Keller v. Kaiser Permanente Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Thomas A. Keller, IV
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Western Prelacy of the Armenian Apostolic Church of America, Inc. doing business as KZV Armenian School and Kaiser Permanente Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2009cv06088
Filed: December 30, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER DISMISSING CASE, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilto on 2/22/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2011)
February 17, 2011 Filing 69 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Request for Dismissal by Thomas A. Keller, IV (Millstein, David) (Filed on 2/17/2011)
December 17, 2010 Filing 68 CERTIFICATION OF MEDIATION Session by Mediator, James P. Baker; Mediation session held 12/13/2010; Case settled. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2010)
November 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 67 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re #66 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Non-Expert Discovery due by 12/31/2010. Disclosure of Experts due by 12/14/2010. Expert Discovery due by 1/14/2011. Dispositive Motions to be heard by 3/2/2011. Pretrial Conference set for 6/9/2011 02:00 PM. Jury Selection set for 7/11/2011 08:30AM. Jury Trial set for 7/11/2011 08:30 AM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/29/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2010)
November 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #63 Motion to Continue Pretrial Deadlines. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2010)
November 18, 2010 Filing 65 STIPULATION re #63 MOTION to Continue the Trial Date and Other Pre-Trial Dates (Local Rule 7-11 Administrative Motion) by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan. (Attachments: #1 explanatory cover letter, #2 Proposed Order amended proposed order)(Pierrou, Yvonne) (Filed on 11/18/2010) Modified on 11/19/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
November 16, 2010 Filing 64 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan re #63 MOTION Continue the Trial Date and Other Pre-Trial Dates (Local Rule 7-11 Administrative Motion) MOTION Continue the Trial Date and Other Pre-Trial Dates (Local Rule 7-11 Administrative Motion) (Dong, Kathy) (Filed on 11/16/2010)
November 15, 2010 Filing 63 MOTION Continue the Trial Date and Other Pre-Trial Dates (Local Rule 7-11 Administrative Motion) filed by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan. (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Declaration of Yvonne M. Pierrou in Support of Administrative Motion to Continue the Trial Date and Other Pre-Trial Dates, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to Continue the Trial Date and Other Pre-Trial Dates)(Dong, Kathy) (Filed on 11/15/2010)
November 12, 2010 Filing 62 DISREGARD, DUPLICATE OF DOCKET ENTRY #61 Proposed Order re #61 Stipulation to Extend Expert Discovery and Motion Hearing Deadlines by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan. (Dong, Kathy) (Filed on 11/12/2010) Modified on 11/15/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2010 Filing 61 STIPULATION and Request for Order Extending Expert Discovery and Motion Hearing Deadlines; Proposed Order by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan. (Dong, Kathy) (Filed on 11/12/2010) Modified on 11/15/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
October 13, 2010 Filing 60 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Western Prelacy of the Armenian Apostolic Church of America, Inc. re #59 Answer to Amended Complaint (Jabagchourian, Ara) (Filed on 10/13/2010)
October 13, 2010 Filing 59 The Western Prelacy of the Armenian Church of America, Inc. dba KZV Armenian School's ANSWER to #12 Amended Complaint by Western Prelacy of the Armenian Apostolic Church of America, Inc.. (Jabagchourian, Ara) (Filed on 10/13/2010) Modified on 10/14/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
September 17, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: Mediation Hearing set for 12/13/2010 at 10:00 AM at the Mediator's office located at Winston & Strawn, LLP, 101 California Street, Suite 3900, San Francisco, CA. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2010)
September 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER by Judge Hamilton Granting in Part and Denying in Part #44 Motion to Dismiss (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2010)
August 20, 2010 Filing 57 Letter from Defendant Western Prelacy aka KZV Armenian School (Ara Jabagchourian) Letter Brief. (Jabagchourian, Ara) (Filed on 8/20/2010)
August 20, 2010 Filing 56 ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing James P. Baker as Mediator. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2010)
