Petroliam Nasional Berhad v. GoDaddy.com, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Petroliam Nasional Berhad
Defendant: GoDaddy.com, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2009cv05939
Filed: December 18, 2009
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
May 2, 2012 192 Proposed Order re 191 Reply to Opposition/Response, SUPPLEMENTAL by Petroliam Nasional Berhad. (Clark, Perry) (Filed on 5/2/2012)
May 2, 2012 191 REPLY (re 189 MOTION for Bill of Costs --Review of Clerk's Action Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d)(1) ) filed byPetroliam Nasional Berhad. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Perry Clark)(Clark, Perry) (Filed on 5/2/2012) Modified on 5/3/2012 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
April 25, 2012 190 RESPONSE (re 189 MOTION for Bill of Costs --Review of Clerk's Action Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d)(1) ) filed byGoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Fiorino, Joseph) (Filed on 4/25/2012) Modified on 5/3/2012 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
April 24, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 189 MOTION for Bill of Costs --Review of Clerk's Action Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d)(1) CORRECTION OF DOC. NO. 186 . Motion Hearing set for 5/16/2012 09:00 AM before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2012)
April 24, 2012 189 MOTION for Bill of Costs --Review of Clerk's Action Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d)(1) CORRECTION OF DOC. NO. 186 filed by Petroliam Nasional Berhad. Motion Hearing set for 5/16/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 4/25/2012. Replies due by 5/2/2012. (Clark, Perry) (Filed on 4/24/2012)
April 11, 2012 188 Proposed Order re 186 MOTION for Bill of Costs --Review of Clerk's Action Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d)(1) by Petroliam Nasional Berhad. (Clark, Perry) (Filed on 4/11/2012)
April 11, 2012 187 Declaration of Perry Clark in Support of 186 MOTION for Bill of Costs --Review of Clerk's Action Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d)(1) filed byPetroliam Nasional Berhad. (Related document(s) 186 ) (Clark, Perry) (Filed on 4/11/2012)
April 11, 2012 186 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT 189 . *** MOTION for Bill of Costs --Review of Clerk's Action Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d)(1) filed by Petroliam Nasional Berhad. Motion Hearing set for 5/16/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 4/25/2012. Replies due by 5/2/2012. (Clark, Perry) (Filed on 4/11/2012) Modified on 4/24/2012 (fff, COURT STAFF).
March 30, 2012 185 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO FILE MOTION by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 184 Stipulation.(nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2012)
March 29, 2012 184 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Dates for Motion to Review Clerk's Taxation of Costs filed by Petroliam Nasional Berhad. (Clark, Perry) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
March 29, 2012 183 Transcript of Proceedings held on December 7, 2011, before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 4/19/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/30/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/27/2012. (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
March 29, 2012 182 Transcript of Proceedings held on September 8, 2010, before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 4/19/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/30/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/27/2012. (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
March 29, 2012 181 Transcript of Proceedings held on December 23, 2009, before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 4/19/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/30/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/27/2012. (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
March 28, 2012 180 Costs Taxed in amount of $ 13,697.63 against Plaintiff and Counterclaim Defendant Petroliam Nasional Berhad. (oh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2012)
March 19, 2012 179 USCA Case Number 12-15584 Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals for 178 Notice of Appeal filed by Petroliam Nasional Berhad. (kk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2012)
March 16, 2012 178 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA Petroliam Nasional Berhad. Appeal of Order, Terminated Case,, 174 (Appeal fee of $455 receipt number 0971-6671437 paid.) (Clark, Perry) (Filed on 3/16/2012)
March 16, 2012 177 RESPONSE to re 176 Objection Go Daddy's Response to Petronas's Objections to Bill of Costs by GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Fiorino, Joseph) (Filed on 3/16/2012)
March 14, 2012 176 OBJECTIONS to re 175 Bill of Costs by Petroliam Nasional Berhad. (Clark, Perry) (Filed on 3/14/2012)
February 29, 2012 175 BILL OF COSTS Go Daddy's Bill of Costs re Petronas's Claims by GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Fiorino, Joseph) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
February 16, 2012 174 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER ENTERING FINAL JUDGMENT ON PETRONAS'S CLAIMS AND DISMISSING GO DADDY'S COUNTERCLAIM WITHOUT PREJUDICE re 173 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Entering Final Judgment on Petronas's Claims & Dismissing Go Daddy's Counterclaim without Prejudice filed by Petroliam Nasional Berhad, GoDaddy.com, Inc., ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/16/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2012)
February 16, 2012 173 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Entering Final Judgment on Petronas's Claims & Dismissing Go Daddy's Counterclaim without Prejudice filed by GoDaddy.com, Inc., Petroliam Nasional Berhad. (Lansky, David) (Filed on 2/16/2012)
February 9, 2012 172 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING GODADDY'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 149 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2012)
February 9, 2012 171 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY E-FILED DOCUMENT NUMBER 143-27 by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 146 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document.(nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2012)
February 9, 2012 170 Minute Entry: Telephone Conference held before the Honorable Phyllis J. Hamilton (Date Filed: 2/9/2012). (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/9/2012)
February 6, 2012 169 RESPONSE (re 168 MOTION Administrative Motion for Entry of Final Judgment on Petronas's Claims and Voluntary Dismissal of Go Daddy's Counterclaim Without Prejudice re 165 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File, Order on Stipulation ) filed byPetroliam Nasional Berhad. (Clark, Perry) (Filed on 2/6/2012)
