Ross v. Global Wine Company et al
Plaintiff: Kimberley Ross
Defendant: Global Wine Company and John Davis
Case Number: 4:2009cv06107
Filed: December 31, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER Granting 101 Stipulation to Dismissal of Action. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/21/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2011)
May 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 100 CONDITIONAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/30/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2011)
May 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER Concerning Parties' 88 Stipulated Request to Continue Trial Date. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/19/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
May 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER DENYING 86 Stipulated Request to Continue Trial Date. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/13/2011. (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2011)
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 85 AMENDED ORDER CONCERNING DEFENDANT'S COUNSEL'S ATTENDANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/6/2011. (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2011)
May 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER ON 44 , 60 MOTIONS IN LIMINE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/4/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2011)
April 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting 38 Motion to Appear by Telephone (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2011)
April 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER RE OVERDUE PAPERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 4/18/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2011)
April 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' 36 Motion to Re-Open Discovery for Limited Purpose. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2011)
March 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Granting 34 Stipulation re: Mental Examination. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/31/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2011)
March 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS 20 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2011)
March 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING 30 Stipulation Re: Mental Examination. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/14/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2011)
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Granting 27 Protective Order re: Medical Records. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/3/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
December 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting 16 Stipulation to Continue the Date for Dispositive Motions and CMC. Case Management Statement due by 1/27/2011. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/3/2011 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 2/3/2010 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/23/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2010)
April 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re 8 grabting Stipulation selecting Mediation. Case referred to mediation.Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 04/09/2010. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ross v. Global Wine Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberley Ross
Represented By: Richard M. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Wine Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?