Bishop v. Electronic Arts, Inc., et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Bryon Bishop
Defendant: Electronic Arts, Inc.,, National Collegiate Athletic Association and Collegiate Licensing Company
Case Number: 4:2009cv04128
Filed: September 4, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER RELATING CASE. C08-2820 and C09-1967 are related as defined by Civil L.R. 3-12(b) and will be reassigned to Judge Walker. Counsel are instructed that all future filings are to bear the initials VRW immediately after the case number. All deadlines in the reassigned cases are vacated and will be reset by the newly assigned judge. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 4/13/2010. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2010) Modified on 4/15/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF). ***FILED IN ERROR, THIS ACTION NOW CONSOLIDATED WITH C-09-1967-CW***
March 1, 2010 Filing 44 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/17/09, before Judge Claudia Wilken. Court Reporter/Transcriber Diane E. Skillman, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 3/22/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/1/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/1/2010. (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 3/1/2010)
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASES. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 1/22/10. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2010)
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING (81) Motion to Appoint Interim Co-Lead Counsel in case 4:09-cv-01967-CW; GRANTING (76) Motion to Appoint Interim Co-Lead Counsel in case 4:09-cv-03329-CW (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING (69) Motion to Consolidate Cases; GRANTING (101) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 4:09-cv-01967-CW; GRANTING (55) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 4:09-cv-03329-CW; GRANTING (10) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 4:09-cv-04128-CW (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2010) Modified on 1/19/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF). CONSOLIDATING CASES C-09-1967-CW, C-09-3329-CW, C-09-4128-CW, C09-4882-CW, C-09-5100-CW, C-09-5134-CW, C-09-5372-CW, C-09-5378-CW ***FOR FURTHER DOCKET ENTRIES, SEE LEAD CONSOLIDATED ACTION C-09-1967-CW***
January 15, 2010 Filing 40 Letter from Robert A. Van Nest in response to January 11, 2010 letter from Keller & O'Bannon counsel. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 1/15/2010)
January 14, 2010 Filing 39 Letter from Steven A. Asher to the Hon. Claudia Wilken. (Asher, Steven) (Filed on 1/14/2010)
January 11, 2010 Filing 38 Letter from Jon T. King and Robert B. Carey Letter re Consolidation and Interim Co-Lead Counsel Meet/Confer Process. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Proposed Order)(King, Jon) (Filed on 1/11/2010)
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 34 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Sara M. Vanderhoff (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2009)
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 33 Motion for Pro Hac Vice R. Charles Henn, Jr. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2009)
December 17, 2009 Filing 37 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 12/17/2009 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 12/17/2009) re (14 in 4:09-cv-04882-CW) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by Collegiate Licensing Company, (69 in 4:09-cv-01967-CW) MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr., Samuel Michael Keller, (10 in 4:09-cv-04128-CW) MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Bryon Bishop, (91 in 4:09-cv-03329-CW) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association, (47 in 4:09-cv-01967-CW) MOTION to Dismiss THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV.P. 12(b)(6) filed by Collegiate Licensing Company, (92 in 4:09-cv-03329-CW) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(6) filed by Collegiate Licensing Company, (34 in 4:09-cv-01967-CW) MOTION to Dismiss THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss THE COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(6) filed by Electronic Arts Inc., (55 in 4:09-cv-03329-CW) MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr., (76 in 4:09-cv-03329-CW) MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel filed by Edward C. O'Bannon, Jr., (12 in 4:09-cv-04882-CW) MOTION to Dismiss filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association, (101 in 4:09-cv-01967-CW) MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Bryon Bishop, (48 in 4:09-cv-01967-CW) MOTION to Dismiss The Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss The Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.12(b)(6) filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association, (35 in 4:09-cv-01967-CW) MOTION to Strike PURSUANT TO CAL. CODE CIV. PROC. SEC. 425.16 (ANTI-SLAPP) MOTION to Strike PURSUANT TO CAL. CODE CIV. PROC. SEC. 425.16 (ANTI-SLAPP) filed by Electronic Arts Inc., Initial Case Management Conference held on 12/17/2009 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 12/17/2009). Further Case Management Conference set for 4/27/2010 02:00 PM. (Court Reporter Diane Skillman.) (scc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/17/2009)
December 11, 2009 Filing 34 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611004578.) filed by Collegiate Licensing Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2009)
December 10, 2009 Filing 33 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for R. Charles Henn, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611004565.) filed by Collegiate Licensing Company. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2009)
December 10, 2009 Filing 32 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Bryon Bishop, Collegiate Licensing Company, Electronic Arts, Inc., National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Asher, Steven) (Filed on 12/10/2009) Modified on 12/11/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 9, 2009 Filing 31 Certificate of Interested Entities by Collegiate Licensing Company and Notice of Interested Parties (Filice, Gennaro) (Filed on 12/9/2009)
December 9, 2009 Filing 30 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Collegiate Licensing Company (Filice, Gennaro) (Filed on 12/9/2009) Modified on 12/10/2009 (cp, COURT STAFF).
