Gilhuly v. KMART Corporation

Plaintiff: Michael Gilhuly
Defendant: KMART Corporation
Case Number: 4:2010cv00360
Filed: January 26, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relations
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 23, 2012 54 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT re 53 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 51 MOTION for Leave to File FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Michael Gilhuly. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/23/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2012)
September 19, 2011 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re 46 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by KMART Corporation. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/19/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
June 30, 2011 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 42 Stipulated Request for Extension of Time to Meet and Confer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 06/30/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2011)
May 26, 2011 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 39 Letter Brief. Telephonic Discovery Hearing set for 6/2/2011 at 2:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 05/26/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
May 10, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CLASS CERTIFICATION BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 36 Stipulation filed by Michael Gilhuly. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/10/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2011)
May 6, 2011 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 35 Continuing Submission Date for Joint Letter Brief re Discovery Dispute. Joint letter due 5/20/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 05/06/2011. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2011)
August 26, 2010 25 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING MEDIATION DEADLINE re 24 Stipulation filed by Michael Gilhuly. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/26/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2010)
June 7, 2010 23 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER VACATING REFERRAL TO COURT CONNECTED MEDIATION AND ASSIGNMENT TO PRIVATE MEDIATION re 22 Stipulation filed by Michael Gilhuly. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/7/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilhuly v. KMART Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Gilhuly
Represented By: Molly Ann Kuehn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KMART Corporation
Represented By: Virginia Kathryn Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?