORDER Granting #350 STIPULATION Concerning Extension of Deadlines in Orders Granting Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlements. Motion Hearing set for 7/16/2015 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/29/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2014)
|
December 26, 2014 |
Filing 350
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Concerning Extension of Deadlines in Orders Granting Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlements filed by Samuel Michael Keller, National Collegiate Athletic Association, Electronic Arts Inc. (Aragon, Leonard) (Filed on 12/26/2014) Modified on 12/29/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
December 22, 2014 |
Filing 349
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Cousins re #341 Amended MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, and Expenses. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/22/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2014)
|
December 15, 2014 |
Filing 348
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL MATERIALS PROVISIONALLY FILED UNDER SEAL #338 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2014)
|
November 28, 2014 |
Filing 347
Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/19/14, before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, Telephone number 510-910-5888, joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #344 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/26/2015. (Related documents(s) #344 ) (Bryce, Joann) (Filed on 11/28/2014)
|
November 21, 2014 |
Filing 346
TRANSCRIPT ORDER by National Collegiate Athletic Association for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Curtner, Gregory) (Filed on 11/21/2014)
|
November 21, 2014 |
Filing 345
Declaration of Swathi Bojedla in Support of #338 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Reply Motion and Exhibit filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Related document(s) #338 ) (Bojedla, Swathi) (Filed on 11/21/2014)
|
November 21, 2014 |
Filing 344
TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. for Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. (Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 11/21/2014)
|
November 19, 2014 |
Filing 343
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins held on 11/19/2014: Plaintiffs' Attorney Seth Rosenthal. Defendants' Attorney Gregory Curtner. NCAA's Motion for Limited Discovery on Plaintiffs Request For Attorneys Fees & Costs #328 denied for the reasons stated on the record. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce. This is a text only Minute Entry. (lmh, COURT STAFF) Modified on 11/21/2014 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
|
November 19, 2014 |
Filing 342
Costs Taxed in amount of $142,889.54 against National Collegiate Athletic Association re #318 Bill of Costs. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2014)
|
November 19, 2014 |
Filing 341
Amended MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, and Expenses and Memorandum in Support Thereof filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. Motion Hearing set for 4/9/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 2/6/2015. Replies due by 3/9/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Amended Declaration of Michael D. Hausfeld, #3 Declaration of William A. Isaacson, #4 Declaration of Jennifer W. Sprengel, #5 Declaration of Melissa H. Maxman, #6 Declaration of Daniel Cohen, #7 Declaration of Peter Kohn, #8 Declaration of Mila F. Bartos, #9 Declaration of Robert J. Wozniak, #10 Declaration of Robert G. Eisler, #11 Declaration of Jason S. Kilene, #12 Declaration of Renae D. Steiner, #13 Declaration of Kimberly A. Kralowec, #14 Declaration of Jay L. Himes, #15 Declaration of Eric B. Fastiff, #16 Amended Declaration of Steven J. Greenfogel (Lite Depalma), #17 Declaration of Terence R. Coates, #18 Declaration of Steven J. Greenfogel (Meredith Cohen), #19 Declaration of Derek J. Howard, #20 Declaration of Brian M. Sund, #21 Declaration of Brian P. Murray, #22 Declaration of Bruce L. Simon, #23 Declaration of Chris Hellums, #24 Declaration of Edgar D. Gankendorff, #25 Declaration of Garrett D. Blanchfield, Jr., #26 Declaration of Bonny E. Sweeney, #27 Declaration of Dianne M. Nast, #28 Declaration of Eugene A. Spector, #29 Declaration of Allan Steyer, #30 Declaration of F. Hill Allen, #31 Declaration of Seth A. Rosenthal, #32 Declaration of Stanley M. Chesley, #33 Declaration of Daniel S. Mason, #34 Declaration of Brian C. Gudmundson)(Bojedla, Swathi) (Filed on 11/19/2014) Modified on 2/9/2015 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
November 19, 2014 |
Filing 340
Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Time-Detail Exhibits to the Declarations in Support of Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Expenses filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Swathi Bojedla, #3 Redacted Version of Amended Declaration of Michael D. Hausfeld, #4 Redacted Version of Amended Declaration of Steven J. Greenfogel (Lite Depalma), #5 Redacted Version of Declaration of Derek J. Howard, #6 Unredacted Version of Amended Declaration of Michael D. Hausfeld (Part 1), #7 Unredacted Version of Amended Declaration of Michael D. Hausfeld (Part 2), #8 Unredacted Version of Amended Declaration of Steven J. Greenfogel (Lite Depalma), #9 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Derek J. Howard)(Bojedla, Swathi) (Filed on 11/19/2014)
|
November 17, 2014 |
Filing 339
REPLY (re #328 MOTION for Limited Discovery on Plaintiffs Request For Attorneys Fees & Costs ) filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1 - Prothro Summaries, #3 Exhibit 2 - Prothro Dep Excerpt, #4 Exhibit 3 - Gosselin Email)(Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 11/17/2014)
|
November 17, 2014 |
Filing 338
Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Reply Motion and Exhibit filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted version of Reply, #4 Unredacted version of Reply, #5 Redacted version of Reply Exhibit 1, #6 Unredacted version of Reply Exhibit 1)(Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 11/17/2014)
|
November 13, 2014 |
Filing 337
RESPONSE (re #328 MOTION for Limited Discovery on Plaintiffs Request For Attorneys Fees & Costs ) filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Swathi Bojedla, #3 Exhibit A)(Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 11/13/2014)
|
November 13, 2014 |
Filing 336
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING #324 MOTION TO AMEND/CORRECT MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES, AND GRANTING #326 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2014) Modified on 11/14/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
November 13, 2014 |
Set Deadlines/Hearing (see docket no. #336 ): Amended Motion due by 11/20/2014; Responses due by 2/6/2015; Replies due by 3/9/2015; Amended Motion Hearing set for 4/9/2015 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2014)
|
November 7, 2014 |
Filing 335
RESPONSE (re #326 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply To Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs ) filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bojedla, Swathi) (Filed on 11/7/2014)
|
November 6, 2014 |
Filing 334
ORDER RESOLVING NCAA'S L.R. 6-3 MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME FOR BRIEFING AND HEARING ON MOTION FOR LIMITED DISCOVERY #331 . Plaintiff's response to NCAA's Motion due 11/13/2014. NCAA's reply due 11/17/2014. Hearing on Motion for Limited Discovery #328 set for 11/19/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 11/06/2014. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2014)
|
November 6, 2014 |
Filing 333
RESPONSE (re #331 MOTION to Shorten Time For Briefing and Hearing On Motion For Limited Discovery ) filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bojedla, Swathi) (Filed on 11/6/2014)
|
November 5, 2014 |
Filing 332
CLERK'S NOTICE: Response to NCAA's Motion to Shorten Time For Briefing and Hearing On Motion For Limited Discovery #331 due 11/06/2014. This is a text-only entry generated by the Court. There is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2014)
|
November 4, 2014 |
Filing 331
MOTION to Shorten Time For Briefing and Hearing On Motion For Limited Discovery filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Gregory L. Curtner)(Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 11/4/2014)
|
November 4, 2014 |
Filing 330
REPLY (re #324 MOTION to Amend/Correct #319 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, and Expenses ) filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sathya S. Gosselin)(Bojedla, Swathi) (Filed on 11/4/2014)
|
November 4, 2014 |
Filing 329
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes Re: #328 MOTION for Limited Discovery on Plaintiffs Request For Attorneys Fees & Costs. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/4/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2014)
|
November 4, 2014 |
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins for Discovery (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2014)
|
November 3, 2014 |
Filing 328
MOTION for Limited Discovery on Plaintiffs Request For Attorneys Fees & Costs filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. Motion Hearing set for 12/8/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 11/17/2014. Replies due by 11/24/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 11/3/2014) Modified on 11/4/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
November 3, 2014 |
Filing 327
RESPONSE (re #324 MOTION to Amend/Correct #319 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, and Expenses ) filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 11/3/2014)
|
November 3, 2014 |
Filing 326
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply To Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Gregory L. Curtner, #3 Declaration of Kimberly K. Kefalas)(Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 11/3/2014)
|
October 29, 2014 |
Filing 324
MOTION to Amend/Correct #319 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, and Expenses filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. Motion Hearing set for 12/4/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 11/4/2014. Replies due by 11/5/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A - First Amended Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Expenses, #3 Exhibit B - Amended Declaration of Michael D. Hausfeld, #4 Exhibit C - Amended Declaration of Steven J. Greenfogel (Lite Depalma), #5 Exhibit D - Declaration of Derek J. Howard, #6 Exhibit E - Amended Proposed Order)(Bojedla, Swathi) (Filed on 10/29/2014)
|
October 28, 2014 |
Filing 325
USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505 receipt number 44611011953 re #316 Notice of Appeal, filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2014)
|
October 27, 2014 |
Filing 323
ORDER of USCA Consolidating Cases as to #316 Notice of Appeal, filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association, #299 Notice of Appeal filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2014)
|
October 22, 2014 |
Filing 322
Request for payment of docket fee to appellant re #316 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (cc to USCA) (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2014)
|
October 21, 2014 |
Filing 321
USCA Case Number 14-17068 Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals for #316 Notice of Appeal filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2014)
|
October 21, 2014 |
Filing 320
Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Time-Detail Exhibits to the Declarations in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Expenses filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Sathya Gosselin, #3 Redacted Version of Declaration of Michael D. Hausfeld, #4 Redacted Version of Declaration of William A. Isaacson, #5 Redacted Version of Declaration of Jennifer W. Sprengel, #6 Redacted Version of Declaration of Melissa H. Maxman, #7 Redacted Version of Declaration of Daniel Cohen, #8 Redacted Version of Declaration of Peter Kohn, #9 Redacted Version of Declaration of Mila F. Bartos, #10 Redacted Version of Declaration of Robert J. Wozniak, #11 Redacted Version of Declaration of Robert G. Eisler, #12 Redacted Version of Declaration of Jason S. Kilene, #13 Redacted Version of Declaration of Renae D. Steiner, #14 Redacted Version of Declaration of Kimberly A. Kralowec, #15 Redacted Version of Declaration of Jay L. Himes, #16 Redacted Version of Declaration of Eric B. Fastiff, #17 Redacted Version of Declaration of Steven J. Greenfogel (Lite DePalma), #18 Redacted Version of Declaration of Terence R. Coates, #19 Redacted Version of Declaration of Steven J. Greenfogel (Meredith Cohen), #20 Redacted Version of Declaration of Brian M. Sund, #21 Redacted Version of Declaration of Brian P. Murray, #22 Redacted Version of Declaration of Bruce L. Simon, #23 Redacted Version of Declaration of Chris Hellums, #24 Redacted Version of Declaration of Edgar D. Gankendorff, #25 Redacted Version of Declaration of Garrett D. Blanchfield, Jr., #26 Redacted Version of Declaration of Bonny E. Sweeney, #27 Redacted Version of Declaration of Dianne M. Nast, #28 Redacted Version of Declaration of Eugene A. Spector, #29 Redacted Version of Declaration of Allan Steyer, #30 Redacted Version of Declaration of F. Hill Allen, #31 Redacted Version of Declaration of Seth A. Rosenthal, #32 Redacted Version of Declaration of Stanley M. Chesley, #33 Redacted Version of Declaration of Daniel S. Mason, #34 Redacted Version of Declaration of Brian C. Gudmundson, #35 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Michael D. Hausfeld (1 of 3), #36 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Michael D. Hausfeld (2 of 3), #37 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Michael D. Hausfeld (3 of 3), #38 Unredacted Version of Declaration of William A. Isaacson, #39 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Jennifer W. Sprengel, #40 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Melissa H. Maxman, #41 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Daniel Cohen, #42 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Peter Kohn, #43 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Mila F. Bartos, #44 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Robert J. Wozniak, #45 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Robert G. Eisler, #46 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Jason S. Kilene, #47 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Renae D. Steiner, #48 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Kimberly A. Kralowec, #49 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Jay L. Himes, #50 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Eric B. Fastiff, #51 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Steven J. Greenfogel (Lite DePalma), #52 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Terence R. Coates, #53 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Steven J. Greenfogel (Meredith Cohen), #54 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Brian M. Sund, #55 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Brian P. Murray, #56 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Bruce L. Simon, #57 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Chris Hellums, #58 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Edgar D. Gankendorff, #59 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Garrett D. Blanchfield, Jr., #60 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Bonny E. Sweeney, #61 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Dianne M. Nast, #62 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Eugene A. Spector, #63 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Allan Steyer, #64 Unredacted Version of Declaration of F. Hill Allen, #65 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Seth A. Rosenthal, #66 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Stanley M. Chesley, #67 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Daniel S. Mason, #68 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Brian C. Gudmundson)(Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 10/21/2014)
|
October 21, 2014 |
Filing 319
MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, and Expenses filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. Motion Hearing set for 2/19/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 12/23/2014. Replies due by 1/23/2015. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Michael Hausfeld, #3 Declaration of Jennifer Sprengel, #4 Declaration of Melissa Maxman, #5 Declaration of Daniel Cohen, #6 Declaration of Peter Kohn, #7 Declaration of Mila Bartos, #8 Declaration of Robert Wozniak, #9 Declaration of Robert Eisler, #10 Declaration of Jason Kilene, #11 Declaration of William Isaacson, #12 Declaration of Renae Steiner, #13 Declaration of Kimberly Kralowec, #14 Declaration of Jay Himes, #15 Declaration of Eric Fastiff, #16 Declaration of Steven Greenfogel (Lite DePalma), #17 Declaration of Terence R. Coates, #18 Declaration of Steven Greenfogel (Meredith Cohen), #19 Declaration of Brian M. Sund, #20 Declaration of Brian P. Murray, #21 Declaration of Bruce L. Simon, #22 Declaration of Chris Hellums, #23 Declaration of Edgar D. Gankendorff, #24 Declaration of Garrett D. Blanchfield, Jr., #25 Declaration of Bonny E. Sweeney, #26 Declaration of Dianne M. Nast, #27 Declaration of Eugene A. Spector, #28 Declaration of Allan Steyer, #29 Declaration of F. Hill Allen, #30 Declaration of Seth A. Rosenthal, #31 Declaration of Stanley M. Chesley, #32 Declaration of Daniel S. Mason, #33 Declaration of Brian C. Gudmundson)(Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 10/21/2014)
|
October 21, 2014 |
Filing 318
BILL OF COSTS and Supporting Documentation by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (1 of 2), #2 Exhibit A (2 of 2), #3 Exhibit B)(Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 10/21/2014)
|
October 21, 2014 |
Filing 317
Representation Statement re #316 Notice of Appeal by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Pomerantz, Glenn) (Filed on 10/21/2014) Modified on 10/22/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
October 21, 2014 |
Filing 316
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID 0971-8861180.) (Pomerantz, Glenn) (Filed on 10/21/2014) Modified on 10/22/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF). ***NOTE: PAYMENT RECEIPT #0971-8861180 IS THE SAME AS NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED ON 8/20/2014, DOCUMENT #299 . BILLED APPELLANT ON 10/22/2104
|
October 16, 2014 |
Filing 315
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting #313 Stipulation Amending re #293 Clerk's Judgment to Certify Final Judgment Under Rule 54(b). (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2014)
|
September 19, 2014 |
Filing 314
Transcript Designation Form re #303 USCA Case Number Transcript due by 9/19/2014. (Rehn, Thane) (Filed on 9/19/2014)
|
September 4, 2014 |
Filing 313
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Amending re #293 Clerk's Judgment to Certify Final Judgment Under Rule 54(b)
|
September 3, 2014 |
Filing 312
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING (167 in case 4:09-cv-03329-CW and 1108 in case 4:09-cv-01967-CW) PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT WITH DEFENDANT ELECTRONIC ARTS INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2014)
|
September 3, 2014 |
Filing 311
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting #309 Stipulation Enlarging Time for Plaintiffs' Bill of Costs and Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Response. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2014)
|
August 29, 2014 |
Filing 310
Transcript of Proceedings held on July 24, 2014, before Judge Claudia Wilken. Court Reporter Raynee H. Mercado, CSR, Telephone number 510-502-6175, cacsr8258@gmail.com, raynee_mercado@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/3/2014. (rhm) (Filed on 8/29/2014)
|
August 28, 2014 |
Filing 309
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Enlarging Time for Plaintiffs' Bill of Costs and Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Response filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr., National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 8/28/2014) Modified on 8/29/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
August 27, 2014 |
Filing 308
Second Joint Filing of Amended Settlement Exhibits by Samuel Michael Keller, National Collegiate Athletic Association, Electronic Arts Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, 1a, #2 Exhibit 2, 2a, #3 Exhibit 3, 3a, #4 Exhibit 4, 4a)(Carey, Robert) (Filed on 8/27/2014) Modified on 8/28/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
August 25, 2014 |
Filing 307
Renotice motion hearing re #305 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. Motion Hearing set for 10/2/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 9/5/2014. Replies due by 9/12/2014. (Related document(s) #305 ) (Bojedla, Swathi) (Filed on 8/25/2014)
|
August 25, 2014 |
Filing 306
CLERKS NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that counsel must re-notice not re-file the #305 motion for attorney fees pursuant to L.R. 7-2(a). Hearing date of September 18, 2014, is vacated. The previous briefing schedule remains in effect.(This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2014)
|
August 22, 2014 |
Filing 305
MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. Motion Hearing set for 9/18/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 9/5/2014. Replies due by 9/12/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Michael Hausfeld, #3 Declaration of Allan Steyer, #4 Declaration of Bonny Sweeney, #5 Declaration of Brian Sund, #6 Declaration of Bruce Simon, #7 Declaration of Chris Hellums, #8 Declaration of Daniel Cohen, #9 Declaration of Daniel Mason, #10 Declaration of Derek Howard, #11 Declaration of Edgar Gankendorff, #12 Declaration of Eric Fastiff, #13 Declaration of Eugene Spector, #14 Declaration of Garrett Blanchfield, #15 Declaration of Jay Himes, #16 Declaration of Jennifer Sprengel, #17 Declaration of Melissa Maxman, #18 Declaration of Michael McClellan, #19 Declaration of Renae Steiner, #20 Declaration of Robert Eisler, #21 Declaration of Robert Wozniak, #22 Declaration of Seth Rosenthal, #23 Declaration of Steven Greenfogel (Lite DePalma), #24 Declaration of Steven Greenfogel (Meredith Cohen), #25 Declaration of Terence Coates, #26 Declaration of William Isaacson)(Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 8/22/2014) Modified on 8/25/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
August 22, 2014 |
Filing 304
BILL OF COSTS and Supporting Documentation by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 8/22/2014)
|
August 21, 2014 |
Filing 303
USCA Case Number 14-16601 Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals for #299 Notice of Appeal filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2014)
|
August 21, 2014 |
Filing 302
Amended Representation Statement by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Pomerantz, Glenn) (Filed on 8/21/2014) Modified on 8/22/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
August 21, 2014 |
Filing 301
RESPONSE (re #297 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Bill of Costs and Motion for Attorney's Fees (Pursuant to Local Rule 6-3) ) filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gregory Curtner, #2 Proposed Order)(Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 8/21/2014)
|
August 20, 2014 |
Filing 300
Representation Statement re #299 Notice of Appeal by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Pomerantz, Glenn) (Filed on 8/20/2014) Modified on 8/21/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
August 20, 2014 |
Filing 299
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-8861180 paid.) (Pomerantz, Glenn) (Filed on 8/20/2014)
|
August 19, 2014 |
Filing 298
ORDER Granting #296 Joint Submission Regarding Clarification of Injunction re #294 MOTION for Clarification of Timing of Injunction. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/19/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2014)
|
August 18, 2014 |
Filing 297
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Bill of Costs and Motion for Attorney's Fees (Pursuant to Local Rule 6-3) filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sathya S. Gosselin, #2 Proposed Order)(Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 8/18/2014) Modified on 8/19/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
August 14, 2014 |
Filing 296
Joint Submission Regarding Clarification of Injunction re #294 MOTION for Clarification of Timing of Injunction and [Proposed] Order filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Related document(s) #294 ) (Pomerantz, Glenn) (Filed on 8/14/2014) Modified on 8/15/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
August 12, 2014 |
Filing 295
RESPONSE (re #294 MOTION for Clarification of Timing of Injunction ) filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 8/12/2014)
|
August 11, 2014 |
Filing 294
MOTION for Clarification of Timing of Injunction filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. Responses due by 8/15/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Glenn Pomerantz, #2 Proposed Order)(Singla, Rohit) (Filed on 8/11/2014) Modified on 8/11/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
August 11, 2014 |
