Hartford Fire Insurance Company v. NBC General Contractors Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Defendant: NBC General Contractors Corporation, Monica Ung and Dennis Chow
Case Number: 4:2009cv05363
Filed: November 13, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 165 JUDGMENT entered in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant NBC Contractors Corporation, in the amount of $5,572,663.42. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 9/23/2014. ***Civil Case Terminated.*** (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2014)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 160 PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on September 2, 2014. (jsclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2014)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 151 Order by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley dismissing 139 Motion for Default Judgment as moot.(jsclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2014)
July 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER GRANTING 148 MOTION TO REOPEN THE CASE. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 7/16/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2014)
May 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 142 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 5/6/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2014)
April 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 4/25/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2014)
April 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 4/21/2014 GRANTING 127 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2014)
April 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 4/15/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
March 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 117 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2014)
November 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 122 FIRST AMENDED ORDER FOR PRETRIAL PREPARATION by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong (terminating 119 Stipulation to Continue Trial Date and Extend Related Pretrial Deadlines). (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2013)
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER REOPENING CASE, Motions terminated: 110 MOTION to Reopen Case filed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 5/30/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 108 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 3/5/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2013)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 90 Motion for Summary Judgment (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2013)
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER vacating settlement conference set for 2/5/13 (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 1/28/2013)
December 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 77 AMENDED NOTICE AND ORDER REGARDING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. The signature date is only modification of the order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 12/14/2011. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2011)
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER re 68 Order. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 5/25/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
May 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 70 WRIT OF ATTACHMENT issued as to Dennis Chow to secure $3,032,740.37 (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
March 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Ex Parte Right To Attach Order And Order For Issuance of Writ of Attachment (Resident) re: 50 Signed by Judge James Larson on 3/23/11. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2011).
March 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 AMENDED ORDER OF REFERENCE to Magistrate Judge James Larson re 53 Application for Writ, 44 Application for Writ. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 3/22/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2011) Modified on 3/23/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Ryu GRANTING 24 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents and Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel previously set for 5/27/2010 has been VACATED. Defendants to provide initial disclosures and responsive documents by no later than 6/2/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/19/2010. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2010)
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE OF REFERENCE FOR ALL DISCOVERY MATTERS AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/07/2010. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2010)
May 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting in part and denying in part 25 Plaintiff's Motion for an Order Shortening Time for Hearing on Motion to Compel Production of Documents. Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel set for 5/27/2010 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Opposition to Motion to Compel to be filed by 5/12/2010. Reply to opposition to be filed by 5/19/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ryu on 5/4/2010. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hartford Fire Insurance Company v. NBC General Contractors Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: James D. Curran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NBC General Contractors Corporation
Represented By: LeCarie Shalece Whitfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica Ung
Represented By: LeCarie Shalece Whitfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Chow
Represented By: LeCarie Shalece Whitfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?