Davis v. Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, Trustee, As Trustee for Series HBV 2007-3 et al

Plaintiff: Estell Davis
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, Trustee, As Trustee for Series HBV 2007-3, GMAC Mortgage, LLC, Jason Haynes and Lakeshore Funding
Case Number: 4:2010cv00489
Filed: February 3, 2010
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 1, 2011 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 9/1/2011. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2011)
August 1, 2011 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND DEADLINE FOR PRODUCING DEPONENTS FOR DEPOSITION re 107 Stipulation, filed by Estell Davis. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/1/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2011)
July 29, 2011 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION RESETTING DISPOSITIVE MOTION HEARING DATE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR PRODUCING DEPONENTS FOR DEPOSITION re 104 Stipulation, filed by Estell Davis. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/29/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2011)
July 15, 2011 92 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS DEADLINE AND PERMITTING PLAINTIFF TO NOTICE DEPOSITIONS OF DEFENDANTS' PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE re 91 Stipulation, filed by GMAC Mortgage, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, Trustee, As Trustee for Series HBV 2007-3. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/15/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
November 18, 2010 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting in part and denying in part 74 Motion to Dismiss; denying 75 Motion to Strike ; finding as moot 83 Motion to Strike (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2010)
July 8, 2010 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 53 Motion to Dismiss; granting 54 Motion to Strike (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2010)
June 4, 2010 64 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS re 59 Stipulation filed by Estell Davis. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/4/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
May 20, 2010 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re 52 Consent MOTION to Substitute Attorney filed by GMAC Mortgage, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, Trustee, As Trustee for Series HBV 2007-3. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/20/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2010)
April 30, 2010 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint; 30 MOTION to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint; 40 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint; 41 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 4/30/2010. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2010)
April 13, 2010 39 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME re 38 Stipulation filed by Estell Davis. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/13/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2010)
March 29, 2010 37 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION re 35 Stipulation filed by Estell Davis. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/29/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2010)
February 19, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 14 Motion for TRO (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2010)
February 16, 2010 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/16/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, Trustee, As Trustee for Series HBV 2007-3 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estell Davis
Represented By: Robert Alan Spanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, Trustee, As Trustee for Series HBV 2007-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMAC Mortgage, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakeshore Funding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?