Trial Exhibit Location (A-2): Plaintiffs' Exhibits: Exhibit #s 248, 269, 270, 275, 280, 281, 283, 298, 305, 400R, 424, 0682, 702, 826, 835, 1005, 1022, 1125, 1126, 1127, 1133, 2000, 2006, 2007, 2011, 2012, 2013, 2016, 2017, 2018, 2020, 2021, 2023, 2026, 2027, 2029, 2033, 2037, 2038, 2045, 2046, 2047, 2049, 2054, 2057, 2059, 2062, 2065, 2074, 2078, 2080, 2081, 2083, 2084, 2095, 2096, 2102, 2104, 2110, 2116, 2117, 2133, 2141, 2147, 2151, 2162, 2179, 2195, 2225, 2230, 2266, 2273, 2281, 2283, 2287, 2288, 2289, 2290, 2292, 2293, 2296, 2297, 2299, 2339, 2340, 2448, 2450, 2451, 2459, 2480, 2481, 2482, 2484, 2487, 2488, 2492, 2493, 2509, 2520, 2521, 2527, 2529 thru 2564, 2567 thru 2570, 2576, 2579, 2580, 2582, 2584, 2587 thru 2590, 2592, 2593, 2595, 2598, 2603, 2604, 2605, 2614, 2615, 2616, 2619, 2621, 2623, 2624, 2627 thru 2631, 2645, 2651, 2661.Defendants' Exhibits: Exhibit #s 62, 73, 75, 112, 160, 181, 293, 300, 303, 308, 332, 336, 339, 498, 552, 556, 650, 700, 719, 730, 735, 938, 1028, 1042, 1047, 1111, 3004, 3008, 3009, 3017, 3020, 3028, 3029, 3042, 3062, 3069, 3078, 3080, 3081, 3083, 3089, 3095, 3117, 3130, 3134, 3165, 3168, 3176, 3191, 3193, 3208, 3210, 3230, 3248, 3251, 3290, 3308, 3314, 3317, 3332, 3369, 3372, 3389, 3392, 3393, 3399, 3411, 3413, 3414, 3419, 3426, 3492, 3596, 3607, 3673, 3731, 3741, 3742, 3886, 3900, 3906, 3907, 3908, 3919, 3922, 3941, 3942, 3961, 3962, 3966, 3968, 3971, 3986, 3987, 3996, 3997, 4001, 4003 thru 4013, 4035, 4038, 4039, 4044, 4045, 4120. SEALED EXHIBITS LOCATION (VAULT): Exhibit #s 2565, 400. 1 flash drive containing admitted trial exhibits(cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2014)
|
August 8, 2014 |
Filing 293
CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Alex Gilbert, Bob Tallent, Chase Garnham, Damien Rhodes, Danny Wimprine, Darius Robinson, David Lattin, Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr., Eric Riley, Harry Fluornoy, Jake Fischer, Jake Smith, Moses Alipate, Oscar P. Robertson, Patrick Maynor, Ray Ellis, Samuel Jacobson, Thad Jaracz, Tyrone Prothro, Victor Keise, William F. Russell against Collegiate Licensing Company, Electronic Arts Inc., National Collegiate Athletic Association (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2014)
|
August 8, 2014 |
Filing 292
PERMANENT INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/8/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2014)
|
August 8, 2014 |
Filing 291
FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/8/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2014)
|
July 24, 2014 |
Filing 289
Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 7/24/2014 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 7/24/2014). (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/24/2014)
|
July 24, 2014 |
Filing 288
Joint Filing of Amended Settlement Agreements and Exhibits Thereto by Samuel Michael Keller (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Carey, Robert) (Filed on 7/24/2014) Modified on 7/25/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
July 23, 2014 |
Filing 287
CLERKS NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the hearing on the motion for preliminary approval of class action settlement previously scheduled for July 24, 2014, at 2:00 p.m., will be held telephonically. No in-person hearing will be held tomorrow by the Court. All counsel must contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for their telephonic appearance. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2014)
|
July 15, 2014 |
Filing 286
DEFENDANT NCAA'S OPPOSITION TO THE ADMISSION OF EXHIBITS 2111 AND 2165 re #281 by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Miller, Jeslyn) (Filed on 7/15/2014) Modified on 7/16/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
July 11, 2014 |
Filing 285
Order granting #284 Stipulation entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
|
July 11, 2014 |
Filing 284
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Exhibits filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association, Edward C. O'Bannon Jr . (Miller, Jeslyn) (Filed on 7/11/2014) Modified on 7/14/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
July 11, 2014 |
Filing 283
Final Joint Exhibit List by National Collegiate Athletic Association, Edward C. O'Bannon Jr.. (Miller, Jeslyn) (Filed on 7/11/2014) Modified on 7/14/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
July 11, 2014 |
Filing 282
Transcript of Proceedings held on July 3, 2014, before Judge Claudia Willken. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov, diane.transcripts@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/9/2014. (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 7/11/2014)
|
July 10, 2014 |
Filing 281
Plaintiffs' Post-Trial Reply Brief by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Swathi Bojedla, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 7/10/2014) Modified on 7/11/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
July 10, 2014 |
Filing 280
ORDER OVERRULING NCAAS #273 OBJECTION TO THE ADMISSION OF EXHIBITS PX 2537- 2543. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/10/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2014)
|
July 8, 2014 |
Filing 279
TRIAL BRIEF Post-Trial Brief by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Pomerantz, Glenn) (Filed on 7/8/2014)
|
July 8, 2014 |
Filing 278
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken RESOLVING ( #255 , #256 ) MOTIONS TO ADMIT EXHIBITS (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2014)
|
July 3, 2014 |
Filing 277
Minute Entry: Motion Hearing (Date Filed: 7/3/2014). Motion Hearing set for 7/24/2014 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (Court Reporter Diane Skillman.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/3/2014)
|
July 3, 2014 |
Filing 276
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken APPROVING #269 STIPULATION. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2014)
|
July 2, 2014 |
Filing 275
Plaintiffs' Opening Post-Trial Brief by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. (Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 7/2/2014) Modified on 7/3/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
July 2, 2014 |
Filing 274
Plaintiffs' Reply to #273 NCAA's Opposition to Admission of Summary Exhibits Prepared by Dr. Rascher by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Bojedla, Swathi) (Filed on 7/2/2014) Modified on 7/3/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
July 1, 2014 |
Filing 273
RESPONSE to re #214 Declaration in Opposition re Admission of Summary Exhibits Prepared by Dr. Rascher by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Miller, Jeslyn) (Filed on 7/1/2014)
|
July 1, 2014 |
Filing 272
Transcript of Proceedings held on June 27, 2014, before Judge Claudia Wilken. Court Reporters Diane E. Skillman and Raynee H. Mercado, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov, diane.transcripts@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #168 Transcript Order - Daily Trial, #165 Transcript Order - Daily Trial ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/29/2014. (Related documents(s) #168 , #165 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 7/1/2014)
|
July 1, 2014 |
Filing 271
Exhibit List Joint Final Trial Exhibit List by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr... (Bojedla, Swathi) (Filed on 7/1/2014)
|
July 1, 2014 |
Filing 270
RESPONSE (re #256 MOTION to Admit Exhibits ) filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Miller, Jeslyn) (Filed on 7/1/2014)
|
June 30, 2014 |
Filing 269
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding the Admission of Exhibits 2084 and 2340 filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association, Edward C. O'Bannon,Jr. (Miller, Jeslyn) (Filed on 6/30/2014) Modified on 7/1/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
June 30, 2014 |
Filing 268
Transcript of Proceedings held on June 26, 2014, before Judge Claudia Wilken. Court Reporters Diane E. Skillman and Raynee H. Mercado, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov, diane.transcripts@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #168 Transcript Order - Daily Trial, #165 Transcript Order - Daily Trial ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/29/2014. (Related documents(s) #168 , #165 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 6/30/2014)
|
June 30, 2014 |
Filing 267
Transcript of Proceedings held on June 25, 2014, before Judge Claudia Wilken. Court Reporters Diane E. Skillman and Raynee H. Mercado, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov, diane.transcripts@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #168 Transcript Order - Daily Trial, #165 Transcript Order - Daily Trial ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/29/2014. (Related documents(s) #168 , #165 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 6/30/2014)
|
June 30, 2014 |
Filing 266
Transcript of Proceedings held on June 24, 2014, before Judge Claudia Wilken. Court Reporters Diane E. Skillman and Raynee H. Mercado, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov, diane.transcripts@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #168 Transcript Order - Daily Trial, #165 Transcript Order - Daily Trial ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/29/2014. (Related documents(s) #168 , #165 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 6/30/2014)
|
June 30, 2014 |
Filing 265
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting #253 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2014)
|
June 30, 2014 |
Filing 264
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken RESOLVING PLAINTIFFS' #240 MOTION TO ADMIT EXHIBITS. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2014) Modified on 7/1/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
June 30, 2014 |
Filing 260
Order granting #257 Stipulation entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
|
June 30, 2014 |
Filing 259
Order granting #254 Stipulation entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
|
June 30, 2014 |
Filing 258
Plaintiffs' Opposition to re #255 NCAA's Motion to Admit Exhibits by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr (Bojedla, Swathi) (Filed on 6/30/2014) Modified on 7/1/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
June 29, 2014 |
Filing 257
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding the Admission of Exhibits filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr., National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Carolyn Luedtke, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of James A. Mitchell)(Bojedla, Swathi) (Filed on 6/29/2014) Modified on 6/30/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
June 29, 2014 |
Filing 256
NOTICE of Motion and Motion to Admit Exhibits by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Bojedla, Swathi) (Filed on 6/29/2014) Modified on 6/30/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/30/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
June 27, 2014 |
Filing 290
Trial Sheet. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2014)
|
June 27, 2014 |
Filing 263
Minute Entry: Bench Trial completed on 6/27/2014 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 6/27/2014). (Court Reporter Diane Skillman and Raynee Mercado.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/27/2014)
|
June 27, 2014 |
Filing 255
Defendant NCAA's Notice of Motion and Motion to Admit Exhibits by National Collegiate Athletic Association (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Proposed Order)(Miller, Jeslyn) (Filed on 6/27/2014) Modified on 6/30/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
June 27, 2014 |
Filing 254
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding the Admission of Exhibits filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr., National Collegiate Athletic Assocation. (Bojedla, Swathi) (Filed on 6/27/2014) Modified on 6/30/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
June 27, 2014 |
Filing 253
Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Glenn D. Pomerantz, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit)(Pomerantz, Glenn) (Filed on 6/27/2014)
|
June 27, 2014 |
Filing 252
Proposed Order - Plaintiffs' Alternative Proposed Form of Injunction by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Alternative [Proposed] Order Granting Injunctive Relief)(Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 6/27/2014)
|
June 26, 2014 |
Filing 262
Minute Entry: Bench Trial held on 6/26/2014 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 6/26/2014). Further Bench Trial set for 6/27/2014 8:30 AM. (Court Reporter Diane Skillman and Raynee Mercado.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/26/2014)
|
June 26, 2014 |
Filing 251
NOTICE by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY TANYA S. CHUTKAN AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS (Isaacson, William) (Filed on 6/26/2014)
|
June 26, 2014 |
Filing 250
Transcript of Proceedings held on June 23, 2014, before Judge Clauda Wilken. Court Reporters Diane E. Skillman and Raynee H. Mercado, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov, diane. transcripts@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #168 Transcript Order - Daily Trial, #165 Transcript Order - Daily Trial ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/24/2014. (Related documents(s) #168 , #165 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 6/26/2014) Modified on 6/27/2014 (kk, COURT STAFF).
