Ashker et al v. Schwarzenegger et al

Plaintiff: Todd Ashker and Danny Troxell
Defendant: Arnold Schwarzenegger, Mathew Cate, Roderick Q. Hickman, Jeanne Woodford, Joe McGrath, Richard Kirkland, Robert Horel, Francisco Jacquez, William Barlow, R. L. Johnson, D. W. Bradbury, J. McKinney, Robert Marquez, R. Rice, John Harrison, B. Thornton, G. H. Wise, A. Hernandez, Robert Doyle, Susan Fisher, Robert Harmon, Hollis Gillingham, D. Smith and S. Tucker
Case Number: 4:2009cv05796
Filed: December 9, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Del Norte
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order 1122 Order by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman granting 905 Motion to Extend the Settlement Agreement. (rmilc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2019)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order 1067 WRIT of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum issued for presence of Plaintiff at settlement conference. Signed by Judge Robert M. Illman on 8/10/2018. (rmilc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2018)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order 1066 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting in part and denying in part 1045 Motion for Reconsideration. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2018)
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order 1028 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' 993 MOTION REGARDING VIOLATION OFSETTLEMENT AGREEMENT PROVISION REQUIRING RELEASE OF CLASS MEMBERS TO GENERAL POPULATION.(ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2018)
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order 1023 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting in part and denying in part 690 Motion for Attorney Fees. (mejlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2018)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order 989 Order by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman denying 847 Motion Regarding RCGP Verification Reviews.(rmilc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2018)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order 978 ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR DE NOVO REVIEW OF MAGISTRATE JUDGES DECISION ON RETENTION OF CLASS MEMBERS IN THE SHU by Judge Claudia Wilken.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2018)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order 971 Order by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman granting 953 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(rmilc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2018)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order 965 STIPULATION AND ORDER as modified re 964 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Change Time Regarding the Hearings Scheduled for Two of Plaintiffs' Pending Motions filed by Anthony Chaus, Todd Ashker, Edmund G. Brown, Jr., Greg Lewis, Mathew Cate Motion Hearing set for 2/13/2018 01:00 PM in McKinleyville before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman. Parties may appear by phone. Signed by Judge Robert M. Illman on 1/30/2018. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order 946 Order by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Illman denying 832 Plaintiffs' Enforcement Motion Regarding Class Members Retained in Administrative Segregation for Safety Concerns.(rmilc1s, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2017)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order 923 ORDER REGARDING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION REGARDING REASSIGNMENT OF FEES MOTION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE ILLMAN AND REASSIGNMENT OF MOTIONS FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES by Judge Claudia Wilken. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2017)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order 867 ORDER re 860 Proposed Order, filed by Paul Redd, Richard Johnson, Jeffrey Franklin, Ronnie Dewberry, George Ruiz, Luis Esquivel, George Franco, Danny Troxell, Gabriel Reyes, Todd Ashker. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 10/31/2017. (njvlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2017)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order 786 Order by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas denying 706 Motion to Enjoin CDCR from Retaining Class Members in the SHU.(njvlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2017)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order 767 Order by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas granting 759 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(njvlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2017)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order 722 Order by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas denying 712 Motion to Enjoin CDCR from Retaining Ashker in Administrative Segregation.(njvlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2017)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order 721 Order by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas granting 716 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(njvlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2017)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order 676 Order by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas denying 590 Motion for De Novo Determination.(njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2017)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order 668 Order by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas granting 667 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2017)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order 656 ORDER Re Plaintiffs' Motion for De Novo Determination of Dispositive Matter. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 1/5/2017. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2017)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order 634 ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR DE NOVO REVIEW OF MAGISTRATE JUDGES RULING ON RECRUITMENT OFFENSE 588 by Hon. Claudia Wilken.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2016) Modified on 9/14/2016 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order 633 ORDER by Judge Nandor J. Vadas denying 441 Motion for Judicial Intervention and Temporary Restraining Order; denying 483 Motion for Relief from Defendants' Retaliation. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2016)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order 632 ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR DE NOVO REVIEW OF RETENTION OF FOUR CLASS MEMBERS IN SHU AND SEALING MOTIONS by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 589 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 610 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 620 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 624 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; granting 626 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2016)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order 608 Order by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas denying 553 Motion to Compel.(njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2016)
