Rainbow Business Solutions et al v. Merchant Services, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Verena Baumgartner, Dietz Towing Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp, Rainbow Business Services, Just Film, Inc., Jerry Su, Erin Campbell, Terry Jordan, The Rose Dress Inc, Lewis Bae and Burlingame Motors Inc
Defendant: Rich Hahn, Joseph I. Sussman, P.C., Merchant Services, Inc, Universal Card, Inc., Leonard Mezei, Transfirst Independent Sales Services, Universal Merchant Services LLC, First National Bank of Omaha, Nathan Jurczyk, United Bank Card of America, Inc., Michael Han, National Payment Processing, SKS Associates LLC, Transfirst Holdings, Inc., La Quinta Holdings LLC, Jason Moore, SPC, Inc., Jay Cohen, Fifth Third Bank, Atlas Payment Processing, Lease Finance Group, LLC, RBL Capital Group, LLC, Congress Financial Corporation, Lease Source-LSI, LLC, TransFirst Third Party Sales, LLC, Golden Eagle Leasing LLC, Robert Latousek, Lease Source, Inc., Lease Source LLC, Merrick Bank, Universal Merchant Services Corporation, Eric Madura, MBF Merchant Capital, LLC, Transfirst Financial Institutions Services, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., Columbus Bank and Trust, TransFirst LLC, Brian Fitzgerald, Fiona Walshe, Joseph I. Sussman, JWM Holdings LLC, Robert Parisi, Northern Funding, LLC, MBF Leasing LLC, Peter Depalma, Sam Buono, William Healy, Alicyn Roy, Sara Krieger and Lina Kravic
Not Classified By Court: Experian Corporation
Cross Defendant: Rover Enterprises, Inc., Anthony Kutscher, Jr., Protege Investments, Inc. and Merchant Services F.A., Inc.
Interested Party: Bradley C. Aldrich, Dr. Lori Clemens, Thomas F. Torchia and Kevin Pludeman
Case Number: 4:2010cv01993
Filed: May 7, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D Laporte
Referring Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2017 Filing 731 JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL CASE. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2017)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 730 ORDER AS MODIFIED GRANTING MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/5/17. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2017)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 729 ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES, COSTS AND INCENTIVE AWARDS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/5/17. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2017)
November 28, 2017 Filing 732 OBJECTIONS to the Settlement filed by Guoxin Xing. ***Filed Under Seal Pursuant to Order, dkt. #730 ***(cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2017) (cpS, COURT STAFF).
November 28, 2017 Filing 728 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Claudia Wilken: Motion Hearing held on 11/28/2017. Court Reporter: Sarah Goekler. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/28/2017)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 727 Order by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #726 Motion to Appear by Telephone by Scott Silberfein.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2017)
November 26, 2017 Filing 726 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at the Hearing on November 28, 2017 filed by Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC. (Silberfein, Scott) (Filed on 11/26/2017)
November 15, 2017 Filing 725 Proposed Order re #719 MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES, COSTS AND INCENTIVE AWARDS by Lewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Erin Campbell, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (fee petition))(Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 11/15/2017)
November 14, 2017 Filing 724 REPLY (re #719 MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES, COSTS AND INCENTIVE AWARDS ) filed byLewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Erin Campbell, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam Gutride, #2 Declaration of Eric Schachter)(Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 11/14/2017)
November 3, 2017 Filing 723 OBJECTIONS to the settlement, and request to extend the deadline of 10/31/2017 for the objection by Guoxing Xing. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2017) Modified on 11/3/2017 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 30, 2017 Filing 722 NOTICE Regarding Amendments Filed in Connection with re #719 MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES, COSTS AND INCENTIVE AWARDS by Lewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Erin Campbell, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 10/30/2017) Modified on 10/31/2017 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 721 ORDER DENYING UNIVERSAL CARD, INC.S MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND TO PERMANENTLY ENJOIN STATE COURT COUNTERCLAIMS by Judge Claudia Wilken. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
October 11, 2017 Filing 719 MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES, COSTS AND INCENTIVE AWARDS filed by Erin Campbell, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, Volker Von Glasenapp. Motion Hearing set for 11/28/2017 02:30 PM before Judge Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 10/25/2017. Replies due by 11/1/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Adam Gutride, #2 Proposed Order)(McCrary, Marie) (Filed on 10/11/2017) Modified on 10/12/2017 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 10, 2017 Filing 720 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Claudia Wilken: Motion Hearing held on 10/10/2017, re #694 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement and Permanently Enjoin State Court Counterclaims filed by Universal Card, Inc. Arguments heard, matter submitted. Court to issue order. Total Time in Court: 25 minutes. Court Reporter: Kathy Wyatt. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/10/2017)
October 6, 2017 Filing 718 Supplemental Briefing (re #694 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement and Permanently Enjoin State Court Counterclaims ) filed bySam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC. (Divelbiss, Rod) (Filed on 10/6/2017) Modified on 10/10/2017 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2017 Filing 717 Supplemental Brief re Jurisdiction in support of (re #694 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement and Permanently Enjoin State Court Counterclaims ) filed byUniversal Card, Inc.. (Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 10/5/2017) Modified on 10/6/2017 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2017 Filing 716 Supplemental Brief (re #694 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement and Permanently Enjoin State Court Counterclaims ) Order (dkt. 708) filed byMichael Han. (Chittur, Krishnan) (Filed on 10/5/2017) Modified on 10/6/2017 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2017 Filing 715 CLERK'S NOTICE: Notice is hereby given that the Court has approved attorney Krishnan Chittur request to appear by telephone. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance no later than 3pm on October 9, 2017. Counsel must print a copy of the minute order and case management order from Judge Wilken's webpage on the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2017)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 714 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT OCTOBER 10,2017 HEARING by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #712 Attorney, Krishnan Chittur's Motion to Appear by Telephone.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2017)
October 5, 2017 Filing 713 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING in support of their opposition (re #694 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement and Permanently Enjoin State Court Counterclaims ) Plaintiff's Supplemental Briefing in Support of Their Opposition to UCI's Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement and Enjoin State Court Counterclaims filed byJust Film, Inc.. (Safier, Seth) (Filed on 10/5/2017) Modified on 10/6/2017 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 4, 2017 Filing 712 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Michael Han. (Chittur, Krishnan) (Filed on 10/4/2017)
October 3, 2017 Filing 711 CLERK'S NOTICE: Notice is hereby given that the court has approved attorneys' Scott Silberfein and Robert Lillienstein request to appear by telephone. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearances no later than 3pm on October 9, 2017. Counsel must print a copy of the minute order and case management order from Judge Wilken's webpage on the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2017)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 710 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT THE OCTOBER 10, 2017 HEARING by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #709 Motion to Appear by Telephone for counsel Scott Silberfein and Robert Lillienstein.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2017)
October 3, 2017 Filing 709 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at October 10, 2017 Hearing on Universal Card, Inc.'s Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement and to Permanently Enjoin State Court Counterclaims and [Proposed] Order filed by Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC. (Divelbiss, Rod) (Filed on 10/3/2017)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 708 ORDER FOR SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFS REGARDING MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/28/17. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2017)
September 19, 2017 Filing 707 REPLY (re #694 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement and Permanently Enjoin State Court Counterclaims ) filed byUniversal Card, Inc.. (Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 9/19/2017)
September 13, 2017 Filing 706 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #694 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement and Permanently Enjoin State Court Counterclaims ) filed byMichael Han. (Chittur, Krishnan) (Filed on 9/13/2017) Modified on 9/14/2017 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 13, 2017 Electronic filing error. No First Page. See L.R. 3-4(a)(1). Please re-file in its entirety Re: #702 Opposition/Response to Motion filed by Michael Han (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2017)
September 12, 2017 Filing 705 MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities (re #694 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement and Permanently Enjoin State Court Counterclaims ) filed bySam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC. (Divelbiss, Rod) (Filed on 9/12/2017) Modified on 9/13/2017 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2017 Filing 704 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #694 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement and Permanently Enjoin State Court Counterclaims ) filed byLewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Erin Campbell, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam Gutride)(Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 9/12/2017)
September 12, 2017 Filing 703 AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION (re #694 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement and Permanently Enjoin State Court Counterclaims ) filed byMichael Han. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Settlement 1, #2 Exhibit Settlement 2, #3 Exhibit Court Approval, #4 Exhibit Kravic Affidavit)(Chittur, Krishnan) (Filed on 9/12/2017) Modified on 9/13/2017 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2017 Filing 702 ***FILED IN ERROR. RE-FILED AT DOCUMENT #706 *** OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #694 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement and Permanently Enjoin State Court Counterclaims ) filed byMichael Han. (Chittur, Krishnan) (Filed on 9/12/2017) Modified on 9/14/2017 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 701 ORDER by District Judge Claudia Wilken granting #700 Krishnan S. Chittur's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2017)
September 8, 2017 Filing 700 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Krishnan S. Chittur ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11700506.) filed by Michael Han, Kevin Pludeman, Bradley C. Aldrich, Lori Clemens, Thomas F. Torchia. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Chittur, Krishnan) (Filed on 9/8/2017)
September 6, 2017 Filing 698 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Universal Card, Inc. re #694 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement and Permanently Enjoin State Court Counterclaims, #696 Proposed Order, #695 Request for Judicial Notice, #697 Renotice motion hearing (Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 9/6/2017) Modified on 9/7/2017 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 5, 2017 Filing 699 Letter from William H. Kaufman re objections to settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2017)
August 30, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #694 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement and Permanently Enjoin State Court Counterclaims. Motion Hearing set for 10/10/2017 02:30 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2017)
August 30, 2017 Filing 697 Renotice motion hearing re #694 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement and Permanently Enjoin State Court Counterclaims filed byUniversal Card, Inc.. (Related document(s) #694 ) (Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 8/30/2017)
August 29, 2017 CORRECTED Deadlines as to #694 MOTION for Settlement Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement and Permanently Enjoin State Court Counterclaims. Responses due by 9/12/2017. Replies due by 9/19/2017. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2017)
August 29, 2017 Filing 696 Proposed Order re #694 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement and Permanently Enjoin State Court Counterclaims by Universal Card, Inc.. (Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 8/29/2017) Modified on 8/29/2017 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 29, 2017 Filing 695 Request for Judicial Notice re #694 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement and Permanently Enjoin State Court Counterclaims filed byUniversal Card, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) #694 ) (Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 8/29/2017) Modified on 8/29/2017 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 29, 2017 Filing 694 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement and Permanently Enjoin State Court Counterclaims filed by Universal Card, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2017 02:30 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 10/17/2017. Replies due by 10/24/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Nathan Jurczyk, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Declaration Jenny Shawver)(Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 8/29/2017) Modified on 8/29/2017 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 22, 2017 Set/Reset Hearing re #691 Minutes re Motion Hearing. Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement/Attorney Fees etc Hearing set for 11/28/2017 02:30 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2017)
August 15, 2017 Filing 693 ERRATA re Motion for Preliminary Approval and Safier Declaration by Lewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Erin Campbell, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 8/15/2017)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 692 ORDER AS MODIFIED GRANTING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT by Hon. Claudia Wilken.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2017)
August 2, 2017 Filing 690 NOTICE Regarding Amendments Filed in Connection with re #684 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement by Lewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Erin Campbell, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp (Attachments: #1 Amended Settlement Agreement with exhibits)(Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 8/2/2017) Modified on 8/3/2017 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 1, 2017 Filing 691 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Claudia Wilken: Motion Hearing held on 8/1/2017. Court Reporter: Raynee Mercado. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/1/2017)
July 28, 2017 Filing 689 NOTICE regarding additional signature pages re #684 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement by Lewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Erin Campbell, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 7/28/2017) Modified on 7/31/2017 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 6, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #684 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. Motion Hearing set for 8/1/2017 02:30 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2017)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 688 Order by Hon. Claudia Wilken granting #686 Administrative Motion to Advance Hearing Date on Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2017)
July 6, 2017 Filing 687 Proposed Order re #686 Joint ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Advance Hearing Date for Motion for Preliminary Approval by Lewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Erin Campbell, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 7/6/2017) Modified on 7/7/2017 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 5, 2017 Filing 686 Joint ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Advance Hearing Date for Motion for Preliminary Approval filed by Lewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Erin Campbell, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp, MBF Leasing LLC, et al. Responses due by 7/10/2017. (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 7/5/2017) Modified on 7/6/2017 (cpS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/7/2017 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 5, 2017 Filing 685 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 7/5/2017)
July 5, 2017 Filing 684 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Lewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Erin Campbell, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. Motion Hearing set for 8/15/2017 02:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 7/19/2017. Replies due by 7/26/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Seth Safier, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 7/5/2017) Modified on 7/6/2017 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 683 ORDER GRANTING #682 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #668 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs After Appellate Affirmance. Reply due by 7/18/2017. Motion Hearing set for 8/1/2017 02:30 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Signed by Chief Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton as General Duty Judge for Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/30/2017. (cwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2017)
May 30, 2017 Filing 682 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #668 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs After Appellate Affirmance filed by Erin Campbell. (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 5/30/2017)
May 19, 2017 Filing 681 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #668 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs After Appellate Affirmance ) filed bySam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC. (Silberfein, Scott) (Filed on 5/19/2017)
May 18, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #668 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs After Appellate Affirmance. Motion Hearing set for 7/25/2017 02:30 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2017)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 680 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE ON MOTION FOR INTERIM FEES by Hon. Claudia Wilken.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2017)
May 18, 2017 Filing 679 CLARIFICATION/REPLY (re #676 MOTION to Continue hearing date on Plaintiff's Motion for Interim Fees ) filed bySam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC. (Divelbiss, Rod) (Filed on 5/18/2017) Modified on 5/19/2017 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 16, 2017 Filing 678 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #676 MOTION to Continue hearing date on Plaintiff's Motion for Interim Fees ) filed byErin Campbell. (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 5/16/2017)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 677 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO EXTEND BRIEFING DEADLINES RE MOTION FOR INTERIM FEES by Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 5/19/2017. Replies due by 5/30/2017.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2017)
May 12, 2017 Filing 676 MOTION to Continue hearing date on Plaintiff's Motion for Interim Fees filed by Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Divelbiss, Rod) (Filed on 5/12/2017)
May 12, 2017 Filing 675 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #674 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #668 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs After Appellate Affirmance ) filed byErin Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kristen Simplicio)(Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 5/12/2017)
May 12, 2017 Filing 674 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #668 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs After Appellate Affirmance filed by Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Alexandra P. Kolod, Esq.)(Silberfein, Scott) (Filed on 5/12/2017)
May 11, 2017 Filing 673 Transcript of Proceedings held on April 18, 2017, before Judge Claudia Wilken. Court Reporter Raynee H. Mercado, CSR, telephone number 510-502-6175, cacsr8258@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #669 Transcript Order, ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/9/2017. (Related document(s) #669 ) (rhm) (Filed on 5/11/2017)
May 1, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #668 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs After Appellate Affirmance. Responses due by 5/15/2017. Replies due by 5/23/2017. Motion Hearing set for 6/6/2017 02:30 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2017)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 672 Order by Hon. Claudia Wilken granting #671 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR OPPOSITION AND REPLY DEADLINES TO PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR INTERIM AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2017)
