April 5, 2011 |
Filing
124
ORDER Granting 123 Stipulation REGARDING SETTLEMENT AND VACATING THE APRIL 7, 2011 HEARING AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. 104 MOTION to Dismiss is denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/5/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2011)
|
March 14, 2011 |
Filing
121
ORDER Granting 120 Stipulation REGARDING CONTINUANCE OF MARCH 17, 2011 HEARING AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. 104 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 4/7/2011 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Case Management Statement due by 3/31/2011. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/7/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/14/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2011)
|
February 11, 2011 |
Filing
117
ORDER Granting 116 Stipulation Regarding Continuance of February 17, 2011 Hearing and Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 3/10/2011. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/17/2011 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 3/17/2011 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/11/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2011)
|
January 6, 2011 |
Filing
115
ORDER Granting 114 Stipulation REGARDING CONTINUANCE OF JANUARY 20, 2011 HEARING AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 2/10/2011. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/17/2011 02:00 PM. 104 Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 2/17/2011 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/6/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2011)
|
September 16, 2010 |
Filing
98
ORDER re 97 Granting Stipulation EXTENDING TIME TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT [JOINT SUBMISSION BY PARTIES. Case Management Statement due by 11/11/2010. Case Management Conference set for 11/18/2010 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/16/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
|
August 31, 2010 |
Filing
94
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 72 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2010)
|
April 23, 2010 |
Filing
87
ORDER re 86 Granting Stipulation EXTENDING DEFENDANTS' TIME TO FILE REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 04/23/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2010)
|
April 20, 2010 |
Filing
85
ORDER re 84 Granting Stipulation REGARDING CONTINUANCE OF MAY 6, 2010 HEARING AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 8/12/2010 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 8/12/2010 02:00 PM.Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 04/20/2010. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2010)
|
March 26, 2010 |
Filing
80
ORDER re 78 granting STIPULATION Changing Time for Filing Lead Plaintiff's Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss and Hearing Schedule Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/6/2010 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 5/6/2010 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/26/2010. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2010)
|
February 10, 2010 |
Filing
76
ORDER re 72 SETTING HEARING ON MOTION. Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2010 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/10/10. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2010)
|
December 10, 2009 |
Filing
62
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING 59 Stipulation Changing Time for Filing Lead Plaintiffs' Consolidated Complaint and Setting Briefing Schedule on Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' Consolidated Complaint due 12/19/09; Defendants' M otion to Dismiss due 02/08/10; Lead Plaintiffs' Opposition due to Motion to Dismiss due 03/25/10; Defendants' Reply to Opposition due 04/15/10. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken, on 12/10/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2009) Modified on 12/11/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
|
November 2, 2009 |
Filing
52
ORDER re 51 GRANTING AS MODIFIED STIPULATION Changing Time for Lead Plaintiff's Consolidated Complaint and Setting Briefing Schedule on Motion to Dismiss. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/29/2010 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 11/2/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2009) Modified on 11/3/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
|
October 26, 2009 |
Filing
48
ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken denying 10 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; denying 19 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel ; granting 19 Motion to Consolidate Cases; granting 21 Motion to Consolidate Cases; granting 21 Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2009)
|
October 7, 2009 |
Filing
42
ORDER granting Stipulation to Consolidate Cases ( C-09-3637-CW and C-09-3813-CW ) re (9 in 4:09-cv-03637-CW) Stipulation, filed by Wade B. Hampton, Robert S. Weiss, John R. Adler, Jr., Robert E. McNamara, Accuray Incorporated, Wayne Wu, Ted Tu , Euan S. Thomson, (29 in 4:09-cv-03362-CW) Stipulation, filed by Wade B. Hampton, Robert S. Weiss, John R. Adler, Jr., Robert E. McNamara, Accuray Incorporated, City of Ann Arbor Employees' Retirement System, Wayne Wu, Ted Tu, Euan S. Thomson. ***FOR FURTHER DOCKET ENTRIES, SEE LEAD CONSOLIDATED ACTION C-09-3362-CW***. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/72/009. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2009) Modified on 12/23/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
|