Wendell et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Wendell and Lisa Wendell
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson, Centocor, Inc., Abbott Laboratories, SmithKline Beecham, TEVA Pharmaceuticals, USA Inc., Gate Pharmaceuticals, PAR Pharmaceutical Inc.,, Mylan Laboratories Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Roxane, Inc. and Roxane Laboratory
Case Number: 4:2009cv04124
Filed: September 4, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ORDER GRANTING 372 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendants Janssen Biotech, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/5/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2014)
June 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 368 ORDER GRANTING 319 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; DENYING 355 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. ***Civil Case Terminated.*** Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/30/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2014)
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 366 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Defendant Abbott Laboratories (n/k/a AbbVie) Only (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2014)
June 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 365 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING UNOPPOSED 362 MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT; APPROVING 364 STIPULATION. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
May 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 359 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE JOINT STATUS REPORT AND CONTINUING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/30/2014 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/19/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2014)
May 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 358 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 357 Stipulated Confidentiality Order. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2014)
April 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 352 Stipulation for Stay of Proceedings as to Plaintiffs' Claims Against Defendants Centocor, Inc. and Johnson and Johnson. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 336 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Denying 332 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
January 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER CONTINUING SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARING. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/8/2014. Motion Hearing set for 2/20/2014 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken.(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2014)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING IN PART 315 MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 257 Motion for Leave to File. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
June 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 294 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for James F. Murdica. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2013)
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING DEFENDANT PAR PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.S UNOPPOSED 286 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2013)
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR RELIEF TO MODIFY DISCOVERY DEADLINES (Dkt. No. 263). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2013)
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER REFERRING MOTION 263 TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/8/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2013)
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL (Dkt. No. 250. Discovery Hearing set for 3/7/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 2/27/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2013)
February 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposesre 249 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Defendants Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc and Par Pharmaceuticals. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/26/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2013)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 252 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Norvell, Susannah. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2013)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken AMENDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER; GRANTING IN PART 242 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2013)
July 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING CENTOCOR AND JOHNSON AND JOHNSONS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION, DENYING ABBOTT, TEVA AND PARS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, AND GRANTING GSKS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2012)
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS 220 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Responses due by 4/23/2012. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/12/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2012)
January 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 217 Stipulation Re Exhibits To Jones Affidavit In Support Of Defendants Centocor Ortho Biotech Inc. And Johnson & Johnsons Motion For Summary Judgment. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2012)
January 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER Granting 211 Stipulation re 205 . Responses due by 1/12/2012. Replies due by 1/17/2012. Motion Hearing set for 2/2/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Case Management Statement due by 1/26/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/2/2012 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/5/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2012)
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING 177 , 179 , 183 , 185 MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2011)
August 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER Granting 197 Stipulation Request for an Order Extending Time and for Private Mediation. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/30/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2011)
July 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER Granting 181 Stipulated Request for Order Extending Time. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 177 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 179 MOTION for Summary Judgment: Responses due by 7/28/2011; Replies due by 8/11/2011. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/21/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2011)
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER Granting 175 Stipulation FOR ORDER EXTENDING TIME. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/23/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2011)
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER Granting 160 Joint Stipulation to Amend Complaint and Withdraw Joint Motion for Judgment on the Pleading. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/19/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2011)
February 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER Granting 141 Joint Stipulation for Filing of Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/3/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2011)
December 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER Granting 138 Stipulation Changing ADR Process and Extending Deadline for Conducting Mediation. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/20/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2010)
June 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Denying 105 Abbott Laboratories' Motion to Dismiss and Granting 115 Remaining Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, with Leave to Amend (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
March 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER re 108 granting Stipulation of Dismissal as to Mylan Laboratories Inc.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 03/25/2010. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2010)
January 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting in part and denying in part 39 Abbott Laboratories' Motion to Dismiss (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER re 86 granting STIPULATION selecting Mediation. Case referred to mediation.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/21/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2009)
December 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING 75 Stipulation to Extend Time to File ADR Certifications and Stipulation Pursuant to Local Rule 6-2. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken, on 12/10/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2009) Modified on 12/11/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER re 65 granting Stipulation der for Extension of Time and Rescheduling Case Management Conference. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2009 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/4/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2009)
November 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER re 63 granting STIPULATION of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice as to Boehringer Ingelheim Roxane, Inc. and Roxane Laboratories, Inc. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/2/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2009)
September 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RECUSAL ORDER. Signed by Judge James Larson on 9/14/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wendell et al v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Wendell
Represented By: Fabrice Nijhof Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Wendell
Represented By: Fabrice Nijhof Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Michelle A Childers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centocor, Inc.
Represented By: Michelle A Childers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Represented By: Traci Lyn Shafroth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SmithKline Beecham
Represented By: William Allen Hanssen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA Pharmaceuticals, USA Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Michael Frieder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gate Pharmaceuticals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAR Pharmaceutical Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Laboratories Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation
Represented By: Lisa Marie Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim Roxane, Inc.
Represented By: Lisa Marie Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roxane Laboratory
Represented By: Lisa Marie Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?