January 30, 2012 168 Administrative Motion for Entry of Final Judgment on Petronas's Claims and Voluntary Dismissal of Go Daddy's Counterclaim Without Prejudice re 165 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File, Order on Stipulation filed by GoDaddy.com, Inc.. Responses due by 2/13/2012. Replies due by 2/21/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration David Lansky Declaration ISO Administrative Motion, # 2 Exhibit A to David Lansky Declaration ISO Administrative Motion, # 3 Exhibit B to David Lansky Declaration ISO Administrative Motion, # 4 Proposed Order)(Lansky, David) (Filed on 1/30/2012) Modified on 1/31/2012 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
January 30, 2012 167 CLERKS NOTICE re deficiency of docket entry 166 . (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2012)
January 27, 2012 166 See document 168 for corrected entry.NOTICE by GoDaddy.com, Inc. re 165 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File, Order on Stipulation Administrative Motion for Entry of Final Judgment on Petronas's Claims and Voluntary Dismissal of Go Daddy's Counterclaim Without Prejudice (Attachments: # 1 Declaration David Lansky Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A to D Lansky Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to D Lansky Declaration, # 4 Proposed Order)(Lansky, David) (Filed on 1/27/2012) Modified on 1/31/2012 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
January 25, 2012 165 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 163 Motion for Extension of Time to File; granting 164 Stipulation (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2012)
January 24, 2012 164 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadline filed by Petroliam Nasional Berhad. (Clark, Perry) (Filed on 1/24/2012)
January 24, 2012 163 MOTION for Extension of Time to File filed by Petroliam Nasional Berhad. (Clark, Perry) (Filed on 1/24/2012)
January 19, 2012 162 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 1/19/2012 before Phyllis J. Hamilton (Date Filed: 1/19/2012). (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/19/2012)
January 9, 2012 161 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 159 Letter filed by GoDaddy.com, Inc. Case Management Conference set for 1/19/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/9/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2012)
January 5, 2012 160 Proposed Order re 159 Letter [Proposed] Order Modifying Case Management Conference Date by GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Slafsky, John) (Filed on 1/5/2012)
January 4, 2012 159 Letter from Defendant/Counterclaimant GoDaddy.com, Inc. Request for One-week Adjournment of Case Management Conference. (Slafsky, John) (Filed on 1/4/2012)
January 3, 2012 158 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting in part and denying in part 112 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 120 134 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2012)
December 22, 2011 157 Featured Case ORDER MODIFYING PRETRIAL ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT re 156 Letter filed by GoDaddy.com, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/22/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2011)
December 19, 2011 156 Letter from Defendant GoDaddy.com, Inc. Requesting Modification of Pretrial Order. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Slafsky, John) (Filed on 12/19/2011)
December 15, 2011 155 Brief Supplemental re Contributory Cybersquatting filed byPetroliam Nasional Berhad. (Clark, Perry) (Filed on 12/15/2011)
December 14, 2011 154 Brief Supplemental Memorandum of Points and Authorities Concerning Contributory Cybersquatting Cases filed byGoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Slafsky, John) (Filed on 12/14/2011)
December 9, 2011 153 DECLARATION of Perry Clark in Opposition to 152 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byPetroliam Nasional Berhad. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20 (Part 1 of 3), # 22 Exhibit 20 (Part 2 of 3), # 23 Exhibit 20 (Part 3 of 3))(Related document(s) 152 ) (Clark, Perry) (Filed on 12/9/2011)
December 9, 2011 152 RESPONSE (re 112 MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Motion, Motion, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Go Daddy's Motion for Summary Judgment, 126 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ) filed byPetroliam Nasional Berhad. (Clark, Perry) (Filed on 12/9/2011)
December 7, 2011 151 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 12/7/2011 before Phyllis J. Hamilton (Date Filed: 12/7/2011) re 134 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment re Liability for Contributory Cybersquatting as to PETRONASTOWERS.NET filed by Petroliam Nasional Berhad, 112 MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Motion, Motion, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Go Daddy's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by GoDaddy.com, Inc. (Court Reporter Diane Skillman.) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/7/2011)
December 2, 2011 150 Declaration of JOSEPH G. FIORINO IN in Support of 149 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Notice of Motion, Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Go Daddy's Administrative Motion to Seal filed byGoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 149 ) (Lansky, David) (Filed on 12/2/2011)
December 2, 2011 149 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Notice of Motion, Motion and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Go Daddy's Administrative Motion to Seal filed by GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A to Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit B to Proposed Order, # 4 Exhibit C to Proposed Order)(Lansky, David) (Filed on 12/2/2011)
December 2, 2011 148 Featured Case ORDER TO PERMIT EQUIPMENT IN THE COURTROOM re 147 Notice (Other) filed by GoDaddy.com, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/2/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2011)
December 1, 2011 147 NOTICE by GoDaddy.com, Inc. Request and [Proposed] Order to Permit Equipment in the Courtroom (Lansky, David) (Filed on 12/1/2011)
November 28, 2011 146 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document Number 143-27 and Stipulation filed by Petroliam Nasional Berhad. (Clark, Perry) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
November 28, 2011 145 EXHIBITS re 143 Declaration in Support,,, Correction of Docket # 143-27 (Ex. 26 to Decl. of Perry Clark) filed byPetroliam Nasional Berhad. (Related document(s) 143 ) (Clark, Perry) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
November 25, 2011 144 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Clark Decl. ISO Opp. Mtn. Summ. Jmt. filed by Petroliam Nasional Berhad. (Clark, Perry) (Filed on 11/25/2011)
