Brantley et al v. Maxwell-Jolly et al
Plaintiff: Lillie Brantley, Gilda Garcia and Allie Jo Woodward
Defendant: David Maxwell-Jolly and Department of Health Care Services
Case Number: 4:2009cv03798
Filed: August 18, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 585 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 522 Motion to Enforce Judgment; adopting Report and Recommendations as to 583 Report and Recommendations. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2013)
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 584 ORDER RE NOVEMBER 23, 2012 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 583 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on November 26, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2012)
October 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 531 ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS' OCTOBER 11, 2012 LETTER. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 522 MOTION to Enforce Judgment and for Appointment of Special Master. Responses due by 10/29/2012. Replies due by 11/2/2012. Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2012 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on October 17, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2012) Modified on 10/17/2012 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
September 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 527 ORDER RE: MEET AND CONFER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO ENFORCE JUDGMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 9/20/2012. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2012)
April 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 482 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 4/13/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2012)
January 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 444 STIPULATED JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 1/24/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2012)
December 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 415 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 412 Motion for Settlement (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2011)
November 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 411 STIPULATION AND ORDER Fairness Hearing set for 1/24/2012 01:00 PM. PRELIMINARY APPROVAL HEARING set for 12/13/2011 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 11/28/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2011)
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 409 ORDER, Motions terminated: 225 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Allie Jo Woodard, Linda Gaspard-Berry, Rozene Dilworth, Jessie Jones, Esther Darling, Raif Nasyrov, Gilda Garcia, Wendy Helfrich, 224 MOTION to Stay filed by Department of Health Care Services, Toby Douglas.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 11/17/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
November 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 407 ORDER, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 225 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2011 02:15 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 11/15/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2011)
November 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 406 Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Portions of Declarations (Dkt. No. 391). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 11/3/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
October 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 376 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE AND DEPOSITION DISPUTE. Discovery Hearing set for 11/3/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 10/28/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2011)
October 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 359 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 357 Stipulation, filed by Toby Douglas, Allie Jo Woodard, Department of Health Care Services, Jessie Jones, Esther Darling, Raif Nasyrova, Gilda Garcia, Wendy Helfrich. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 10/20/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2011)
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER RE: MOTION TO COMPEL (Dkt. No. 309) AND DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY (Dkt. No. 316). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 9/30/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2011)
August 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong DENYING 303 Motion for Relief to Reverse Briefing Schedule and Setting Hearing re 303 Motion for Relief to Reverse Briefing Schedule and 225 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2011 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong.. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 8/30/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2011) Modified on 9/1/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 225 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Plaintiffs' supplemental brief due by 10/14/2011. Defendants' supplemental brief due by 10/21/2011. Motion Hearing set for 11/1/2011 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong.. Signed by Judge Armstrong on 7/22/11. (sbalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
July 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 219 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 7/6/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011) Modified on 7/7/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 264 STIPULATION AND ORDER: That the hearing re 225 Motion for Preliminary Injunction shall be set for 07/26/11 at 1:00 PM. Responses due by 6/29/2011. Replies due by 7/12/2011. Motion Hearing set for 7/26/2011 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong.. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 6/21/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2011) Modified on 6/23/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 207 Motion for Leave to File Supplement to Complaint. Plaintiff shall file Supplemental Pleading within (2) two-days of this Order. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 06/02/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2011) Modified on 6/3/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 201 STIPULATION AND ORDER STAYING CASE, Case stayed.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 11/22/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2010)
March 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 174 Motion to Set Further Case Management Conference and for Extension of Time re Briefing and Hearing re Motion for Class Certification; and DENYING 177 Motion for Order to Show Cause. The Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification is CONTINUED to 05/25/10 at 1:00 PM. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2010) Modified on 3/26/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 180 BRIEFING ORDER: Holding in temporary ABEYANCE the 174 Motion for Class Certification. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 3/22/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2010) Modified on 3/23/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/23/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 90 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The requirement for posting bond is WAIVED. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 2/24/10. (sbalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2010) Modified on 2/25/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 164 STIPULATION AND ORDER: re 122 Motion to Certify Class. Opposition due by 3/23/2010. Replies due by 4/13/2010. Motion Hearing set for 4/27/2010 01:00 PM. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 2/16/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2010) Modified on 2/18/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 86 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Setting Hearing on Motion to 2/23/2010 at 01:00 PM. Motions due by 01/19/10; Opposition due by 02/02/10; Replies due 02/09/10. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 1/11/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2010) Modified on 1/13/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 81 STIPULATION AND ORDER: That Leave to Amend the Complaint is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 12/30/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2009) Modified on 1/4/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING MODIFICATION TO THE PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION re 62 Stipulation, filed by Department of Health Care Services, David Maxwell-Jolly, Allie Jo Woodward, Gilda Garcia, Lillie Brantley.. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 11/6/09. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2009)
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 25 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, and FINDING AS MOOT 14 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2009) Modified on 9/11/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brantley et al v. Maxwell-Jolly et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lillie Brantley
Represented By: Elizabeth Anna Zirker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilda Garcia
Represented By: Elizabeth Anna Zirker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allie Jo Woodward
Represented By: Elizabeth Anna Zirker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Maxwell-Jolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Health Care Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?