GMAC Inc. v. Groth Bros. Oldsmobile, Inc.
Plaintiff: GMAC Inc.
Defendant: Groth Bros. Oldsmobile, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2010cv01669
Filed: April 19, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Referring Judge: Phyllis J Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/5/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2011)
April 5, 2011 Filing 45 STIPULATION for Dismissal with Prejudice by GMAC Inc.. (Elliott, Andrew) (Filed on 4/5/2011)
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re #43 Joint Case Management Statement filed by Groth Bros. Oldsmobile, Inc., GMAC Inc. Case Management Statement due by 3/31/2011. Case Management Conference set for 4/7/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/8/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2011)
March 7, 2011 Filing 43 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by GMAC Inc., Groth Bros. Oldsmobile, Inc.. (Elliott, Andrew) (Filed on 3/7/2011) Modified on 3/8/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
January 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re #41 Joint Case Management Statement filed by Groth Bros. Oldsmobile, Inc., GMAC Inc. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/3/2011. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/10/2011 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/10/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2011)
January 7, 2011 Filing 41 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by GMAC Inc., Groth Bros. Oldsmobile, Inc.. (Elliott, Andrew) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
November 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re #39 Joint Case Management Statement filed by Groth Bros. Oldsmobile, Inc., GMAC Inc. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/6/2011. Case Management Conference set for 1/13/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/29/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2010)
November 23, 2010 Filing 39 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Groth Bros. Oldsmobile, Inc., GMAC Inc. (Elliott, Andrew) (Filed on 11/23/2010) Modified on 11/24/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
October 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER CONTINUING THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re #37 Joint Case Management Statement filed by Groth Bros. Oldsmobile, Inc., GMAC Inc. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/24/2010. Case Management Conference set for 12/2/2010 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/19/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2010)
October 15, 2010 Filing 37 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by GMAC Inc., Groth Bros. Oldsmobile, Inc.. (Elliott, Andrew) (Filed on 10/15/2010)
September 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER RE STIPULATION FOR ORDER FOR AMENDED WRIT OF POSSESSION AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF re #33 Stipulation filed by GMAC Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/24/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2010)
September 24, 2010 Filing 35 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/21/2010 02:00 PM. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2010)
September 23, 2010 Filing 34 Proposed Order re #33 Stipulation For Order For Amended Writ of Possession And Injunctive Relief by GMAC Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A & Exhibit B)(Elliott, Andrew) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
September 23, 2010 Filing 33 STIPULATION For Order For Amended Writ of Possession And Injunctive Relief by GMAC Inc.. (Elliott, Andrew) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
September 23, 2010 Filing 32 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by GMAC Inc., Groth Bros. Oldsmobile, Inc.. (Elliott, Andrew) (Filed on 9/23/2010) Modified on 9/24/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
August 5, 2010 Filing 31 Writ of Possession issued as to Broth Bros. Oldsmobile, Inc. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2010)
August 4, 2010 Filing 30 Proposed Writ of of Possession by GMAC Inc.. (Elliott, Andrew) (Filed on 8/4/2010) Modified on 8/5/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
August 4, 2010 Filing 29 NOTICE by GMAC Inc. Notice of Entry of Order re Stipulation For Order For Writ of Possession And Injunctive Relief (Elliott, Andrew) (Filed on 8/4/2010)
August 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER RE STIPULATION FOR ORDER FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF re #26 Stipulation filed by GMAC Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/4/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2010)
August 3, 2010 Filing 27 Proposed Order re #26 Stipulation for Order for Writ of Possession and Injunctive Relief by GMAC Inc., Groth Bros. Oldsmobile, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - B)(Elliott, Andrew) (Filed on 8/3/2010) Modified on 8/4/2010 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
August 3, 2010 Filing 26 STIPULATION for Order for Writ of Possession and Injunctive Relief by GMAC Inc., Groth Bros. Oldsmobile, Inc. (Elliott, Andrew) (Filed on 8/3/2010) Modified on 8/4/2010 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
July 29, 2010 Filing 25 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/23/2010. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/30/2010 02:00 PM. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2010)
July 28, 2010 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand byGroth Bros. Oldsmobile, Inc.. (Ghiringhelli, William) (Filed on 7/28/2010)
July 21, 2010 Filing 23 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Joint Rule 26(f) Report. (Elliott, Andrew) (Filed on 7/21/2010)
July 21, 2010 Filing 22 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by GMAC Inc., Groth Bros. Oldsmobile, Inc.. (Elliott, Andrew) (Filed on 7/21/2010)
June 28, 2010 Filing 21 Request to Withdraw #7 Application by GMAC Inc. (Elliott, Andrew) (Filed on 6/28/2010) Modified on 6/29/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/22/2010. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/29/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/5/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2010)