November 25, 2011 143 Declaration of Perry Clark in Support of 134 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment re Liability for Contributory Cybersquatting as to PETRONASTOWERS.NET filed byPetroliam Nasional Berhad. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21, # 23 Exhibit 22, # 24 Exhibit 23, # 25 Exhibit 24, # 26 Exhibit 25, *** # 27 Exhibit 26 FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT LOCKED. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** , # 28 Exhibit 27, # 29 Exhibit 28)(Related document(s) 134 ) (Clark, Perry) (Filed on 11/25/2011) Modified on 11/28/2011 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
November 23, 2011 142 Declaration of Perry Clark in Support of 141 Reply in support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Petroliam Nasional Berhad. (Clark, Perry) (Filed on 11/23/2011) Modified on 11/28/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
November 23, 2011 141 REPLY (re 134 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment re Liability for Contributory Cybersquatting as to PETRONASTOWERS.NET ) filed byPetroliam Nasional Berhad. (Clark, Perry) (Filed on 11/23/2011)
November 23, 2011 140 Declaration of Joseph G. Fiorino in Support of 112 Go Daddy's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Slafsky, John) (Filed on 11/23/2011) Modified on 11/28/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
November 23, 2011 139 REPLY (re 112 MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Motion, Motion, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Go Daddy's Motion for Summary Judgment ) Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Further Support of Go Daddy's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byGoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Slafsky, John) (Filed on 11/23/2011)
November 22, 2011 138 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AMICI CURIAE OF NETWORK SOLUTIONS, LLC ND REGISTER.COM by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 125 Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2011)
November 22, 2011 137 Featured Case ORDER re Appendices. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 11/22/2011. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2011) Modified on 11/22/2011 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
November 21, 2011 136 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 133 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal APPENDIX PAGES APP000165-173 AND APP000187-190 by Petroliam Nasional Berhad. (Clark, Perry) (Filed on 11/21/2011)
November 21, 2011 135 DOCUMENT STRICKEN PURSUANT TO 137 ORDER.Appendix re 134 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment re Liability for Contributory Cybersquatting as to PETRONASTOWERS.NET filed byPetroliam Nasional Berhad. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix, # 2 Appendix, # 3 Appendix, # 4 Appendix, # 5 Appendix, # 6 Appendix)(Related document(s) 134 ) (Clark, Perry) (Filed on 11/21/2011) Modified on 11/22/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
November 21, 2011 134 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment re Liability for Contributory Cybersquatting as to PETRONASTOWERS.NET filed by Petroliam Nasional Berhad. Motion Hearing set for 12/7/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 11/16/2011. Replies due by 11/23/2011. (Clark, Perry) (Filed on 11/21/2011)
November 18, 2011 133 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting in part and denying in part 119 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2011)
November 18, 2011 132 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF OF AMICUS CURIAE BY ENOM, INC. by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 111 Motion to File Amicus Curiae Brief (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2011)
November 17, 2011 131 Featured Case ORDER re 127 Declaration in Opposition filed by Petroliam Nasional Berhad; ORDER denying Rule 56(d) motion. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 11/17/2011. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2011)
November 16, 2011 130 DECLARATION of David L. Lansky in Opposition to 128 Opposition/Response to Motion, in Support of Go Daddy's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byGoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) 128 ) (Slafsky, John) (Filed on 11/16/2011)
November 16, 2011 129 DECLARATION of Scott Brown in Opposition to 128 Opposition/Response to Motion, in Support of Go Daddy's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byGoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 128 ) (Slafsky, John) (Filed on 11/16/2011)
November 16, 2011 128 RESPONSE (re 120 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment NOTICE ONLY: MEMORANDUM AND OTHER DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT FILED UNDER SEAL ) Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byGoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Slafsky, John) (Filed on 11/16/2011)
November 16, 2011 127 DECLARATION of Perry Clark In Support of Request For Denial or Continuance of GoDaddy's Motion For Summary Judgment filed byPetroliam Nasional Berhad. (Clark, Perry) (Filed on 11/16/2011) Modified on 11/17/2011 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
November 16, 2011 126 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Petroliam Nasional Berhad. (Clark, Perry) (Filed on 11/16/2011)
November 11, 2011 125 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief of Network Solutions, LLC and Register.Com, Inc. in Support of Defendant GoDaddy.Com's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Network Solutions, LLC, Register.Com, Inc.. Responses due by 11/28/2011. Replies due by 12/5/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to Fiile Brief Amici Curiae of Network Solutions, LLC and Register.Com, Inc.)(McKown, Aaron) (Filed on 11/11/2011)
November 9, 2011 124 Declaration of Nima Kelly in Support of 119 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Appendix in Support filed byGoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Greg Schwimer ISO Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit A Part 1 to Proposed Order, # 4 Exhibit A Part 2 to Proposed Order, # 5 Exhibit A Part 3 to Proposed Order, # 6 Exhibit A Part 4 to Proposed Order, # 7 Exhibit A Part 5 to Proposed Order, # 8 Exhibit A Part 6 to Proposed Order, # 9 Exhibit A Part 7 to Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 119 ) (Slafsky, John) (Filed on 11/9/2011)
November 9, 2011 123 Featured Case ORDER of Notice of Referral for Discovery Referred to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 11/9/11. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2011)
November 7, 2011 122 Featured Case ORDER of Reference to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 11/7/2011. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2011) Modified on 11/8/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
November 2, 2011 121 Proposed Order Granting Partial Summary Judgment by Petroliam Nasional Berhad. (Clark, Perry) (Filed on 11/2/2011)