April 27, 2017 Filing 671 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Hearing Date and Opposition and Reply Deadlines re #668 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs After Appellate Affirmance filed by Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc.. (Divelbiss, Rod) (Filed on 4/27/2017) Modified on 4/28/2017 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 20, 2017 Filing 669 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/18/2017 before Hon. Claudia Wilken by Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Divelbiss, Rod) (Filed on 4/20/2017) Modified on 4/21/2017 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 18, 2017 Filing 670 Minute Order and Case Management Order. for proceedings held before Hon. Claudia Wilken: Further Case Management Conference held on 4/18/2017. Amended Pleadings due by 7/17/2017; Designation of Experts due by 9/22/2017; Rebuttal Reports due by 10/13/2017; Close of Fact and Expert Discovery due by 10/27/2017; Further Case Management Conference set for 12/19/2017 02:30 PM; Motion Hearing set for 12/19/2017 02:30 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken; Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/27/2018 02:30 PM; Jury Selection/Jury Trial (15 day) set for 4/16/2018 08:30 AM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (sisS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/18/2017)
April 18, 2017 Filing 668 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs After Appellate Affirmance filed by Erin Campbell. Motion Hearing set for 5/23/2017 02:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 5/2/2017. Replies due by 5/9/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam Gutride, #2 Exhibit A (Gutride Decl), #3 Exhibit B (Gutride Decl), #4 Declaration of Kristen Simplicio, #5 Exhibit 1 (Simplicio Decl), #6 Exhibit 2 (Simplicio Decl), #7 Exhibit 3 (Simplicio Decl), #8 Exhibit 4 (Simplicio Decl), #9 Exhibit 5 (Simplicio Decl), #10 Exhibit 6 (Simplicio Decl))(Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 4/18/2017) Modified on 4/19/2017 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 11, 2017 Filing 667 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Verena Baumgartner, Erin Campbell, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, Volker Von Glasenapp, MBF Leasing LLC, et al. (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 4/11/2017) Modified on 4/12/2017 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 11, 2017 Filing 666 Modified Order by Hon. Claudia Wilken granting #665 Motion to Appear by Telephone.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2017)
April 10, 2017 Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. Correct event is Motion to Appear by Telephone. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #665 Proposed Order, filed by Leonard Mezei, et al. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2017)
April 10, 2017 Filing 665 Motion to Appear Telephonically at April 18, 2017 Case Management Conference by Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC. (Divelbiss, Rod) (Filed on 4/10/2017) Modified on 4/10/2017 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
April 3, 2017 Set/Reset Hearing re #664 Order on Stipulation. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/18/2017 02:30 PM. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2017)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 664 Order by Hon. Claudia Wilken granting #663 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2017)
March 31, 2017 Filing 663 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference from April 11, 2017 to April 18, 2017 filed by Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC. (Divelbiss, Rod) (Filed on 3/31/2017) Modified on 4/3/2017 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2017 Filing 662 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for April 11, 2017, before Judge Claudia Wilken, at 2:30 p.m., in Oakland, CA. Please check the public calendar the day before for the courtroom designation. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2017)
March 27, 2017 Filing 661 MANDATE of USCA as to #623 Notice of Appeal, filed by Leonard Mezei, Sam Buono, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., MBF Leasing LLC, Jay Cohen, Northern Funding, LLC, SKS Associates LLC, Sara Krieger (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2017)
February 7, 2017 Filing 660 OPINION of USCA as to USCA Case Number 14-16132 (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2017) Modified on 2/8/2017 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 659 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #658 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Thomas J. Kavaler.(jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2016)
April 6, 2016 Filing 658 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10350202.) filed by Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC. (Kavaler, Thomas) (Filed on 4/6/2016)
April 5, 2016 Filing 657 Appendix A (Motion for Interim Fees, Exhibits)(public filing of documents filed under seal at Dkt. #647 ) pursuant to re #655 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, filed byErin Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 6)(Related document(s) #655 ) (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 4/5/2016) Modified on 4/6/2016 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 5, 2016 Set/Reset Hearing. Motion Hearing Vacated re: #656 Order. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2016)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 656 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO LIFT THE STAY by Hon. Claudia Wilken denying #650 Motion to Lift Stay. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2016)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 655 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO SEAL. Plaintiffs shall file an unredacted version of the document in the public record by Hon. Claudia Wilken denying #647 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2016) Modified on 4/5/2016 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
March 29, 2016 Filing 654 REPLY (re #650 MOTION to Lift Stay (Redacted. Portions under Seal at #647) ) filed byErin Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Reply Declaration of Adam Gutride)(Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 3/29/2016)
March 22, 2016 Filing 653 RESPONSE (re #650 MOTION to Lift Stay (Redacted. Portions under Seal at #647) ) Leasing Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Lift Stay filed bySam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Scott Silberfein in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Lift Stay, #2 Exhibit A)(Silberfein, Scott) (Filed on 3/22/2016)
March 11, 2016 *******Per order #652 . Set/Reset Deadlines as to #650 MOTION to Lift Stay (Redacted. Portions under Seal at #647). Responses due by 3/22/2016. Replies due by 3/29/2016. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2016)
March 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 652 STIPULATION AND ORDER PURSUANT TO LOCAL CIVIL RULE 6-2(b) TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF ERIN CAMPBELLS MOTION TO LIFT STAY by Hon. Claudia Wilken granting #651 Stipulation. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs Motion by March 22, 2016; Plaintiff shall file her reply by March 29, 2016. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2016)
March 9, 2016 Filing 651 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time to Respond to re #650 MOTION to Lift Stay (Redacted. Portions under Seal at #647) filed by Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC, Rainbow Business Services, et al. (Silberfein, Scott) (Filed on 3/9/2016) Modified on 3/10/2016 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
March 3, 2016 Filing 650 MOTION to Lift Stay (Redacted. Portions under Seal at #647) filed by Erin Campbell. Motion Hearing set for 4/12/2016 02:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 3/17/2016. Replies due by 3/24/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam Gutride ISO Motion to Lift Stay, #2 Appendix A Part I (Motion for Interim Fees - Redacted), #3 Appendix A Part II (Gutride Decl ISO Motion for Interim Fees), #4 Appendix A Part III (Gutride Decl Ex. A), #5 Appendix A Part IV (Simplicio Decl ISO Mtn for Interim Fees), #6 Appendix A Part V (Simplicio Decl. Ex 3), #7 Appendix A Part VI (Simplicio Decl. Ex. 4), #8 Appendix A Part VII (Simplicio Decl. Ex 5))(Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 3/3/2016)
March 3, 2016 Filing 649 CLERK'S NOTICE. You are hereby notified that docket no. #648 was filed incorrectly. Counsel has been advised to withdraw the document and re-file as a formal motion. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2016)
March 1, 2016 Filing 648 MOTION Lift Stay for Limited Purpose of Submitting a Fee Petition (Administrative Motion - Local Rule 7-11) filed by Erin Campbell. Responses due by 3/21/2016. Replies due by 3/23/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam Gutride ISO Admin Mtn to Lift Stay, #2 Appendix A Part I (Motion for Interim Fees - Redacted), #3 Appendix A Part II (Gutride Decl ISO Motion for Interim Fees), #4 Appendix A Part III (Gutride Decl Ex. A), #5 Appendix A Part IV (Simplicio Decl ISO Mtn for Interim Fees), #6 Appendix A Part V (Simplicio Decl. Ex 3), #7 Appendix A Part VI (Simplicio Decl. Ex. 4), #8 Appendix A Part VII (Simplicio Decl. Ex 5))(Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 3/1/2016) Modified on 3/2/2016 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
March 1, 2016 Filing 647 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Appendix A to Administrative Motion to Lift Stay for Limited Purpose of Submitting Interim Fee Petition filed by Erin Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Appendix A (Motion for Interim Fees - Under Seal), #4 Appendix A (Motion for Interim Fees - Redacted, #5 Appendix A (Simplicio Decl Ex 1), #6 Appendix A (Simplicio Decl Ex 2), #7 Appendix A (Simplicio Decl Ex 6))(Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 3/1/2016)
October 7, 2014 Filing 645 NOTICE of Change of Address by Kristen Gelinas Simplicio (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 10/7/2014)
July 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 644 Order granting #640 Stipulation entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
July 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 643 STIPULATION AND ORDER Modifying Time on Discovery Motion signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Plaintiff's motion is hereby resolved and no hearing thereon is necessary. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2014)
July 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 642 Order granting #639 Stipulation entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
July 21, 2014 Filing 640 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Staying Case Pending Ninth Circuit Ruling on Appeal filed by Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC, Rainbow Business Services, et al. (Silberfein, Scott) (Filed on 7/21/2014) Modified on 7/22/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 21, 2014 Filing 639 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #617 MOTION to Compel Complete Production in Response to Plaintiffs' Requests for Production (REDACTED) Resolving Motion filed by Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC, Rainbow Business Services. (Silberfein, Scott) (Filed on 7/21/2014) Modified on 7/22/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 17, 2014 ***See Order #638 . Set/Reset Deadlines as to #617 MOTION to Compel Complete Production in Response to Plaintiffs' Requests for Production (REDACTED). Responses due by 7/22/2014. Replies due by 7/29/2014. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2014)
July 16, 2014 Set/Reset Hearing re #617 MOTION to Compel Complete Production in Response to Plaintiffs' Requests for Production (REDACTED) Motion Hearing set for 8/12/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2014)
July 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 638 STIPULATION AND ORDER Modifying Time on Discovery Motion signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. The hearing on Plaintiffs' motion to compel #617 is continued from August 5, 2014 to August 12, 2014. Defendants' opposition shall be due July 22, 2014, and Plaintiffs' reply shall be due July 29, 2014. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2014)
July 15, 2014 Filing 637 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Modifying Time on re #617 MOTION to Compel Complete Production in Response to Plaintiffs' Requests for Production filed by Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC, Rainbow Business Services. (Silberfein, Scott) (Filed on 7/15/2014) Modified on 7/16/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 10, 2014 Set/Reset Hearing re #617 MOTION to Compel Complete Production in Response to Plaintiffs' Requests for Production (REDACTED) Motion Hearing set for 8/5/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2014)
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 636 STIPULATION AND ORDER Modifying Time on Discovery Motion by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte.(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2014)
July 9, 2014 Filing 635 Transcript Designation Form for proceedings held on 8/29/13 before Judge Claudia Wilken, (Divelbiss, Rod) (Filed on 7/9/2014)
July 9, 2014 Filing 634 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Divelbiss, Rod) (Filed on 7/9/2014)
July 7, 2014 Filing 633 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Modifying Time re #617 MOTION to Compel filed by Verena Baumgartner, Erin Campbell, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp, Sam Buono, et al. (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 7/7/2014) Modified on 7/8/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
June 24, 2014 Set/Reset Hearing Motion Hearing set for 7/29/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2014)
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 632 STIPULATION AND ORDER modifying time on discovery motion signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Plaintiffs' motion to compel is continued to July 29, 2014. Defendants' opposition shall be due July 8, 2014 and Plaintiffs' reply shall be due July 15, 2014. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2014)
June 23, 2014 Filing 631 JOINT STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Modifying Time on Discovery Motion re #617 MOTION to Compel Complete Production in Response to Plaintiffs' Requests for Production (REDACTED) filed by Verena Baumgartner, Erin Campbell, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 6/23/2014) Modified on 6/24/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
June 18, 2014 Filing 630 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Approval of Class Notice and Notice Plan (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 6/18/2014)
June 17, 2014 Reset Hearings (see docket no. 629 ) : Further Case Management Conference / Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2014 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2014)
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 629 Order granting #615 Stipulation entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
June 16, 2014 Filing 628 CLERKS NOTICE: Notice is hereby given that the Court, on its own motion, continues the hearing re Plaintiffs' motion to compel #617 from 7/15/2014 at 9:00 AM to 7/22/2014 at 9:00 AM. in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. All other related case deadlines shall remain the same. This is a text only entry, there is no document associated with this notice. . (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2014)
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 627 ORDER Denying #618 Plaintiffs' motion to shorten time by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte.(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2014)
June 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 625 Order granting #622 Stipulation entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
June 13, 2014 Filing 624 RESPONSE (re #618 MOTION to Shorten Time FOR HEARING OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLETE RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS ) filed bySam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC. (Silberfein, Scott) (Filed on 6/13/2014)
June 12, 2014 Filing 623 NOTICE OF PAYMENT OF FEES IN LIEU OF NOTICE OF APPEAL re #620 , USCA Order #621 (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-8692460 paid.) by Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC. (Silberfein, Scott) (Filed on 6/12/2014) Modified on 6/13/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/13/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
June 12, 2014 Filing 622 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time to Respond to re #614 MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF PROPOSED CLASS NOTICE AND PLAN OF NOTICE filed by Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC. (Silberfein, Scott) (Filed on 6/12/2014) Modified on 6/13/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
June 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 621 ORDER of USCA: grants petitions for permission to appeal the district court's December 20, 2013 and March 17, 2014 orders re class certification as to #600 USCA Case Number, #599 USCA Case Number (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2014)
June 12, 2014 Filing 620 USCA Case Number 14-16132. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2014)
June 11, 2014 Filing 619 Declaration of Kristen Simplicio in Support of #618 MOTION to Shorten Time FOR HEARING OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLETE RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS filed byVerena Baumgartner, Erin Campbell, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Related document(s) #618 ) (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 6/11/2014)
June 10, 2014 Filing 618 MOTION to Shorten Time FOR HEARING OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLETE RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS filed by Verena Baumgartner, Erin Campbell, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 6/10/2014) Modified on 6/11/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
June 10, 2014 Filing 617 MOTION to Compel Complete Production in Response to Plaintiffs' Requests for Production (REDACTED) filed by Verena Baumgartner, Erin Campbell, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. Motion Hearing set for 7/15/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 6/24/2014. Replies due by 7/1/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kristen Simplicio, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit H, #7 Exhibit I, #8 Exhibit J, #9 Exhibit K, #10 Exhibit L)(Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
June 10, 2014 Filing 616 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Complete Production and Supporting Exhibits filed by Verena Baumgartner, Erin Campbell, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kristen Simplicio, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Motion to Compel (redacted), #4 Motion to Compel (under seal), #5 Exhibit E (under seal), #6 Exhibit F (under seal), #7 Exhibit G (under seal))(Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
June 2, 2014 Filing 615 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Pursuant To Rule 30(A)(2)(A)(I) filed by Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC, Merchant Services Inc (Silberfein, Scott) (Filed on 6/2/2014) Modified on 6/3/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 29, 2014 Filing 614 MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF PROPOSED CLASS NOTICE AND PLAN OF NOTICE filed by Verena Baumgartner, Erin Campbell, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, Volker Von Glasenapp. Motion Hearing set for 7/10/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 6/12/2014. Replies due by 6/19/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kristen Simplicio (with Exhibits))(Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 5/29/2014)
May 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 613 ORDER Granting, In Part, Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel #588 by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte: Leasing Defendants are ordered to complete production of the documents in accordance with their representations in their Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel by May 30, 2014. Leasing Defendants shall produce, by May 30, 2014, all non-privileged, non-public documents relating to Northern Leasing Systems Inc.s claim in the bankruptcy proceeding consistent with the discussions on the record at the May 6 Hearing. Defendants Leonard Mezei and Jay Cohen shall produce all phone records of calls to, from, or with Jonathan Mirsky made in March, April, and May 2011, consistent with the discussions on the record at the May 6 Hearing (see order for further details).(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2014)
May 13, 2014 Filing 612 Proposed Order re #588 MOTION to Compel Production of Plaintiffs' Third Set of Requests for Production of Documents by Verena Baumgartner, Erin Campbell, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 5/13/2014)
May 9, 2014 Filing 611 Letter from Plaintiffs Counsel re Proposed Order on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel . (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
May 9, 2014 Filing 610 Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 5/9/2014 before Elizabeth D. Laporte (Date Filed: 5/9/2014). (Recording #2:08-2:26.) (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/9/2014) Modified on 5/12/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 5, 2014 Filing 609 MANDATE of USCA as to #582 Notice of Appeal, filed by Leonard Mezei, Sam Buono, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., MBF Leasing LLC, Jay Cohen, Northern Funding, LLC, SKS Associates LLC, Sara Krieger (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2014)
May 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 608 ORDER by Judge Wilken denying #604 Motion to Stay; denying #605 Motion for Temporary Stay (cwlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2014)
May 1, 2014 Filing 607 REPLY (re #605 MOTION for Order Granting Temporary Stay Pending Hearing on Leasing Defendatns' Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Ninth Circuit Guidance ) filed bySam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit in Support of Response to Opposition to Administrative Motion)(Divelbiss, Rod) (Filed on 5/1/2014)
