Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. v. Brosnan et al

Plaintiff: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Defendant: John Brosnan, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. and Robert Jacobsen
Case Number: 4:2009cv03600
Filed: August 6, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 87 STIPULATED PERMANENT INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 8/3/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2010)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 86 STIPULATION PERMANENT INJUNCTION, JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 7/27/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2010)
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 2/16/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2010) Modified on 2/17/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Excusing Attendance at Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/10/2010. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2010)
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Request to Excuse Attendance at Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/8/2010. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2010)
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 78 PERMANENT INJUNCTION as to Defendant Robert Jacobsen. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 2/2/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2010) Modified on 2/4/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong DENYING AS MOOT 17 Motion for Order Permitting Service by Mail. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2010) Modified on 2/2/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 70 Ex Parte Motion to Vacate Order to Mediate in Light of Upcoming Settlement Conference and VACATING 64 Stipulation and Order. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2010) Modified on 1/15/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 72 REPORT & RECOMMENDATION RE: FEES & COSTS INCURRED BY PLAINTIFF TO BRING CONTEMPT PROCEEDING re 54 Order on Ex Parte Motion. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James, on 12/30/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2009) Modified on 1/4/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 64 STIPULATION AND ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 11/19/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2009) Modified on 11/23/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER SCHEDULING HEARING & BRIEFING RE ORDER re 54 Order on Ex Parte Application,,,. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/13/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2009)
October 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 11/10/2009 at 01:00 PM. Show Cause Response due by 10/30/2009. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 10/26/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2009) Modified on 10/28/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. The preliminary injunction will take effect upon Plaintiff's posting of a bond in the amount of $1,000. The TRO shall remain in effect for (10) ten-days to allow Plaintiff time to post bond. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken, on 9/4/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2009) Modified on 9/8/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. v. Brosnan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Leigha E. Wilbur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Brosnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Jacobsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?