November 2, 2011 120 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment NOTICE ONLY: MEMORANDUM AND OTHER DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT FILED UNDER SEAL filed by Petroliam Nasional Berhad. Motion Hearing set for 12/7/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 11/16/2011. Replies due by 11/23/2011. (Clark, Perry) (Filed on 11/2/2011)
November 2, 2011 119 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Appendix in Support filed by Petroliam Nasional Berhad. (Clark, Perry) (Filed on 11/2/2011)
November 2, 2011 118 Declaration of Jessica Hanyen in Support of 112 MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Motion, Motion, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Go Daddy's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byGoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Part 1, # 2 Exhibit 1 Part 2, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14)(Related document(s) 112 ) (Slafsky, John) (Filed on 11/2/2011)
November 2, 2011 117 Declaration of Linda Jett in Support of 112 MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Motion, Motion, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Go Daddy's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byGoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3 Part 1, # 4 Exhibit 3 Part 2, # 5 Exhibit 4 Part 1, # 6 Exhibit 4 Part 2, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6)(Related document(s) 112 ) (Slafsky, John) (Filed on 11/2/2011)
November 2, 2011 116 Declaration of Jeff Munson in Support of 112 MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Motion, Motion, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Go Daddy's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byGoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Related document(s) 112 ) (Slafsky, John) (Filed on 11/2/2011)
November 2, 2011 115 Declaration of John Roling in Support of 112 MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Motion, Motion, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Go Daddy's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byGoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) 112 ) (Slafsky, John) (Filed on 11/2/2011)
November 2, 2011 114 Declaration of Michael D. Palage in Support of 112 MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Motion, Motion, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Go Daddy's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byGoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 112 ) (Slafsky, John) (Filed on 11/2/2011)
November 2, 2011 113 Declaration of John L. Slafsky in Support of 112 MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Motion, Motion, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Go Daddy's Motion for Summary Judgment filed byGoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15)(Related document(s) 112 ) (Slafsky, John) (Filed on 11/2/2011)
November 2, 2011 112 MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Motion, Motion, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Go Daddy's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by GoDaddy.com, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/7/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 11/16/2011. Replies due by 11/23/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Slafsky, John) (Filed on 11/2/2011)
November 2, 2011 111 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae Brief In Support of 112 Motion For Summary Judgment filed by eNom, Inc.. Responses due by 11/16/2011. Replies due by 11/23/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ballon, Ian) (Filed on 11/2/2011) Modified on 11/3/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
October 26, 2011 110 Letter from Both Parties re Discovery filed by byPetroliam Nasional Berhad and GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Clark, Perry) (Filed on 10/26/2011) Modified on 10/27/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
September 22, 2011 109 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM byPetroliam Nasional Berhad. (Clark, Perry) (Filed on 9/22/2011)
September 6, 2011 108 Featured Case ORDER RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 9/6/2011. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2011)
September 2, 2011 107 Letter from Plaintiff and Defendant JOINT re Discovery. (Clark, Perry) (Filed on 9/2/2011)
July 28, 2011 106 Amended ANSWER to Amended Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against Petroliam Nasional Berhad byGoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Slafsky, John) (Filed on 7/28/2011)
July 28, 2011 105 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 93 Motion to Strike ; granting 94 Motion to Amend/Correct ; (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2011)
July 22, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 93 MOTION to Strike All Affirmative Defenses in Defendant GoDaddy's Answer to Amended Complaint, 94 MOTION to Amend/Correct 89 Answer to Amended Complaint -- DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER TO ADD COUNTERCLAIM AND ADDITIONAL AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE -- MOTION to Amend/Correct 89 Answer to Amended Complaint -- DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER TO ADD COUNTERCLAIM AND ADDITIONAL AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE --. Motion Hearing set for 8/10/2011 09:00 AM before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
July 22, 2011 104 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO AUGUST 10, 2011, TO CONSOLIDATE WITH HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER re 102 Stipulation, filed by GoDaddy.com, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/22/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
July 21, 2011 103 REPLY (re 94 MOTION to Amend/Correct 89 Answer to Amended Complaint ) filed by GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Slafsky, John) (Filed on 7/21/2011) Modified on 7/22/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
July 20, 2011 102 STIPULATION and Proposed Orderto Continue Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses to August 10, 2011, to Consolidate with Hearing on Defendant's Motion for Leave to Amend Answer by GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Slafsky, John) (Filed on 7/20/2011) Modified on 7/21/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
July 19, 2011 101 REPLY (re 93 MOTION to Strike All Affirmative Defenses in Defendant GoDaddy's Answer to Amended Complaint ) filed byPetroliam Nasional Berhad. (Clark, Perry) (Filed on 7/19/2011)
July 14, 2011 100 RESPONSE (re 94 MOTION to Amend/Correct 89 Answer to Amended Complaint ) filed by Petroliam Nasional Berhad. (Clark, Perry) (Filed on 7/14/2011) Modified on 7/15/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
July 12, 2011 99 Declaration of Hollis Beth Hire in Support of 98 Opposition/Response to Motion, Declaration of Hollis Beth Hire in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses filed byGoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 98 ) (Slafsky, John) (Filed on 7/12/2011)