May 1, 2014 Filing 606 RESPONSE (re #605 MOTION for Order Granting Temporary Stay Pending Hearing on Leasing Defendants' Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Ninth Circuit Guidance ) Plaintiffs' Opposition filed byVerena Baumgartner, Erin Campbell, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kristen Simplicio)(Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 5/1/2014) Modified on 5/2/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 29, 2014 Filing 605 MOTION for Order Granting Temporary Stay Pending Hearing on Leasing Defendants' Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Ninth Circuit Guidance filed by Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC. Responses due by 5/5/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rod Divelbiss, #2 Exhibit Exhibits to Declaration of Rod Divelbiss, #3 Proposed Order)(Divelbiss, Rod) (Filed on 4/29/2014) Modified on 4/30/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/2/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 24, 2014 Filing 604 MOTION to Stay Action Pending Resolution of Rule 23(f) Petitions and Any Subsequent Appeal filed by Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC. Motion Hearing set for 5/29/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 5/8/2014. Replies due by 5/15/2014. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Order)(Divelbiss, Rod) (Filed on 4/24/2014)
April 21, 2014 ***See order document # 603 . Set/Reset Hearing. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/4/2014 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 12/4/2014 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2014)
April 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 603 Order granting #597 Stipulation entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
April 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 602 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #598 STIPULATION To Extend Return Date of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel filed by Leonard Mezei, MBF Leasing LLC, Sam Buono, Rainbow Business Services, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., Jay Cohen, Northern Funding, LLC, SKS Associates LLC, Sara Krieger, Set/Reset Deadlines as to #598 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Extend Return Date of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel, #588 MOTION to Compel Production of Plaintiffs' Third Set of Requests for Production of Documents. Motion Hearing set for 5/6/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 4/11/2014. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2014)
April 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 601 ORDER of USCA as to #582 Notice of Appeal, filed by Leonard Mezei, Sam Buono, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., MBF Leasing LLC, Jay Cohen, Northern Funding, LLC, SKS Associates LLC, Sara Krieger (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
April 10, 2014 Filing 600 USCA Case Number 14-80051 by Rainbow Business Service. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
April 10, 2014 Filing 599 USCA Case Number 14-80050 by Just Film, Inc. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2014) Modified on 4/10/2014 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
April 10, 2014 Filing 598 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Extend Return Date of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel filed by Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC, Rainbow Business Services, et al. (Silberfein, Scott) (Filed on 4/10/2014) Modified on 4/11/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 9, 2014 Filing 597 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER On Deposition Limit and Discovery and Case Management Schedule filed by Verena Baumgartner, Erin Campbell, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp, Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding LLC, SKS Associates LLC. (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 4/9/2014) Modified on 4/10/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 2, 2014 Filing 596 REPLY (re #588 MOTION to Compel Production of Plaintiffs' Third Set of Requests for Production of Documents ) filed byVerena Baumgartner, Erin Campbell, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Kristen G. Simplicio, #2 Exhibit J, #3 Exhibit K)(Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 4/2/2014)
March 28, 2014 Filing 595 RESPONSE (re #588 MOTION to Compel Production of Plaintiffs' Third Set of Requests for Production of Documents ) filed bySam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC. (Divelbiss, Rod) (Filed on 3/28/2014)
March 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 594 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #593 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to re #588 MOTION to Compel Production of Plaintiffs' Third Set of Requests for Production of Documents Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Comp filed by The Rose Dress Inc, Leonard Mezei, Jerry Su, Erin Campbell, MBF Leasing LLC, Volker Von Glasenapp, Verena Baumgartner, Sam Buono, Rainbow Business Services, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., Jay Cohen, Northern Funding, LLC, SKS Associates LLC, Terry Jordan, Dietz Towing Inc, Sara Krieger. Responses due by 3/28/2014. Replies due by 4/2/2014. Motion Hearing set for 4/14/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 3/19/2014. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2014)
March 18, 2014 Filing 593 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time to Respond to re #588 MOTION to Compel Production of Plaintiffs' Third Set of Requests for Production of Documents filed by Verena Baumgartner, Erin Campbell, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp, Sam Buono, et al. (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 3/18/2014) Modified on 3/19/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
March 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 592 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF ERIN CAMPBELLS #584 MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/17/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2014)
March 3, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #588 MOTION to Compel Production of Plaintiffs' Third Set of Requests for Production of Documents. Responses due by 3/18/2014. Replies due by 3/25/2014. Motion Hearing set for 4/8/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2014)
March 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 591 Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting #590 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2014)
March 3, 2014 Filing 590 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time to Respond to re #588 MOTION to Compel Production of Plaintiffs' Third Set of Requests for Production of Documents filed by Lewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Erin Campbell, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp, MBF Leasing LLC, et al. (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 3/3/2014) Modified on 3/3/2014 (cp, COURT STAFF).
February 19, 2014 Filing 589 REPLY (re #587 MOTION for Leave to Seek Reconsideration of Order Partially Granting Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Class Certification ) (Plaintiff' Reply) filed byErin Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kristen G. Simplicio, #2 Exhibit RRRRR to Simplicio Declaration, #3 Declaration of Erin Campbell, #4 Declaration Robin Kopit)(Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 2/19/2014)
February 18, 2014 Filing 588 MOTION to Compel Production of Plaintiffs' Third Set of Requests for Production of Documents filed by Verena Baumgartner, Erin Campbell, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. Motion Hearing set for 3/25/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 3/4/2014. Replies due by 3/11/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kristen Simplicio (with Exhibits))(Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 2/18/2014)
February 14, 2014 Filing 587 MOTION for Leave to Seek Reconsideration of Order Partially Granting Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Class Certification filed by Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC. (Divelbiss, Rod) (Filed on 2/14/2014) Modified on 2/18/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/19/2014 (ndr, COURT STAFF).
February 14, 2014 Filing 586 RESPONSE to Docket #584 Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration of Order Partially Granting Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Class Certification by Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC. (Divelbiss, Rod) (Filed on 2/14/2014) Modified on 2/18/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
February 7, 2014 Reset Deadlines (See Docket No. #585 ): Responses due by 2/14/2014. Replies due by 2/19/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2014)
February 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 585 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' #584 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2014) Modified on 2/10/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 15, 2014 Filing 584 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SEEK RECONSIDERATION OF DENIAL OF CERTIFICATION OF THE SKS POST-LEASE EXPIRATION CLASS #581 filed by Erin Campbell. (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 1/15/2014) Modified on 1/16/2014 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 6, 2014 Filing 583 USCA Case Number 14-15012 for #582 Notice of Appeal, filed by Leonard Mezei, Sam Buono, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., MBF Leasing LLC, Jay Cohen, Northern Funding, LLC, SKS Associates LLC, Sara Krieger. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2014)
January 2, 2014 Filing 582 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC.(Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-8266198 paid.) (Divelbiss, Rod) (Filed on 1/2/2014)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 581 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFFS #508 MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 11, 2013 Filing 580 CLERK'S JUDGMENT (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2013)
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 579 ORDER Re #551 Plaintiffs' Application for Attorneys Fees, Costs and Incentive Awards. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/11/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2013)
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 578 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting #551 Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Judgment (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2013)
December 10, 2013 Filing 577 Proposed Order re #551 APPLICATION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES, COSTS AND INCENTIVE AWARDS by Verena Baumgartner, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 12/10/2013) Modified on 12/11/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
December 10, 2013 Filing 576 Proposed Order re #551 MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND JUDGMENT by Verena Baumgartner, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 12/10/2013) Modified on 12/11/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
December 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 575 Order granting #571 Motion to Appear by Telephone entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
December 9, 2013 Filing 574 Supplemental Declaration of Jenny Cudworth Regarding Claim Filing Rate filed byVerena Baumgartner, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Related document(s) #573 , #551 ) (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 12/9/2013) Modified on 12/10/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
December 9, 2013 Filing 573 Second Supplemental Memorandum in support of re #551 MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and for Attorneys Fees, Costs and Incentive Awards filed byVerena Baumgartner, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sally Greenberg, #2 Declaration of Oren Sellstrom, #3 Declaration of Jenny DaSilva)(Related document(s) #551 ) (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 12/9/2013) Modified on 12/10/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
December 9, 2013 Filing 572 STIPULATION Regarding Amended Settlement Agreement filed by Verena Baumgartner, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, Volker Von Glasenapp, Fiona Walshe, Universal Merchant Services LLC, Universal Card Inc, Alicyn Roy, Robert Parisi, Jason Moore Merchant Services Inc, Eric Madura, Nathan Jurczyk. (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 12/9/2013) Modified on 12/10/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
December 9, 2013 Filing 571 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Hearing on December 12, 2013 filed by Fiona Walshe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wegner, Matthew) (Filed on 12/9/2013)
December 6, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing re #570 Order on Stipulation. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/14/2014 02:00 PM. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2013)
December 5, 2013 Set Deadlines/Hearings (See Docket No. #570 ): Further Case Management Conference / Motion Hearing set for 8/14/2014 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2013)
December 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 570 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting #567 Stipulation To RESET DEADLINES FOR EXPERT DISCLOSURE AND DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2013)
December 5, 2013 Reset Deadlines as to #551 MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and for Attorneys Fees, Costs and Incentive Awards (see docket no. 569 : Motion Hearing set for 12/12/2013 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2013)
December 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 569 Order granting #568 Stipulation entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
December 4, 2013 Filing 568 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Hearing to December 12, 2013 filed by Verena Baumgartner, Burlingame Motors Inc, Dietz Towing Inc, Rainbow Business Services, Volker Von Glasenapp, Merchant Services, Fiona Walshe, et al. (Gutride, Adam) (Filed on 12/4/2013) Modified on 12/5/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2013 Filing 567 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To RESET DEADLINES FOR EXPERT DISCLOSURE AND DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS filed by Verena Baumgartner, Erin Campbell, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp, Sam Buono, et al. (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 12/4/2013) Modified on 12/5/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2013 Filing 565 Declaration of Mediator Antonio Piazza In Support Of Final Approval Of Class Action Settlement by Nathan Jurczyk, Eric Madura, Merchant Services, Inc, Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Robert Parisi, Alicyn Roy, Universal Card, Inc., Universal Merchant Services LLC. (Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 12/4/2013) Modified on 12/5/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2013 Filing 564 Settling Defendants' Position Statement Regarding Final Approval Of Class Action Settlement by Nathan Jurczyk, Eric Madura, Merchant Services, Inc, Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Robert Parisi, Alicyn Roy, Universal Card, Inc., Universal Merchant Services LLC., Fiona Walshe (Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 12/4/2013) Modified on 12/5/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
December 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 563 Order granting #562 Motion to Appear by Telephone entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
December 2, 2013 Filing 562 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Hearing on December 5, 2013 filed by Fiona Walshe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wegner, Matthew) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
November 26, 2013 Filing 561 Transcript of Proceedings held on November 21, 2013, before Judge Claudia Wilken. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov, diane.transcripts@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/24/2014. (Related documents(s) #560 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 11/26/2013)
November 25, 2013 Filing 560 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Verena Baumgartner, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, Volker Von Glasenapp for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
November 21, 2013 Filing 566 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 11/21/2013 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 11/21/2013). Motion Hearing set for 12/5/2013 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (Court Reporter Diane Skillman.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/21/2013)
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 559 Order granting #558 Motion to Appear by Telephone entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
November 15, 2013 Filing 558 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Fiona Walshe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Park, Janet) (Filed on 11/15/2013)
November 14, 2013 Filing 557 Declaration of Nathan Jurczyk re settlement notice by Nathan Jurczyk, Eric Madura, Merchant Services, Inc, Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Robert Parisi, Alicyn Roy, Universal Card, Inc., Universal Merchant Services LLC. (Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 11/14/2013) Modified on 11/15/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
November 7, 2013 Filing 556 Supplemental Memorandum in Support of #551 MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and for Attorneys Fees, Costs and Incentive Awards filed byVerena Baumgartner, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam Gutride)(Related document(s) #551 ) (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 11/7/2013) Modified on 11/8/2013 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
November 6, 2013 Filing 555 NOTICE Regarding Settlement Class Notice and Exclustions by Verena Baumgartner, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, Volker Von Glasenapp CORRECTION OF DOCKET #554 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jenny Cudworth (with exhibits))(Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 11/6/2013) Modified on 11/7/2013 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
November 6, 2013 Filing 554 ***FILED IN ERROR, REFER TO DOCUMENT #555 *** NOTICE Regarding Settlment Class Notice and Exclustions by Verena Baumgartner, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jenny Cudworth (with exhibits))(Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 11/6/2013) Modified on 11/7/2013 (kcS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/12/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 22, 2013 Filing 553 Supplemental Declaration of Marilee Bass in Support of #551 MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and for Attorneys Fees, Costs and Incentive Awards filed byVerena Baumgartner, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Related document(s) #551 ) (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 10/22/2013) Modified on 10/23/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 22, 2013 Filing 552 Declaration of Michael Sweet in Support of #551 MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and for Attorneys Fees, Costs and Incentive Awards filed byVerena Baumgartner, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Related document(s) #551 ) (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 10/22/2013)
October 3, 2013 Filing 551 MOTION for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and for Attorneys Fees, Costs and Incentive Awards filed by Verena Baumgartner, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, Volker Von Glasenapp. Motion Hearing set for 11/21/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 10/24/2013. Replies due by 11/7/2013. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Adam Gutride, #2 Declaration Declaration of Marilee Bass)(Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 10/3/2013) Modified on 10/4/2013 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
September 24, 2013 Filing 550 Transcript of Proceedings held on August 29, 2013, before Judge Claudia Wilken. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov, diane.transcripts@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/23/2013. (Related documents(s) #546 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 9/24/2013)
September 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 549 Order granting #548 Stipulation entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
September 12, 2013 Filing 548 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO RESET DEADLINES FOR EXPERT DISCLOSURE filed by Verena Baumgartner, Erin Campbell, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 9/12/2013)
September 6, 2013 Filing 547 NOTICE by Nathan Jurczyk, Eric Madura, Merchant Services, Inc, Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Robert Parisi, Alicyn Roy, Universal Card, Inc., Universal Merchant Services LLC of further service on federal and state CAFA officials (Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 9/6/2013)
September 4, 2013 Filing 546 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Divelbiss, Rod) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
August 29, 2013 Filing 545 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 8/29/2013 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 8/29/2013). (Court Reporter Diane Skillman.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/29/2013)
August 15, 2013 Filing 544 SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY (re #508 Amended MOTION to Certify Class REDACTED per 5/10/13 Court Order [Dkt. # 505] ) filed byVerena Baumgartner, Erin Campbell, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 8/15/2013) Modified on 8/16/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 12, 2013 Filing 543 Declaration of Nathan Jurczyk by Nathan Jurczyk, Eric Madura, Merchant Services, Inc, Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Robert Parisi, Alicyn Roy, Universal Card, Inc., Universal Merchant Services LLC. (Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 8/12/2013) Modified on 8/13/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 8, 2013 Filing 542 Declaration of Jennifer Nigro in Support of Leasing Defendants' #541 Sur-reply (re #508 Amended MOTION to Certify Class REDACTED per 5/10/13 Court Order [Dkt. # 505] filed bySam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 54, #2 Exhibit 55, #3 Declaration DeRussy, #4 Exhibit 49, #5 Exhibit 50, #6 Exhibit 51, #7 Exhibit 52, #8 Exhibit 53)(Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/8/2013) Modified on 8/9/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 8, 2013 Filing 541 SUR-REPLY (re #508 Amended MOTION to Certify Class REDACTED per 5/10/13 Court Order [Dkt. # 505] ) filed bySam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC. (Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/8/2013) Modified on 8/9/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 8, 2013 Filing 540 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/8/2013) Modified on 1/2/2014 (ndr, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2013 See Docket No. #539 . Reset Deadlines as to #508 Amended MOTION to Certify Class: Responses due by 8/8/2013; Replies due by 8/15/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2013)