|
June 25, 2014 |
Filing 261
Minute Entry: Bench Trial held on 6/25/2014 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 6/25/2014). Further Bench Trial set for 6/26/2014 8:30 AM.(Court Reporter Diane Skillman and Raynee Mercado.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/25/2014)
|
June 24, 2014 |
Filing 249
Minute Entry: Bench Trial held on 6/24/2014 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 6/24/2014). Further Bench Trial set for 6/25/2014 8:30 AM. (Court Reporter Diane Skillman and Raynee Mercado.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/24/2014)
|
June 24, 2014 |
Filing 246
Order granting #237 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
|
June 24, 2014 |
Filing 245
Transcript of Proceedings held on June 20, 2014, before Judge Claudia Wilken. Court Reporters Diane E. Skillman and Raynee H. Mercado, Telephone number 510-451-2930 Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov, diane.transcripts@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #168 Transcript Order - Daily Trial, #165 Transcript Order - Daily Trial ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/22/2014. (Related documents(s) #168 , #165 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 6/24/2014) Modified on 6/26/2014 (ndr, COURT STAFF).
|
June 24, 2014 |
Filing 244
RESPONSE (re #240 MOTION to Admit Exhibits ) Defendant NCAA's Oppositon to Motion to Admit Exhibits filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Pomerantz, Glenn) (Filed on 6/24/2014)
|
June 24, 2014 |
Filing 243
Proposed Order CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [237-2] by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Miller, Jeslyn) (Filed on 6/24/2014)
|
June 24, 2014 |
Filing 242
CLERKS NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the Court, on its own motion, shall take the #240 administrative motion to admit exhibits under submission on the papers. The hearing previously scheduled for June 25, 2014, is vacated. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2014)
|
June 23, 2014 |
Filing 248
Minute Entry: Bench Trial held on 6/23/2014 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 6/23/2014). Further Bench Trial set for 6/24/2014 8:30 AM. (Court Reporter Diane Skillman and Raynee Mercado.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/23/2014)
|
June 23, 2014 |
Filing 241
Transcript of Proceedings held on June 19, 2014, before Judge Claudia Wilken. Court Reporters Diane E. Skillman and Raynee H. Mercado, Telephone number 510-451-2930, diane_skillman@cand.uscourts.gov, diane.transcripts@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #168 Transcript Order - Daily Trial, #165 Transcript Order - Daily Trial ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/22/2014. (Related documents(s) #168 , #165 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 6/23/2014)
|
June 23, 2014 |
Filing 240
MOTION to Admit Exhibits filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. Motion Hearing set for 6/25/2014 01:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 6/24/2014. Replies due by 6/25/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O)(Bojedla, Swathi) (Filed on 6/23/2014)
|
June 23, 2014 |
Filing 239
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting #236 Stipulation Regarding the Admission of Exhibits. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2014)
|
June 23, 2014 |
Filing 238
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting #232 Stipulation Regarding the Admission of Exhibits. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2014)
|
June 23, 2014 |
Filing 237
Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant NCAA's Deposition Designations filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeslyn A. Miller, #2 Proposed Order, #3 NCAA's Deposition Designations, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K, #15 Exhibit L, #16 Exhibit M, #17 Exhibit N, #18 Exhibit O, #19 Exhibit P, #20 Exhibit Q, #21 Exhibit R, #22 Exhibit S, #23 Exhibit T, #24 Exhibit U, #25 Exhibit V - REDACTED, #26 Exhibit V - SEALED, #27 Exhibit W, #28 Exhibit X, #29 Exhibit Y, #30 Exhibit Z, #31 Exhibit AA, #32 Exhibit BB)(Miller, Jeslyn) (Filed on 6/23/2014) Modified on 6/24/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
|
June 22, 2014 |
Filing 236
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding the Admission of Exhibits filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr., National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Bojedla, Swathi) (Filed on 6/22/2014) Modified on 6/23/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
|
June 22, 2014 |
Filing 235
Transcript of Proceedings held on June 18, 2014, before Judge Claudia Wilken. Court Reporters Diane E. Skillman and Raynee H. Mercado, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov, diane.transcripts@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #168 Transcript Order - Daily Trial, #165 Transcript Order - Daily Trial ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/22/2014. (Related documents(s) #168 , #165 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 6/22/2014)
|
June 21, 2014 |
Filing 234
Exhibit List by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr... (Bojedla, Swathi) (Filed on 6/21/2014)
|
June 20, 2014 |
Filing 247
Minute Entry: Bench Trial held on 6/20/2014 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 6/20/2014). Further Bench Trial set for 6/23/2014 8:30 AM. (Court Reporter Diane Skillman and Raynee Mercado.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/20/2014)
|
June 20, 2014 |
Filing 233
Deposition Designations by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Bojedla, Swathi) (Filed on 6/20/2014) Modified on 6/23/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
|
June 20, 2014 |
Filing 232
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding the Admission of Exhibits filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr., National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Bojedla, Swathi) (Filed on 6/20/2014) Modified on 6/20/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
June 20, 2014 |
Filing 227
Transcript of Proceedings held on June 17, 2014, before Judge Claudia Wilken. Court Reporters Diane E. Skillman and Raynee H. Mercado, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov, diane.transcripts@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #168 Transcript Order - Daily Trial, #165 Transcript Order - Daily Trial ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/18/2014. (Related documents(s) #168 , #165 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 6/20/2014)
|
June 19, 2014 |
Filing 231
Minute Entry: Bench Trial held on 6/19/2014 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 6/19/2014).Further Bench Trial set for 6/20/2014 8:30 AM. (Court Reporter Diane Skillman and Raynee Mercado.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/19/2014)
|
June 19, 2014 |
Filing 226
Transcript of Proceedings held on June 16, 2014, before Judge Claudia Wilken. Court Reporters Diane E. Skilman and Raynee H. Mercado, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov, diane.transcripts@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #168 Transcript Order - Daily Trial, #165 Transcript Order - Daily Trial ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/17/2014. (Related documents(s) #168 , #165 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 6/19/2014)
|
June 18, 2014 |
Filing 230
Minute Entry: Bench Trial held on 6/18/2014 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 6/18/2014). Further Bench Trial set for 6/19/2014 8:30 AM. (Court Reporter Diane Skillman and Raynee Mercado.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/18/2014)
|
June 17, 2014 |
Filing 229
***DISREGARD, DUPLICATE ENTRY*** Minute Entry: Bench Trial held on 6/17/2014 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 6/17/2014). Further Bench Trial set for 6/18/2014 8:30 AM. (Court Reporter Diane Skillman and Raynee Mercado.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/17/2014) Modified on 6/20/2014 (ndr, COURT STAFF).
|
June 17, 2014 |
Filing 228
Minute Entry: Bench Trial held on 6/17/2014 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 6/17/2014).Further Bench Trial set for 6/18/2014 8:30 AM. (Court Reporter Diane Skillman and Raynee Mercado.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/17/2014)
|
June 17, 2014 |
Filing 224
ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/17/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2014)
|
June 17, 2014 |
Filing 223
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken APPROVING #209 STIPULATION; GRANTING IN PART #200 MOTION TO SEAL; DENYING AS MOOT #204 MOTION TO INTERVENE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2014)
|
June 17, 2014 |
Filing 222
Transcript of Proceedings held on June 13, 2014, before Judge Claudia Wilken. Court Reporters Diane E. Skillman and Raynee H. Mercado, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov, diane.transcripts@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #168 Transcript Order - Daily Trial, #165 Transcript Order - Daily Trial ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/15/2014. (Related documents(s) #168 , #165 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 6/17/2014)
|
June 16, 2014 |
Filing 225
Minute Entry: Bench Trial held on 6/16/2014 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 6/16/2014). Further Bench Trial set for 6/17/2014 8:30 AM. (Court Reporter Diane Skillman and Raynee Mercado.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/16/2014)
|
June 16, 2014 |
Filing 216
Transcript of Proceedings held on June 12, 2014, before Judge Claudia Wilken. Court Reporters Diane E. Skillman and Raynee H. Mercado, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov, diane.transcripts@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #168 Transcript Order - Daily Trial, #165 Transcript Order - Daily Trial ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/15/2014. (Related documents(s) #168 , #165 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 6/16/2014) Modified on 6/17/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
June 16, 2014 |
Filing 215
Transcript of Proceedings held on June 11, 2014, before Judge Claudia Wilken. Court Reporters Diane E. Skillman and Raynee H. Mercado, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov, diane.transcripts@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #168 Transcript Order - Daily Trial, #165 Transcript Order - Daily Trial ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/15/2014. (Related documents(s) #168 , #165 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 6/16/2014) Modified on 6/17/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
June 15, 2014 |
Filing 214
DECLARATION of Daniel A. Rascher in Opposition to NCAA's Objections to Plaintiffs' Summary Exhibits filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Isaacson, William) (Filed on 6/15/2014) Modified on 6/16/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
June 13, 2014 |
Filing 221
Minute Entry: Bench Trial held on 6/13/2014 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 6/13/2014). Further Bench Trial set for 6/16/2014 8:30 AM. (Court Reporter Diane Skillman and Raynne Mercado.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/13/2014) Modified on 6/16/2014 (ndr, COURT STAFF).
|
June 13, 2014 |
Filing 213
Transcript of Proceedings held on June 10, 2014, before Judge Claudia Wilken. Court Reporters Diane E. Skillman and Raynee H. Mercado, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov, diane.transcripts@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/11/2014. (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 6/13/2014)
|
June 13, 2014 |
Filing 212
Transcript of Proceedings held on June 9, 2014, before Judge Claudia Wilken. Court Reporters Diane E. Skillman and Raynee H. Mercado, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov, diane.transcripts@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #168 Transcript Order - Daily Trial, #165 Transcript Order - Daily Trial ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/11/2014. (Related documents(s) #168 , #165 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 6/13/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/7/2014: #1 Supplement Master Index) (oh, COURT STAFF).
