Madsen v. Risenhoover et al
Plaintiff: Rick Madsen
Defendant: Sue E. Risenhoover, Michael Sayre, Claire P. Williams, W. Wahidullah, Donna K. Alpaugh, M. McLean, Plaintiffs Unnamed UM Review Committee Members 6/5/2006, Plaintiffs Unnamed UM Review Committee Members 7/25/2006, Plaintiffs Unnamed UM Review Committee Members 8/16/2006, Plaintiffs Unnamed UM Review Committee Members 11/9/2006, Plaintiffs Unnamed UM Review Committee Members 11/20/2006, Plaintiffs Unnamed UM Review Committee Members 5/20/2008, Plaintiffs Unnamed MAR Review Committee Members 8/21/2006, Plaintiffs Unnamed MAR Review Committee Members 11/20/2006 and Plaintiffs Unnamed MAR Review Committee Members 5/20/2008
Case Number: 4:2009cv05457
Filed: November 17, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 10/12/17. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2017)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER, Set/Reset Deadlines as to Motions due by 9/26/2016. Responses due by 10/10/2016. Replies due by 10/17/2016. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 7/29/16. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2016)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER Re Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 4/29/2016. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2016)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Armstrong on 04/20/16. (sbalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2016)
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 4/12/16. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/20/2016. Initial Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 4/27/2016 at 02:45 PM. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2016)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 262 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 261 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 258 Status Conference, Set Hearings, re Settlement Conference, filed by Rick Madsen Status Conference set for 2/23/2016 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 1/19/2016. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2016)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 259 Case Management Statement. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/17/2016. Further Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 3/24/2016 at 02:30 PM. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 1/14/16. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2016)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER Re Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 10/19/2015. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2015)
September 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER Re Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 9/18/2015. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2015)
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER re 242 Scheduling Conference, Set Hearings. Order setting video settlement conference 9/24/15 10:00 AM. Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/8/2015 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 8/19/2015. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2015)
January 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong DENYING 228 MOTION TO COMPEL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2015)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong PLAINTIFFS 219 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2014)
September 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 217 Report of Pro Se Prisoner Early Settlement Proceeding. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 9/8/14. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2014)
July 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 212 WRIT of habeas corpus ad testificandum issued for presence of Plaintiff at settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor Vadas on 7/16/2014. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2014)
May 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER Granting Request and Vacating Settlement Conference, Status Conference and Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 5/13/2014. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2014)
May 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 207 AMENDED ORDER RE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE (Order amended as to signature only). Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 5/6/2014. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2014)
May 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 206 WRIT of habeas corpus ad testificandum issued for presence of Plaintiff at settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 5/5/2014. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2014)
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER Telephonic Status Conference set for 7/16/13 is RESET for 8/6/2013 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 7/15/2013. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2013)
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER, Motions terminated: 156 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Rick Madsen.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 5/30/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
May 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER re 155 Letter filed by Rick Madsen. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 5/21/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2013)
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER Re Attendance of CDCR Representative at Settlement Conference. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2013)
May 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER Re Settlement Conference. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2013)
April 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER re 136 Notice of Appeal, filed by Rick Madsen. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 4/26/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2013)
August 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 109 Motion for Extension of Time to File (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2012)
July 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting in part and denying in part 105 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 73 MOTION for Summary Judgment Responses due by 8/24/2012. Replies due by 9/7/2012. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2012)
July 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER re 73 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Claire P. Williams, Donna K. Alpaugh, Sue E. Risenhoover, M. McLean, Michael Sayre. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 7/10/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2012)
June 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 62 Motion to Compel; denying 65 Motion to Compel; denying 90 Motion for Extension of Time to File; denying 95 Motion to Appoint Counsel (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2012)
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 79 Motion to Stay (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2012)
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 66 Motion for Extension of Time to File (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2011)
September 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 55 Motion TO SERVE SUMMONS; granting 57 Motion for Extension of Time to File (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2011)
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER re 31 Letter. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 6/13/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2011)
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong DENYING 6 Motion to Appoint Counsel; GRANTING 7 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration, GRANTING 8 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration. This action is REOPENED and the 12/18/09 Order is VACATED and the Complaint filed on 11/17/09 is REINSTATED. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2010) Modified on 1/28/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/28/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong ***Civil Case Terminated. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2009) Modified on 12/23/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Madsen v. Risenhoover et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Madsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sue E. Risenhoover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Sayre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claire P. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Wahidullah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna K. Alpaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. McLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plaintiffs Unnamed UM Review Committee Members 6/5/2006
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plaintiffs Unnamed UM Review Committee Members 7/25/2006
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plaintiffs Unnamed UM Review Committee Members 8/16/2006
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plaintiffs Unnamed UM Review Committee Members 11/9/2006
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plaintiffs Unnamed UM Review Committee Members 11/20/2006
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plaintiffs Unnamed UM Review Committee Members 5/20/2008
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plaintiffs Unnamed MAR Review Committee Members 8/21/2006
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plaintiffs Unnamed MAR Review Committee Members 11/20/2006
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plaintiffs Unnamed MAR Review Committee Members 5/20/2008
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?