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order 580 ORDER Denying Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Compliance and Plaintiffs' Motion to Enjoin CDCR. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 7/7/2016. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2016)
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order 579 ORDER re 577 Unopposed Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs, Notice to Class Members, and a Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/1/16. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2016)
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order 564 ORDER 563 Request ON REQUEST FOR EMERGENCY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/16/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2016)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order 518 ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO RELATE CASES. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 4/29/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2016)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order 488 ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT re 486 Brief. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/26/16. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2016)
October 2, 2015 Opinion or Order 438 ORDER. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/2/15. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2015)
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order 401 ORDER Granting 396 Plaintiffs' Cross Motion to Further Amend Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 05/07/2015. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2015)
March 24, 2015 Opinion or Order 392 ORDER AMENDING SCHEDULE. The deadline for expert discovery is amended to May 29, 2015. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/23/2015. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2015)
January 21, 2015 Opinion or Order 369 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken AMENDING SCHEDULE and GRANTING ( 353 , 360 ) MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2015)
December 31, 2014 Opinion or Order 357 ORDER Discovery Hearing set for 1/5/2015 at 1:00 pm in Courtroom D before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas. Signed by Judge Nandor Vadas on 12/31/2014. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2014)
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order 342 ORDER Discovery Hearing set for 12/9/2014 at 11:00 before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas. Signed by Judge Nandor Vadas on 12/8/2014. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2014)
November 20, 2014 Opinion or Order 339 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFFS 331 MOTION TO AMEND THE SCHEDULE AND DENYING PLAINTIFFS 334 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2014)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order 329 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 328 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Michael D. Bell (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2014)
October 2, 2014 Opinion or Order 323 ORDER re 321 Clerk's Notice, 320 Letter filed by Anthony Chaus, Edmund G. Brown, Jr., Greg Lewis, Mathew Cate. Discovery Hearing set for October 2, 2014 at 1:00 p.m., is VACATED; Plaintiff's request for third party presence at Rule 35 examinations is DENIED. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 10/02/2104. (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2014)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order 322 ORDER REFERRING CASE FOR RELATED CASE DETERMINATION RE: C 10-1317 SI. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 9/30/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2014)
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order 317 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING IN PART 195 MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION; DENYING 233 MOTION TO INTERVENE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2014)
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order 298 Order by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas granting 287 Motion to Compel.(njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2014)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order 291 Discovery Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on January 6, 2014. (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
November 19, 2013 Opinion or Order 280 ORDER regarding access to clients. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on November 19, 2013. (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2013)
August 2, 2013 Opinion or Order 259 ORDER by Judge Claudia WilkenGRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS 250 MOTION TO SEAL (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2013)
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order 239 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas granting in part and denying in part 207 Motion to Compel; terminating 237 Discovery Letter Brief (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2013)
June 28, 2013 Opinion or Order 235 ORDER requiring further settlement conference statements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on June 28, 2013. (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2013)
June 19, 2013 Opinion or Order 230 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 226 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 195 MOTION to Certify Class . Responses due by 7/18/2013. Replies due by 8/8/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2013)
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order 223 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING PLAINTIFFS RENEWED 215 MOTION TO SEAL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013)
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order 218 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO AMEND 215 MOTION TO SEAL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2013)
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order 217 Discovery Order requiring parties to meet and confer in person on 6/19/2013 and continuing discovery hearing on Plaintiffs' motion to compel 207 until 6/25/2013 before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on May 29, 2013. (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2013)
May 21, 2013 Opinion or Order 210 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING 196 PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO SEAL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2013)
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order 209 ORDER Vacating Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 5/15/2013. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2013)
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order 193 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING 157 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2013)
