Golden Gate Way, LLC v. Stewart et al
Plaintiff: Golden Gate Way, LLC
Defendant: Jeanne Stewart, Jeanne's Hamlin Cleaners, Leonard A. Gross, Leonard A. Gross Professional Corporation and Tommy Lee Stewart
3rd_party_defendant: Roes 1-100
3rd_party_plaintiff: Jeanne Stewart
Case Number: 4:2009cv04458
Filed: September 22, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:9601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 336 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 05/09/2014. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
September 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 327 THIRD AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER: Expert and Non-expert Discovery due by 8/15/2014. Pretrial Conference set for 1/14/2015 03:00 PM and Bench Trial/Jury Trial set for 1/26/2015 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 9/16/13. See Order for all other dates set by the Court.(ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2013).
August 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 316 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 314 Stipulation to Extend the Deadline for Substitution under Rule 25.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2013)
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 308 SECOND AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER: Court-sponsored mediation to be held by 8/28/2013. Updated Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/28/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/4/2013 01:30 PM. Non-expert Discovery, Exper t Disclosure, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure due by 3/3/2014. Joint Pretrial Conference Statement/Trial Briefs due by 9/19/14. Pretrial Conference set for 10/8/2014 03:00 PM and Bench/Jury Trial (estimated for 10 days) set for 10/20/2014 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 3/18/13. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2013)
September 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 277 Motion to Appoint Guardian ad Litem; denying 192 Motion to Compel; denying 194 Motion for Sanctions. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2012)
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 291 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 289 Motion to Appear by Telephone.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2012)
September 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 287 AMENDED ORDER Regarding Opposition to 277 Plaintiff's MOTION to Appoint Guardian ad Litem FOR DEFENDANT LEONARD A. GROSS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 09/07/2012. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2012)
August 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER on 283 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Hearing Date for Motion and CMC; Briefing Schedule filed by Jeanne Stewart.Responses due by 8/31/2012. Replies due by 9/7/2012. Motion Hearing and Case Management Conference set for 9/27/2012 11:00 AM. Case Management Statement due by 9/20/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/1/2012. (hlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2012)
June 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER on 281 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE filed by Leonard A. Gross.Motion Hearing set for 8/23/2012 11:00 AM. Responses due by 8/2/2012. Replies due by 8/9/2012. Case Management Conference set for 8/23/2012 11:00 AM. Case Management Statement due by 8/16/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 6/15/2012. (hlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2012)
June 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule and Hearing on Motion. Responses due by 6/14/2012. Replies due by 6/28/2012. Motion Hearing set for 7/12/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 6/1/2012. (hlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2012)
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER Appointing Counsel and Extending Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 4/4/2012. (hlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2012)
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER re 270 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 3/27/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2012)
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 3/23/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 3/19/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2012)
March 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER REFERRING LITIGANT TO FEDERAL PRO BONO PROJECT AND STAYING PROCEEDINGS PENDING APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 03/15/2012. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2012)
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 03/12/12. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2012)
March 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 258 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 256 Motion to Appear by Telephone.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2012)
February 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER Extending Mediation Deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 02/10/2012. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2012)
January 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ENTER DEFAULT OF LEONARD A. GROSS PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 01/20/2012. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2012)
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Directed at Defendant Leonard A. Gross Professional Corporation. Show Cause Response due by 1/24/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 01/10/2012. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2012)
December 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER FOR DEFENDANT LEONARD A. GROSS PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION TO RETAIN COUNSEL NO LATER THAN DECEMBER 30, 2011 AND RESETTING HEARING AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON PLAINTIFFS DISCOVERY MOTIONS 192 194 . Hearing set for 2/2/2012 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/07/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2011)
October 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER Resetting Case Management Conference. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/19/2011 03:00 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/04/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2011)
September 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 9/29/2011. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2011)