July 12, 2011 98 RESPONSE (re 93 MOTION to Strike All Affirmative Defenses in Defendant GoDaddy's Answer to Amended Complaint ) Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses filed byGoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Slafsky, John) (Filed on 7/12/2011)
July 11, 2011 97 Featured Case STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/11/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
July 8, 2011 96 Proposed STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Slafsky, John) (Filed on 7/8/2011) Modified on 7/11/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
June 30, 2011 95 Declaration of John L. Slafsky in Support of 94 MOTION to Amend/Correct 89 Answer to Amended Complaint -- DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER TO ADD COUNTERCLAIM AND ADDITIONAL AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE -- MOTION to Amend/Correct 89 Answer to Amended Complaint -- DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER TO ADD COUNTERCLAIM AND ADDITIONAL AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE -- -- DECLARATION OF JOHN L. SLAFSKY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER TO ADD COUNTERCLAIM AND ADDITIONAL AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE -- filed byGoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 94 ) (Slafsky, John) (Filed on 6/30/2011)
June 30, 2011 94 MOTION to Amend/Correct 89 Answer to Amended Complaint -- DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ANSWER TO ADD COUNTERCLAIM AND ADDITIONAL AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE -- filed by GoDaddy.com, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/10/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 7/14/2011. Replies due by 7/21/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Slafsky, John) (Filed on 6/30/2011)
June 28, 2011 93 MOTION to Strike All Affirmative Defenses in Defendant GoDaddy's Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Petroliam Nasional Berhad. Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 7/12/2011. Replies due by 7/19/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER)(Clark, Perry) (Filed on 6/28/2011)
June 1, 2011 92 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re 91 Case Management Conference - Further. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/1/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2011)
May 26, 2011 91 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 5/26/2011 before Phyllis J. Hamilton (Date Filed: 5/26/2011). Jury Selection set for 3/5/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. 4 Day Jury Trial set for 3/5/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Last Date for Dispositive Motions to be heard is 12/7/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Pretrial Conference set for 2/9/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (fs, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/26/2011)
May 19, 2011 90 THIRD JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Petroliam Nasional Berhad, GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Clark, Perry) (Filed on 5/19/2011) Modified on 5/20/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
May 19, 2011 89 ANSWER to Amended Complaint --ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT -- DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL -- byGoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Slafsky, John) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
May 5, 2011 87 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 77 Motion to Dismiss (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2011)
May 4, 2011 88 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 5/4/2011 before Phyllis J. Hamilton (Date Filed: 5/4/2011) re 77 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by GoDaddy.com, Inc. (Court Reporter Leo Mankiewicz.) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/4/2011)
May 4, 2011 86 PLEASE SEE DOCUMENT 88 FOR CORRECT ATTACHMENT.Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 5/4/2011 before Phyllis J. Hamilton (Date Filed: 5/4/2011) re 77 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by GoDaddy.com, Inc. (Court Reporter Leo Mankiewicz.) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/4/2011) Modified on 5/5/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
April 20, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 77 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 5/4/2011 09:00 AM before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2011)
April 20, 2011 85 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS TO MAY 4, 2011 re 84 Stipulation filed by GoDaddy.com, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/20/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2011)
April 19, 2011 84 STIPULATION re 83 Clerks Notice Continuing Motion Hearing -- STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS TO MAY 4, 2011 -- by GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Slafsky, John) (Filed on 4/19/2011)
April 18, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 77 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 4/27/2011 09:00 AM before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2011)
April 18, 2011 83 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING MOTION HEARING. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2011)
March 7, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 77 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 4/20/2011 09:00 AM before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
March 4, 2011 82 Featured Case ORDER CONTINUING HEARING DATE. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 3/4/2011. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2011)
February 23, 2011 81 REPLY (re 77 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint ) -- REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT -- filed byGoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Slafsky, John) (Filed on 2/23/2011)
February 18, 2011 80 SUPPLEMENTARY MATERIAL in Opposition (re 77 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint ) filed by Petroliam Nasional Berhad. (Clark, Perry) (Filed on 2/18/2011) Modified on 2/22/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
February 17, 2011 79 RESPONSE (re 77 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint ) CORRECTED filed byPetroliam Nasional Berhad. (Clark, Perry) (Filed on 2/17/2011)
February 17, 2011 78 RESPONSE (re 77 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint ) filed byPetroliam Nasional Berhad. (Clark, Perry) (Filed on 2/17/2011)
January 31, 2011 77 MOTION to Dismiss --NOTICE OF MOTION, MOTION, AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT-- filed by GoDaddy.com, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/9/2011 09:00 AM before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Defendant's Motion To Dismiss First Amended Complaint)(Slafsky, John) (Filed on 1/31/2011) Modified on 2/1/2011 (kc, COURT STAFF).