July 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 539 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING PLAINTIFFS' #538 MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME FOR HEARING OF PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2013) Modified on 7/29/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 25, 2013 Filing 538 MOTION to Shorten Time on Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Class Certification filed by Verena Baumgartner, Erin Campbell, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Simplicio Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 7/25/2013)
July 25, 2013 Filing 537 Renotice motion hearing re #508 Amended MOTION to Certify Class REDACTED per 5/10/13 Court Order [Dkt. # 505] filed byVerena Baumgartner, Erin Campbell, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. Motion Hearing set for 8/29/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (Related document(s) #508 ) (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 7/25/2013)
July 25, 2013 Filing 536 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #505 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, Errata - Exhibits B, D, KK to Amended Pltf Mtn for Class Cert (dkt 534) by Verena Baumgartner, Erin Campbell, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D (sealed), #2 Exhibit KK (sealed))(Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 7/25/2013)
July 25, 2013 Filing 535 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #505 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, ERRATA (Exhibit A, Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Class Cert (Dkt. 533) by Verena Baumgartner, Erin Campbell, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 7/25/2013)
July 25, 2013 Filing 534 ERRATA re #508 Amended MOTION to Certify Class REDACTED per 5/10/13 Court Order [Dkt. # 505], #511 Exhibits,,,,, #512 Exhibits,,, #510 Exhibits,,,, #509 Exhibits,,,, #514 Reply to Opposition/Response,, Amended Exhibits to Declaration of Kristen Simplicio by Verena Baumgartner, Erin Campbell, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B (redacted), #2 Exhibit D (redacted), #3 Exhibit KK (redacted), #4 Exhibit DDD, #5 Exhibit PPP, #6 Exhibit QQQ, #7 Exhibit YYY, #8 Exhibit DDDD, #9 Exhibit GGGG, #10 Exhibit LLLLL, #11 Exhibit MMMMM)(Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 7/25/2013)
July 25, 2013 Filing 533 ERRATA re #508 Amended MOTION to Certify Class REDACTED per 5/10/13 Court Order [Dkt. # 505] (redacted) by Verena Baumgartner, Erin Campbell, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Attachments: #1 Errata Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification)(Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 7/25/2013)
July 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 532 ORDER VACATING HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS #508 MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/22/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2013)
July 18, 2013 Filing 531 RESPONSE (re #530 MOTION to Continue hearing on Plaintiffs Amended Notice for Plaintiffs Amended Motion for Class Certification filed byVerena Baumgartner, Erin Campbell, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 7/18/2013) Modified on 7/19/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 17, 2013 **See Docket No. 529 ** Reset Deadlines/Hearing: Motions due by 10/3/2013. Responses due by 10/24/2013. Replies due by 11/7/2013. Motion Hearing set for 11/21/2013 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2013)
July 16, 2013 Filing 530 MOTION to Continue hearing on Plaintiffs Amended Notice for Plaintiffs Amended Motion for Class Certification filed by Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC. Responses due by 7/22/2013. Replies due by 7/23/2013. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/16/2013) Modified on 7/17/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 529 Order granting #528 Stipulation entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
July 11, 2013 Filing 528 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to continue dates set forth in preliminary approval order #524
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 527 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING PLAINTIFFS #523 MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME FOR HEARING ON MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND GRANTING #526 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013)
June 25, 2013 Filing 526 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Support of Their Motion to Shorten Time for Hearing re Amended Motion for Class Certification; REPLY (re #523 MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing of Amended Motion for Class Certification (dkt.# 522) ) filed byVerena Baumgartner, Erin Campbell, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 6/25/2013) Modified on 6/26/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
June 24, 2013 Filing 525 RESPONSE (re #523 MOTION to Shorten Time for Hearing of Amended Motion for Class Certification (dkt.# 522) ) Leasing Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Amended Notice of Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Class Certification and in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Shorten Time for Hearing of Amended Motion for Class Certification filed bySam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jennifer Nigro, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Jennifer Nigro, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Jennifer Nigro)(Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 524 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING #496 MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Claim Form, #2 Exhibit B-Part 1: Long-Form Notice, #3 Exhibit B-Part 2: Postcard Notice) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
June 21, 2013 Filing 523 MOTION to Shorten for Hearing of Amended Motion for Class Certification (dkt.# 522) filed by Verena Baumgartner, Erin Campbell, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Kristen Simplicio, #2 Proposed Order)(Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 6/21/2013) Modified on 6/24/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
June 20, 2013 Filing 522 Renotice motion hearing re #508 Amended MOTION to Certify Class REDACTED per 5/10/13 Court Order [Dkt. # 505] filed byVerena Baumgartner, Erin Campbell, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, Volker Von Glasenapp. Motion Hearing set for 7/25/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (Related document(s) #508 ) (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 6/20/2013)
June 18, 2013 Filing 521 NOTICE of mailing of CAFA notice pursuant to 28 USC 1715 by Nathan Jurczyk, Eric Madura, Merchant Services, Inc, Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Robert Parisi, Alicyn Roy, Universal Card, Inc., Universal Merchant Services LLC. (Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 6/18/2013) Modified on 6/19/2013 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
June 10, 2013 Filing 520 Declaration of Kristen Simplicio in Support of #519 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Amended Settlement Agreement and Proposed Order of Preliminary Approval filed byVerena Baumgartner, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Related document(s) #519 ) (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 6/10/2013)
June 6, 2013 Filing 519 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Amended Settlement Agreement and Proposed Order of Preliminary Approval filed by Verena Baumgartner, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, Volker Von Glasenapp, Merchant Services Inc, Fiona Walshe, et al. (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 6/6/2013) Modified on 6/7/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
June 5, 2013 Filing 518 Letter from Plaintiffs' Counsel Regarding Status of Settlement Discussions. (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 6/5/2013) Modified on 6/6/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 517 Order granting #516 Stipulation entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
May 30, 2013 Filing 516 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING DEADLINE FOR RESPONDING TO ISSUES RAISED AT HEARING ON PRELIMINARY APPROVAL filed by Verena Baumgartner, Erin Campbell, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp, Fioane Walshe. (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 5/30/2013) Modified on 5/31/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 23, 2013 Filing 515 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #505 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Supplemental Declaration of Kristen G. Simplicio Declaration ISO Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification by Verena Baumgartner, Erin Campbell, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NNNNN)(Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 5/23/2013) Modified on 5/24/2013 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
May 23, 2013 Filing 514 REPLY (re #508 Amended MOTION to Certify Class REDACTED per 5/10/13 Court Order [Dkt. # 505] ) filed per 5/10/13 Court Order [Dkt. # 505] filed byVerena Baumgartner, Erin Campbell, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Kristen Simplicio, #2 Exhibit HHHHH, #3 Exhibit IIIII, #4 Exhibit JJJJJ, #5 Exhibit KKKKK, #6 Errata LLLLL, #7 Exhibit MMMMM, #8 Exhibit NNNNN (partially redacted), #9 Exhibit OOOOO, #10 Exhibit PPPPPP, #11 Exhibit QQQQQ)(Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 5/23/2013)
May 23, 2013 Filing 513 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #505 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification (UNDER SEAL) by Verena Baumgartner, Erin Campbell, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Attachments: #1 Sands Declaration (under seal), #2 Simplicio Declaration (under seal), #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit N, #10 Exhibit O, #11 Exhibit Q, #12 Exhibit Y, #13 Exhibit AA, #14 Exhibit BB PART 1, #15 Exhibit BB PART 2, #16 Exhibit FF, #17 Exhibit GG, #18 Exhibit KK, #19 Exhibit MM, #20 Exhibit NN, #21 Exhibit OO, #22 Exhibit QQ, #23 Exhibit RR, #24 Exhibit SS, #25 Exhibit VV, #26 Exhibit WW, #27 Exhibit EEE, #28 Exhibit FFF, #29 Exhibit GGG, #30 Exhibit HHH, #31 Exhibit JJJ, #32 Exhibit VVVV, #33 Exhibit YYYY, #34 Exhibit BBBBB)(Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 5/23/2013)
May 23, 2013 Filing 512 EXHIBITS re #508 Amended MOTION to Certify Class REDACTED per 5/10/13 Court Order [Dkt. # 505], #505 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, Amended MOTION to Certify Class REDACTED per 5/10/13 Court Order [Dkt. # 505], #505 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, Amended MOTION to Certify Class REDACTED per 5/10/13 Court Order [Dkt. # 505] Simplicio Decl ISO Class Cert Exhibits AAAAA-ZZZZZ REDACTED per 5/10/13 Court Order [Dkt. # 505] Ex. AAAA filed byVerena Baumgartner, Erin Campbell, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit BBBBB (partially redacted), #2 Exhibit CCCCC, #3 Exhibit DDDDD, #4 Exhibit EEEEE, #5 Exhibit FFFFF, #6 Exhibit GGGGG)(Related document(s) #508 , #505 ) (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 5/23/2013)
May 23, 2013 Filing 511 EXHIBITS re #508 Amended MOTION to Certify Class REDACTED per 5/10/13 Court Order [Dkt. # 505], #505 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, Amended MOTION to Certify Class REDACTED per 5/10/13 Court Order [Dkt. # 505], #505 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, Amended MOTION to Certify Class REDACTED per 5/10/13 Court Order [Dkt. # 505] Simplicio Decl ISO Class Cert Exhibits AAAA-ZZZZ REDACTED per 5/10/13 Court Order [Dkt. # 505] Ex. AAAA filed byVerena Baumgartner, Erin Campbell, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit BBBB, #2 Exhibit CCCC, #3 Exhibit DDDD, #4 Exhibit EEEE, #5 Exhibit FFFF, #6 Exhibit GGGG, #7 Exhibit HHHH, #8 Exhibit IIII, #9 Exhibit JJJJ, #10 Exhibit KKKK, #11 Exhibit LLLL, #12 Exhibit MMMM, #13 Exhibit NNNN, #14 Exhibit OOOO, #15 Exhibit PPPP, #16 Exhibit QQQQ, #17 Exhibit RRRR, #18 Exhibit SSSS, #19 Exhibit TTTT, #20 Exhibit UUUU, #21 Exhibit VVVV (partially redacted), #22 Exhibit WWWW (partially redacted), #23 Exhibit XXXX, #24 Exhibit YYYY (partially redacted), #25 Exhibit ZZZZ)(Related document(s) #508 , #505 ) (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 5/23/2013)
May 23, 2013 Filing 510 EXHIBITS re #508 Amended MOTION to Certify Class REDACTED per 5/10/13 Court Order [Dkt. # 505], #505 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, Amended MOTION to Certify Class REDACTED per 5/10/13 Court Order [Dkt. # 505] Simplicio Decl ISO Class Cert Exhibits AAA-ZZZ REDACTED REDACTED per 5/10/13 Court Order [Dkt. # 505] Ex. AAA filed byVerena Baumgartner, Erin Campbell, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit BBB, #2 Exhibit CCC, #3 Exhibit DDD, #4 Exhibit EEE (redacted in entirety), #5 Exhibit FFF (redacted in entirety), #6 Exhibit GGG (redacted in entirety), #7 Exhibit HHH (partially redacted), #8 Exhibit III, #9 Exhibit JJJ (redacted in entirety), #10 Exhibit KKK, #11 Exhibit LLL, #12 Exhibit MMM, #13 Exhibit NNN, #14 Exhibit PPP, #15 Exhibit QQQ, #16 Exhibit RRR, #17 Exhibit SSS, #18 Exhibit TTT, #19 Exhibit UUU, #20 Exhibit VVV, #21 Exhibit WWW, #22 Exhibit XXX, #23 Exhibit YYY, #24 Exhibit ZZZ)(Related document(s) #508 , #505 ) (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 5/23/2013)
May 23, 2013 Filing 509 EXHIBITS re #508 Amended MOTION to Certify Class REDACTED per 5/10/13 Court Order [Dkt. # 505] Simplicio Decl ISO Class Cert Exhibits AA-ZZ REDACTED REDACTED per 5/10/13 Court Order [Dkt. # 505] Ex. AA (partially redacted) filed byVerena Baumgartner, Erin Campbell, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit BB (partially redacted), #2 Exhibit CC, #3 Exhibit DD, #4 Exhibit EE, #5 Exhibit FF (redacted in entirety), #6 Exhibit GG (redacted in entirety), #7 Exhibit HH, #8 Exhibit II, #9 Exhibit JJ, #10 Exhibit KK (partially redacted), #11 Exhibit MM (redacted in entirety), #12 Exhibit NN (partially redacted), #13 Exhibit OO (partially redacted), #14 Exhibit PP, #15 Exhibit QQ (partially redacted), #16 Exhibit RR (partially redacted), #17 Exhibit SS (partially redacted), #18 Exhibit TT, #19 Exhibit UU, #20 Exhibit VV (redacted in entirety), #21 Exhibit WW (redacted in entirety), #22 Exhibit XX, #23 Exhibit YY, #24 Exhibit ZZ)(Related document(s) #508 ) (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 5/23/2013)
May 23, 2013 Filing 508 Amended MOTION to Certify Class REDACTED per 5/10/13 Court Order [Dkt. # 505] filed by Verena Baumgartner, Erin Campbell, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. Responses due by 1/31/2013. Replies due by 2/14/2013. (Attachments: #1 Declaration REDACTED Declaration of Robyn Sands, #2 Declaration REDACTED Declaration of Kristen Simplicio, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B (partially redacted), #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D (partially redacted), #7 Exhibit E (partially redacted), #8 Exhibit F (partially redacted), #9 Exhibit G (partially redacted), #10 Exhibit H (partially redacted), #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit N (redacted in entirety), #16 Exhibit O (partially redacted), #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q (redacted in entirety), #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W (partially redacted), #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y (partially redacted), #26 Exhibit Z)(Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 5/23/2013)
May 17, 2013 Filing 507 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Sabrina Layne Youdim Shadi (Shadi, Sabrina Layne) (Filed on 5/17/2013)
May 15, 2013 Filing 506 Transcript of Proceedings held on May 2, 2013, before Judge Claudia Wilken. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/13/2013. (Related documents(s) #504 ) (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 5/15/2013)
May 13, 2013 CLERKS NOTICE. Notice is hereby given as ordered at the May 2, 2013 hearing, the May 23, 2013 hearing on the motion for class certification and case management conference are vacated, to be reset after the parties file their further motion or status report regarding the pending motion for approval of a class action settlement. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2013)
May 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 505 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken RESOLVING ( #385 , #431 , #458 , and #478 ) MOTIONS TO SEAL RELATED TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2013)
May 7, 2013 Filing 504 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Nathan Jurczyk, Eric Madura, Merchant Services, Inc, Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Robert Parisi, Alicyn Roy, Universal Card, Inc., Universal Merchant Services LLC for Court Reporter Diane Skillman. (Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 5/7/2013)
May 2, 2013 Filing 503 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 5/2/2013 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 5/2/2013). (Court Reporter Diane Skillman.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/2/2013)
April 30, 2013 Filing 502 Supplemental Declaration of Adam Gutride in Support of #496 MOTION for Settlement (Preliminary Approval) filed byVerena Baumgartner, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Related document(s) #500 , #496 ) (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 4/30/2013) Modified on 5/1/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2013 Filing 501 NOTICE by Nathan Jurczyk, Eric Madura, Merchant Services, Inc, Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Robert Parisi, Alicyn Roy, Universal Card, Inc., Universal Merchant Services LLC of mailing of CAFA notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1715 (Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 4/30/2013)
April 26, 2013 Filing 500 STIPULATION Regarding Amendement to Agreement #496 filed by Verena Baumgartner, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, Volker Von Glasenapp, Merchant Services Inc, et al. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 4/26/2013) Modified on 4/29/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 24, 2013 Filing 499 Declaration of Nathan Jurczyk in Support of #496 MOTION for Settlement (Preliminary Approval) filed byVerena Baumgartner, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Related document(s) #496 ) (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 4/24/2013)
April 24, 2013 CLERKS NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the Court has approved counsels #497 request to appear by telephone. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. **See text order, docket no. 498 .*** (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2013)
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 498 Order granting #497 Motion to Appear by Telephone entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
April 23, 2013 Filing 497 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at the Hearing of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement Scheduled on May 2, 2013 filed by Fiona Walshe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wegner, Matthew) (Filed on 4/23/2013)
April 19, 2013 Filing 496 MOTION for Settlement (Preliminary Approval) filed by Verena Baumgartner, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, Volker Von Glasenapp. Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 4/26/2013. Replies due by 4/30/2013. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Adam Gutride (with exhibits))(Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 4/19/2013)
April 1, 2013 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Motions due by 4/18/2013; Motion Hearing set for 5/2/2013 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken; Status Report due by 5/9/2013. 432 Amended MOTION to Certify Class / Case Management Conference set for 5/23/2013 02:00 PM. See Docket No. 494 . (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2013)
March 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 495 Order finding as moot #492 Motion to Appear by Telephone entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
March 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 494 Order granting #493 Stipulation entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
March 28, 2013 Filing 493 Joint Status Report and Stipulation to continue class certification hearing and case management conference and (Proposed) Order filed by Verena Baumgartner, Erin Campbell, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp, et al. (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 3/28/2013) Modified on 3/29/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2013 Filing 492 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at 4/11/2013 CMC and Motion for Class Certification filed by Fiona Walshe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wegner, Matthew) (Filed on 3/28/2013)
March 5, 2013 Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to 432 Amended MOTION to Certify Class (REDACTED). Status Report due by 3/28/2013. Case Management Conference / Motion Hearing set for 4/11/2013 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. See Docket No. 491 . (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2013)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 491 Order granting #490 Stipulation entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. The parties shall file a joint status report on March 28, 2013, so that the Court will be advised whether to prepare for the motions hearing. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
March 4, 2013 Filing 490 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CLASS CERTIFICATION HEARING AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Verena Baumgartner, Erin Campbell, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 3/4/2013) Modified on 3/5/2013 (kcS, ).
