CEP Emery Tech Investors LLC v. JP Morgan Chase, N.A.
Plaintiff: CEP Emery Tech Investors LLC
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase, N.A.
3rd Party Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
3rd Party Plaintiff: JP Morgan Chase, N.A.
Case Number: 4:2009cv04409
Filed: September 18, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte finding as moot 78 Motion to Compel; finding as moot 86 Motion to Compel; denying 101 Motion to Stay (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2011)
August 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 95 DISCOVERY ORDER re 94 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Discovery. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 08/25/2011. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2011)
April 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 53 Motion to Vacate (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2011)
January 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 57 Ex Parte Application (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2011)
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/30/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2010)
September 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/17/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2010)
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER: for Plaintiff to change attorneys to Michael A. Gevertz, Esq. and Eleanor M. Roman, Esq. in place of Frank T. Pepler, Esq. and Erin Jane Illman, Esq., of Pepler Mastromonaco LLP. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 04/12/10. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CEP Emery Tech Investors LLC v. JP Morgan Chase, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CEP Emery Tech Investors LLC
Represented By: Frank Thomas Pepler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase, N.A.
Represented By: Kathleen Alyce Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Renee Welze Livingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: JP Morgan Chase, N.A.
Represented By: Kathleen Alyce Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?