Newsom et al v. Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Peter Newsom and Stephanie Newsom
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., Recontrust Company, N.A., Bankers Alliance Inc. and Old Republic Title Company
Case Number: 4:2009cv05288
Filed: November 6, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Fraud
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** ORDER Re Settlement Conference. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2014) Modified on 1/23/2014 (njvlc1, COURT STAFF).
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER re 159 MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by Julie Whiteside. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on April 11, 2013. (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2013)
March 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 3/28/2013.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 3/21/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2013)
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG striking 124 Motion to Dismiss (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2013)
September 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER re 105 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings,,, Case Management Conference set for 10/11/2012 03:15 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/5/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2012)
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER requiring further briefing re 95 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Bankers Alliance and Stephanie Whiteside filed by Stephanie Newsom, Peter Newsom. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on May 1, 2012. (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2012)
March 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 70 Motion to Relate Case (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2011)
November 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting in part and denying in part 60 Motion to Dismiss (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2010)
August 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 54 Motion to Amend/Correct ; PLAINTIFF is required to E-FILE the amended document (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
July 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER: That Plaintiff shall file a Motion for Leave to Amend by no later than 07/30/10; Defendant shall file its Response by 08/11/2010; Plaintiffs Reply due 08/18/10 re 41 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration; the 44 Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 7/20/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2010) Modified on 7/22/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER re 41 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration filed by Stephanie Newsom, Peter Newsom, 44 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 6/23/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2010)
May 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 24 Motion to Dismiss, to Expunge Lis Pendens and to Strike. Plaintiff to file Third Amended Complaint within (7) seven-days of this Order. A Telephonic Case Management Conference is set for 6/23/10 at 2:30 PM. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2010) Modified on 5/20/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER: That Defendant shall respond to Second Amended Complaint by 02/08/11. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 2/4/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2010) Modified on 2/5/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 12/8/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newsom et al v. Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Newsom
Represented By: Tiffany Rochelle Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Newsom
Represented By: Tiffany Rochelle Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: James Goldberg, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Recontrust Company, N.A.
Represented By: James Goldberg, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bankers Alliance Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Republic Title Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?