Bain et al v. AstraZeneca LP et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Bain, Judy Almond, Keith Aldmon, Jennifer Alvarez, Howard Bivens, Anthony Day, Ethel Harris, Lucinda Gordon, Dolores Grimes-Munson, Ralph Hetherington, Gregory Hill, Angela Jenkins, Dawn Kinney, Bryan Knowles, Jessica Lipscomb, Patricia Miller, Dawn Mulder, Mary Myers, Patti Myers, Edward Nettles, Donald Nivens, Cinda Newton, Scarlett Parker, Deborah Parr, Theresa Shireman, Sherman Shoop, Jr., Khalil Tawwab, Adeline Tessora, Tyrone Wanser and Benjamin White
Defendant: AstraZeneca LP, AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP and McKesson Corporation
Case Number: 4:2009cv04147
Filed: September 8, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER Granting Outstanding Dismissals. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/13/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2013)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND ADDRESSING FUTURE FILINGS AND DEADLINES. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/14/2013 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/14/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2013)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS granting ( 81 in case 4:09-cv-04158-CW; 78 in case 4:09-cv-04148-CW; 83 in case 4:09-cv-04149-CW; 83 in case 4:09-cv-04147-CW; 73 in case 4:09-cv-04150-CW; 88 in case 4:09-cv-04 157-CW; 78 in case 4:09-cv-04159-CW; 80 in case 4:09-cv-04161-CW; 78 in case 4:09-cv-04165-CW; 72 in case 4:10-cv-00288-CW 73 in case 4:10-cv-00289-CW) TO EXTEND DEADLINES TO FINALIZE CLAIMS AND ADDRESSING FILING OF DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2013)
January 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER APPROVING DRAFT LETTERS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/2/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2013)
December 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFF MARGARET CLINE TO FINALIZE HER SETTLEMENT OR OTHERWISE RESOLVE HER CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/27/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2012)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER Granting Stipulation as to Private Mediation with Previous Mediator. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/19/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2012)
December 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER ADDRESSING FUTURE FILINGS AND DATES AND GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE CERTAIN DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/9/2013 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/14/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2012)
December 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING (69 in case 4:09-cv-04158-CW; 65 in case 4:09-cv-04148-CW; 70 in case 4:09-cv-04149-CW; 71 in case 4:09-cv-04147-CW; 75 in case 4:09-cv-04157-CW; 68 in case 4:09-cv-04161-CW; 65 in case 4:09-cv-04165-CW; 59 in case 4:10-cv-00288-CW; 60 in case 4:10-cv-00289-CW) MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FINALIZE PARTICIPATION IN MASTER SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT FOR PLAINTIFFS BEVERLY SHEFFIELD AND ROBERT GUFFEE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2012)
December 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER GRANTING IN PART, DENYING IN PART AND DEFFERING IN PART MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FINALIZE PARTICIPATION IN MASTER SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/7/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2012)
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER REQUIRING THE MULLIGAN LAW FIRM TO PROVIDE ADDITIONAL NOTICE TO PLAINTIFFS REGARDING THE RENEWED MOTIONS TO WITHDRAW. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on November 14, 2012. (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2012)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER SETTING FUTURE DATES. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/12/2012 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/8/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2012)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 65 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to David J. Dickens. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2012)
October 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER GRANTING CERTAIN PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO EXTEND TIME, DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO THESE PLAINTIFFS, ORDERING COUNSEL TO FILE A DECLARATION AND MAINTAINING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on October 19, 2012. (cwlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2012)
September 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken ORDER GRANTING(51 in case 4:09-cv-04158-CW; 47 in case 4:09-cv-04148-CW; 49 in case 4:09-cv-04149-CW; 54 in case 4:09-cv-04147-CW; 57 in case 4:09-cv-04157-CW; 49 in case 4:09-cv-04161-CW; 48 in case 4:09-cv-04165-CW; 44 in case 4:10-cv-00288-CW; 41 in case 4:10-cv-00289-CW) JOINT MOTION FOR AN ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND TO EXTEND TIME TO FINALIZE REMAINING CLAIMS AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2012)
September 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL TO PROVIDE ADDITIONAL INFORMATION AND TO FILE STIPULATIONS OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/17/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
August 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL TO FILE REGULAR STATUS REPORTS. Case Management Conference set for 10/10/2012 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/24/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2012)
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER ON STIPULATED MOTION REGARDING PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF AND ORDER ESTABLISHING QUALIFIED SETTLEMENT FUND AND APPOINTING FUND ADMINISTRATOR. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/15/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2011)
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting in part and denying in part (38) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 4:09-cv-04158-CW; (34) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 4:09-cv-04148-CW; (37) Administrative Motion to File Unde r Seal in case 4:09-cv-04149-CW; (41) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 4:09-cv-04147-CW; granting in part and denying in part (44) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 4:09-cv-04157-CW; (36) Administrative Motion to File U nder Seal in case 4:09-cv-04161-CW; (35) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 4:09-cv-04165-CW; (32) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 4:10-cv-00288-CW; (28) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 4:10-cv-00289-CW (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2011)
September 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER re 31 Granting STIPULATED MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF REQUESTING STAY OF SEROQUEL CASES PENDING FINALIZATION OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. Motion 11 Terminated. Case Management Conference set for 1/25/2011 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/22/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2010)
September 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER RELATING CASE with member cases C-09-4148-CW, C-09-4164-CW, C-09-4166-CW. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/21/2010. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bain et al v. AstraZeneca LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Bain
Represented By: David Christian Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Almond
Represented By: David Christian Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Aldmon
Represented By: David Christian Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Alvarez
Represented By: David Christian Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Bivens
Represented By: David Christian Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Day
Represented By: David Christian Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ethel Harris
Represented By: David Christian Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucinda Gordon
Represented By: David Christian Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dolores Grimes-Munson
Represented By: David Christian Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Hetherington
Represented By: David Christian Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Hill
Represented By: David Christian Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Jenkins
Represented By: David Christian Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Kinney
Represented By: David Christian Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Knowles
Represented By: David Christian Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Lipscomb
Represented By: David Christian Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Miller
Represented By: David Christian Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Mulder
Represented By: David Christian Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Myers
Represented By: David Christian Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patti Myers
Represented By: David Christian Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Nettles
Represented By: David Christian Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Nivens
Represented By: David Christian Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cinda Newton
Represented By: David Christian Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scarlett Parker
Represented By: David Christian Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Parr
Represented By: David Christian Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Shireman
Represented By: David Christian Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherman Shoop, Jr.
Represented By: David Christian Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khalil Tawwab
Represented By: David Christian Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adeline Tessora
Represented By: David Christian Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrone Wanser
Represented By: David Christian Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin White
Represented By: David Christian Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AstraZeneca LP
Represented By: Oliver Quinn Dunlap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP
Represented By: Oliver Quinn Dunlap
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Michael Eric Molland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?