Evanston Insurance Company v. American Safety Indemnity Company
Plaintiff: Evanston Insurance Company
Defendant: American Safety Indemnity Company
Case Number: 4:2010cv01472
Filed: April 7, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 CONDITIONAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/19/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS 20 MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DENYING DEFENDANTS 21 CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Case Management Statement due by 6/2/2011. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/9/2011 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 6/9/2011 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/10/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2011)
January 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING 25 Stipulation to Continue CMO Deadlines. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/25/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2011)
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re 15 Granting Stipulation Selecting Private ADR. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/3/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evanston Insurance Company v. American Safety Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evanston Insurance Company
Represented By: John B. Hook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Safety Indemnity Company
Represented By: David Seth Blau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?