Meisel et al v. Kaufman et al
Plaintiff: Andrew H. Meisel, Robin H. Meisel, AR Meisel Properties, LLC, Sybil Meisel, Edward Meisel, Meisel Family Partnership, Irvin Laxineta, Marilyn D. Laxineta, Robert Laxineta, Sylvia Laxineta, Marc Laxineta and Gerald Hart
Defendant: Mark Kaufman, Mark Alan Kaufman Properties, Inc., Mark Kaufman Properties, Inc. and Midland Mak Management, LLC
Case Number: 4:2010cv01786
Filed: April 26, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER CONTINUING CMC. Signed by Judge Beeler on 5/1/2012. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2012)
April 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER CONTINUING CMC TO MAY 2, 2012 at 10:30 a.m.. Signed by Judge Beeler on 4/25/2012. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2012)
March 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Beeler on 3/21/2012. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2012)
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER re 191 Letter, filed by Irvin Laxineta, Robert Laxineta, Marc Laxineta, Sylvia Laxineta, Edward Meisel, Robin H. Meisel, Marilyn D. Laxineta, Sybil Meisel, Gerald Hart, Andrew H. Meisel, AR Meisel Properties, LLC, Meisel Family Partnership. Signed by Judge Beeler on 2/13/2012. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2012)
November 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER re 186 Proposed Order, filed by Irvin Laxineta, Robert Laxineta, Marc Laxineta, Sylvia Laxineta, Edward Meisel, Robin H. Meisel, Marilyn D. Laxineta, Sybil Meisel, Gerald Hart, Andrew H. Meisel, AR Meisel Properties, LLC, Meisel Family Partnership. Signed by Judge Beeler on 11/18/2011. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2011)
October 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER RE PRETRIAL FILING DEADLINES AND HEARING ON CROSS-MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Beeler on 10/26/2011. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2011)
October 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 181 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Beeler on 10/20/2011. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2011)
October 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 178 REVISED ORDER RE PRETRIAL FILINGS. Signed by Judge Beeler on 10/13/2011. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2011)
October 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 174 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING HEARING TO OCTOBER 20, 2011 [signed]. Signed by Judge Beeler on 10/4/2011. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2011)
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER RE STIPULATION 168 . Signed by Judge Beeler on 9/12/2011. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
September 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER RE STIPULATION 162 , 163 . Signed by Judge Beeler on 9/6/2011. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2011)
August 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON CROSS-MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Beeler on 8/30/2011. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2011)
July 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER RE HEARING AND SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Beeler on 7/29/2011. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2011)
July 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 131 GRANTING DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE REPLY BRIEF. Signed by Judge Beeler on 7/21/2011. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2011)
June 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 95 REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Beeler on 6/24/2011. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
May 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER CONTINUING CMC. Signed by Judge Beeler on 5/25/2011. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER CONTINUING CMC. Signed by Judge Beeler on 5/3/2011. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2011)
April 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER CONTINUING CMC. Signed by Judge Beeler on 4/1/2011. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2011)
March 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 71 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Beeler on 3/29/2011. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2011)
March 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Beeler on 3/21/2011. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2011)
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER VACATING AND RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO MARCH 10, 2011, AND PERMITTING TELEPHONE APPEARANCE. Signed by Judge Beeler on 1/14/2011. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
September 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT CMC. Signed by Judge Beeler on 9/24/10. (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2010)
September 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING 49 Stipulation, filed by Midland Mak Management, LLC, Mark Kaufman, Mark Kaufman Properties, Inc., Mark Alan Kaufman Properties, Inc.. Signed by Judge Beeler on 9/20/10. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2010)
August 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER by Judge Beeler granting 29 Motion to Vacate (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2010)
June 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION FORM BY JULY 9, 2010. Signed by Judge Beeler on 6/22/10. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meisel et al v. Kaufman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew H. Meisel
Represented By: Steven Robert Roeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin H. Meisel
Represented By: Steven Robert Roeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AR Meisel Properties, LLC
Represented By: Steven Robert Roeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sybil Meisel
Represented By: Steven Robert Roeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Meisel
Represented By: Steven Robert Roeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meisel Family Partnership
Represented By: Steven Robert Roeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irvin Laxineta
Represented By: Steven Robert Roeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn D. Laxineta
Represented By: Steven Robert Roeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Laxineta
Represented By: Steven Robert Roeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Laxineta
Represented By: Steven Robert Roeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Laxineta
Represented By: Steven Robert Roeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Hart
Represented By: Steven Robert Roeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Alan Kaufman Properties, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Kaufman Properties, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Mak Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?