August 20, 2010 Filing 55 Letter Brief re #44 MOTION to Dismiss filed byThomas A. Keller, IV. (Related document(s) #44 ) (Millstein, David) (Filed on 8/20/2010)
August 18, 2010 Filing 54 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 8/18/2010 before Phyllis J. Hamilton (Date Filed: 8/18/2010) re #44 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Western Prelacy of the Armenian Apostolic Church of America, Inc. (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado.) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/18/2010)
August 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/6/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2010)
August 5, 2010 Filing 52 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 8/5/2010 before Phyllis J. Hamilton (Date Filed: 8/5/2010), Case referred to mediation. Non-Expert Discovery due by 12/6/2010. Disclosure of Experts due by 11/5/2010. Expert Discovery due by 12/6/2010. Dispositive Motions to be heard by 1/26/2011 at 9:00 AM. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/28/2011 02:00 PM. Jury Trial set for 5/23/2011 08:30 AM. (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/5/2010)
August 4, 2010 Filing 51 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Western Prelacy of the Armenian Apostolic Church of America, Inc. re #50 Reply to Opposition (Jabagchourian, Ara) (Filed on 8/4/2010)
August 4, 2010 Filing 50 Reply to Opposition re #44 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT'S REPLY TO MOTION TO DISMISS FRCP 12(b)(6) filed byWestern Prelacy of the Armenian Apostolic Church of America, Inc.. (Jabagchourian, Ara) (Filed on 8/4/2010)
August 3, 2010 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by HAH on 8/2/10. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2010)
July 29, 2010 Filing 49 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomas A. Keller, IV re #48 Case Management Statement (Millstein, David) (Filed on 7/29/2010)
July 29, 2010 Filing 48 Joint CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Thomas A. Keller, IV, Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Western Prelacy of the Armenian Apostolic Church of America, Inc. . (Millstein, David) (Filed on 7/29/2010) Modified on 7/30/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
July 29, 2010 Filing 47 Certificate of Interested Entities by Thomas A. Keller, IV (Millstein, David) (Filed on 7/29/2010)
July 28, 2010 Filing 46 Memorandum in Opposition re #44 MOTION to Dismiss filed byThomas A. Keller, IV. (Millstein, David) (Filed on 7/28/2010)
July 9, 2010 Filing 45 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Western Prelacy of the Armenian Apostolic Church of America, Inc. re #44 MOTION to Dismiss (Jabagchourian, Ara) (Filed on 7/9/2010)
July 9, 2010 Filing 44 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Western Prelacy of the Armenian Apostolic Church of America, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/18/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jabagchourian, Ara) (Filed on 7/9/2010)
July 8, 2010 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Western Prelacy of the Armenian Apostolic Church of America, Inc. re #41 Proposed Order (Jabagchourian, Ara) (Filed on 7/8/2010)
July 8, 2010 Filing 41 Proposed Order re #29 MOTION to Set Aside Entry of Default by Western Prelacy of the Armenian Apostolic Church of America, Inc.. (Jabagchourian, Ara) (Filed on 7/8/2010)
July 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #29 Motion to Set Aside (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2010)
July 7, 2010 Filing 40 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 7/7/2010 before Phyllis J. Hamilton (Date Filed: 7/7/2010) re #29 MOTION to Set Aside Entry of Default filed by Western Prelacy of the Armenian Apostolic Church of America, Inc. (Court Reporter Sarah Goekler.) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/7/2010)
June 23, 2010 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Western Prelacy of the Armenian Apostolic Church of America, Inc. re #38 Reply to Opposition (Jabagchourian, Ara) (Filed on 6/23/2010)
June 23, 2010 Filing 38 Reply to Opposition re #29 MOTION to Set Aside Entry of Default filed byWestern Prelacy of the Armenian Apostolic Church of America, Inc.. (Jabagchourian, Ara) (Filed on 6/23/2010)
June 16, 2010 Filing 37 Declaration of Shannon M. Stone in Support of #34 Memorandum in Opposition to KZV Armenian School's Motion to Set Aside Default filed byThomas A. Keller, IV. (Related document(s) #34 ) (Millstein, David) (Filed on 6/16/2010)
June 16, 2010 Filing 36 Declaration of Jasmine Z. Keller in Support of #34 Memorandum in Opposition to KZV Armenian School's Motion to Set Aside Default filed byThomas A. Keller, IV. (Related document(s) #34 ) (Millstein, David) (Filed on 6/16/2010)
