Netlist, Inc. v. Google Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Netlist, Inc.
Defendant: Google Inc.
Counter-claimant: Google Inc.
Counter-defendant: Netlist, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2009cv05718
Filed: December 4, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Orange
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: 35:145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2011 Filing 69 REPORT on the determination of an action regarding PATENT INFRINGEMENT (cc: form mailed to register). (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2011)
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS AND ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE: by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 01/25/11 ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 1/25/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2011) Modified on 1/27/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2011 Filing 67 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Donald Frederick Zimmer, Jr (Zimmer, Donald) (Filed on 1/12/2011)
December 27, 2010 Filing 66 STIPULATION to Stay Proceedings Pending Reexamination of U.S. Patent No. 7,619,912, filed by Netlist, Inc., Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cunningham, Sean) (Filed on 12/27/2010) Modified on 12/28/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 23, 2010 Filing 65 NOTICE of Appearance of Donald Frederick Zimmer, Jr and Cheryl A. Sabnis as Counsel, filed by Google Inc. (Zimmer, Donald) (Filed on 12/23/2010) Modified on 12/27/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 20, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated re Release of Transcript Restriction as to 58 Transcript. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2010)
November 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 62 Unopposed Motion to Continue Claim Construction Hearing Date. Case Management Conference set for 3/17/2011 09:00 AM. Claims Construction Hearing set for 3/17/2011 09:00 AM.. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 11/8/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2010) Modified on 11/10/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 5, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated re Motion Hearing as to 62 Motion. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2010)
November 5, 2010 Filing 63 Declaration of Jesse Hindman in Support of 62 Motion to Continue Claim Construction Hearing Date filed by Netlist, Inc.. (Related document(s) 62 ) (Cunningham, Sean) (Filed on 11/5/2010) Modified on 11/8/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 5, 2010 Filing 62 Unopposed MOTION to Continue re Claim Construction Hearing Date filed by Netlist, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cunningham, Sean) (Filed on 11/5/2010) Modified on 11/8/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 61 SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY AND ORDER: That Defendant Netlist, Inc., Substitute Sean C. Cunningham, John M. Guaragna, John D. Kinton and Jesse Hindman of DLA Piper LLP as attorneys of record in place of Adrian M. Pruetz and Erica J. Pruetz of Pruetz Law Group LLP and Enoch H. Liang and Steven R. Hansen of Lee Tran & Liang APLC. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 10/26/10(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2010)
October 22, 2010 Filing 60 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Shelley K. Mack as Counsel, filed by Google Inc. (Mack, Shelley) (Filed on 10/22/2010) Modified on 10/25/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 20, 2010 Filing 59 NOTICE of Substitution of Sean C. Cunningham as Counsel with Proposed Order, filed by Netlist, Inc. (Cunningham, Sean) (Filed on 10/20/2010) Modified on 10/21/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 20, 2010 Filing 58 Transcript of Proceedings held on August 30, 2010, before Judge Joseph C. Spero. Court Reporter/Transcriber Belle Ball, CSR, RMR, CRR, Telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/20/2010. (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 9/20/2010)
September 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATION AND ORDER: That the Case Management Conference is set for 12/8/2010 at 09:00 AM and the Claims Construction Hearing is set for 12/8/2010 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 9/7/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2010) Modified on 9/8/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 1, 2010 Filing 56 STIPULATION and Proposed Order re: Scheduling of Claim Construction Hearing, filed by Netlist, Inc., Google Inc.. (Hansen, Steven) (Filed on 9/1/2010) Modified on 9/2/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 30, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated. Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 8/30/10 at 3:30 PM before Judge Spero. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2010)
August 30, 2010 Filing 55 Minute Entry: Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 8/30/2010 before Magistrate Joseph C. Spero re: Sealed Joint Letter [Docket No. 51] (Court Reporter: Belle Ball.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/30/2010) Modified on 8/31/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2010 Filing 54 CLERKS NOTICE Setting Telephonic Discovery Hearing re: Joint letter brief, docket 51, for 8/30/2010 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
August 20, 2010 Filing 53 Proposed Amended Proposed Order re 52 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document re: Document No. 51 by Netlist, Inc.. (Hansen, Steven) (Filed on 8/20/2010) Modified on 8/23/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2010 Filing 52 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document re: Document No. 51 filed by Netlist, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Steven R. Hansen, # 2 Proposed Order)(Hansen, Steven) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 18, 2010 Filing 51 *** FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT LOCKED. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** Letter from Plaintiff and Defendant (Joint) re: Discovery Dispute. (Hansen, Steven) (Filed on 8/18/2010) Modified on 8/19/2010 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
August 16, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated re Reply Deadline as to 43 Case Management Scheduling Order. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2010)