February 28, 2013 Filing 489 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Verena Baumgartner, Erin Campbell, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp, Sam Buono, Fiona Walshe . (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 2/28/2013) Modified on 3/1/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
February 26, 2013 Filing 488 RESPONSE to re #484 Objection, by Just Film, Inc.. (Safier, Seth) (Filed on 2/26/2013)
February 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 487 Order granting #481 Motion to Appear by Telephone entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
February 22, 2013 Filing 486 Proposed Order re #481 MOTION to Appear by Telephone by Fiona Walshe. (Wegner, Matthew) (Filed on 2/22/2013)
February 21, 2013 Filing 485 Declaration of Nathan Jurczyk in response to plaintiffs' February 14, 2013 administrative motion to seal filed byNathan Jurczyk, Eric Madura, Merchant Services, Inc, Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Robert Parisi, Alicyn Roy, Universal Card, Inc., Universal Merchant Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 2/21/2013) Modified on 2/22/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
February 21, 2013 Filing 484 JOINT OBJECTIONS to and motion to strike new reply evidence by Nathan Jurczyk, Eric Madura, Merchant Services, Inc, Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Robert Parisi, Alicyn Roy, Universal Card, Inc., Universal Merchant Services LLC. (Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 2/21/2013) Modified on 2/22/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
February 21, 2013 Filing 483 Declaration of Sara Krieger In Response to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed bySam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC. (Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 2/21/2013) Modified on 2/22/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
February 21, 2013 Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 3/6/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/13/2014 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 3/13/2014 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. See Docket No. 482. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2013)
February 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 482 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting #480 Stipulation to Reset Deadlines for Expert Disclosure. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2013)
February 20, 2013 Filing 481 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Case Management Conference and Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by Matthew Keenan Wegner (Wegner, Matthew) (Filed on 2/20/2013) Modified on 2/21/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
February 15, 2013 Filing 480 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Reset Deadlines for Expert Disclosure filed by Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC, Merchant Services, Inc., Universal Card, Inc., National Payment Processing, Inc., Universal Merchant Services, LLC, Jason Moore, Robert Parisi, Nathan Jurczyk, Eric Madura, Alicyn Roy (Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 2/15/2013) Modified on 2/19/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
February 14, 2013 Filing 479 REPLY (re 432 Amended MOTION to Certify Class (REDACTED) ) filed byLewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Erin Campbell, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Kristen Simplicio)(Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 2/14/2013)
February 14, 2013 Filing 478 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Reply and Supplemental Declaration in Support of Motion for Class Certification filed by Lewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Erin Campbell, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 2/14/2013)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 477 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting #476 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2013)
February 11, 2013 Filing 476 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice and Proposed Order ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7465167.) Filing fee previously paid on 2-7-13 filed by Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, Lease Finance Group, LLC, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC. (Lillienstein, Robert) (Filed on 2/11/2013) Modified on 2/12/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
February 7, 2013 Filing 475 ***Incorrect form used*** MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Robert D. Lillienstein ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7465167.) filed by Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lillienstein, Robert) (Filed on 2/7/2013) Modified on 2/8/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
February 6, 2013 Filing 474 RESPONSE (re 432 Amended MOTION to Certify Class (REDACTED) ) Merchant Defendants' Amended Opposition to Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Class Certification filed byNathan Jurczyk, Eric Madura, Merchant Services, Inc, Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Robert Parisi, Alicyn Roy, Universal Card, Inc., Universal Merchant Services LLC. (Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 2/6/2013)
February 6, 2013 Filing 473 RESPONSE (re 432 Amended MOTION to Certify Class (REDACTED) ) Leasing Defendants' Amended Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify the Class filed bySam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC. (Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 2/6/2013)
February 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 472 ORDER STRIKING #468 SEPARATE EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS AND GRANTING DEFENDANTS LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED OPPOSITIONS TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Responses due by 2/6/2013. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 2/4/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2013)
January 31, 2013 Filing 471 Notice of Joinder in #459 , #469 Oppositions to Amended Motion to Certify Class filed byFiona Walshe. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Wegner, Matthew) (Filed on 1/31/2013) Modified on 2/1/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 31, 2013 Filing 470 Declaration of Cary D. Sullivan in support of Merchant Defendants' class certification #469 opposition filed byNathan Jurczyk, Eric Madura, Merchant Services, Inc, Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Robert Parisi, Alicyn Roy, Universal Card, Inc., Universal Merchant Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, part 1, #2 Exhibit A, part 2, #3 Exhibit A, part 3, #4 Exhibit A, part 4, #5 Exhibit B and C, #6 Exhibit D and E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H and I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M and N)(Related document(s) #469 ) (Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 1/31/2013) Modified on 2/1/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 31, 2013 Filing 469 RESPONSE (re 432 Amended MOTION to Certify Class (REDACTED) ) Merchant Defendants' opposition to plaintiffs' amended motion for class certification filed byNathan Jurczyk, Eric Madura, Merchant Services, Inc, Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Robert Parisi, Alicyn Roy, Universal Card, Inc., Universal Merchant Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nathan Jurczyk in support of Merchant Defendants' class certification opposition, #2 Declaration of Curtis Bauer)(Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 1/31/2013)
January 31, 2013 Filing 468 ***STRICKEN PER ORDER, DOCUMENT #472 *** Defendants' joint evidentiary objections to portions of declaration of Robyn Sands in support of plaintiffs' 432 motion for class certification by Nathan Jurczyk, Eric Madura, Merchant Services, Inc, Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Robert Parisi, Alicyn Roy, Universal Card, Inc., Universal Merchant Services LLC. (Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 1/31/2013) Modified on 2/1/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/5/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 31, 2013 Filing 467 EXHIBITS re #460 Declaration in Support, Exhibit 36 (E(i) E(ii)) filed bySam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 36(ii))(Related document(s) #460 ) (Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/31/2013)
January 31, 2013 Filing 466 EXHIBITS re #460 Declaration in Support, Exhibits 40-48 filed bySam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 41, #2 Exhibit 42, #3 Exhibit 43, #4 Exhibit 44, #5 Exhibit 45, #6 Exhibit 46, #7 Exhibit 47, #8 Exhibit 48)(Related document(s) #460 ) (Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/31/2013)
January 31, 2013 Filing 465 EXHIBITS re #460 Declaration in Support, Exhibits 30-39 filed bySam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 31, #2 Exhibit 32, #3 Exhibit 33, #4 Exhibit 34, #5 Exhibit 35, #6 Exhibit 37, #7 Exhibit 38, #8 Exhibit 39)(Related document(s) #460 ) (Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/31/2013)
January 31, 2013 Filing 464 EXHIBITS re #460 Declaration in Support, Exhibits 20-29 filed bySam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 21, #2 Exhibit 22, #3 Exhibit 23, #4 Exhibit 24, #5 Exhibit 25, #6 Exhibit 26, #7 Exhibit 27, #8 Exhibit 28, #9 Exhibit 29)(Related document(s) #460 ) (Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/31/2013)
January 31, 2013 Filing 463 EXHIBITS re #460 Declaration in Support, Exhibits 11-19 filed bySam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 12, #2 Exhibit 13, #3 Exhibit 14, #4 Exhibit 15, #5 Exhibit 16, #6 Exhibit 17, #7 Exhibit 18, #8 Exhibit 19)(Related document(s) #460 ) (Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/31/2013)
January 31, 2013 Filing 462 EXHIBITS re #460 Declaration in Support, Exhibits 6-10 filed bySam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7, #2 Exhibit 8, #3 Exhibit 9, #4 Exhibit 10)(Related document(s) #460 ) (Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/31/2013)
January 31, 2013 Filing 461 EXHIBITS re #460 Declaration in Support, Exhibits 1 - 5 filed bySam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5)(Related document(s) #460 ) (Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/31/2013)
January 31, 2013 Filing 460 Declaration of Jennifer Nigro in Support of #459 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byLeonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Kravic, #2 Declaration Sussman, #3 Declaration Kulangroth, #4 Declaration Bent)(Related document(s) #459 ) (Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/31/2013) Modified on 2/1/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 31, 2013 Filing 459 RESPONSE (re 432 Amended MOTION to Certify Class (REDACTED) ) Leasing Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class filed bySam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC. (Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/31/2013)
January 31, 2013 Filing 458 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/31/2013)
January 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 457 ORDER by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte granting #453 Stipulation in Resolution of Plaintiff's Motion to Sanction; withdrawing #429 Motion for Sanctions; terminating #455 Stipulation. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2013)
January 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 456 ORDER by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte granting #451 Stipulation in Resolution of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel; withdrawing #428 Motion to Compel. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2013)
January 15, 2013 Filing 455 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER in resolution of re #429 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC, Rainbow Business Services, Volker Von Glasenapp, et al (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/15/2013) Modified on 1/16/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2013 Filing 454 DECLARATION OF JENNIFER NIGRO IN SUPPORT OF LEASING DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS' (re #428 MOTION to Compel LEASING DEFENDANTS PRODUCTION OF MATERIALS FROM OTHER LAWSUITS, #429 MOTION for Sanctions FOR LEASING DEFENDANTS' FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH JUNE ORDER AND STIPULATION ) filed bySam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC. (Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/14/2013) Modified on 1/15/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/15/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2013 Filing 453 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #429 MOTION for Sanctions FOR LEASING DEFENDANTS' FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH JUNE ORDER AND STIPULATION filed by Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC, Volker Von Glasenapp, et al. (Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/14/2013) Modified on 1/15/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 452 Order denying #443 Motion to extend time entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
January 14, 2013 Filing 451 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #428 MOTION to Compel LEASING DEFENDANTS PRODUCTION OF MATERIALS FROM OTHER LAWSUITS filed by Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC, Rainbow Business Services, Volke Von Glasenapp, et al. (Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/14/2013) Modified on 1/15/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 14, 2013 Filing 450 NOTICE of Change of Address by Rod Divelbiss (Notice of Change of Firm Name) (Divelbiss, Rod) (Filed on 1/14/2013)
January 11, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #429 MOTION for Sanctions FOR LEASING DEFENDANTS' FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH JUNE ORDER AND STIPULATION, #428 MOTION to Compel LEASING DEFENDANTS PRODUCTION OF MATERIALS FROM OTHER LAWSUITS. Responses due by 1/14/2013. Replies due by 1/16/2013. Motion Hearing set for 1/29/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2013)
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 449 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting #445 Modified Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Repond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel and Plaintiffs' Motion to Sanction. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2013)
January 10, 2013 Filing 448 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint) byFiona Walshe. (Wegner, Matthew) (Filed on 1/10/2013)
January 10, 2013 Filing 447 ANSWER to Amended Complaint Third Amended Complaint byNathan Jurczyk, Eric Madura, Merchant Services, Inc, Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Robert Parisi, Alicyn Roy, Universal Card, Inc., Universal Merchant Services LLC. (Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 1/10/2013)
January 10, 2013 Filing 446 Leasing Defendants ANSWER to Amended Complaint bySam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC. (Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/10/2013)
January 10, 2013 Filing 445 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time to Respond to re #428 MOTION to Compel LEASING DEFENDANTS PRODUCTION OF MATERIALS FROM OTHER LAWSUITS, #429 MOTION for Sanctions FOR LEASING DEFENDANTS' FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH JUNE ORDER AND STIPULATION filed by Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC. (Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/10/2013) Modified on 1/11/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 8, 2013 Filing 444 RESPONSE (re #443 Joint Motion to Extend Time to Oppose Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification ) Plaintiffs' Opposition filed byLewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Erin Campbell, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Robyn Sands)(Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 1/8/2013)
January 7, 2013 Filing 443 Defendants' Joint Administrative Motion to Extend Time to Oppose Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC., Merchant Services Inc, et al (Attachments: #1 Declaration Nigro Declaration in Support, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/7/2013) Modified on 1/8/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/8/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/8/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 442 STIPULATION AND ORDER re Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to #429 MOTION for Sanctions FOR LEASING DEFENDANTS' FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH JUNE ORDER AND STIPULATION, and #428 MOTION to Compel LEASING DEFENDANTS PRODUCTION OF MATERIALS FROM OTHER LAWSUITS. Responses due by 1/11/2013. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 1/7/2013. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2013)
January 7, 2013 Filing 441 CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING THE TIME TO HEAR THE #429 MOTION for Sanctions FOR LEASING DEFENDANTS' FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH JUNE ORDER AND STIPULATION, and #428 MOTION to Compel LEASING DEFENDANTS PRODUCTION OF MATERIALS FROM OTHER LAWSUITS. Motion Hearing set for 1/29/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte.This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2013)
January 4, 2013 Filing 440 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to extend time to respond to re #428 MOTION to Compel, #429 MOTION to Sanction filed by Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC, Just Film, Inc. (Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/4/2013) Modified on 1/7/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
January 3, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #429 MOTION for Sanctions FOR LEASING DEFENDANTS' FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH JUNE ORDER AND STIPULATION, #428 MOTION to Compel LEASING DEFENDANTS PRODUCTION OF MATERIALS FROM OTHER LAWSUITS. Responses due by 1/8/2013. Replies due by 1/15/2013. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2013)
January 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 439 Order by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting #438 Stipulation to Extend Tiime to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and Plaintiff's Motion to Sanction.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2013)
January 2, 2013 Filing 438 JOINT STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time To Respond to Plaintiffs' Motions to Compel and to Sanction filed by Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC, Just Film Inc, et al. (Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/2/2013) Modified on 1/3/2013 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
December 27, 2012 Filing 437 STIPULATION AND MODIFIED ORDER re #436 STIPULATION re #428 MOTION to Compel LEASING DEFENDANTS PRODUCTION OF MATERIALS FROM OTHER LAWSUITS, #429 MOTION for Sanctions FOR LEASING DEFENDANTS' FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH JUNE ORDER AND STIPULATION
December 21, 2012 Filing 436 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #428 MOTION to Compel LEASING DEFENDANTS PRODUCTION OF MATERIALS FROM OTHER LAWSUITS, #429 MOTION for Sanctions FOR LEASING DEFENDANTS' FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH JUNE ORDER AND STIPULATION Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order to Extend Time filed by Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC. (Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/21/2012)
December 20, 2012 Filing 435 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #436 . *** JOINT STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time to Respond to re #428 MOTION to Compel LEASING DEFENDANTS PRODUCTION OF MATERIALS FROM OTHER LAWSUITS, #429 MOTION for Sanctions FOR LEASING DEFENDANTS' FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH JUNE ORDER AND STIPULATION Stipulation with Proposed Order to Extend Time filed by Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC,Rainbow Business Services, et al. (Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/20/2012) Modified on 12/21/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/21/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/21/2012 (wv, COURT STAFF).
