Beebe v. Thomson et al

Plaintiff: Thomas Beebe and Eric Bachinski
Defendant: Euan S. Thomson, Wayne Wu, Li Yu, Robert S. Weiss, Elizabeth Davila, John P Wareham, Robert E. McNamara, Red T.C, TU, John R. Adler, Jr. and Accuray Incorporated
Case Number: 4:2009cv05580
Filed: November 24, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Securities Violation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 6, 2010 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/6/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2010)
September 16, 2010 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 56 Granting Stipulation for extension of time to file amended complaint. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/16/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
August 31, 2010 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 35 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2010)
July 26, 2010 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 46 Granting Stipulation Continuing the Hearing Date on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Case Management Conference set for 8/12/2010 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 8/12/2010 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/26/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2010)
June 24, 2010 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 40 Granting Stipulation CONTINUING THE HEARING DATE ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS' REPLY MEMORANDUM. Case Management Conference set for 8/5/2010 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 8/5/2010 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/24/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2010)
March 25, 2010 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONSOLIDATING ACTIONS. Case no. C-10-1117 is consolidated with C-09-5580. ** FOR FURTHER DOCKET ENTRIES SEE LEAD CONSOLIDATED ACTION C-09-5580 **. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 03/25/2010. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2010)
March 19, 2010 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 29 granting as modified STIPULATION Regarding FIling of Consolidated Complaint and Briefing Schedule Further Case Management Conference set for 7/1/2010 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 7/1/2010 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 03/19/2010. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2010)
January 11, 2010 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 23 GRANTING AS MODIFIED STIPULATION Modifying the Briefing Schedule on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge CLAUDIA WILKEN on 1/11/10. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2010)
December 23, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re (11 in 4:09-cv-05580-CW) GRANTING STIPULATION Consolidating Actions, Appointing Co-Lead Counsel, and Related Matters. Motion Hearing set for 4/29/2010 02:00 PM. CASE CONSOLIDATED WITH C-09-5639 CW AND C-09-5655 CW. ***FOR FURTHER DOCKET ENTRIES SEE LEAD CONSOLIDATED ACTION C-09-5580 CW***. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/23/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2009)
December 22, 2009 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RELATING CASE with member cases C-09-5639-CW and C09-5655-CW. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/22/2009. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beebe v. Thomson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Beebe
Represented By: Marc M. Umeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Bachinski
Represented By: Frank James Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Euan S. Thomson
Represented By: Ignacio Evaristo Salceda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Wu
Represented By: Ignacio Evaristo Salceda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Li Yu
Represented By: Ignacio Evaristo Salceda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert S. Weiss
Represented By: Ignacio Evaristo Salceda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Davila
Represented By: Ignacio Evaristo Salceda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John P Wareham
Represented By: Ignacio Evaristo Salceda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert E. McNamara
Represented By: Ignacio Evaristo Salceda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red T.C, TU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John R. Adler, Jr.
Represented By: Ignacio Evaristo Salceda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accuray Incorporated
Represented By: Ignacio Evaristo Salceda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?