December 27, 2010 76 STIPULATION to Extend Time to File Response to Amended Complaint re 69 Amended Complaint filed by GoDaddy.com, Inc., Petroliam Nasional Berhad. (Hire, Hollis) (Filed on 12/27/2010) Modified on 12/28/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 10, 2010 75 Minute Entry: Further Settlement Conference held on 12/9/10 before Magistrate Judge Spero. Case did not settle. (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/10/2010)
October 29, 2010 74 Notice and Order Setting Further Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Further Settlement Conference set for 12/9/2010 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/28/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2010)
October 18, 2010 73 Minute Entry: Settlement Conference held on 10/18/2010 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/18/2010)
October 6, 2010 72 Featured Case ORDER, by Judge Joseph C. Spero, signed 10/6/10, granting 70 Plaintiff's Motion to Appear by Telephone and 71 Defendant's Request for Reciprocity. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2010)
October 1, 2010 71 RESPONSE to re 70 MOTION to Appear by Telephone -- DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR RECIPROCITY WITH RESPECT TO TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE -- Originally Lodged With Court 9/24/10 -- by GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Slafsky, John) (Filed on 10/1/2010)
September 29, 2010 69 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against GoDaddy.com, Inc.. Filed by Petroliam Nasional Berhad. (Clark, Perry) (Filed on 9/29/2010) Modified on 9/30/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
September 23, 2010 70 Application For Leave to Appear by Telephone at October 18, 2010 Settlement Conference filed by Petroliam Nasional Berhad. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
September 10, 2010 68 Notice of Settlement and Order Setting Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Settlement Conference set for 10/18/2010 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 09/10/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2010)
September 9, 2010 67 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 50 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying 62 Motion for Leave to File (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 8, 2010 66 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Spero for Settlement. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/8/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2010)
September 8, 2010 65 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 9/8/2010 before Phyllis J. Hamilton (Date Filed: 9/8/2010) re 50 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings --NOTICE OF MOTION, MOTION, AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AND FOR AN ORDER FINDING PLAINTIFF LIABLE FOR FEES -- filed by GoDaddy.com, Inc. (Court Reporter Diane Skillman.) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/8/2010)
September 8, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2010)
September 8, 2010 64 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 6-3 TO POSTPONE HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE CERTAIN AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 60 Motion (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2010)
September 7, 2010 63 Memorandum in Opposition re 62 MOTION for Leave to File Sur Reply and to Strike --DEFENDANT'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SUR-REPLY -- filed byGoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Slafsky, John) (Filed on 9/7/2010)
September 7, 2010 62 MOTION for Leave to File Sur Reply and to Strike filed by Petroliam Nasional Berhad. Motion Hearing set for 9/8/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Clark, Perry) (Filed on 9/7/2010)
August 30, 2010 61 Declaration of Hollis Hire in Support of 60 MOTION PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 6-3 TO POSTPONE HEARING ON 55 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE CERTAIN AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES filed by GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 60 ) (Slafsky, John) (Filed on 8/30/2010) Modified on 8/31/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
August 30, 2010 60 MOTION PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 6-3 TO POSTPONE HEARING ON 55 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE CERTAIN AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES -- re 55 MOTION to Strike GoDaddy's Affirmative Defenses CORRECTION OF DOCKET #54 filed by GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Slafsky, John) (Filed on 8/30/2010) Modified on 8/31/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
August 30, 2010 59 ERRATA re 53 Memorandum in Opposition, by Petroliam Nasional Berhad. (Clark, Perry) (Filed on 8/30/2010)
August 25, 2010 58 Declaration of Hollis Hire in Further Support of 50 --MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AND FOR AN ORDER FINDING PLAINTIFF LIABLE FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES -- filed by GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 57 ) (Slafsky, John) (Filed on 8/25/2010) Modified on 8/26/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
August 25, 2010 57 Reply In Further Support of re 50 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings AND FOR AN ORDER FINDING PLAINTIFF LIABLE FOR FEES -- filed by GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Slafsky, John) (Filed on 8/25/2010) Modified on 8/26/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
August 25, 2010 56 Proposed Order Granting 55 Motion to Strike GoDaddy's Affirmative Defenses by Petroliam Nasional Berhad. (Clark, Perry) (Filed on 8/25/2010) Modified on 8/26/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
August 25, 2010 55 MOTION to Strike GoDaddy's Affirmative Defenses CORRECTION OF DOCKET #54 filed by Petroliam Nasional Berhad. Motion Hearing set for 9/29/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Clark, Perry) (Filed on 8/25/2010)
August 25, 2010 54 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 55 . *** MOTION to Strike GoDaddy's Affirmative Defenses filed by Petroliam Nasional Berhad. Motion Hearing set for 9/29/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Clark, Perry) (Filed on 8/25/2010) Modified on 8/26/2010 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
