Largan Precision Co, LTD v. Fujinon Corporation
Plaintiff: Largan Precision Co, LTD
Defendant: Fujinon Corporation
Case Number: 4:2010cv01318
Filed: March 29, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement (Insurance)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER re 122 Claims Construction / Markman Hearing Case Management Conference set for 10/17/2012 02:30 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/17/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
October 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER re 120 Proposed Order filed by Largan Precision Co, LTD. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 10/25/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2011)
April 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 104 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2011)
March 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER by Judge Larson granting 88 Motion for Discovery (jllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2011)
March 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG DENIED as moot 65 Motion TO WITHDRAW CONSENT TO STIPULATION TO STAY LITIGATION ; granting 68 Motion for Leave to File; denying 76 Motion to Stay (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2011)
December 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 54 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2010)
October 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 37 Motion to Substitute Party. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2010)
September 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/23/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Largan Precision Co, LTD v. Fujinon Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Largan Precision Co, LTD
Represented By: John P. Schnurer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fujinon Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?