Chung v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Plaintiff: Dale Chung
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco and Michael Hennesey
Case Number: 4:2010cv01099
Filed: March 15, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER OF DISMISSAL, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/27/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2011)
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Nandor J. Vadas finding as moot 21 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant's Supplemental Responses and for Sanctions. (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER REQUIRING DEFENDANT TO FILE ITS RESPONSE TO 21 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL AND FOR SANCTIONS by close of business on March 4, 2011. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on February 28, 2011. (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2011)
July 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Dispositive Motions to be heard by 5/25/2011. Pretrial Conference set for 9/1/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/6/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chung v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Chung
Represented By: Michael Robert Bracamontes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Hennesey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?