August 18, 2010 53 Memorandum in Opposition re 50 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings --NOTICE OF MOTION, MOTION, AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AND FOR AN ORDER FINDING PLAINTIFF LIABLE FOR FEES -- filed byPetroliam Nasional Berhad. (Clark, Perry) (Filed on 8/18/2010)
August 5, 2010 52 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 8/5/2010 before Phyllis J. Hamilton (Date Filed: 8/5/2010). (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/5/2010)
August 3, 2010 51 DECLARATION OF JOHN L. SLAFSKY IN SUPPORT OF 50 DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AND FOR AN ORDER FINDING PLAINTIFF LIABLE FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES filed byGoDaddy.com, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 50 ) (Slafsky, John) (Filed on 8/3/2010) Modified on 8/4/2010 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
August 3, 2010 50 NOTICE OF MOTION, MOTION, MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES, AND [PROPOSED] ORDER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS AND FOR AN ORDER FINDING PLAINTIFF LIABLE FOR FEES filed by GoDaddy.com, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 9/8/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion For Judgment On The Pleadings And For An Order Finding Plaintiff Liable For Attorneys' Fees)(Slafsky, John) (Filed on 8/3/2010) Modified on 8/4/2010 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
July 28, 2010 49 Featured Case RELATED CASE ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 43 Motion to Relate Case. C09-5939 PJH AND C10-3052 EDL ARE RELATED. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2010)
July 26, 2010 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 8/5/2010 02:00 PM. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2010)
July 26, 2010 48 Featured Case ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 46 Motion (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2010)
July 23, 2010 47 Proposed Order re 46 MOTION Continuing CMC from 7/29/2010 to 8/5/2010 CORRECTION OF DOCKET NO. 45 by Petroliam Nasional Berhad. (Clark, Perry) (Filed on 7/23/2010)
July 23, 2010 46 MOTION Continuing CMC from 7/29/2010 to 8/5/2010 CORRECTION OF DOCKET NO. 45 filed by Petroliam Nasional Berhad. (Clark, Perry) (Filed on 7/23/2010) Modified on 7/26/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
July 23, 2010 45 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 46 . *** MOTION continuing CMC from 7/29/2010 to 8/5/2010 filed by Petroliam Nasional Berhad. (Clark, Perry) (Filed on 7/23/2010) Modified on 7/23/2010 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
July 20, 2010 44 Proposed Order re 43 MOTION to Relate Case 10-CV-03052 by Petroliam Nasional Berhad. (Clark, Perry) (Filed on 7/20/2010)
July 20, 2010 43 MOTION to Relate Case 10-CV-03052 filed by Petroliam Nasional Berhad. (Clark, Perry) (Filed on 7/20/2010)
July 14, 2010 42 SECOND JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by GoDaddy.com, Inc., Petroliam Nasional Berhad. (Slafsky, John) (Filed on 7/14/2010) Modified on 7/15/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
June 15, 2010 41 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 40 Stipulation filed by Petroliam Nasional Berhad Case Management Statement due by 7/15/2010. Case Management Conference set for 7/29/2010 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/15/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2010)
June 14, 2010 40 STIPULATION re 39 Order Re Case Management Conference and Proposed Order by Petroliam Nasional Berhad. (Clark, Perry) (Filed on 6/14/2010) Modified on 6/15/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
May 13, 2010 ***6/2/2010 hearing terminated. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
May 13, 2010 39 Featured Case ORDER. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/13/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
May 13, 2010 38 Featured Case ORDER TRANSFERRING DOMAIN NAME by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton in case 4:09-cv-05939-PJH; granting (7) Motion in case 4:10-cv-00431-PJH (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
May 12, 2010 37 Proposed Order Transferring Domain Name by Petroliam Nasional Berhad. (Clark, Perry) (Filed on 5/12/2010)
April 15, 2010 36 Featured Case ORDER re Motion hearing. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 4/15/2010. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2010) Modified on 4/16/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
March 26, 2010 34 Featured Case ORDER granting 31 Motion that this action C-09-5939-PJH and the later filed action C-10-00431-EMC concern substantially the same parties and property and should be deemed related cases. Order signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/26/2010. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2010)
March 25, 2010 35 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 3/25/2010 before Phyllis J. Hamilton (Date Filed: 3/25/2010). (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/25/2010)
March 25, 2010 33 *** FILED IN WRONG CASE. NO NEW DOCUMENT. *** MOTION for Limited Admission, MOTION Transfer Domain Name filed by Petroliam Nasional Berhad. Motion Hearing set for 4/28/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Clark, Perry) (Filed on 3/25/2010) Modified on 3/30/2010 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
March 24, 2010 32 Proposed Order re 31 MOTION Order Relating Cases and Stipulation by Petroliam Nasional Berhad. (Clark, Perry) (Filed on 3/24/2010)
March 24, 2010 31 MOTION Order Relating Cases filed by Petroliam Nasional Berhad. (Clark, Perry) (Filed on 3/24/2010)
March 18, 2010 30 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by GoDaddy.com, Inc., Petroliam Nasional Berhad. (Slafsky, John) (Filed on 3/18/2010) Modified on 3/19/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
March 15, 2010 29 CLERKS NOTICE ADVANCING TIME OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/18/2010. Case Management Conference set for 3/25/2010 01:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2010)