June 16, 2010 Filing 35 Declaration of Thomas A. Keller IV in Support of #34 Memorandum in Opposition to KZV Armenian School's Motion to Set Aside Default filed byThomas A. Keller, IV. (Related document(s) #34 ) (Millstein, David) (Filed on 6/16/2010)
June 16, 2010 Filing 34 Memorandum in Opposition to #26 KZV Armenian School's Motion to Set Aside Default filed by Thomas A. Keller, IV. (Millstein, David) (Filed on 6/16/2010) Modified on 6/18/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
May 27, 2010 Filing 33 Letter from Ara Jabagchourian to Honorable Judge Hamilton. (Jabagchourian, Ara) (Filed on 5/27/2010)
May 26, 2010 ADR Remark: The ADR Phone Conference scheduled for 6/1/10 has been rescheduled to 8/2/10 at 11:00 a.m. Pacific time. Please note that plaintiff's counsel initiates the call to all parties. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2010)
May 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/29/2010. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/5/2010 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/25/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2010)
May 24, 2010 Filing 31 Declaration of Ara R. Jabagchourian in Support of #29 MOTION to Set Aside Entry of Default CORRECTED VERSION WITH EXHIBITS filed byWestern Prelacy of the Armenian Apostolic Church of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) #29 ) (Jabagchourian, Ara) (Filed on 5/24/2010)
May 21, 2010 Filing 30 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #31 . *** Declaration of Ara Jabagchourian in Support of #29 MOTION to Set Aside Entry of Default CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 29-1 filed byWestern Prelacy of the Armenian Apostolic Church of America, Inc.. (Related document(s) #29 ) (Jabagchourian, Ara) (Filed on 5/21/2010) Modified on 5/24/2010 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
May 20, 2010 Filing 29 MOTION to Set Aside Entry of Default filed by Western Prelacy of the Armenian Apostolic Church of America, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/7/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland.*** ATTACHMENT 1 FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT #30 . *** (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ara Jabagchourian, #2 Declaration of Grace Andonian, #3 Declaration of Kahren Arzoumanian, #4 Declaration of Sarkis Mahserejian)(Pitre, Frank) (Filed on 5/20/2010) Modified on 5/21/2010 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
May 19, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated. #13 Clerks Notice, #26 MOTION to Set Aside Entry of Default, #18 MOTION for Default Judgment. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2010)
May 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Judge Hon. Susan Illston no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/19/10. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2010)
May 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER OF RECUSAL (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2010)
May 18, 2010 Filing 26 MOTION to Set Aside Entry of Default; Memorandum of Law iso Defendant's Motin to Set Aside Entry of Default filed by Western Prelacy of the Armenian Apostolic Church of America, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/25/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ara jabagchourian iso of Defendant's Motin to Set Aside Entry of Default, #2 Declaration of Grace Andonian, #3 Declaration of Kahren Arzoumanian, #4 Declaration of Sarkis Mahserejian)(Pitre, Frank) (Filed on 5/18/2010)
May 17, 2010 Filing 25 ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 6/1/10 at 11:00 a.m. Please take note that plaintiff's counsel initiates the call to all parties. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2010)
May 14, 2010 Filing 24 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Millstein, David) (Filed on 5/14/2010)
May 14, 2010 Filing 23 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Millstein, David) (Filed on 5/14/2010)
May 13, 2010 Filing 22 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Pierrou, Yvonne) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
April 29, 2010 Filing 21 Certificate of Interested Entities by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan (Pierrou, Yvonne) (Filed on 4/29/2010)
April 29, 2010 Filing 20 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byKaiser Foundation Health Plan. (Pierrou, Yvonne) (Filed on 4/29/2010)
April 26, 2010 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomas A. Keller, IV re #18 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant The Western Prelacy of the Armenian Apostolic Church of America, Inc. dba KZV Armenian School (Millstein, David) (Filed on 4/26/2010)