August 16, 2010 Filing 50 Reply Claim Construction Brief filed by Netlist, Inc. (Hansen, Steven) (Filed on 8/16/2010) Modified on 8/17/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
August 4, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated re Response Deadline as to 43 Case Management Scheduling Order. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2010)
August 4, 2010 Filing 49 BRIEF: CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D)(Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/4/2010) Modified on 8/5/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 16, 2010 Filing 48 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT filed by Netlist, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Steven R. Hansen in Support of Plaintiff Netlist, Inc.'s Opening Claim Construction Brief, # 2 Exhibit A to Decl. of Steven R. Hansen, # 3 Exhibits B - G to Decl. of Steven R. Hansen)(Hansen, Steven) (Filed on 7/16/2010)
July 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero, on 7/6/2010. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2010) Modified on 7/9/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 28, 2010 Filing 46 STIPULATION and Proposed Protective Order, filed by Netlist, Inc., Google Inc. (Hansen, Steven) (Filed on 6/28/2010) Modified on 6/29/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 25, 2010 Filing 45 JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT and Prehearing Statement Under Patent Local Rule 4-3, filed by Netlist, Inc., Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Hansen, Steven) (Filed on 6/25/2010) Modified on 6/28/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong DENYING Motion for Leave to Amend Infrigement Contentions in case 4:08-cv-04144-SBA (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2010) Modified on 5/6/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 8, 2010 Set/Reset Deadlines as to re 43 Responses due by 8/4/2010. Replies due by 8/16/2010. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2010)
April 8, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings:, Set/Reset Deadlines: re 43 Claims Construction Hearing set for 9/9/2010 09:00 AM. Case Management Conference set for 9/9/2010 09:00 AM. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2010)
April 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Tutorial/Markman Hearing and Case Management Conference set for 09/09/10 at 9:00 AM. Response due 08/04/10. Reply due 08/16/10 Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 4/2/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2010) Modified on 4/9/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/9/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY, PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT 43 *** CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER:. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 4/2/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2010) Modified on 4/9/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/6/2010. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2010) Modified on 4/9/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 2, 2010 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for Discovery (wh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2010)
April 1, 2010 Set/Reset Deadlines:, Set/Reset Hearings: re 40 Claims Construction (Tutorial and Markman) Hearing set for 9/9/2010 09:00 AM. Case Management Conference set for 9/9/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2010)
April 1, 2010 Filing 40 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 4/1/2010 before Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong. Case Management Conference CONTINUED to 09/09/10 at 9:00 AM; Tutorial and Markman Hearing CONTINUED to 09/09/10 at 9:00 AM. Case referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for all Discovery. (Date Filed: 4/1/2010). (Court Reporter: Not Reported) (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/1/2010) Modified on 4/5/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 23, 2010 Filing 37 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Laura Huffman ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611004963.) filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2010)
March 8, 2010 Filing 36 ANSWER/REPLY to Counterclaim with Jury Demand, filed by Netlist, Inc.. (Pruetz, Adrian) (Filed on 3/8/2010) Modified on 3/9/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
March 2, 2010 Filing 35 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Select Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte for Early Settlement Conference, filed by Google Inc., Netlist, Inc.. (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 3/2/2010) Modified on 3/3/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 23, 2010 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re 33 Joint Case Management Conference Statement and Proposed Order - on Non-Registered CM/ECF Party filed by Google Inc. (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 2/23/2010) Modified on 2/24/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/16/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2010 Filing 33 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Proposed Order, filed by Google Inc., Netlist, Inc.. (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 2/22/2010) Modified on 2/23/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2010 Filing 32 NOTICE OF STIPULATION to Select Magistrate Judge Trumbull for Early Settlement Conference and Proposed Order, filed by Netlist, Inc., Google Inc. (Pruetz, Adrian) (Filed on 2/22/2010) Modified on 2/23/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2010 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte for Settlement (wh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2010)
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION AND ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 2/17/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2010) Modified on 2/23/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 19, 2010 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Google Inc., Netlist, Inc. on Non-Registered CM/ECF Party (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 2/19/2010)
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Scott T. Weingaertner (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2010)
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 22 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Daniel Miller (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2010)