May 3, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated. #19 Clerks Notice. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
May 3, 2010 Filing 19 CLERKS NOTICE Motion Hearing re #7 set for 6/30/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2010) Modified on 5/4/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
May 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/3/10. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
May 3, 2010 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by GMAC Inc. re #6 Order Reassigning Case, Case Assigned/Reassigned,, #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, #11 Proposed Order, #8 Declaration in Support, #1 Complaint, #3 ADR Scheduling Order, #9 Declaration in Support, #7 Ex Parte Application for Writ of Possession and for Temporary Restraining Order, #4 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, #5 Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment, #10 Proposed Order, Case Referred to ECF PROOF OF SERVICE RE: MARY PFEIFFER, AGENT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS (Elliott, Andrew) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
May 3, 2010 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen for Report and Recommendation on writ of possession. (wh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2010)
April 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re #7 Denying Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Referring Application for Writ of Possession to Magistrate Judge. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2010)
April 28, 2010 Filing 15 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 4/28/2010 before Phyllis J. Hamilton (Date Filed: 4/28/2010) re #7 Ex Parte Application for Writ of Possession and for Temporary Restraining Order filed by GMAC Inc. (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado.) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/28/2010)
April 27, 2010 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition ex A Robin Groth-Hill filed byGroth Bros. Oldsmobile, Inc.. (Ghiringhelli, William) (Filed on 4/27/2010)
April 27, 2010 Filing 13 Memorandum in Opposition re #7 Ex Parte Application for Writ of Possession and for Temporary Restraining Orderfiled by Groth Bros. Oldsmobile, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit)(Ghiringhelli, William) (Filed on 4/27/2010) Modified on 4/28/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
April 27, 2010 Filing 12 Memorandum in Opposition to re #7 Ex Parte Application for Writ of Possession and for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Groth Bros. Oldsmobile, Inc.. (Ghiringhelli, William) (Filed on 4/27/2010) Modified on 4/28/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
April 23, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated re #3 ADR Scheduling Order. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2010)
April 23, 2010 Filing 11 Proposed Order re #7 Ex Parte Application for Writ of Possession and for Temporary Restraining Order by GMAC Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Elliott, Andrew) (Filed on 4/23/2010)
April 23, 2010 Filing 10 Proposed Order re #7 Ex Parte Application for Writ of Possession and for Temporary Restraining Order by GMAC Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Elliott, Andrew) (Filed on 4/23/2010)
April 23, 2010 Filing 9 Declaration of Rise' Michelle Smith in Support of #7 Ex Parte Application for Writ of Possession and for Temporary Restraining Order filed byGMAC Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C, #2 Exhibit D-K)(Related document(s) #7 ) (Elliott, Andrew) (Filed on 4/23/2010)
April 23, 2010 Filing 8 Declaration of Andrew S. Elliott in Support of #7 Ex Parte Application for Writ of Possession and for Temporary Restraining Order filed byGMAC Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #7 ) (Elliott, Andrew) (Filed on 4/23/2010)
April 23, 2010 Filing 7 Ex Parte Application for Writ of Possession and for Temporary Restraining Order filed by GMAC Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of GMAC LLC's Ex Parte Application for Writ of Possession and for Temporary Restraining Order)(Elliott, Andrew) (Filed on 4/23/2010)
April 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Judge Magistrate Judge James Larson no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/22/10. (mab, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2010)
April 22, 2010 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (wh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2010)
April 21, 2010 Filing 4 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by GMAC Inc.. (Elliott, Andrew) (Filed on 4/21/2010)
April 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 7/21/2010. Case Management Conference set for 7/28/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge James Larson on 4/19/10. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by GMAC Inc. re #1 Complaint (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2010)
April 19, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT /issued summons against Groth Bros. Oldsmobile, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611044852.). Filed byGMAC Inc.. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/27/2010: #1 Complaint part 2, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (vlk, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/5/2017: #3 Summons, #4 Corrected PDF of part 1) (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 19, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GMAC Inc. v. Groth Bros. Oldsmobile, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GMAC Inc.
Represented By: Andrew S. Elliott
Represented By: Donald Hogan Cram, III
Represented By: Duane M. Geck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Groth Bros. Oldsmobile, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew S. Elliott
Represented By: William Francis Ghiringhelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?