December 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 434 ORDER by Judge 12/14/2012 GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS JOINT #430 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME. Responses due by 1/31/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2012) Modified on 12/17/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 13, 2012 Filing 433 RESPONSE (re #430 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class CertificationJoint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint ) Plaintiffs' Opposition filed byLewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Erin Campbell, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Kristen G Simplicio)(Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 12/13/2012)
December 13, 2012 Filing 432 ***DOCUMENT REMOVED AS PER ORDER, DOCUMENT #505 (see pg. 4 footnote)*** Amended MOTION to Certify Class (REDACTED) filed by Lewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Erin Campbell, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. Motion Hearing set for 3/7/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 1/24/2013. Replies due by 2/14/2013. (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 12/13/2012) Modified on 5/13/2013 (cp, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/13/2013 (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 13, 2012 Filing 431 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Class Certification) filed by Lewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Erin Campbell, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 12/13/2012)
December 12, 2012 Filing 430 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint filed by Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Nigro Declaration with Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 12/12/2012)
December 11, 2012 Filing 429 MOTION for Sanctions FOR LEASING DEFENDANTS' FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH JUNE ORDER AND STIPULATION filed by Lewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Erin Campbell, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. Motion Hearing set for 1/15/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 12/26/2012. Replies due by 1/2/2013. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Kristen G Simplicio)(Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 12/11/2012)
December 11, 2012 Filing 428 MOTION to Compel LEASING DEFENDANTS PRODUCTION OF MATERIALS FROM OTHER LAWSUITS filed by Lewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Erin Campbell, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. Motion Hearing set for 1/15/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 12/26/2012. Replies due by 1/2/2013. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Kristen G Simplicio)(Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 12/11/2012)
December 7, 2012 Filing 427 AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiffs Third Amended Class Complaint against All Defendants. Filed byLewis Bae, The Rose Dress Inc, Dietz Towing Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp, Terry Jordan, Jerry Su, Verena Baumgartner, Rainbow Business Services. (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 12/7/2012)
December 7, 2012 Filing 426 MOTION for Leave to File (filed pursuant to Dkt. #425) filed by Lewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A (part I) [REDACTED], #2 Exhibit Exhibit A (part II) [REDACTED])(Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 12/7/2012) Modified on 3/4/2013 (ndr, COURT STAFF).
December 6, 2012 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Amended Pleadings due by 12/9/2012. Motions due by 12/13/2012. Responses due by 1/24/2013. Replies due by 2/14/2013. Case Management Statement due by 2/28/2013. Motion /Further Case Management Conference set for 3/7/2013 02:00 PM. See Docket No. 425. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2012)
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 425 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS #383 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT, GRANTING IN PART, DENYING IN PART AND DEFERRING IN PART PLAINTIFFS #385 MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL AND SETTING FURTHER DATES. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2012)
December 5, 2012 Filing 424 Declaration of Nathan Jurczyk in response to plaintiffs' administrative motion to seal (Dkt. No. 385, filed Aug. 23, 2012) filed byNathan Jurczyk, Eric Madura, Merchant Services, Inc, Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Robert Parisi, Alicyn Roy, Universal Card, Inc., Universal Merchant Services LLC. (Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 12/5/2012)
November 21, 2012 Filing 423 Supplemental Declaration in Support of Motion to Seal filed bySam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC. (Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/21/2012) Modified on 11/26/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
November 16, 2012 Filing 422 Declaration of Kristen G Simplicio (Second Supplemental) in Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byLewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 11/16/2012)
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 421 ORDER GRANTING LEASING DEFENDANTS LEAVE TO FILE A FURTHER DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO SEAL AND REQUIRING PLAINTIFFS TO EXPLAIN A DISCREPANCY. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/15/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2012)
November 14, 2012 Filing 420 Declaration of Kristen G. Simplicio (Supplemental) in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Seal filed byLewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 11/14/2012)
November 14, 2012 Filing 419 Declaration of Jennifer Nigro in Response to Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File Under Seal filed bySam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC. (Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/14/2012) Modified on 11/15/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 418 Order granting #417 Stipulation entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
November 13, 2012 Filing 417 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Further Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal filed by Nathan Jurczyk, Eric Madura, Merchant Services, Inc, Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Robert Parisi, Alicyn Roy, Universal Card, Inc., Universal Merchant Services LLC. (Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 11/13/2012) Modified on 11/14/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 416 ORDER SUPPLEMENTING #408 OCTOBER 31, 2012 ORDER Re #411 Declaration. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/13/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2012)
November 9, 2012 Filing 415 Declaration of Jeremy S. Close in Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byExperian Corporation. (Close, Jeremy) (Filed on 11/9/2012)
November 9, 2012 Filing 414 Declaration of Peter Henke in Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byExperian Corporation. (Close, Jeremy) (Filed on 11/9/2012)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 413 Order granting #412 Stipulation entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
November 5, 2012 Filing 412 JOINT STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND re #408 Order on Motion for Reconsideration filed by Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC. (Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/5/2012) Modified on 11/6/2012 (kcS, ).
November 2, 2012 Filing 411 Declaration of Kristen G. Simplicio in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Seal (Correction of Dkt. # 409) filed byLewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 11/2/2012)
November 2, 2012 Filing 410 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp (filed in connection with Dkt. #408 and #409) (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 11/2/2012)
November 2, 2012 Filing 409 Declaration of Kristen G. Simplicio in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Seal filed byLewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 11/2/2012)
October 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 408 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING DEFENDANTS #407 JOINT EMERGENCY MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM AND LEAVE TO SEEK RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURTS OCTOBER 29, 2012 ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2012)
October 31, 2012 Filing 407 Joint Emergency MOTION for Relief from and for Leave to Seek Reconsideration of October 29, 2012 Order on Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion re #406 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Nathan Jurczyk, Eric Madura, Merchant Services, Inc, Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Robert Parisi, Alicyn Roy, Universal Card, Inc., Universal Merchant Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cary D. Sullivan, #2 Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 10/31/2012) Modified on 11/1/2012 (kcS, ).
October 30, 2012 CLERKS NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the Case Management Conference, previously set for Thursday, November 8, 2012, is vacated. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2012)
October 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 406 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING #385 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2012)
September 24, 2012 CLERKS NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the Court, on its own motion, shall take the #383 motion for leave to file under submission on the papers. The hearing previously scheduled for Thursday, September 27, 2012, is vacated. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
September 20, 2012 CLERKS NOTICE. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. **See text order, docket no. 405. *** (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2012)
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 405 Order granting #404 Motion to Appear by Telephone entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
September 17, 2012 Filing 404 MOTION to Appear by Telephone at Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion For Leave To File Third Amended Complaint filed by Fiona Walshe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wegner, Matthew) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
September 13, 2012 Filing 403 REPLY (re #383 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint ) filed byLewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Simplicio Declaration)(Gutride, Adam) (Filed on 9/13/2012)
September 10, 2012 Set Deadlines as to: #383 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 9/27/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2012)
September 6, 2012 Filing 402 Request for Judicial Notice re #401 Opposition/Response to Motion,, filed byNathan Jurczyk, Eric Madura, Merchant Services, Inc, Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Robert Parisi, Alicyn Roy, Universal Card, Inc., Universal Merchant Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cary D. Sullivan in Support of Request for Judicial Notice)(Related document(s) #401 ) (Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 9/6/2012)
September 6, 2012 Filing 401 CONSOLIDATED RESPONSE (re #383 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint ) filed bySam Buono, Jay Cohen, Nathan Jurczyk, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Eric Madura, Merchant Services, Inc, Leonard Mezei, Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., Robert Parisi, Alicyn Roy, SKS Associates LLC, Universal Card, Inc., Universal Merchant Services Corporation, Universal Merchant Services LLC, Fiona Walshe. (Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/6/2012) Modified on 9/7/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
September 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 400 Order denying #399 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; denying #399 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; finding as moot #399 Motion to Shorten Time entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. Opposition shall be consolidated but no more than 25 pages. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
September 4, 2012 Filing 399 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #383 Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint, MOTION for Leave to File Consolidated Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint and to Shorten Time for Plaintiffs' to Respond to Defendants' Administrative Motion filed by Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Nathan Jurczyk, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Eric Madura, Merchant Services, Inc, Leonard Mezei, Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., Robert Parisi, Alicyn Roy, SKS Associates LLC, Universal Card, Inc., Universal Merchant Services Corporation, Universal Merchant Services LLC, Fiona Walshe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration with Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Administrative Motion)(Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/4/2012) Modified on 9/5/2012 (kc, ).
September 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 398 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting #382 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael Adam Sweet terminated. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2012)
August 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 397 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #388 #389 Motions for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and denying #395 Motion for Leave to File a Reply (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2012)
August 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 396 Order granting #384 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. Defendants may file a total of 50 pages in opposition, in one or two joint briefs. Single reply to all opposition shall not exceed 20 pages. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
August 30, 2012 Filing 395 MOTION for Leave to File Reply re Administrative Motion to Extend Time to Oppose Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Nathan Jurczyk, Eric Madura, Merchant Services, Inc, Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Robert Parisi, Alicyn Roy, Universal Card, Inc., Universal Merchant Services LLC. (Biffar, Travis) (Filed on 8/30/2012)
August 30, 2012 Filing 394 CLERK'S NOTICE to Defendants' Counsel regarding deficiency in docket #393 . Re-posting is required within 24 hours to correct this entry. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2012)
August 29, 2012 Filing 393 DISREGARD, INCORRECT EVENT USED. DOCUMENT TO BE RE-POSTEDREPLY (re #388 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #387 MOTION to Certify Class ) Request for Leave to File Reply and [Proposed] Reply re Administrative Motion for Extension filed byNathan Jurczyk, Eric Madura, Merchant Services, Inc, Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Robert Parisi, Alicyn Roy, Universal Card, Inc., Universal Merchant Services LLC. (Biffar, Travis) (Filed on 8/29/2012) Modified on 8/30/2012 (kc, COURT STAFF).
August 28, 2012 Filing 392 RESPONSE (re #388 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #387 MOTION to Certify Class , #389 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #387 MOTION to Certify Class ) filed byLewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Jerry Su, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Safier, Seth) (Filed on 8/28/2012)
August 27, 2012 Filing 391 NOTICE of Joinder re #388 Administrative Motion To Extend Time To File Brief Opposing Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed by Merchant Services F.A., Inc., Rover Enterprises, Inc., Fiona Walshe. (Wegner, Matthew) (Filed on 8/27/2012) Modified on 8/28/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2012 Filing 390 Declaration of Jennifer Nigro in Support of #389 Motion to Extend Time to File a Response/Reply filed by Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC. (Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/27/2012) Modified on 8/28/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2012 Filing 389 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #387 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/24/2012) Modified on 8/27/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2012 Filing 388 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #387 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Nathan Jurczyk, Eric Madura, Merchant Services, Inc, Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Robert Parisi, Alicyn Roy, Universal Card, Inc., Universal Merchant Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kevin H. Logan in Support of Administrative Motion, #2 Proposed Order)(Logan, Kevin) (Filed on 8/24/2012) Modified on 8/27/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2012 Filing 387 MOTION to Certify Class (Redacted) filed by Lewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 10/4/2012. Replies due by 10/25/2012. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Simplicio Declaration (redacted), #2 Declaration Sands Declaration (redacted))(Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 8/24/2012) Modified on 8/27/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
August 23, 2012 Filing 386 Declaration of Adam Gutride In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion For Class Certification filed byLewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Jerry Su, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Gutride, Adam) (Filed on 8/23/2012)
August 23, 2012 Filing 385 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (1) Motion for Leave To File Third Amended Complaint, (2) Motion for Class Certification, (3) Declaration of Kristen Simplicio In Support Of Class Certification, (4) Declaration of Robyn Sands In Support Of Class Certification filed by Lewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Terry Jordan, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gutride, Adam) (Filed on 8/23/2012) Modified on 12/6/2012 (ndr, COURT STAFF).