April 14, 2010 Filing 18 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant The Western Prelacy of the Armenian Apostolic Church of America, Inc. dba KZV Armenian School filed by Thomas A. Keller, IV. Motion Hearing set for 6/25/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Thomas A. Keller IV, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Shannon Stone, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Millstein, David) (Filed on 4/14/2010)
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER dismissing Kaiser only (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2010)
April 12, 2010 Filing 16 stipulation not filed, The Court is not available on 5/21/10 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
April 8, 2010 Filing 15 STIPULATION Stipulation and Proposed Order to Dismiss Kaiser Permanente Insurance Company by Thomas A. Keller, IV. (Millstein, David) (Filed on 4/8/2010)
April 8, 2010 Filing 14 STIPULATION Stipulation and Proposed Order to Continue Initial Case Management Conference by Thomas A. Keller, IV. (Millstein, David) (Filed on 4/8/2010)
April 7, 2010 Filing 13 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 6/4/2010 02:30 PM. Motion Hearing set for 6/4/2010 09:00 AM. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2010)
March 30, 2010 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kaiser Permanente Insurance Company, Western Prelacy of the Armenian Apostolic Church of America, Inc.. Filed byThomas A. Keller, IV. (Millstein, David) (Filed on 3/30/2010)
March 8, 2010 Filing 11 Clerks Notice ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to defendants Kaiser Permanente and Western Prelacy of the American Apostolic Church of America on March 8, 2010. (Related documents(s) #6 , #8 ) (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2010)
March 5, 2010 Filing 10 CLERKS NOTICE re: Failure to E-File documents #6, #7, #8 and #9 by plaintiff's counsel (cc: S.M.Stone, Esq.) (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2010)
March 4, 2010 Filing 9 Declaration of Shannon M. Stone in Support of #8 MOTION for Entry of Default against defendant Western Prelacy of the Armenian Apostolic Church of America filed byThomas A. Keller, IV. (Related document(s) #8 ) (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2010) (ys, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2010 Filing 8 MOTION for Entry of Default against defendant Western Prelacy of the Armenian Apostolic Church of America filed by Thomas A. Keller, IV. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2010) (ys, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2010 Filing 7 Declaration of Shannon M. Stone in Support of #6 MOTION for Entry of Default against defendant Kaiser Permanente filed byThomas A. Keller, IV. (Related document(s) #6 ) (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2010) (ys, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2010 Filing 6 MOTION for Entry of Default against defendant Kaiser Permanente filed by Thomas A. Keller, IV. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2010) (ys, COURT STAFF).
February 16, 2010 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomas A. Keller, IV (Western Prelacy of the Armenian Apostolic Chirch of America, Inc.) (Millstein, David) (Filed on 2/16/2010)
February 16, 2010 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomas A. Keller, IV (Kaiser) (Millstein, David) (Filed on 2/16/2010)
December 30, 2009 Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 4/2/2010. Case Management Conference set for 4/9/2010 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2009)
December 30, 2009 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Kaiser Permanente Insurance Company, Western Prelacy of the Armenian Apostolic Church of America, Inc.. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2009)
December 30, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT; Demand for Jury Trial against Kaiser Permanente Insurance Company, Western Prelacy of the Armenian Apostolic Church of America, Inc. (Filing fee $ 350.00, receipt number 34611040544). Filed by Thomas A. Keller, IV. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2009)
December 30, 2009 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keller v. Kaiser Permanente Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan
Represented By: Kathy H Dong
Represented By: Yvonne Michelle Pierrou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Prelacy of the Armenian Apostolic Church of America, Inc. doing business as KZV Armenian School
Represented By: Frank Mario Pitre
Represented By: Ara R. Jabagchourian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaiser Permanente Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas A. Keller, IV
Represented By: David J. Millstein
Represented By: Shannon M Stone,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?