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Susan Kim (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2010)
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Mark H. Francis (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2010)
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING 21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Allison Altersohn (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2010)
February 16, 2010 Filing 24 STIPULATION and Proposed Order re Settlement Conference, filed by Google Inc., Netlist, Inc.. (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 2/16/2010) Modified on 2/17/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 12, 2010 Filing 23 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Susan Kim ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611004800.) filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2010)
February 12, 2010 Filing 22 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Daniel Miller ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611004800.) filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2010)
February 12, 2010 Filing 21 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Allison Altersohn ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611004800.) filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2010)
February 12, 2010 Filing 20 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Mark H. Francis ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611004800.) filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2010)
February 12, 2010 Filing 19 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Scott T. Weingaertner ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611004800.) filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2010) Modified on 2/16/2010 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
February 12, 2010 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand for Patent Infringement, COUNTERCLAIMS against Netlist, Inc., filed by Google Inc.. (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 2/12/2010) Modified on 2/16/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 12, 2010 Filing 17 Certificate of Interested Entities, filed by Google Inc. (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 2/12/2010) Modified on 2/16/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 12, 2010 Filing 16 Statement: Corporate Disclosure with Jury Demand, filed by Google Inc.. (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 2/12/2010) Modified on 2/16/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/16/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 12, 2010 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel of Robert F. Perry, filed by Google Inc. (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 2/12/2010) Modified on 2/16/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 3, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 3/4/2010 03:15 PM. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2010)
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 85 Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 4:08-cv-04144-SBA. A Telephonic Case Management Conference is set for 03/04/10 at 3:15 PM. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2010) Modified on 2/4/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/5/2010 (kk, COURT STAFF).
January 22, 2010 Filing 13 Second STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by Google Inc.. (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 1/22/2010) Modified on 1/25/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 22, 2010 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance of Geoffrey M. Ezgar, Timothy Scott, Leo Spooner III as Attorney, filed by Google Inc. (Ezgar, Geoffrey) (Filed on 1/22/2010) Modified on 1/25/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER: That Google's Answer to Complaint shall be due on 01/29/10 re 9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/29/09. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2009) Modified on 12/30/2009 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 28, 2009 ***Deadlines terminated. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2009)
December 28, 2009 Case Reassigned to Judge Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Judge Hon. Charles R. Breyer no longer assigned to the case. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2009)
December 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RELATING CASE.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 12/24/09. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2009)
December 23, 2009 Filing 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint Stipulated Joint Motion and Order filed by Google Inc.. (Mack, Shelley) (Filed on 12/23/2009)
December 23, 2009 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Shelley Kay Mack (Mack, Shelley) (Filed on 12/23/2009)
December 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/16/09. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2009)
December 14, 2009 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2009)
December 11, 2009 Filing 5 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Netlist, Inc.. (Pruetz, Adrian) (Filed on 12/11/2009)
December 11, 2009 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding PATENT INFRINGEMENT (cc: form mailed to register). (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2009)
December 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 3/10/2010. Case Management Conference set for 3/17/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/4/09. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2009)
December 4, 2009 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2009)
December 4, 2009 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement re 1 Complaint by Netlist, Inc.. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2009)
December 4, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT /issued summons against Google Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 44611084533.). Filed byNetlist, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Netlist, Inc. v. Google Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Netlist, Inc.
Represented By: Edward S. Quon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Inc.
Represented By: Scott T. Weingaertner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Google Inc.
Represented By: Scott T. Weingaertner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: Netlist, Inc.
Represented By: Edward S. Quon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?