Flowbee International, Inc. et al v. Google, Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Flowbee International, Inc. and Flowbee Haircutter Limited Partnership
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Counter-claimant: Google, Inc.
Counter-defendant: Flowbee Haircutter Limited Partnership and Flowbee International, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2010cv00668
Filed: February 18, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44
ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION FORM. Signed by Judge Beeler on 2/23/2010. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2010)
February 22, 2010 Filing 43
ERRATA re 42 Answer to Complaint and Counterclaim, by Google, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Galvin, Cheryl) (Filed on 2/22/2010) Modified on 2/23/2010 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
February 17, 2010 Filing 41
ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 5/27/2010. Case Management Conference set for 6/3/2010 01:30 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2010)
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38
ORDER Denying 11 Motion to Dismiss this case for improper venue; Granting alternative motion to transfer case to Northern District of California, San Jose Division.(Signed by Judge Janis Graham Jack) Parties notified.(srussell, )
December 17, 2009 Filing 37
NOTICE of Setting as to 11 MOTION to Dismiss 1 Complaint,, 29 Unopposed MOTION for Oral Argument Relating to Its Pending Motion to Dismiss Hearing re: 26 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief to Its Pending Motion to DismissUnopposed MOTION for Oral Argument Relating to Its Pending Motion to Dismiss Hearing re: 26 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief to Its Pending Motion to Dismiss. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 1/11/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge Janis Graham Jack, filed. (sscotch, )
November 5, 2009 Filing 36
Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Margaret Caruso re: 32 Order on Motion for Leave to File, filed. (Bar website reflects the same address) (dperez, )
October 19, 2009 Filing 33
PLAINTIFFS' SUR-REPLY in Support of 24 Response to Defendant Google, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(3), filed by Flowbee International, Inc., Flowbee Haircutter Limited Partnership. (srussell, )
October 16, 2009 Filing 30
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Support of Response to Motion to Dismiss by Flowbee International, Inc., Flowbee Haircutter Limited Partnership, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/5/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bright, David)
October 8, 2009 Filing 29
Unopposed MOTION for Oral Argument Relating to Its Pending Motion to Dismiss Hearing re: 26 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief to Its Pending Motion to Dismiss by Google, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/28/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Caruso, Margaret)
September 25, 2009 Filing 23
Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to 21 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (vgano, )
September 24, 2009 Filing 22
AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Carl Butzer. This is to order a transcript of held on 09/23/09 before Judge Janis Graham Jack Court Reporter/Transcriber: Molly Carter, filed. (lcayce, )
September 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20
SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 3/15/2009 Joinder of Parties due by 12/15/2009 Discovery due by 6/30/2010 Dispositive Motion Filing due by 6/15/2010 Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/20/2010 Pretrial Conference set for 9/1/2010 at 08:30 AM before Judge Janis Graham Jack Jury Selection set for 9/2/2010 at 08:00AM before Judge Janis Graham Jack Jury Trial set for 9/2/2010 at 08:00 AM before Judge Janis Graham Jack.(Signed by Judge Janis Graham Jack) Parties notified.(lrivera, )
September 22, 2009 Filing 15
INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Google, Inc., filed.(Babcock, Charles)
September 17, 2009 Filing 13
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Goodpastor on behalf of Flowbee International, Inc., Flowbee Haircutter Limited Partnership, filed. (Bright, David)
September 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12
ORDER granting 9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Janis Graham Jack) Parties notified.(lrivera, )
September 11, 2009 Filing 10
JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Flowbee International, Inc., Flowbee Haircutter Limited Partnership, filed.(Bright, David)
September 10, 2009 Filing 9
MOTION for Margaret M. Caruso to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Google, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/5/2009. (mserpa, )
September 9, 2009 Filing 6
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Google, Inc., filed.(Babcock, Charles)
September 2, 2009 Filing 4
RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Google, Inc. served on 8/25/2009, answer due 9/14/2009, filed.(Bright, David)
August 28, 2009 Filing 3
First CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Flowbee International, Inc., Flowbee Haircutter Limited Partnership, filed.(Bright, David)
August 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2
ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/23/2009 at 01:15 PM before Judge Janis Graham Jack. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order) Parties notified.(dterrell, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flowbee International, Inc. et al v. Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flowbee International, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher V Goodpastor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flowbee Haircutter Limited Partnership
Represented By: Christopher V Goodpastor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Represented By: Cheryl Ann Galvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Google, Inc.
Represented By: Cheryl Ann Galvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: Flowbee Haircutter Limited Partnership
Represented By: Christopher V Goodpastor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: Flowbee International, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher V Goodpastor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?