Woodard v. City of Menlo Park
Plaintiff: Robert Lee Woodward
Defendant: City of Menlo Park
Case Number: 4:2009cv03331
Filed: July 21, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER Granting 213 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 1/31/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
January 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 2/5/2014 03:00 PM. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 1/16/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2014)
November 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 1/15/2014. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 1/22/2014 02:45 PM. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 11/7/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2013)
October 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER VACATING 177 JUDGMENT AND REFERRING MATTER FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 10/15/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2013)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 195 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2013)
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER re 184 to Extend Deadlines to File Responsive Briefs to 181 Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under Rule 50(b) and, in the alternative, Motion for New Trial Under Rule 59, filed by Robert Lee Woodard, Ron Venzon, S et/Reset Deadlines as to 184 to Extend Deadlines to File Responsive Briefs to 181 Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under Rule 50(b) and, in the alternative, Motion for New Trial Under Rule 59, , 181 Renewed MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under Rule 50(b) and, in the alternative, MOTION for New Trial Under Rule 59., Motions terminated: 184 to Extend Deadlines to File Responsive Briefs to 181 Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Under R ule 50(b) and, in the alternative, Motion for New Trial Under Rule 59, filed by Robert Lee Woodard, Ron Venzon. Responses due by 12/7/2012. Replies due by 1/4/2013.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 11/19/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2012)
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting in part and denying in part 142 Motion in Limine; granting 147 Motion USE LEADING QUESTIONS (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2012)
September 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 151 Motion DISMISS CITY OF MENLO PARK (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2012)
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER PERMITTING EQUIPMENT AT TRIAL Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/17/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2012)
September 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 144 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 139 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Exclusion of Evidence filed by Robert Lee Woodard, Ron Venzon, Motions terminated: 139 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Exclusion of Evidence filed by Robert Lee Woodard, Ron Venzon.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/14/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
August 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 95 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 8/1/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 89 STIPULATION AND ORDER, Motions terminated: 88 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Robert Lee Woodard, Ron Venzon.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 7/9/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2012)
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 78 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2012)
May 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL: That Kristin M. Hall and Peter C. Meier of Paul Hastings LLP has been appointed to represent Plaintiff Robert Woodard in this matter. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 05/17/12. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2012)
March 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 35 Motion for Summary Judgment (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2011)
March 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 22 Motion to Dismiss. The Case Management Conference is CONTINUED to 04/21/2010 at 3:30 PM. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2010) Modified on 3/9/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER, GRANTING 8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by City of Menlo Park. GRANTING Plaintiff Leave to Amend Complaint. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/14/2010 at 03:15 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 11/10/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2009) Modified on 11/17/2009 (kc, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodard v. City of Menlo Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Lee Woodward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Menlo Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?