November 30, 2009 Filing 29 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2009)
November 13, 2009 Filing 28 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motions Hearing and Case Management Conference Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2009 02:00 PM. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2009 02:00 PM. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2009)
November 13, 2009 Filing 27 Certificate of Interested Entities by National Collegiate Athletic Association (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 11/13/2009)
November 3, 2009 Filing 26 Reply to Opposition re 10 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed byBryon Bishop. (Asher, Steven) (Filed on 11/3/2009)
October 28, 2009 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Karl Olson (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 10/28/2009)
October 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 22 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Steven A. Asher (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
October 27, 2009 Filing 23 Memorandum in Opposition re 10 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed byNational Collegiate Athletic Association. (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
October 26, 2009 Filing 22 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Steven A. Asher ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611004318.) filed by Bryon Bishop. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2009)
October 22, 2009 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Alex Geller, Glen R. Olson, David Borovsky. (Geller, Jason) (Filed on 10/22/2009) Modified on 10/23/2009 (kc, COURT STAFF).
October 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Suzanne L. Wahl (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2009)
October 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Atleen Kaur (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2009)
October 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Gregory L. Curtner (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2009)
October 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Kimberly K. Kefalas (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2009)
October 20, 2009 Filing 16 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Suzanne L. Wahl (Filing fee $210, receipt number 44611004297) filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2009)
October 16, 2009 Filing 12 CLERKS NOTICE Rescheduling Motion Hearing Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2009 02:00 PM. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2009)
October 16, 2009 Filing 11 Declaration of Steven A. Asher in Support of 10 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed byBryon Bishop. (Related document(s) 10 ) (Weinstein, David) (Filed on 10/16/2009)
October 16, 2009 Filing 10 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Bryon Bishop. Motion Hearing set for 11/19/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Weinstein, David) (Filed on 10/16/2009)
October 15, 2009 Filing 15 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Atleen Kaur ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611037776.) filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2009)
October 15, 2009 Filing 14 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Gregory L. Curtner ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611037776.) filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2009)
October 15, 2009 Filing 13 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Kimberly K. Kefalas ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611037776.) filed by National Collegiate Athletic Association. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2009)
October 5, 2009 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (ahy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2009)
October 5, 2009 Filing 7 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Bryon Bishop. (Weinstein, David) (Filed on 10/5/2009)
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RELATING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Claudia Wilken for all further proceedings. Judge Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman no longer assigned to the case. Case Management Conference set for 11/17/2009 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/2/2009. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2009)
September 25, 2009 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert James Slaughter ; Robert A. Van Nest; R. Adam Lauridsen (Slaughter, Robert) (Filed on 9/25/2009)
September 25, 2009 Filing 5 STIPULATION Extending Time To File And Serve Responsive Pleadings by Electronic Arts, Inc.,. (Slaughter, Robert) (Filed on 9/25/2009)
September 23, 2009 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert James Wierenga (Wierenga, Robert) (Filed on 9/23/2009)
September 4, 2009 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (tn, COURT STAFF)
September 4, 2009 Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Case Management Statement due 12/7/2009 & InitialCase Management Conference set for 12/14/2009 at 4:00 PM.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2009)
September 4, 2009 Filing 2 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Collegiate Licensing Company, Electronic Arts, Inc. & National Collegiate Athletic Association. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2009)
September 4, 2009 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT & Demand for Jury Trial - [Summons Issued] against Collegiate Licensing Company, Electronic Arts, Inc. & National Collegiate Athletic Association, [Filing Fee: $350.00, Receipt Number 34611036299] Filed byPlaintiff Bryon Bishop. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet). (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bishop v. Electronic Arts, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryon Bishop
Represented By: David Haym Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electronic Arts, Inc.,
Represented By: Robert Addy Van Nest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Collegiate Athletic Association
Represented By: Robert James Wierenga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collegiate Licensing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?