March 15, 2010 28 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Sarah Louise Forney and Zhuanjia Gu (Forney, Sarah) (Filed on 3/15/2010)
March 11, 2010 27 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byGoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Slafsky, John) (Filed on 3/11/2010)
February 9, 2010 26 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to re 1 Complaint by GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Slafsky, John) (Filed on 2/9/2010) Modified on 2/10/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
January 11, 2010 25 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO 1 COMPLAINT (Civ. Local Rule 6-1(a)) by GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Slafsky, John) (Filed on 1/11/2010) Modified on 1/12/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
January 8, 2010 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Perry Clark (Clark, Perry) (Filed on 1/8/2010)
January 4, 2010 23 CLERKS NOTICE re: Failure to E-File and/or Failure to Register as an E-Filer documents 1 - 7 . (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2010)
December 29, 2009 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/18/2010. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/25/2010 02:00 PM. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2009)
December 29, 2009 22 Featured Case ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/29/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2009)
December 23, 2009 21 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton denying 2 Motion for TRO (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2009)
December 23, 2009 20 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 12/23/2009 before Phyllis J. Hamilton (Date Filed: 12/23/2009) re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Petroliam Nasional Berhad. (Court Reporter Diane Skillman.) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/23/2009)
December 22, 2009 19 Certificate of Interested Entities by Petroliam Nasional Berhad (Amended) (Forney, Sarah) (Filed on 12/22/2009)
December 22, 2009 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Petroliam Nasional Berhad. GoDaddy.com, Inc. served on 12/21/2009, answer due 1/11/2010. (Forney, Sarah) (Filed on 12/22/2009)
December 22, 2009 17 Filed in Error. Please see document 19 for corrected entry.Certificate of Interested Entities by Petroliam Nasional Berhad (Forney, Sarah) (Filed on 12/22/2009) Modified on 12/22/2009 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
December 22, 2009 16 Proposed Order denying 2 MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by GoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Slafsky, John) (Filed on 12/22/2009) Modified on 12/23/2009 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
December 22, 2009 15 Certificate of Interested Entities by GoDaddy.com, Inc. --DEFENDANT'S CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS -- (Slafsky, John) (Filed on 12/22/2009)
December 22, 2009 14 Declaration of John L. Slafsky in Opposition re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed byGoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Slafsky, John) (Filed on 12/22/2009) Modified on 12/23/2009 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
December 22, 2009 13 Declaration of Kelly Lewis in Opposition re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed byGoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Slafsky, John) (Filed on 12/22/2009) Modified on 12/23/2009 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
December 22, 2009 12 Memorandum in Opposition re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order -- DEFENDANT'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER -- filed byGoDaddy.com, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Slafsky, John) (Filed on 12/22/2009)
December 21, 2009 11 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 10 Order re Service by Perry Clark on behalf of Petroliam Nasional Berhad (Clark, Perry) (Filed on 12/21/2009)
December 18, 2009 10 Featured Case ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 12/18/2009. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2009)
December 18, 2009 9 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge James Larson no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/18/09. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2009)
December 18, 2009 8 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2009) (vlk, COURT STAFF).
December 18, 2009 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Petroliam Nasional Berhad re 5 Proposed Order, 3 Declaration in Support, 6 Proposed Order, 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, 1 Complaint, 4 Declaration in Support (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2009) (vlk, COURT STAFF).
December 18, 2009 6 Proposed Order To Show Cause by Petroliam Nasional Berhad. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2009) (vlk, COURT STAFF).
December 18, 2009 5 Proposed Order re 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Petroliam Nasional Berhad. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2009) (vlk, COURT STAFF).
December 18, 2009 4 Declaration of Priya Manokaran in Support of 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed byPetroliam Nasional Berhad. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2009) (vlk, COURT STAFF).
December 18, 2009 3 Declaration of Perry Clark in Support of 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed byPetroliam Nasional Berhad. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2009) (vlk, COURT STAFF).
December 18, 2009 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Petroliam Nasional Berhad. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2009) (vlk, COURT STAFF).
December 18, 2009 1 COMPLAINT /issued summons against GoDaddy.com, Inc. (Filing fee $ 350.). Filed byPetroliam Nasional Berhad. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2009) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/8/2010: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (vlk, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Petroliam Nasional Berhad v. GoDaddy.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Petroliam Nasional Berhad
Represented By: Jia Jia Gu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GoDaddy.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?