Daoust v. U Unlimited, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: James Daoust
Defendant: U Unlimited, Inc. and Eitan Spanier
Case Number: 4:2010cv00678
Filed: February 17, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER RE STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 9/9/2010. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
August 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER by Judge Beeler: (1) DENYING AS MOOT 9 Motion for Default Judgment; (2) GRANTING 17 Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default; (3) Setting amended schedule and hearing date. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2010)
June 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER SETTING HEARING DATES AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Beeler on 6/24/2010. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2010)
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER FOR SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beeler on 6/21/2010. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2010)
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER (1) VACATING CMC; (2) SETTING HEARING ON MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGEMENT; AND (3) REQUIRING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING BY PLAINTIFF. Signed by Judge Beeler on 6/2/10. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daoust v. U Unlimited, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Daoust
Represented By: Michael Lion Tracy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U Unlimited, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eitan Spanier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?