April 9, 2013 Opinion or Order 191 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING 160 MOTION TO DISMISS. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2013)
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order 189 ORDER SUBSTITUTING DEFENDANTS' NAMES. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/18/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2013)
March 15, 2013 Opinion or Order 186 ORDER Granting 146 Proposed Consent Order Re Substitution of Counsel. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/15/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2013)
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order 182 ORDER Granting 181 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/6/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2013)
December 27, 2012 Opinion or Order 173 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 167 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2012)
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order 155 ORDER by Judge Claudia WilkenAMENDING SCHEDULE AND GRANTING IN PART MOTIONS FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF re 143 ; 147 . (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2012)
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order 135 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING 126 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2012)
May 31, 2012 Opinion or Order 128 ORDER DENYING OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/31/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2012)
May 18, 2012 Opinion or Order 120 CLERKS NOTICE DEEMING OBJECTION DENIED Re 116 Motion Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.72(A). (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2012)
April 13, 2012 Opinion or Order 113 ORDER re 111 Letter Brief, filed by Edmund G. Brown, Jr., Greg Lewis, William Barlow, Robert Marquez, John Harrison, D. Smith, R. Rice, Mathew Cate, Francisco Jacquez, S. Tucker, J. McKinney, Joe McGrath, G. H. Wise, Richard Kirkland , Robert Horel, Hollis Gillingham, Jeanne Woodford, B. Thornton, Susan Fisher, D. W. Bradbury, Robert Doyle, Robert Harmon, A. Hernandez, R. L. Johnson, 112 Letter filed by Danny Troxell, Todd Ashker. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on April 13, 2012. (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2012)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order 105 ORDER REFERRING CERTAIN ISSUES, AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE NANDOR VADAS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/29/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
March 13, 2012 Opinion or Order 102 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE PLAINTIFFS' 65 MOTION TO FILE SUPPLEMENTS TO MOTIONS, 51 MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER, 67 MOTION TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND GRANTING REQUEST FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2012)
February 29, 2012 Opinion or Order 98 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 97 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Jules Lobel. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order 74 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING DEFENDANTS 73 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE DISPOSITIVE MOTION. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
October 12, 2011 Opinion or Order 64 ORDER FOR FURTHER BRIEFING ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER PROHIBITING RETALIATORY ACTS AND FOR RETURN OF PROPERTY. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/12/11. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2011)
October 11, 2011 Opinion or Order 62 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING PLAINTIFFS 42 RENEWED MOTION FOR TAPED DEPOSITIONS. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2011)
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order 59 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING PLAINTIFFS 48 MOTION FOR PHOTOCOPY OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2011)
May 5, 2011 Opinion or Order 36 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING PLAINTIFFS 27 MOTION FOR TAPED DEPOSITIONS AS PREMATURE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2011)
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order 26 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING PLAINTIFFS 22 MOTION TO CORRECT OMISSION IN FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2011)
February 14, 2011 Opinion or Order 21 ORDER SUBSTITUTING GOVERNOR EDMUND G. BROWN AS DEFENDANT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/14/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2011)
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order 20 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING PLAINTIFFS 19 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE DEFENDANTS. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order 18 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING 17 PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE DEFENDANT AND FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO REQUEST ASSISTANCE FOR SERVICE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order 15 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's 14 Request for Clarification. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/6/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
December 20, 2010 Opinion or Order 12 ORDER SCREENING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT UNDER 28 U.S.C. § 1915A AND GRANTING PLAINTIFFS LEAVE TO SERVE DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/20/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2010)
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order 11 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 8 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration; granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to File (cwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ashker et al v. Schwarzenegger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Ashker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Troxell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnold Schwarzenegger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mathew Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roderick Q. Hickman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanne Woodford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Kirkland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Horel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francisco Jacquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. L. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. W. Bradbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. McKinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Marquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Thornton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. H. Wise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hollis Gillingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?