Hall v. San Francisco County Superior Court
Petitioner: Damien Hall
Respondent: San Francisco County Superior Court
Case Number: 4:2009cv05299
Filed: November 6, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 11/7/10. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2010)
August 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ryu on 8/11/2010. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2010)
August 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER CLARIFYING RELEASE PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 8/6/10. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2010)
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 BRIEFING ORDER RE: MOTION FOR RELEASE. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 7/30/10. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2010)
July 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 7/29/10. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2010)
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re Amended Petition. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 7/26/10. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2010) Modified on 7/26/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
March 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 4 Motion for Release (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2010)
January 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION FOR RELEASE. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 1/28/10. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2010)
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 11/24/09. (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. San Francisco County Superior Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Damien Hall
Represented By: Dennis Patrick Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: San Francisco County Superior Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?