|
June 13, 2014 |
Filing 211
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting #208 Stipulation Regarding the Admission of Exhibits. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2014)
|
June 12, 2014 |
Filing 220
Minute Entry: Bench Trial held on 6/12/2014 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 6/12/2014). Further Bench Trial set for 6/13/2014 8:30 AM. (Court Reporter Diane Skillman and Raynee Mercado.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/12/2014) Modified on 6/16/2014 (ndr, COURT STAFF).
|
June 12, 2014 |
Filing 210
Letter from Counsel for Plaintiffs to the Court . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A)(Isaacson, William) (Filed on 6/12/2014)
|
June 12, 2014 |
Filing 209
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Plaintiffs' Trial Exhibit 400 filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr., National Collegiate Athletic Association, CBS Broadcasting Inc. (Bojedla, Swathi) (Filed on 6/12/2014) Modified on 6/13/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
June 12, 2014 |
Filing 208
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding the Admission of Exhibits filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr., National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Bojedla, Swathi) (Filed on 6/12/2014) Modified on 6/13/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
June 12, 2014 |
Filing 207
STIPULATION of Undisputed Facts Regarding Where Broadcast Money Goes filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr., National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Bojedla, Swathi) (Filed on 6/12/2014) Modified on 6/13/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
June 11, 2014 |
Filing 219
Minute Entry: Bench Trial held on 6/11/2014 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 6/11/2014). Further Bench Trial set for 6/12/2014 8:30 AM. (Court Reporter Diane Skillman and Raynee Mercado.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/11/2014) Modified on 6/16/2014 (ndr, COURT STAFF).
|
June 11, 2014 |
Filing 206
Plaintiffs' Bench Memorandum Regarding Expert Witness Rebuttal Testimony filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Martha Goodman, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 6/11/2014) Modified on 6/12/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
June 11, 2014 |
Filing 205
***DISREGARD, DUPLICATE ENTRY. SEE DOCKET NO. #219 .*** Minute Entry: Bench Trial held on 6/11/2014 before Judge Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 6/11/2014). Witnesses called. Further Bench Trial set for 6/12/2014 8:30 AM. (Court Reporter Diane Skillman; Raynee Mercado.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/11/2014) Modified on 6/16/2014 (ndr, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/20/2014 (ndr, COURT STAFF).
|
June 11, 2014 |
Filing 204
Non-Party MOTION to Intervene for the Limited Purpose of Protecting the Public Disclosure of Plaintiffs' Trial Exhibit 400 and Brief In Support of Defendant National Collegiate Athletic Association's Administrative Motion to Seal Confidential Trial Exhibits filed by CBS Broadcasting, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/9/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 6/9/2014. Replies due by 6/9/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel Weinberg, #2 Proposed Order)(Cox, Christopher) (Filed on 6/11/2014) Modified on 6/12/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
June 11, 2014 |
Filing 203
Declaration of Tina K. Shah in Support of #200 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Trial Exhibits Second Declaration of Tina K. Shah In Support of Defendant NCAA's Administrative Moton to Seal Confidential Trial Exhibits filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Related document(s) #200 ) (Pomerantz, Glenn) (Filed on 6/11/2014)
|
June 10, 2014 |
Filing 218
Minute Entry: Bench Trial held on 6/10/2014 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 6/10/2014). Further Bench Trial set for 6/11/2014 8:30 AM. (Court Reporter Diane Skillman and Raynee Mercado.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/10/2014) Modified on 6/16/2014 (ndr, COURT STAFF).
|
June 10, 2014 |
Filing 202
RESPONSE (re #200 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Trial Exhibits ) filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
|
June 10, 2014 |
Filing 201
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING IN PART( #177 , #178 MOTIONS TO SEAL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
|
June 10, 2014 |
Filing 200
Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Confidential Trial Exhibits filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 400, #2 Exhibit 400, #3 Exhibit 2218, #4 Exhibit 2218, #5 Declaration of Scott Bearby ISO, #6 Declaration of Nathan Rehn ISO, #7 Exhibit A to Rehn Decl., #8 Exhibit B to Rehn Decl., #9 Declaration of Daniel Weinberg ISO, #10 Declaration of Tina Shah ISO, #11 Proposed Order)(Pomerantz, Glenn) (Filed on 6/10/2014) Modified on 6/10/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
June 9, 2014 |
Filing 217
Minute Entry: Bench Trial held on 6/9/2014 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 6/9/2014). Further Bench Trial set for 6/10/2014 8:30 AM. (Court Reporter Diane Skillman and Raynee Mercado.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/9/2014) Modified on 6/16/2014 (ndr, COURT STAFF).
|
June 9, 2014 |
Filing 199
Declaration of Burke Magnus in Support of #178 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byThe Big 12 Conference, Inc.. (Related document(s) #178 ) (Capps, Leane) (Filed on 6/9/2014)
|
June 9, 2014 |
Filing 198
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting #196 Stipulation Concerning Dismissal of Claims (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2014)
|
June 8, 2014 |
Filing 197
NOTICE by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. Antitrust Plaintiffs' Evidentiary Bench Memorandum (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Bojedla, Swathi) (Filed on 6/8/2014)
|
June 8, 2014 |
Filing 196
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Concerning Dismissal of Claims filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr., National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 6/8/2014) Modified on 6/9/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
June 6, 2014 |
Filing 195
Exhibit List Amended by National Collegiate Athletic Association.. (Pomerantz, Glenn) (Filed on 6/6/2014)
|
June 6, 2014 |
Filing 194
NOTICE by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. of Withdrawal of Attorney Megan E. Jones (Scherrer, Hilary) (Filed on 6/6/2014)
|
June 6, 2014 |
Filing 193
Proposed Order - Antitrust Plaintiffs' Proposed Form of Injunction by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 6/6/2014)
|
June 6, 2014 |
Filing 192
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #182 Joint Request To Bring Miscellaneous Items Into The Courtroom (cwlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2014)
|
June 6, 2014 |
Filing 191
Order denying #179 Motion to Strike entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
|
June 6, 2014 |
Filing 190
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #176 Request to Bring Electronic and Other Miscellaneous Equipment into the Courtroom (cwlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2014)
|
June 6, 2014 |
Filing 189
STIPULATION Regarding Undisputed Facts filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr., National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 6/6/2014) Modified on 6/9/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
June 6, 2014 |
Filing 187
RESPONSE (re #177 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , #178 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) Plaintiffs' Combined Opposition to Motions of Big 12 Conference and Conference USA to Seal Trial Exhibits filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Scherrer, Hilary) (Filed on 6/6/2014)
|
June 6, 2014 |
Filing 186
RESPONSE (re #179 MOTION to Strike the Declaration of Daniel L. Rubinfeld ) filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Pomerantz, Glenn) (Filed on 6/6/2014)
|
June 6, 2014 |
Filing 185
NOTICE of Appearance by Swathi Bojedla (Bojedla, Swathi) (Filed on 6/6/2014)
|
June 5, 2014 |
Filing 188
ORDER of USCA denying petition for writ of mandamus (14-71522) (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2014)
|
June 5, 2014 |
Filing 184
TRIAL BRIEF by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Pomerantz, Glenn) (Filed on 6/5/2014)
|
June 5, 2014 |
Filing 183
Exhibit List - Antitrust Plaintiffs' Amended Trial Exhibit List by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr... (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 6/5/2014)
|
June 5, 2014 |
Filing 182
Antitrust Plaintiffs And NCAAs Joint Request Pursuant To General Order 58.Iv.E To Bring Miscellaneous Items Into The Courtroom by National Collegiate Athletic Association (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 6/5/2014) Modified on 6/5/2014 (cp, COURT STAFF).