August 23, 2012 Filing 384 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages In Support of Motion for Class Certification filed by Lewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gutride, Adam) (Filed on 8/23/2012)
August 23, 2012 Filing 383 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint filed by Lewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Dietz Towing Inc, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Proposed Third Amended Complaint (Redacted))(Gutride, Adam) (Filed on 8/23/2012)
July 31, 2012 Filing 382 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney MICHAEL SWEET AND MEYERS NAVE AS COUNSEL OF RECORD AND [Proposed] ORDER APPROVING WITHDRAWAL filed by Lewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, Volker Von Glasenapp. Responses due by 8/14/2012. Replies due by 8/21/2012. (Gutride, Adam) (Filed on 7/31/2012) Modified on 8/1/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
June 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 381 ORDER RESOLVING DOCKET 365 AND 371 by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte #365 Motion to Compel; #370 Motion to Compel. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2012)
June 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 380 Order by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting #378 Stipulation Regarding Deposition Schedule.(kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2012)
June 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 379 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING #337 MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2012)
June 1, 2012 Filing 378 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Revised Deposition Schedule filed by Lewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp, Universal Merchant Services LLC, et al. (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 6/1/2012) Modified on 6/4/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
June 1, 2012 Filing 377 Proposed Order re #365 MOTION to Compel Leasing Defendants' Responses to Plaintiffs Second Set of Requests for the Production of Documents, #370 Second MOTION to Compel Complete Responses to Plaintiffs First Requests for the Production of Documents regarding rulings and agreements from May 29, 2012 Hearing by Lewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 6/1/2012)
May 29, 2012 Filing 376 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 5/29/2012 before The Honorable Elizabeth D Laporte (Date Filed: 5/29/2012) re #365 MOTION to Compel Leasing Defendants' Responses to Plaintiffs Second Set of Requests for the Production of Documents filed by The Rose Dress Inc, Jerry Su, Volker Von Glasenapp, Just Film, Inc., Lewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Rainbow Business Services, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, #370 Second MOTION to Compel Complete Responses to Plaintiffs First Requests for the Production of Documents filed by The Rose Dress Inc, Jerry Su, Volker Von Glasenapp, Just Film, Inc., Lewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Rainbow Business Services, Terry Jordan, Dietz Towing Inc. (Court Reporter Sahar Bartlett.) (kns, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/29/2012)
May 24, 2012 Filing 375 REPLY (re #370 Second MOTION to Compel Complete Responses to Plaintiffs First Requests for the Production of Documents ) filed byLewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Reply Declaration of Kristen G Simplicio with Exhibits)(Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 5/24/2012)
May 22, 2012 Filing 374 DECLARATION IN OPPOSITION (re #370 Second MOTION to Compel Complete Responses to Plaintiffs First Requests for the Production of Documents ) filed bySam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/22/2012) Modified on 5/23/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
May 17, 2012 Reset Deadlines as to #370 Second MOTION to Compel Complete Responses to Plaintiffs First Requests for the Production of Documents. Responses due by 5/22/2012. Replies due by 5/24/2012. Motion Hearing set for 5/29/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2012)
May 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 373 MODIFIED ORDER granting #371 Motion to Shorten Time; signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte.(kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2012)
May 16, 2012 Filing 372 Proposed Order re #371 MOTION to Shorten Time re Plaintiffs Second Motion to Compel Complete Responses to Plaintiffs First Requests for the Production of Documents by Lewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 5/16/2012)
May 15, 2012 Filing 371 MOTION to Shorten Time re Plaintiffs Second Motion to Compel Complete Responses to Plaintiffs First Requests for the Production of Documents filed by Lewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Kristen G Simplicio)(Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 5/15/2012)
May 15, 2012 Filing 370 Second MOTION to Compel Complete Responses to Plaintiffs First Requests for the Production of Documents filed by Lewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. Motion Hearing set for 6/19/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 5/29/2012. Replies due by 6/5/2012. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Kristen G Simplicio, #2 Exhibit Exhibits to Simplicio Declaration)(Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 5/15/2012)
May 15, 2012 Filing 369 REPLY (re #365 MOTION to Compel Leasing Defendants' Responses to Plaintiffs Second Set of Requests for the Production of Documents ) filed byLewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Burlingame Motors Inc, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Kristen G. Simplicio)(Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 5/15/2012)
May 8, 2012 Filing 368 RESPONSE (re #365 MOTION to Compel Leasing Defendants' Responses to Plaintiffs Second Set of Requests for the Production of Documents ) Opposition filed bySam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration in Support of Opposition, with Ex. 1)(Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/8/2012)
May 1, 2012 Deadlines/Hearings Terminated and Reset: Motions due by 8/23/2012. Responses due by 10/4/2012. Replies due by 10/25/2012. Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Case Management Statement due by 11/1/2012. Case Management Conference set for 11/8/2012 02:00 PM. Case Management Statement due by 6/20/2013. Case Management Conference set for 6/27/2013 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 6/27/2013 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. ** See Text Order, Docket No. 367** (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2012)
April 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 367 Order granting #363 Stipulation entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
April 25, 2012 Filing 366 CLERKS NOTICE Resetting Motion Hearing, as to #365 MOTION to Compel Leasing Defendants' Responses to Plaintiffs Second Set of Requests for the Production of Documents. Motion Hearing set for 5/29/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2012)
April 24, 2012 Filing 365 MOTION to Compel Leasing Defendants' Responses to Plaintiffs Second Set of Requests for the Production of Documents filed by Lewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. Motion Hearing set for 5/29/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 5/8/2012. Replies due by 5/15/2012. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Kristen G Simplicio, #2 Exhibit Exhibits to Simplicio Declaration)(Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 4/24/2012)
April 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 364 ORDER RE PRODUCTION. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 4/24/2012. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2012)
April 24, 2012 Filing 363 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CLASS CERTIFICATION HEARING AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE, DISCOVERY CUTOFFS, DISPOSITIVE MOTION DEADLINE, CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Lewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Dietz Towing Inc, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, Volker Von Glasenapp, Jay Cohen, t al. (Gutride, Adam) (Filed on 4/24/2012) Modified on 4/25/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
April 23, 2012 Filing 362 MANDATE of USCA as to #280 Notice of Appeal, filed by SKS Associates LLC (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2012)
April 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 361 ORDER RE DEADLINE FOR DISCOVERY ISSUES. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 4/17/2012. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2012)
April 17, 2012 Filing 360 Letter to Magistrate Laporte regarding Plaintiffs improper filing of Joint Statement without consent of Leasing Defendants. (Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/17/2012)
April 17, 2012 Filing 359 JOINT STATEMENT PARTIALLY RESOLVING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS FROM LEASING DEFENDANTS AND REQUEST FOR RULING filed byLewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp, Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger. (Gutride, Adam) (Filed on 4/17/2012) Modified on 4/18/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
April 13, 2012 Filing 358 Letter from Plaintiffs' Counsel and Counsel for Leasing Defendants regarding efforts to further meet and confer. (Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/13/2012)
April 10, 2012 Filing 357 Letter from counsel for Plaintiffs and Leasing Defendants regarding meet and confer efforts. (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 4/10/2012)
April 3, 2012 Filing 356 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4-03-2012, before Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Official Court Reporter Connie Kuhl, CSR, RPR, RMR, CRR, Telephone number 415-431-2020. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/2/2012. (ck, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2012)
April 3, 2012 Filing 355 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 4/3/2012 before The Honorable Elizabeth D Laporte (Date Filed: 4/3/2012). (Court Reporter Connie Kuhl.) (kns, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/3/2012)
April 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO APPEAR BY PHONE. Signed by Judge Laporte on 4/2/12. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2012)
March 30, 2012 Filing 353 Proposed Order and Request to Appear Telephonically at 4/3/12 Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Documents by Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC. (Divelbiss, Rod) (Filed on 3/30/2012)
March 28, 2012 CLERKS NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the Court, on its own motion, shall take the #337 motion for summary judgment under submission on the papers. The hearing previously scheduled for Thursday, March 29, 2012, is vacated. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2012)
March 22, 2012 Filing 352 USCA Memorandum as to #280 Notice of Appeal, filed by SKS Associates LLC (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2012)
March 20, 2012 Filing 351 REPLY (re #342 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Leasing Defendants ) filed byLewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supplemental Simplicio Declaration)(Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 3/20/2012)
March 20, 2012 Filing 350 REPLY (re #341 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Merchant Services Defendants ) filed byLewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supplemental Simplicio Declaration)(Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 3/20/2012)
March 15, 2012 Filing 349 REPLY (re #337 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byNathan Jurczyk, Eric Madura, Merchant Services, Inc, Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Robert Parisi, Alicyn Roy, Universal Card, Inc., Universal Merchant Services LLC. (Logan, Kevin) (Filed on 3/15/2012)
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 348 Order by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting #345 Stipulation.(kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2012)
March 13, 2012 Filing 347 RESPONSE (re #342 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Leasing Defendants ) filed bySam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration with Exhibits)(Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/13/2012)
March 13, 2012 Filing 346 RESPONSE (re #341 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Merchant Services Defendants ) filed byNathan Jurczyk, Eric Madura, Merchant Services, Inc, Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Robert Parisi, Alicyn Roy, Universal Card, Inc., Universal Merchant Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cary D. Sullivan, #2 Exhibit A to H to Declaration of Cary D. Sullivan, #3 Declaration of Jason Moore, #4 Declaration of Nathan Jurczyk)(Logan, Kevin) (Filed on 3/13/2012)
March 13, 2012 Filing 345 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITIONS filed by Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC, Merchant Services Inc, Universal Card Inc, etc. (Divelbiss, Rod) (Filed on 3/13/2012) Modified on 3/14/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/14/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
March 8, 2012 Filing 344 Request for Judicial Notice re #343 Opposition/Response to Motion, filed byLewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Burlingame Motors Inc, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Related document(s) #343 ) (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 3/8/2012)
March 8, 2012 Filing 343 RESPONSE (re #337 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byLewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Burlingame Motors Inc, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Volker Von Glasenapp, #2 Declaration Declaration of Kristen G. Simplicio)(Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 3/8/2012)
February 28, 2012 Filing 342 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Leasing Defendants filed by Lewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Burlingame Motors Inc, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. Motion Hearing set for 4/3/2012 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 3/13/2012. Replies due by 3/20/2012. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Kristen G Simplicio, #2 Exhibit Exhibits to Simplicio Declaration)(Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 2/28/2012)
February 28, 2012 Filing 341 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Merchant Services Defendants filed by Lewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. Motion Hearing set for 4/3/2012 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 3/13/2012. Replies due by 3/20/2012. (Attachments: #1 Separate Statement, #2 Declaration Declaration of Kristen G Simplicio, #3 Exhibit Exhibits to Simplicio Declaration)(Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 2/28/2012)
February 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 340 Order granting #339 Stipulation entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
February 27, 2012 Filing 339 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Pursuant to F.R.E. 502(d) filed by Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC, Just Film, Inc. (Divelbiss, Rod) (Filed on 2/27/2012) Modified on 2/28/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
February 23, 2012 Filing 338 Request for Judicial Notice re #337 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byNathan Jurczyk, Eric Madura, Merchant Services, Inc, Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Robert Parisi, Alicyn Roy, Universal Card, Inc., Universal Merchant Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order granting request for judicial notice in support of motion for partial summary judgment regarding plaintiff Volker Von Glasenapp)(Related document(s) #337 ) (Biffar, Travis) (Filed on 2/23/2012)
February 23, 2012 Filing 337 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Nathan Jurczyk, Eric Madura, Merchant Services, Inc, Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Robert Parisi, Alicyn Roy, Universal Card, Inc., Universal Merchant Services LLC. Motion Hearing set for 3/29/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 3/8/2012. Replies due by 3/15/2012. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cary D. Sullivan in support of motion for partial summary judgment regarding plaintiff Volker Von Glasenapp, #2 Proposed Order granting motion for partial summary judgment regarding plaintiff Volker Von Glasenapp)(Biffar, Travis) (Filed on 2/23/2012)
February 21, 2012 Filing 336 MOTION to Compel Depositions of Defendants filed by Verena Baumgartner, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. Motion Hearing set for 4/3/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Responses due by 3/6/2012. Replies due by 3/13/2012. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kristen Simplicio)(Kennedy, Todd) (Filed on 2/21/2012)
February 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING PLAINTIFFS #327 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO DISMISS ALL CLAIMS BY BURLINGAME MOTORS, INC. AND AMEND THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2012)
January 26, 2012 Filing 334 REPLY (re #327 MOTION for Leave to Dismiss all Claims by "Burlingame Motors, Inc." and Amend Second Amended Complaint to Clarify that "Burlingame Motors" is a Fictitious Business Name of Plaintiff Verena Baumgartner filed byVerena Baumgartner, Burlingame Motors Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Kristen G Simplicio)(Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 1/26/2012) Modified on 1/27/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER granting #308 Motion to Compel; signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2012)
January 23, 2012 Filing 332 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents From Defendant Fiona Walshe by Just Film, Inc.. (Sweet, Michael) (Filed on 1/23/2012)
January 19, 2012 Filing 331 RESPONSE (re #327 MOTION for Leave to Dismiss all Claims by "Burlingame Motors, Inc." and Amend Second Amended Complaint to Clarify that "Burlingame Motors" is a Fictitious Business Name of Plaintiff Verena Baumgartner filed byNathan Jurczyk, Eric Madura, Merchant Services, Inc, Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Robert Parisi, Alicyn Roy, Universal Card, Inc., Universal Merchant Services LLC. (Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 1/19/2012) Modified on 1/20/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 10, 2012 Filing 330 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 1/10/2012 before The Honorable Elizabeth D Laporte (Date Filed: 1/10/2012). (Court Reporter Joan Columbini.) (kns, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/10/2012)
January 6, 2012 Filing 329 NOTICE of Appearance by Janet Suejean Park (Park, Janet) (Filed on 1/6/2012)
January 6, 2012 Filing 328 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Allen Berliner (Berliner, Matthew) (Filed on 1/6/2012)
January 5, 2012 Filing 327 MOTION for Leave to Dismiss all Claims by "Burlingame Motors, Inc." and Amend Second Amended Complaint to Clarify that "Burlingame Motors" is a Fictitious Business Name of Plaintiff Verena Baumgartner filed by Verena Baumgartner, Burlingame Motors Inc. Motion Hearing set for 2/23/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 1/19/2012. Replies due by 1/26/2012. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kristen Simplicio)(Gutride, Adam) (Filed on 1/5/2012) Modified on 1/6/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER re #319 Notice of Substitution of Counsel. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/4/2012. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2012)
January 4, 2012 Filing 325 NOTICE of Appearance by John Vincent Erickson (Erickson, John) (Filed on 1/4/2012)
January 4, 2012 Filing 324 NOTICE of Appearance by Rod Divelbiss (Divelbiss, Rod) (Filed on 1/4/2012)
January 4, 2012 Filing 323 NOTICE of Appearance by John Vincent Erickson (Erickson, John) (Filed on 1/4/2012)
January 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING #303 MOTION TO STAY OR TRANSFER, DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND CLARIFYING ORDER OF AUGUST 29, 2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2012)
December 27, 2011 Filing 321 REPLY (re #308 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Fiona Walshe ) filed byLewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Burlingame Motors Inc, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Sweet, #2 Exhibit to M. Sweet Declaration)(Sweet, Michael) (Filed on 12/27/2011)
December 20, 2011 Filing 320 RESPONSE (re #308 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Fiona Walshe ) filed byFiona Walshe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew K. Wegner in support of Opposition, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Separate Statement in support of Opposition)(Wegner, Matthew) (Filed on 12/20/2011)
December 14, 2011 CLERKS NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the Court, on its own motion, shall take the motion to stay, motion to transfer, and motion for protective order under submission on the papers. The hearing previously scheduled for Thursday, December 15, 2011, is vacated. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2011)
December 7, 2011 Filing 319 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Kevin Elliott Gaut (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gaut, Kevin) (Filed on 12/7/2011)
