Taragan et al v. Nissan North America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Helen Taragan, Frances Jeanette Taylor and Clarence Taylor
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc. and Nissan Motor Company, Ltd.
Case Number: 4:2009cv03660
Filed: August 10, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 89 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 7/30/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2013)
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 75 Motion to Dismiss (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2013)
December 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 82 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING DEADLINES filed by Nissan North America, Inc., Helen Taragan, Marites Asido, Matthew Wakefield, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 82 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSE D ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING DEADLINES, 75 MOTION to Dismiss . Responses due by 1/29/2013. Replies due by 2/26/2013. Motion Hearing set for 3/12/2013 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 12/17/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2012)
December 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 81 STIPULATION AND ORDER, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 75 MOTION to Dismiss . Responses due by 12/21/2012. Replies due by 1/15/2013.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 12/6/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2012)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 73 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 72 Continuing Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to First Amended Complaint filed by Nissan North America, Inc., Helen Taragan, Marites Asido, Matthew Wakefield, Nissan Motor Company, Ltd.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 11/9/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2012)
October 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 70 STIPULATION AND ORDER Amended Pleadings due by 10/29/2012. Case Management Conference set for 12/12/2012 02:45 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 10/2/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2012)
March 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 3/16/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2011)
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG finding as moot 12 Motion to Strike ; granting 14 Motion to Dismiss (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2010)
March 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION AND ORDER: to Continue Case Management Conference. Setting Hearing on Motion 14 Motion to Dismiss, 12 Motion to Strike: Motion Hearing set for 5/4/2010 at 01:00 PM; Case Management Conference set for 5/4/2010 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 3/24/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2010) Modified on 3/26/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER: That the parties stipulated request to modify briefing is GRANTED. The motion hearings re 14 Motion to Dismiss and 12 Motion to Strike are CONTINED to 02/09/10 at 1:00 PM. Responses due by 1/8/2010. Replies due by 1/15/2010. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 1/4/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2010) Modified on 1/6/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: That Defendant Nissan North America, Inc.'s time to answer/respond to complaint is EXTENDED to 10/12/09 re 6 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 9/16/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2009) Modified on 9/18/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taragan et al v. Nissan North America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Taragan
Represented By: Scott Purington Nealey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Jeanette Taylor
Represented By: Scott Purington Nealey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence Taylor
Represented By: Scott Purington Nealey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan Motor Company, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?