|
June 5, 2014 |
Filing 181
ORDER DIRECTING NCAA TO RESPOND TO #179 MOTION TO STRIKE. Responses due by 12:00 p.m. on 6/6/2014. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/5/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2014)
|
June 5, 2014 |
Filing 180
NOTICE by Samuel Jacobson, Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. of Withdrawal of Attorney Thomas K. Boardman As Counsel for Plaintiffs Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. and Samuel Jacobson (Simon, Bruce) (Filed on 6/5/2014)
|
June 4, 2014 |
Filing 179
MOTION to Strike the Declaration of Daniel L. Rubinfeld filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. Motion Hearing set for 7/9/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 6/18/2014. Replies due by 6/25/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 6/4/2014)
|
June 4, 2014 |
Filing 178
Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by The Big 12 Conference, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Leane K. Capps in Support of The Big 12 Conference, Inc's Administrative Motion to Seal Confidential Trial Exhibits, #2 Declaration of Tim Weiser in Support of The Big 12 Conference, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal, #3 Declaration of Karen Brodkin in Support of The Big 12 Conference Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal Confidential Trial Exhibits, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Exhibit Unredacted 1109, #6 Exhibit Unredacted 2058, #7 Exhibit Unredacted 2060, #8 Exhibit Unredacted 2165, #9 Exhibit Unredacted 2229, #10 Exhibit Unredacted 2230)(Capps, Leane) (Filed on 6/4/2014)
|
June 4, 2014 |
Filing 177
Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Conference USA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Leane K. Capps in Support of Conference USA, Inc's Administrative Motion to Seal Confidential Trial Exhibits, #2 Declaration Declaration of Britton Banowsky in Support of Conference USA, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal Confidential Trial Exhibits, #3 Declaration Declaration of Karen Brodkin in Support of Conference USA, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to Seal Confidential Trial Exhibits, #4 Proposed Order, #5 Exhibit Unredacted Exhibit 3028, #6 Exhibit Unredacted Exhibit 3185 Pt. 1, #7 Exhibit Unredacted Exhibit 3185 Pt. 2, #8 Exhibit Unredacted Exhibit 3186, #9 Exhibit Unredacted Exhibit 3207, #10 Exhibit Unredacted Exhibit 2133, #11 Exhibit Unredacted Exhibit 2134, #12 Exhibit Unredacted Exhibit 2213, #13 Exhibit Unredacted Exhibit 2226)(Capps, Leane) (Filed on 6/4/2014)
|
June 4, 2014 |
Filing 176
Defendant NCAA's Request Pursuant to General Order 58.IV.E to Bring Electronic and Other Miscellaneous Equipment into the Courtroom by National Collegiate Athletic Association (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 6/4/2014) Modified on 6/5/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
June 4, 2014 |
Filing 175
Witness List by National Collegiate Athletic Association NCAA's Amended Revised Live Trial Witness List. (Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 6/4/2014)
|
June 4, 2014 |
Filing 174
Witness List by National Collegiate Athletic Association NCAA's Revised Live Trial Witness List. (Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 6/4/2014)
|
June 4, 2014 |
Filing 173
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting #171 Motion Pursuant to General Order 58.IV.E to Bring Electronic and Other Miscellaneous Equipment into the Courtroom (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2014)
|
June 3, 2014 |
Filing 172
TRIAL BRIEF - Antitrust Plaintiffs' Trial Brief by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 6/3/2014)
|
June 3, 2014 |
Filing 171
Antitrust Plaintiffs' Request Pursuant to General Order 58.IV.E to Bring Electronic and Other Miscellaneous Equipment into the Courtroom by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 6/3/2014) Modified on 6/4/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
June 3, 2014 |
Filing 170
TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Electronic Arts Inc. for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Shacham, Matan) (Filed on 6/3/2014)
|
June 2, 2014 |
Filing 169
NOTICE of Appearance by Luis Li for National Collegiate Athletic Association (Li, Luis) (Filed on 6/2/2014)
|
May 30, 2014 |
Filing 168
TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Daily Trial by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Isaacson, William) (Filed on 5/30/2014)
|
May 30, 2014 |
Filing 167
MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Of filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. Motion Hearing set for 7/3/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 6/13/2014. Replies due by 6/20/2014. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Declaration of Michael D. Hausfeld, #4 Declaration of Steve W. Berman, #5 Declaration of Leonard W. Aragon)(Scherrer, Hilary) (Filed on 5/30/2014) Modified on 6/2/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
May 30, 2014 |
Filing 166
ORDER RESOLVING MOTIONS IN LIMINE (Docket Nos. 1063, 1069 in case no. 09-1967 CW). Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/30/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2014)
|
May 29, 2014 |
Filing 165
TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Daily Trial by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Singla, Rohit) (Filed on 5/29/2014)
|
May 29, 2014 |
Filing 164
Transcript of Proceedings held on May 28, 2014, before Judge Claudia Wilken. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov, diane.transcripts@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/27/2014. (Related documents(s) #161 , #163 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 5/29/2014)
|
May 28, 2014 |
Filing 163
TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Lehmann, Michael) (Filed on 5/28/2014)
|
May 28, 2014 |
Filing 162
Minute Entry: Pretrial Conference held on 5/28/2014 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 5/28/2014), Motion in Limine Hearing held on 5/28/2014 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 5/28/2014). (Court Reporter Diane Skillman.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/28/2014)
|
May 28, 2014 |
Filing 161
TRANSCRIPT ORDER by National Collegiate Athletic Association for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Singla, Rohit) (Filed on 5/28/2014)
|
May 28, 2014 |
Filing 160
Order granting #151 Motion to Appear by Telephone entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
|
May 28, 2014 |
Filing 159
Order granting #150 Motion to Appear by Telephone entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
|
May 27, 2014 |
Filing 158
NOTICE of Appearance by Rohit K. Singla for Defendant National Collegiate Athletic Association (Singla, Rohit) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
|
May 27, 2014 |
Filing 157
NOTICE of Appearance by Thane Rehn for Defendant National Collegiate Athletic Association (Rehn, Thane) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
|
May 27, 2014 |
Filing 156
NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Paul Raphael for Defendant National Collegiate Athletic Association (Raphael, Justin) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
|
May 27, 2014 |
Filing 155
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeslyn A Miller for Defendant National Collegiate Athletic Association (Miller, Jeslyn) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
|
May 27, 2014 |
Filing 154
NOTICE of Appearance by Carolyn Hoecker Luedtke for Defendant National Collegiate Athletic Association (Luedtke, Carolyn) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
|
May 27, 2014 |
Filing 153
NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Max Klaus for Defendant National Collegiate Athletic Association (Klaus, Kelly) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
|
May 27, 2014 |
Filing 152
NOTICE of Appearance by Glenn Douglas Pomerantz for Defendant National Collegiate Athletic Association (Pomerantz, Glenn) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
|
May 27, 2014 |
Filing 151
MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Steiner, Renae) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
|
May 27, 2014 |
Filing 150
MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Right of Publicity Plaintiffs. (Aragon, Leonard) (Filed on 5/27/2014) Modified on 5/28/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
May 27, 2014 |
Electronic filing error. Document filed in wrong case. [err401]Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #149 Brief filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
|
May 27, 2014 |
Electronic filing error. Document filed in wrong case. [err401]Please re-file in its entirety. Re: 149 Brief filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
|
May 23, 2014 |
Filing 149
***INCORRECT CASE NUMBER*** Brief : Oppositions to Plaintiffs' Motions in Limine (Dkt. 1063 in Case No. 09-1967) filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Singla, Rohit) (Filed on 5/23/2014) Modified on 5/27/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
May 23, 2014 |
Filing 148
Antitrust Plaintiffs' Opposition to NCAA's Motions in Limine (Dkt. 1069 in Case No. 09-1967) filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gosselin, Sathya) (Filed on 5/23/2014) Modified on 5/27/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
|
May 23, 2014 |
Filing 147
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING (1029 in case 4:09-cv-01967-CW) MOTION TO SEVER TRIAL ISSUES OR CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND SETTING DATES. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2014)
|
February 13, 2012 |
Filing 146
***FILED IN ERROR, INCORRECT CASE NUMBER*** Transcript of Proceedings held on February 8, 2012, before Judge Nathanael Cousins. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, Telephone number 415-255-6842. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 3/5/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/15/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/14/2012. (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 2/13/2012) Modified on 2/14/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
|
August 8, 2011 |
ADR Remark: The further ADR Phone Conference scheduled for 8/11/11 has been rescheduled to 11/10/11 at 10:30 a.m. Pacific time. Please take note that at the appointed time, all parties shall call 218-339-2500 and use access code 1057593 to join the call. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2011)
|
February 8, 2011 |
Filing 145
MDL ORDER Denying Transfer (MDL No. 2212) (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2011)
|
April 14, 2010 |
Filing 144
ORDER RELATING CASE. C08-2820 and C09-1967 are related as defined by Civil L.R. 3-12(b) and will be reassigned to Judge Walker. Counsel are instructed that all future filings are to bear the initials VRW immediately after the case number. All deadlines in the reassigned cases are vacated and will be reset by the newly assigned judge. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 4/13/2010. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2010) Modified on 4/15/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF). ***FILED IN ERROR, THIS ACTION NOW CONSOLIDATED WITH C-09-1967-CW***
|
March 1, 2010 |
Filing 143
Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/17/09, before Judge Claudia Wilken. Court Reporter/Transcriber Diane E. Skillman, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 3/22/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/1/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/1/2010. (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 3/1/2010)
|
February 8, 2010 |
Filing 142
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART (91) NCAA's Motion to Dismiss in case 4:09-cv-03329-CW; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART (92) CLC's Motion to Dismiss in case 4:09-cv-03329-CW; GRANTING (12) NCAA's Motion to Dismiss in case 4:09-cv-04882-CW; GRANTING (14) CLC's Motion to Dismiss in case 4:09-cv-04882-CW. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/8/2010. (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2010)
|
January 22, 2010 |
Filing 141
ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASES. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 1/22/10. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2010)
|
January 15, 2010 |
Cases associated: Create association to 4:09-cv-01967-CW. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
|
January 15, 2010 |
Cases associated. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
|
January 15, 2010 |
Filing 140
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING (81) Motion to Appoint Interim Co-Lead Counsel in case 4:09-cv-01967-CW; GRANTING (76) Motion to Appoint Interim Co-Lead Counsel in case 4:09-cv-03329-CW (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
|
January 15, 2010 |
Filing 139
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING (69) Motion to Consolidate Cases; GRANTING (101) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 4:09-cv-01967-CW; GRANTING (55) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 4:09-cv-03329-CW; GRANTING (10) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 4:09-cv-04128-CW (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2010) Modified on 1/19/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF). CONSOLIDATING CASES C-09-1967-CW, C-09-3329-CW, C-09-4128-CW, C09-4882-CW, C-09-5100-CW, C-09-5134-CW, C-09-5372-CW, C-09-5378-CW ***FOR FURTHER DOCKET ENTRIES, SEE LEAD CONSOLIDATED ACTION C-09-1967-CW***
|
January 14, 2010 |
Filing 138
Letter from Steven A. Asher to the Hon. Claudia Wilken in response to Jan. 11 letter from Keller and O'Bannon counsel. (Asher, Steven) (Filed on 1/14/2010)
|
January 11, 2010 |
Filing 137
Letter from Jon T. King and Robert B. Carey Letter re Consolidation and Interim Co-Lead Counsel Meet/Confer Process. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Order)(King, Jon) (Filed on 1/11/2010)
|
December 17, 2009 |
Filing 136
Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 12/17/2009 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 12/17/2009) re (14 in 4:09-cv-04882-CW) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by Collegiate Licensing Company, (69 in 4:09-cv-01967-CW) MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr., Samuel Michael Keller, (10 in 4:09-cv-04128-CW) MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Bryon Bishop, (91 in 4:09-cv-03329-CW) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association, (47 in 4:09-cv-01967-CW) MOTION to Dismiss THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV.P. 12(b)(6) filed by Collegiate Licensing Company, (92 in 4:09-cv-03329-CW) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) filed by Collegiate Licensing Company, (34 in 4:09-cv-01967-CW) MOTION to Dismiss THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Electronic Arts Inc., (55 in 4:09-cv-03329-CW) MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr., (76 in 4:09-cv-03329-CW) MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr., (12 in 4:09-cv-04882-CW) MOTION to Dismiss filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association, (101 in 4:09-cv-01967-CW) MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Bryon Bishop, (48 in 4:09-cv-01967-CW) MOTION to Dismiss The Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss The Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.12(b)(6) filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association, (35 in 4:09-cv-01967-CW) MOTION to Strike PURSUANT TO CAL. CODE CIV. PROC. SEC. 425.16 (ANTI-SLAPP) MOTION to Strike PURSUANT TO CAL. CODE CIV. PROC. SEC. 425.16 (ANTI-SLAPP) filed by Electronic Arts Inc., Initial Case Management Conference held on 12/17/2009 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 12/17/2009). Further Case Management Conference set for 4/27/2010 02:00 PM. (Court Reporter Diane Skillman.) (scc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/17/2009)
|
December 11, 2009 |
Filing 135
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING Defendants' #71 Motion to Change Venue to the Southern District of Indiana (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2009)
|
November 20, 2009 |
Filing 134
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. Proof of Service Re Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Carl A. Taylor Lopez (King, Jon) (Filed on 11/20/2009)
|
November 18, 2009 |
Filing 133
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #124 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Carl A. Taylor Lopez (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2009)
|
November 18, 2009 |
Filing 132
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. Proof of Service No. 2 for Orders Granting Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice (King, Jon) (Filed on 11/18/2009)
|
November 18, 2009 |
Filing 131
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. Proof of Service for Orders Granting Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice (King, Jon) (Filed on 11/18/2009)
|
November 13, 2009 |
Filing 130
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #120 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Jeffrey L. Spector (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2009)
|
November 13, 2009 |
Filing 129
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #119 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Eugene A. Spector (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2009)
|
November 13, 2009 |
Filing 128
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #118 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Jeffrey J. Corrigan (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2009)
|
November 13, 2009 |
Filing 127
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #117 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Jay S. Cohen (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2009)
|
November 13, 2009 |
Filing 126
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #116 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for William G. Caldes (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2009)
|
November 13, 2009 |
Filing 123
CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motions Hearing and Case Management Conference Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2009 02:00 PM. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2009 02:00 PM. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2009)
|
November 13, 2009 |
Filing 122
NOTICE of Appearance by Amber Melia Trincado (Trincado, Amber) (Filed on 11/13/2009)
|
November 13, 2009 |
ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by DB on 11/13/09. A further ADR Phone Conference has been scheduled for 4/13/10 at 10:30 a.m. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2009)
|
November 12, 2009 |
Filing 125
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #109 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Svetlana S. Gans (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2009)
|
November 12, 2009 |
Filing 124
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Carl A. Taylor Lopez ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611004431.) filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2009)
|
November 10, 2009 |
Filing 121
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Geller, Jason) (Filed on 11/10/2009)
|
November 10, 2009 |
Filing 120
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Jeffrey L. Spector ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611004419.) filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2009)
|
November 10, 2009 |
Filing 119
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Eugene A. Spector ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611004415.) filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2009)
|
November 10, 2009 |
Filing 118
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Jeffrey J. Corrigan ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611004416.) filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2009)
|
November 10, 2009 |
Filing 117
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Jay S. Cohen ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611004418.) filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2009)
|
November 10, 2009 |
Filing 116
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for William G. Caldes ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611004417.) filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2009)
|
November 9, 2009 |
Filing 115
ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 11/13/09 at 10:30 a.m. Please take note that plaintiff's counsel initiates the call to all parties. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2009)
|
November 6, 2009 |
Filing 114
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (REFILED Document 103) (Filice, Gennaro) (Filed on 11/6/2009)
|
November 6, 2009 |
Filing 113
NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Filice, Gennaro) (Filed on 11/6/2009)
|
November 3, 2009 |
Filing 112
Reply Brief in Support of Its re #92 Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(B)(6) filed byCollegiate Licensing Company. (Attachments: #1 certificate of service)(Filice, Gennaro) (Filed on 11/3/2009) Modified on 11/4/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/4/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
|
November 3, 2009 |
Filing 111
Reply Memorandum re #76 MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Bailey, Arthur) (Filed on 11/3/2009)
|
November 3, 2009 |
Filing 110
Reply Memorandum re #91 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 11/3/2009) Modified on 11/4/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
|
October 30, 2009 |
Filing 109
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Svetlana S. Gans ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611004350.) filed by Collegiate Licensing Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2009)
|
October 29, 2009 |
Filing 108
ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2009)
|
October 27, 2009 |
Filing 107
Memorandum in Opposition to NCAA's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Lehmann, Michael) (Filed on 10/27/2009) Modified on 10/28/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
|
October 27, 2009 |
Filing 106
Memorandum in Opposition to CLC's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Lehmann, Michael) (Filed on 10/27/2009) Modified on 10/28/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
|
October 27, 2009 |
Filing 105
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Lehmann, Michael) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
|
October 27, 2009 |
Filing 104
Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs Keller's and O'Bannon's Joint Motion for Appointment of Interim Co-Lead Counsel Pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 23(g) filed byCollegiate Licensing Company. (Filice, Gennaro) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
|
October 27, 2009 |
Filing 103
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Parties and Counsel (Filice, Gennaro) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
|
October 27, 2009 |
Filing 102
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
|
October 27, 2009 |
Filing 101
Memorandum in Opposition re #76 MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
|
October 23, 2009 |
Filing 100
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #94 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Suzanne L. Wahl (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2009)
|
October 23, 2009 |
Filing 99
ORDER re #96 DENYING REQUEST FOR STIPULATED ORDER REVISING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 10/23/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2009)
|
October 23, 2009 |
Filing 98
NOTICE of Appearance by Donald Scott Macrae (Macrae, Donald) (Filed on 10/23/2009)
|
October 22, 2009 |
Filing 97
Declaration of Allen Steyer in Support of #96 Request for Stipulated Order Revising Briefing Schedule for Motions to Dismiss filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. (Related document(s) #96 ) (Steyer, Allan) (Filed on 10/22/2009) Modified on 10/23/2009 (kc, COURT STAFF).
|
October 22, 2009 |
Filing 96
REQUEST FOR STIPULATED ORDER REVISING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND PROPOSED ORDER by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr., Collegiate Licensing Company, National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Steyer, Allan) (Filed on 10/22/2009) Modified on 10/23/2009 (kc, COURT STAFF).
|
October 22, 2009 |
Filing 95
NOTICE of Appearance by Allan Steyer (Steyer, Allan) (Filed on 10/22/2009)
|
October 21, 2009 |
Filing 93
Joint Consolidated Reply to Electronic Arts, Inc., NCAA, and CLC's Opposition to Motion to Consolidate Actions filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr., Samuel Michael Keller. (King, Jon) (Filed on 10/21/2009) Modified on 10/22/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
|
October 20, 2009 |
Filing 94
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Suzanne L. Wahl (Filing fee $210, receipt number 44611004296) filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2009)
|
October 13, 2009 |
Filing 92
MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) filed by Collegiate Licensing Company. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: #1 Defendant Collegiate Licensing Company's Motion to Dismiss (Cont'd.), #2 Affidavit Declaration of Peter M. Boyle in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A (Cont'd.), #5 Exhibit Exhibit B, #6 Affidavit Certificate of Service, #7 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Defendant Collegiate Licensing Company's Motion to Dismiss)(Filice, Gennaro) (Filed on 10/13/2009)
|
October 13, 2009 |
Filing 91
MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Curtner, Gregory) (Filed on 10/13/2009)
|
October 8, 2009 |
Filing 90
Reply Brief in support of re #71 MOTION to Change Venue filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 10/8/2009) Modified on 10/9/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
|
October 7, 2009 |
Filing 89
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #88 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Mitchell J. Rapp (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2009)
|
October 2, 2009 |
Filing 87
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #86 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Shawn D. Stuckey (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2009)
|
October 1, 2009 |
Filing 88
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Mitchell J. Rapp ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611004205.) filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2009)
|
September 28, 2009 |
Filing 86
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Shawn D. Stuckey ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611004184.) filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2009)
|
September 25, 2009 |
Filing 85
STIPULATION Extending Time to File Responsive Pleadings by National Collegiate Athletic Association, Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr., Collegiate Licensing Company. (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 9/25/2009) Modified on 9/28/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
|
September 25, 2009 |
Set/Reset Deadlines as to 55 MOTION to Consolidate Cases, 76 MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2009 02:00 PM. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2009)
|
September 25, 2009 |
Set/Reset Deadlines as to #55 MOTION to Consolidate Cases, #76 MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2009 02:00 PM. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2009)
|
September 23, 2009 |
Filing 84
ORDER: Notice is hereby given that the Court, on its own motion, shall continue the hearings on Plaintiff's joint motion to consolidate actions (Docket No. 55) and motion to appoint lead counsel (Docket No. 76) to November 17, 2009 at 2:00PM, in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA 94612. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/23/09. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2009)
|
September 23, 2009 |
Filing 83
SEE DOCKET NO. 84 FOR CORRECT CAPTION REGARDING THIS ORDER. ** Docket No. 78 is clerk's notice informing counsel that Defendant's Motion to Change Venue is already taken under submission. ORDER : Notice is given that the Court, on its own motions, shall continue the hearings on Plaintiff's joint motion to consolidate actions (Docket No. 55) and motion to appoint lead counsel (Docket No. 76) to November 17, 2009 at 2:00pm in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA 94612. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/23/09. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2009) Modified on 9/24/2009 (fs, COURT STAFF).
