Casissa v. First Republic Bank
Plaintiff: Frederick J. Casissa
Defendant: First Republic Bank
Case Number: 4:2009cv04129
Filed: September 4, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS 119 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/24/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2012)
June 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER REFERRING PARTIES TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/14/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2012)
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING 131 DEFENDANTS MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL AND GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFFS 127 MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2012)
June 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER REGARDING 127 MOTION AND STIPULATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/7/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2012)
May 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER REGARDING (127 in 4:09-cv-04129-CW) MOTION AND STIPULATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/30/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2012)
May 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING 124 MOTION AND 118 STIPULATION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2012)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, Motions terminated: (92 in 4:09-cv-04129-CW) MOTION to Compel Production of Documents filed by Frederick J. Casissa.Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 3/30/2012. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2012)
March 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS 101 MOTION TO CONTINUE AND VACATING HEARING. 101 Motion TO CONTINUE AND VACATING HEARING set for 4/12/2012, is vacated. Responses due by 3/10/2012. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/6/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2012)
January 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MODIFIED STIPULATION AND ORDER re 89 Stipulation to Continue 83 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff's Appearance for Deposition filed by First Republic Bank, Frederick J. Casissa, Merrill Lynch Bank and Trust, FSB, Elizabeth Riggins : Motion Hearing set for 3/13/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 1/17/2012. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2012)
September 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes re 74 MOTION to Compel DEFENDANTS TO IDENTIFY AND RELATE PRODUCED DOCUMENTS TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/9/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
August 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Granting 72 Stipulation Continuing Trial and Resetting PreTrial Deadlines. Discovery due by 5/15/2012. Case Management Statement due by 5/10/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/17/2012 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 5/17/20 12 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/7/2012 02:00 PM. Jury Selection set for 8/21/2012 08:30 AM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Jury Trial (8 day) set for 8/21/2012 08:30 AM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/2/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2011)
July 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Granting 68 Stipulation Continuing Trial and Resetting Pre-Trial Deadlines. (This Order also resolves 64 MOTION to Continue Trial and Reset Pre-Trial Deadlines). Case Management Statement due by 9/22/2011. Further Case Management Conferen ce set for 9/29/2011 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 9/29/2011 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/22/2012 02:00 PM. Jury Selection set for 6/4/2012 08:30 AM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Jury Trial (8 DAY) set for 6/4/2012 08:30 AM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/19/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2011)
March 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Granting 48 CONFIDENTIALITY STIPULATION re PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/9/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2011)
February 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING 43 JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RESET PRETRIAL DATES. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Settlement Case Management Statement due by 9/22/2011. Further Case Management Conference (whether or not motion filed) set fo r 9/29/2011 02:00 PM. Jury Selection set for 1/9/2012 08:30 AM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Jury Trial(8 day) set for 1/9/2012 08:30 AM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (to be filed) Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 9/29/2011 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Pretrial Conference set for 12/20/2011 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/4/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2011)
July 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING 32 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2010)
April 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING 21 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2010)
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motions to Dismiss and Taking Defendant's Motions under Submission on the Papers. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on November 18, 2009. (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Casissa v. First Republic Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick J. Casissa
Represented By: Stephen R. Jaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Republic Bank
Represented By: Joseph D. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?