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER Setting Hearing Re Defendant Leonard Gross. Hearing set for 10/19/2011 3:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 09/28/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2011)
August 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER re Defendant Leonard A. Gross' E-Filing Status. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 08/03/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2011)
July 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER Discharging 179 Order to Show Cause re Defendant Leonard A. Gross. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 07/29/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2011)
July 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Defendants Leonard A. Gross and Leonard A. Gross Professional Corporation's Show Cause Response due by 7/28/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 07/14/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2011)
July 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER re 173 Plaintiffs' Motion for Administrative Relief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 07/08/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
March 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 163 STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Scope of Discovery and any Limitations on Discovery Tools for the Period Prior to Mediation Deadline re 162 Stipulation filed by Jeanne Stewart. Court made addition to Section 3, see Order for particulars. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 03/17/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2011)
February 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/1/2011 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for Plaintiff Golden Gate Way shall initiate the call to the Court. See Order for particulars re 158 Letter filed by Yolanda Peacock, William Peacock, Golden Gate Way, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 2/25/11. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2011)
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER Discharging 146 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 02/18/11. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
February 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 154 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING extension for plaintiff to serve the Estate of Ronald Monroe, Deceased, and the Estate of Matthew Monroe, Deceased, until 6/20/2011 re 152 Stipulation, filed by Scott Monroe, William Peacock, Joy Lou Monroe, Tommy Lee Stewart, Golden Gate Way, LLC, Jeanne's Hamlin Cleaners, Yolanda Peacock, Gerald Martino, Jeanne Stewart, Jeanne Hamlin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 2/8/11. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2011)
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER re 138 PERMITTING WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 1/26/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 1/21/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 01/14/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
December 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER Setting Telephonic Case Management Conference for January 12, 2011 at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 12/02/2010. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2010)
October 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER re 98 Granting Stipulation filed by Joy Lou Monroe, Jeanne Stewart. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/15/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2010)
September 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 93 STIPULATION AND ORDER that the last day to add additional parties is extended to 10/21/10 re 91 Stipulation, filed by Leonard A. Gross Professional Corporation, Jeanne's Hamlin Cleaners, Leonard A. Gross, Tommy Lee Stewart, Hamlin Cleaners, Golden Gate Way, LLC, Jeanne Stewart, Jeanne Hamlin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 9/27/10. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2010)
September 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER re 86 Stipulation, filed by Leonard A. Gross Professional Corporation, Jeanne's Hamlin Cleaners, Leonard A. Gross, Tommy Lee Stewart, Hamlin Cleaners, Golden Gate Way, LLC, Jeanne Stewart, VACATING Settlement Conference scheduled on 11/1/2010 65 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 9/17/2010. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2010)
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER Re 80 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/9/10. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2010)
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 79 STIPULATION and ORDER granting Extension of Time For Stewart Defendants to Respond to the First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/2/10. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
July 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER of Amended Substitution of Attorney. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/29/10. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2010) Modified on 7/29/2010 (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 64 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 6/17/10. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2010)
June 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR FILING OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND TIME FOR RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS re 60 Stipulation, filed by Leonard A. Gross Professional Corporation, Jeanne's Hamlin Cleaners, Contractors Capital Corporation, Leonard A. Gross, Hamlin Cleaners, Golden Gate Way, LLC, Jeanne Stewart, 61 Amended Complaint, filed by Golden Gate Way, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 6/16/10. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Golden Gate Way, LLC v. Stewart et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Golden Gate Way, LLC
Represented By: William C. Acevedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanne Stewart
Represented By: Cecelia Claire Anne Fusich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanne's Hamlin Cleaners
Represented By: Cecelia Claire Anne Fusich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard A. Gross
Represented By: Andrew Thomas Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard A. Gross Professional Corporation
Represented By: Andrew Thomas Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommy Lee Stewart
Represented By: Cecelia Claire Anne Fusich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_defendant: Roes 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd_party_plaintiff: Jeanne Stewart
Represented By: Cecelia Claire Anne Fusich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?