|
September 22, 2009 |
Filing 82
NOTICE by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. re #56 MOTION to Extend All Deadlines Pending Determination on Motion to Consolidate Actions Notice of Withdrawal of Motion and Scheduling Suggestion (King, Jon) (Filed on 9/22/2009) Modified on 9/24/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
|
September 21, 2009 |
Filing 81
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. re #79 Notice of Appearance of Christopher L. Lebsock (Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 9/21/2009)
|
September 21, 2009 |
Filing 80
Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue and Certificate of Service filed byEdward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher L. Lebsock in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue)(Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 9/21/2009)
|
September 21, 2009 |
Filing 79
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher L. Lebsock on behalf of Plaintiff (Lebsock, Christopher) (Filed on 9/21/2009)
|
September 21, 2009 |
Filing 78
CLERKS NOTICE: Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue and Statement of Relief Sought set for 10/22/09 at 2:00PM before Judge Claudia Wilken is SUBMITTED ON THE PAPERS. No counsel appearances are required. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2009)
|
September 17, 2009 |
Filing 77
Memorandum in Opposition re #55 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Unpublished Opinions)(Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 9/17/2009)
|
September 16, 2009 |
Filing 76
MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. Motion Hearing set for 10/22/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Proposed Order)(King, Jon) (Filed on 9/16/2009) Modified on 9/17/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
|
September 14, 2009 |
Filing 75
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #66 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Jay L. Himes (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2009)
|
September 14, 2009 |
Filing 74
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #65 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Morissa R. Falk (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2009)
|
September 14, 2009 |
Filing 73
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #64 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Vincent J. Esades (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2009)
|
September 14, 2009 |
Filing 72
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #63 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Ronald J. Aranoff (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2009)
|
September 14, 2009 |
Filing 71
MOTION to Change Venue CORRECTION OF DOCKET #69 filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. Motion Hearing set for 10/22/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Robert Wierenga, #2 Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit A - Div I Men's Basketball, #4 Exhibit B - Football Bowl Subdivision, #5 Exhibit C - Federal Judicial Caseload Statistics, #6 Exhibit D - Email from Jon King 9-8-09, #7 Affidavit Peter Boyle, #8 Appendix Unpublished Opinions, #9 Proposed Order Transfer Venue)(Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 9/14/2009)
|
September 14, 2009 |
Filing 70
CLERKS NOTICE of deficiency re document #69 (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2009)
|
September 11, 2009 |
Filing 69
NOTICE by Collegiate Licensing Company, National Collegiate Athletic Association of Motion to Transfer Venue and Statement of Relief Sought; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Robert J. Wierenga, #2 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit A - Div I Men's Basketball, #4 Exhibit B - Football Bowl Subdivision, #5 Exhibit C - Federal Judical Caseload Statistics 3-31-08, #6 Exhibit D - Email from Jon King 9-8-09, #7 Affidavit Peter M. Boyle, #8 Unpublished Opinions, #9 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 9/11/2009)
|
September 10, 2009 |
Filing 68
NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Alex Geller (Geller, Jason) (Filed on 9/10/2009)
|
September 10, 2009 |
Filing 67
NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Jason Alex Geller Substitution of Attorneys (Geller, Jason) (Filed on 9/10/2009)
|
September 8, 2009 |
Filing 66
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Jay L. Himes ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611004109.) filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2009)
|
September 8, 2009 |
Filing 65
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Morissa R. Falk ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611004112.) filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Propoed Order)(cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2009)
|
September 8, 2009 |
Filing 64
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Vincent J. Esades ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611004110.) filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2009)
|
September 8, 2009 |
Filing 63
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Ronald J. Aranoff ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611004111.) filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2009)
|
September 4, 2009 |
Filing 62
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #58 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Jonathan W. Cuneo (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2009)
|
September 4, 2009 |
Filing 61
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #57 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Daniel Cohen (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2009)
|
September 4, 2009 |
Filing 60
Memorandum in Opposition re #56 MOTION to Extend All Deadlines Pending Determination on Motion to Consolidate Actions filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 9/4/2009)
|
September 4, 2009 |
Filing 59
Letter from Jon T. King re Chambers Copies of Motion to Consolidate and Motion to Extend Deadlines. (King, Jon) (Filed on 9/4/2009)
|
September 3, 2009 |
Filing 58
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Jonathan W. Cuneo ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611004090.) filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2009)
|
September 3, 2009 |
Filing 57
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Daniel Cohen ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611004090.) filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2009)
|
September 1, 2009 |
Filing 56
MOTION to Extend All Deadlines Pending Determination on Motion to Consolidate Actions filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Jon T. King, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(King, Jon) (Filed on 9/1/2009) Modified on 9/2/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
|
September 1, 2009 |
Filing 55
MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. Motion Hearing set for 10/8/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Jon T. King, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(King, Jon) (Filed on 9/1/2009)
|
August 31, 2009 |
Filing 54
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #51 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Jack Simms (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2009)
|
August 28, 2009 |
Filing 53
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #48 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - William Isaacson (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2009)
|
August 28, 2009 |
Filing 52
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #46 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Tanya Chutkan (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2009)
|
August 28, 2009 |
Filing 51
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Jack Simms ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611004049.) filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2009)
|
August 28, 2009 |
Filing 50
NOTICE by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. Notice of Association of Counsel Carl A. Taylor Lopez REVISED (King, Jon) (Filed on 8/28/2009)
|
August 28, 2009 |
Filing 49
NOTICE by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. Notice of Association of Counsel Carl A. Taylor Lopez (King, Jon) (Filed on 8/28/2009)
|
August 27, 2009 |
Filing 48
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - William Isaacson ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611004039.) filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2009)
|
August 27, 2009 |
Filing 47
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #45 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Megan Jones (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2009)
|
August 27, 2009 |
Filing 46
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Tanya Chutkan ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611004040.) filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2009)
|
August 26, 2009 |
Filing 45
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Megan Jones ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611004029.) filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2009)
|
August 26, 2009 |
Filing 44
NOTICE of Appearance by Steven J. Greenfogel (Greenfogel, Steven) (Filed on 8/26/2009)
|
August 25, 2009 |
Filing 43
Certificate of Interested Entities by National Collegiate Athletic Association (Curtner, Gregory) (Filed on 8/25/2009)
|
August 24, 2009 |
Filing 42
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. re #38 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Michael D. Hausfeld (King, Jon) (Filed on 8/24/2009)
|
August 24, 2009 |
Filing 41
NOTICE of Appearance by Jiangxiao Athena Hou (Hou, Jiangxiao) (Filed on 8/24/2009)
|
August 24, 2009 |
Filing 40
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Simon Mason (Mason, Daniel) (Filed on 8/24/2009)
|
August 21, 2009 |
Filing 39
Letter from Jon T. King Regarding Status of Revised Schedule re Responsive Pleadings. (King, Jon) (Filed on 8/21/2009)
|
August 18, 2009 |
Filing 38
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #34 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Michael D. Hausfeld (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2009)
|
August 18, 2009 |
Filing 37
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #33 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Cindy D. Hanson (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2009)
|
August 18, 2009 |
Filing 36
CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE: Case Management Conference set for 11/17/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/18/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2009)
|
August 14, 2009 |
Filing 35
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. Proof of Service By Mail on Non-ECF Participants (King, Jon) (Filed on 8/14/2009)
|
August 12, 2009 |
Filing 33
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice- Cindy D. Hanson filed by Collegiate Licensing Company. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2009) Modified on 8/13/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF). ***already paid in related case C-09-1967-CW, docket #60***
|
August 12, 2009 |
Filing 32
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. Proof of Service Summons and Complaint on Collegiate Licensing Company (King, Jon) (Filed on 8/12/2009)
|
August 12, 2009 |
Filing 31
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. Proof of Service Summons and Complaint on National Collegiate Athletic Association (King, Jon) (Filed on 8/12/2009)
|
August 12, 2009 |
Filing 30
NOTICE by Collegiate Licensing Company CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (Filice, Gennaro) (Filed on 8/12/2009)
|
August 12, 2009 |
Filing 29
Certificate of Interested Entities by Collegiate Licensing Company (Filice, Gennaro) (Filed on 8/12/2009)
|
August 12, 2009 |
Filing 28
STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO FILE AND SERVE RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS by Collegiate Licensing Company, National Collegiate Athletic Association, Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. (Filice, Gennaro) (Filed on 8/12/2009) Modified on 8/13/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
|
August 11, 2009 |
Filing 34
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Michael D. Hausfeld (Filing fee $210, receipt number 34611035397) filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2009)
|
August 11, 2009 |
Filing 27
ORDER RELATING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Claudia Wilken for all further proceedings. Judge Hon. Maxine M. Chesney no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/11/2009. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2009)
|
August 11, 2009 |
Filing 26
ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Constance K. Robinson is admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 11, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2009)
|
August 11, 2009 |
Filing 25
ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Peter M. Boyle is admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 11, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2009)
|
August 7, 2009 |
Filing 24
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Collegiate Licensing Company re #22 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Peter M. Boyle) ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611035258.), #23 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Constance K. Robinson) ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611035257.) (Filice, Gennaro) (Filed on 8/7/2009)
|
August 7, 2009 |
Filing 23
ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED: DUPLICATIVE OF DOCKET NUMBER #21 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Constance K. Robinson) ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611035257.) filed by Collegiate Licensing Company. (Filice, Gennaro) (Filed on 8/7/2009) Modified on 8/11/2009 (aaa, COURT STAFF).
|
August 7, 2009 |
Filing 22
ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED: DUPLICATIVE OF DOCKET NUMBER #20 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Peter M. Boyle) ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611035258.) filed by Collegiate Licensing Company. (Filice, Gennaro) (Filed on 8/7/2009) Modified on 8/11/2009 (aaa, COURT STAFF).
|
August 6, 2009 |
Filing 21
MOTION for leave for admission of Attorney Constance K. Robinson to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 34611035257.) filed by Collegiate Licensing Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2009)
|
August 6, 2009 |
Filing 20
MOTION for leave for admission of Attorney Peter M. Boyle to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 34611035258.) filed by Collegiate Licensing Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2009)
|
August 4, 2009 |
Filing 19
Letter from Michael D. Hausfeld to Judge Wilken in Keller Action Regarding Interim Lead Counsel Issue. (King, Jon) (Filed on 8/4/2009)
|
August 4, 2009 |
Filing 18
ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Kimberly K. Kefalas is admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 4, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2009)
|
August 4, 2009 |
Filing 17
ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Atleen Kaur is admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 4, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2009)
|
August 4, 2009 |
Filing 16
ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Gregory L. Curtner is admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on August 4, 2009. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2009)
|
July 29, 2009 |
Filing 15
MOTION of Kimberly K. Kefalas for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611034900) filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2009)
|
July 29, 2009 |
Filing 14
MOTION of Atleen Kaur for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611034900) filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2009)
|
July 29, 2009 |
Filing 13
MOTION of Gregory L. Curtner for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611034900) filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2009)
|
July 29, 2009 |
Filing 12
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Maxine M. Chesney for all further proceedings. Judge Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/29/09. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2009)
|
July 29, 2009 |
Filing 11
CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (ahy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2009)
|
July 28, 2009 |
Filing 10
NOTICE by National Collegiate Athletic Association re #6 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge Notice of Errata re Declination to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge (Roger, Kent) (Filed on 7/28/2009)
|
July 28, 2009 |
Filing 9
NOTICE by National Collegiate Athletic Association re #5 Notice of Appearance Notice of Errata re Appearance (Roger, Kent) (Filed on 7/28/2009)
|
July 28, 2009 |
Filing 8
NOTICE of Appearance by Kent Michael Roger Notice of Appearance Entered on Behalf of National Collegiate Athletic Association (Roger, Kent) (Filed on 7/28/2009)
|
July 28, 2009 |
Filing 7
CLERKS NOTICE re: Failure to E-File and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer re #5 , #6 . (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2009)
|
July 28, 2009 |
Filing 4
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert James Wierenga (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 7/28/2009)
|
July 27, 2009 |
Filing 6
Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Collegiate Licensing Company, National Collegiate Athletic Association. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2009) (aaa, COURT STAFF).
|
July 27, 2009 |
Filing 5
APPEARANCE by Kent Michael Roger, Robert Sturtevant Eaton. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2009) (aaa, COURT STAFF).
|
July 21, 2009 |
Filing 3
ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Case Management Statement due 11/2/2009 & Case Management Conference set for 11/9/2009 at 4:00 PM.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2009)
|
July 21, 2009 |
Filing 2
SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Collegiate Licensing Company & National Collegiate Athletic Association. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2009)
|
July 21, 2009 |
Filing 1
CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT & Demand for Jury Trial - [Summons Issued] against Collegiate Licensing Company & National Collegiate Athletic Association, [Filing Fee: $350.00, Receipt Number 34611034568] Filed by Plaintiff Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet). (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2009)
|
July 21, 2009 |
Filing 1
CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT & Demand for Jury Trial - [Summons Issued] against Collegiate Licensing Company & National Collegiate Athletic Association, [Filing Fee: $350.00, Receipt Number 34611034568] Filed by Plaintiff Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr.. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet). (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2009)
|
July 21, 2009 |
CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (tn, COURT STAFF)
|