Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC v. Apple, Inc.
Plaintiff: Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Counter-claimant: Apple, Inc.
Counter-defendant: Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC
Case Number: 4:2009cv04436
Filed: September 22, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: 35:145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER RESOLVING REMAINING PORTION OF PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL, Docket No. 215, PURSUANT TO THIS COURT'S ORDER, Docket No. 240.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on June 30, 2011. (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2011)
June 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER REGARDING 239 , 243 STIPULATIONS FOR ADDITIONAL BRIEFING AND RESETTING HEARING DATE. 196 Motion Hearing set for 7/14/2011 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/20/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting In Part And Denying In Part 215 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal regarding Affinity's Claim Construction and Summary Judgement Briefing. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER by Claudia Wilken 208 SEALING PORTIONS OF DOCUMENTS SUBMITTED IN CONNECTION WITH APPLES CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF; MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; AND OPPOSITION TO AFFINITY LABS OF TEXAS, LLCS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND CROSS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/7/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
May 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 207 STIPULATED AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/24/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2011)
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER by Judge LARSON denying 175 Motion to Compel (jllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2011)
April 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER re 148 submitted on papers and hearing vacated (jllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2011)
April 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER Granting 173 Stipulation regarding modification of briefing schedule and dispositive motion and claim construction hearingPursuant to Civil L.R. 6-2(a). Case Management Statement due by 6/16/2011. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/23/2011 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 6/23/2011 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/21/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2011)
April 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER Granting 166 Stipulation Pursuant to Civil L.R. 6-2(a). Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/11/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2011)
March 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER Granting 139 Stipulation Civil Local Rule 6-2(a). Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/31/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2011)
March 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 134 PROTECTIVE ORDER RE 3/10/2011 DEPOSITIONS. Signed by Judge LARSON on 3/10/2011. (jllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2011)
March 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER Granting 128 Stipulation re extension of fact discovery through March 21 and for Expert Reports. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/9/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2011)
March 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER Granting 119 Stipulation REGARDING SONY MINIDISC RECORDER, MINIDISC RECORDER USER MANUAL, AND LAPTOP USER GUIDE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/7/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
March 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 117 MOTION for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/4/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2011)
March 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER Granting 112 Stipulation Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 6-2(a). Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/1/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2011)
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER Granting 104 Stipulation / Civil Local Rule 6-2(a). Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/18/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
February 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER Granting 93 Stipulation Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 6-2(a). Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/3/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2011)
January 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Denying Plaintiff's 79 Motion in Limine. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2011)
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER Granting 87 Stipulation Regarding Certain Documents Obtainable from Third-Party Oganizations. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/14/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
December 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER GRANTING 78 Stipulation Civil Local Rule 6-2(a). Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/23/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2010)
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER Granting 74 Stipulation Pursuant to Civil Rule 6-2(a). Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/13/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2010)
June 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER re 67 Granting Stipulation and Joint Request Regarding Patent Local Rule 3-1, 3-3, and 3-4 Disclosures. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/22/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2010)
April 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Denying 49 Defendant's Motion to Stay; Granting 62 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Declaration in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Stay (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2010)
March 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER re 47 granting Stipulation selecting Private ADR. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 03/23/2010. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC v. Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC
Represented By: Thomas W Sankey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan K Yagura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan K Yagura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: Affinity Labs of Texas, LLC
Represented By: Thomas W Sankey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?