Depomed, Inc. v. Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Depomed, Inc.
Defendant: Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Lupin Limited
Case Number: 4:2009cv05587
Filed: November 25, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 35:183 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 152 CONSENT INJUNCTION AND DISMISSAL ORDER re 151 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER [Consent Injunction and Dismissal Order] filed by Depomed, Inc., ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/27/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2012)
January 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER regarding 141 the parties' joint discovery letter dated January 17, 2012. See order for details. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 01/20/2012. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2012)
January 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 140 STIPULATION AND ORDER CHANGING TIME re 137 Stipulation, filed by Depomed, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/12/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2012)
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 1/9/2012. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2012)
November 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 128 STIPULATION AND ORDER CHANGING TIME AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT re 127 Stipulation filed by Lupin Limited, Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Dispositive Motions to be heard by 4/25/2012. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/13/2012 02:00 PM. Jury Selectio n set for 10/15/2012 08:30 AM before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Jury Trial set for 10/15/2012 08:30 AM before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton for 5 days (second place position). Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/7/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2011)
October 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR ORDER CHANGING TIME re 125 Stipulation filed by Lupin Limited, Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. THE COURT REQUIRES 120 DAYS BETWEEN DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS HEARING DATE AND TRIAL DATE. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/24/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2011)
July 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 117 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re 116 Case Management Conference - Further. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/6/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
June 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 113 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND STATEMENT DATES re 112 Stipulation filed by Lupin Limited, Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/23/2011. Case Management Conference set for 6/30/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/2/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2011)
May 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER by Judge Hamilton Construing Claims; Order denying 95 Motion to Strike (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2011)
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 104 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING REQUEST TO BRING EQUIPMENT INTO COURTROOM FOR JANUARY 26, 2011 CLAM CONSTRUCTION HEARING. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/21/2011. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2011)
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 99 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING REQUEST TO BRING EQUIPMENT INTO COURTROOM re 98 Stipulation, filed by Depomed, Inc., Lupin Limited, Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/7/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
November 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 11/24/2010. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2010)
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 75 STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING THE CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE REGARDING THE BRIEFING ON CLAIM CONSTRUCTION re 74 Stipulation filed by Depomed, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/1/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 70 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT AND CONSTRUCTION OF TERM re 69 Stipulation filed by Lupin Limited, Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/30/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2010)
September 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT AND DISMISS AND WITHDRAWAL OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 67 Stipulation, filed by Depomed, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/7/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2010)
August 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARING DATE AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT re 61 Stipulation filed by Depomed, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/20/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2010)
August 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 56 Stipulation filed by Depomed, Inc.. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/6/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2010)
December 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND re 36 Stipulation, filed by Depomed, Inc., Lupin Limited, Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/16/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2009)
December 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/7/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Depomed, Inc. v. Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Depomed, Inc.
Represented By: Terrance P McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lupin Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?