December 7, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #308 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Fiona Walshe. Responses due by 12/20/2011. Replies due by 12/27/2011. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2011)***pursuant to order, document #318 ***
December 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting #317 Motion for Extension of Time (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2011) Modified on 12/7/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
December 6, 2011 Filing 317 MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Fiona Walshe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew Wegner ISO Fiona Walshe's Application for Order Enlarging Briefing Schedule, #2 Proposed Order Granting Application for Order Enlarging Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff's Mtn to Compel)(Wegner, Matthew) (Filed on 12/6/2011) Modified on 12/7/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
November 30, 2011 Filing 316 REPLY (re #303 MOTION to Stay MOTION to Transfer Case MOTION for Protective Order ) filed byMBF Leasing LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Reply Declaration)(Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/30/2011)
November 30, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #308 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Fiona Walshe. Motion Hearing set for 1/10/2012 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2011)
November 29, 2011 Filing 315 Renotice motion hearing re #308 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Fiona Walshe Plaintiffs' Re-Notice of Motion to Compel Production of Documents From Defendants Fiona Walshe filed byJust Film, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/10/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (Related document(s) #308 ) (Sweet, Michael) (Filed on 11/29/2011)
November 28, 2011 Filing 314 ***FILED IN ERROR, SEE DOCUMENT #315 *** NOTICE by Just Film, Inc. re #310 Proposed Order, #308 Amended MOTION to Compel CORRECTION OF DOCKET#307 Production of Documents from Fiona WalsheAmended MOTION to Compel CORRECTION OF DOCKET#307 Production of Documents from Fiona Walshe, #309 Declaration in Support, Re-Notice of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents From Defendant Fiona Walshe (Sweet, Michael) (Filed on 11/28/2011) Modified on 11/30/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER RE DISCOVERY: Motion to Compel Hearing set for 1/10/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 11/28/2011. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
November 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 312 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR DISCOVERY re #308 Amended MOTION to Compel. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/23/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2011)
November 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 311 Order granting #306 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re #303 MOTION to Stay MOTION to Transfer Case MOTION for Protective Order entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
November 23, 2011 Filing 310 Proposed Order re #308 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Fiona Walshe by Just Film, Inc.. (Sweet, Michael) (Filed on 11/23/2011) Modified on 11/28/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
November 23, 2011 Filing 309 Declaration of Michael A. Sweet in Support of #308 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Fiona Walshe filed byJust Film, Inc.. (Related document(s) #308 ) (Sweet, Michael) (Filed on 11/23/2011) Modified on 11/28/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
November 23, 2011 Filing 308 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Fiona Walshe CORRECTION OF DOCKET#307 filed by Just Film, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/5/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 12/7/2011. Replies due by 12/14/2011. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-F, #2 Exhibit G-I, #3 Supplement LR 27-2 Sep. Statement re Disputed Discovery)(Sweet, Michael) (Filed on 11/23/2011) Modified on 11/28/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
November 22, 2011 Filing 307 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT #308 . *** MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Fiona Walshe filed by Just Film, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 1/5/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 12/6/2011. Replies due by 12/13/2011. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Sweet, #2 Exhibit A-F, #3 Exhibit G-I, #4 Supplement LR 37-2 Sep. Statement re Disputed Discovery, #5 Proposed Order)(Sweet, Michael) (Filed on 11/22/2011) Modified on 11/23/2011 (kc, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/23/2011 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
November 22, 2011 Filing 306 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by MBF Leasing LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration with exhibit, #2 Proposed Order Proposed order)(Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/22/2011)
November 21, 2011 Filing 305 RESPONSE (re #303 MOTION to Stay MOTION to Transfer Case MOTION for Protective Order ) Plaintiffs Opposition filed byLewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Burlingame Motors Inc, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Kristen G. Simplicio, #2 Exhibit Simplicio Declaration Exhibits A-K)(Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 11/21/2011)
November 17, 2011 Filing 304 Amended Declaration of Jennifer Nigro in Support of #303 MOTION to Stay MOTION to Transfer Case MOTION for Protective Order filed byMBF Leasing LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC. (Related document(s) #303 ) (Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/17/2011) Modified on 11/18/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
November 7, 2011 Filing 303 MOTION to Stay, MOTION to Transfer Case, MOTION for Protective Order filed by MBF Leasing LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC. Motion Hearing set for 12/15/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 11/22/2011. Replies due by 11/29/2011. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Nigro Decl., #2 Exhibit Ex. A to Nigro Decl., #3 Exhibit Ex. B to Nigro Decl., #4 Exhibit Ex. C to Nigro Decl., #5 Exhibit Ex. D to Nigro Decl., #6 Exhibit Ex. E to Nigro Decl., #7 Exhibit Ex. F to Nigro Decl., #8 Exhibit Ex. G to Nigro Decl., #9 Declaration Kulangroth Decl., #10 Exhibit Exs. A - F to Kulangroth Decl., #11 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/7/2011)
November 7, 2011 Filing 302 ***FILED IN ERROR, REFER TO DOCUMENT #303 *** MOTION to Stay, MOTION to Transfer Case, MOTION for Protective Order filed by MBF Leasing LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC. Motion Hearing set for 12/15/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 11/21/2011. Replies due by 11/28/2011. Responses due by 11/22/2011. Replies due by 11/29/2011. (Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 11/7/2011) Modified on 11/8/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
November 7, 2011 CLERKS NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the further case management conference, previously set for Thursday, February 2, 2012, is continued to Thursday, July 12, 2012, at 2:00 p.m., to be heard along with the class certification motion, in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA 94612. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2011)
November 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER Granting #300 Stipulation to continue class certification hearing and extend associated briefing schedule. Motion Hearing set for 7/12/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/12/2012 02:00 PM. Case Management Statement due by 7/5/2012. Motions due by 4/27/2012. Responses due by 6/8/2012. Replies due by 6/29/2012. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/7/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2011)
November 3, 2011 Filing 300 STIPULATION to continue class certification hearing and extend associated briefing schedule; (Proposed) Order by Lewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Burlingame Motors Inc, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp, Fiona Walshe. (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 11/3/2011) Modified on 11/4/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 30, 2011 Filing 299 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Second) byFiona Walshe. (Wegner, Matthew) (Filed on 9/30/2011)
September 30, 2011 Filing 298 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byNathan Jurczyk, Eric Madura, Merchant Services, Inc, Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Robert Parisi, Alicyn Roy, Universal Card, Inc., Universal Merchant Services LLC. (Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 9/30/2011)
September 30, 2011 Filing 297 ANSWER to Amended Complaint bySam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC. (Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/30/2011)
September 26, 2011 Filing 296 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 9/26/2011) Modified on 9/27/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2011 CLERKS NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the Further Case Management Conference and the Class Certification Motion hearing previously set for Tuesday, January 31, 2012, is continued to Thursday, February 2, 2012, at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, CA 94612. Case Management Statement due by January 26, 2012. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2011)
September 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 295 Order granting #294 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer until Sept 30, 2011 entered by Hon. Claudia Wilken. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
September 1, 2011 Filing 294 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer To Second Amended Complaint filed by Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Sara Krieger, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., SKS Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration in Support with Exhibits A and B, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 9/1/2011)
August 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE DEFENDANT SKS ASSOCIATES, LLCS #283 MOTION TO STAY AND MBF MERCHANT CAPITAL AND WILLIAM HEALYS #285 MOTION FOR SANCTIONS. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2011)
August 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken ON DEFENDANTS #221 , #246 , #247 , #248 , #249 MOTIONS. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2011)
August 18, 2011 Filing 291 REPLY (re #283 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal of Order Denying Motion to Compel Arbitration ) filed bySKS Associates LLC. (Gaut, Kevin) (Filed on 8/18/2011)
August 18, 2011 Filing 290 REPLY (re #285 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 11 ) filed byWilliam Healy, MBF Merchant Capital, LLC. (Trimble, Joan) (Filed on 8/18/2011)
August 11, 2011 Filing 289 DECLARATION of Kristen Simplicio In Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Sanctions filed byJust Film, Inc.. (Sweet, Michael) (Filed on 8/11/2011) Modified on 8/12/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 11, 2011 Filing 288 RESPONSE (re #285 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 11 ) Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Sanctions filed byJust Film, Inc.. (Sweet, Michael) (Filed on 8/11/2011)
August 11, 2011 Filing 287 RESPONSE (re #283 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal of Order Denying Motion to Compel Arbitration ) Plaintiffs' Opposition filed byLewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Burlingame Motors Inc, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 8/11/2011)
August 2, 2011 Filing 286 Transcript of Proceedings held on June 2, 2011, before Judge Claudia Wilken. Court Reporter Diane E. Skillman, Telephone number 510-451-2930, Diane_Skillman@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 8/23/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/2/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/31/2011. (Skillman, Diane) (Filed on 8/2/2011)
July 28, 2011 Filing 285 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 11 filed by William Healy, MBF Merchant Capital, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 9/1/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 8/11/2011. Replies due by 8/18/2011. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Trimble, Joan) (Filed on 7/28/2011)
July 27, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #283 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal of Order Denying Motion to Compel Arbitration. Motion Hearing set for 9/1/2011 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken.(See Docket No. 284 For Revised Notice Setting New Date). (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2011)
July 26, 2011 Filing 284 NOTICE by SKS Associates LLC re #283 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal of Order Denying Motion to Compel Arbitration Revising Hearing Date (Gaut, Kevin) (Filed on 7/26/2011)
July 26, 2011 Hearing Date of 8/25/2011 is Terminated as to #283 Motion. Motions Must Have Atleast 35 Days Notice. CRD Called Counsel to Appropriately Re-Notice. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2011)
July 25, 2011 Filing 283 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal of Order Denying Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by SKS Associates LLC. Motion Hearing set for 8/25/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Responses due by 8/8/2011. Replies due by 8/15/2011. (Gaut, Kevin) (Filed on 7/25/2011)
July 13, 2011 Filing 282 Transcript Designation and Ordering Form for proceedings held on 6/2/2011 before Judge Claudia Wilken, (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2011)
July 12, 2011 Filing 281 USCA Case Number 11-16677 Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals for #280 Notice of Appeal, filed by SKS Associates LLC. (kk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2011)
July 12, 2011 Filing 280 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #278 Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #277 Preliminary Injunction by SKS Associates LLC. Filing fee $ 455, Receipt #44611007274. Appeal Record due by 8/11/2011. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 279 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Michael Adam Sweet (Sweet, Michael) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
June 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER by Judge Claudua Wilken GRANTING PLAINTIFFS #208 MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND DENYING DEFENDANT SKS ASSOCIATES, LLCS #253 MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION OF PLAINTIFF ERIN CAMPBELLS CLAIMS. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 13, 2011 Filing 277 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AGAINST DEFENDANT SKS ASSOCIATES. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/13/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 13, 2011 *** CMC Date Corrected From 1/31/2011 to 1/31/2012 Pursuant to Order, Docket No. 276 *** Case Management Statement due by 1/24/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/31/2012 02:00 PM. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 7, 2011 Filing 274 Letter from SKS Asssociates LLC in Response to Plaintiffs' Letter regarding proposed language for preliminary injunction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
June 6, 2011 Filing 273 Letter from Plaintiffs (Regarding Proposed Language for Preliminary Injunction). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 6/6/2011)
June 2, 2011 Filing 276 Minute Entry and Case Management Order: Initial Case Management Conference held on 6/2/2011 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 6/2/2011), Case referred to Private ADR. Case Management Statement due by 1/24/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/31/2011 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 1/31/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/4/2012 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 10/4/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (Court Reporter Diane Skillman.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/2/2011)
June 2, 2011 Filing 275 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 6/2/2011 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 6/2/2011). (Court Reporter Diane Skillman.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/2/2011)
May 26, 2011 Filing 272 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Nathan Jurczyk, Eric Madura, Merchant Services, Inc, Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Robert Parisi, Alicyn Roy, Universal Card, Inc., Universal Merchant Services LLC, Sam Buono, et al. (Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 5/26/2011) Modified on 5/27/2011 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 24, 2011 Filing 271 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/24/2011)
May 19, 2011 Filing 270 REPLY (re #253 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss or Stay Action ) filed bySKS Associates LLC. (Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
May 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER Granting #268 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference from May 31, 2011 to June 2, 2011. Case Management Statement due by 5/26/2011. Case Management Conference set for 6/2/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/19/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
May 17, 2011 Filing 268 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Continue Case Management Conference from May 31, 2011 to June 2, 2011 by Nathan Jurczyk, Eric Madura, Merchant Services, Inc, Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Robert Parisi, Alicyn Roy, Universal Card, Inc., Universal Merchant Services LLC, Lewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Burlingame Motors Inc, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc, Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp, (Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 5/17/2011) Modified on 5/19/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
May 13, 2011 Filing 267 REPLY (re #249 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint, and to Compel Arbitration, Dismiss or Stay ) filed bySam Buono, Jay Cohen, Brian Fitzgerald, Golden Eagle Leasing LLC, Joseph I. Sussman, P.C., Sara Krieger, Lease Finance Group, LLC, Lease Source-LSI, LLC, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., RBL Capital Group, LLC, Joseph I. Sussman. (Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/13/2011)
May 13, 2011 Filing 266 REPLY (re #248 Joinder and MOTION to Dismiss First Cause of Action of SAC ) filed byFiona Walshe. (Wegner, Matthew) (Filed on 5/13/2011) Modified on 5/16/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
May 13, 2011 Filing 265 REPLY (re #247 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint ) filed byNathan Jurczyk, Eric Madura, Merchant Services, Inc, Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Robert Parisi, Alicyn Roy, Universal Card, Inc., Universal Merchant Services LLC. (Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 5/13/2011)
May 13, 2011 Filing 264 REPLY (re #246 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ) filed byWilliam Healy, MBF Merchant Capital, LLC. (Trimble, Joan) (Filed on 5/13/2011)
May 12, 2011 Filing 263 RESPONSE (re #253 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss or Stay Action ) filed byLewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Burlingame Motors Inc, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kristen Simplicio)(Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 5/12/2011)
May 6, 2011 Filing 262 RESPONSE (re #246 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, #249 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint, and to Compel Arbitration, Dismiss or Stay, #247 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint, #248 MOTION for Joinder MOTION to Dismiss First Cause of Action of SAC ) Plaintiffs' Consolidated Opposition filed byLewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Burlingame Motors Inc, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kristen Simplicio, #2 Appendix A, #3 Appendix B)(Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 5/6/2011)
May 6, 2011 Filing 261 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal and Further Clarification by Lewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Burlingame Motors Inc, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 5/6/2011)
May 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #259 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Scott E. Silberfein (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2011)
May 3, 2011 Filing 259 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice as to Scott E. Silberfein ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 44611006915.) filed by Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Brian Fitzgerald, Golden Eagle Leasing LLC, Joseph I. Sussman, P.C., Sara Krieger, Lease Finance Group, LLC, Lease Source-LSI, LLC, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, RBL Capital Group, LLC, SKS Associates LLC, Joseph I. Sussman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2011)
May 3, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #208 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against SKS Associates, #221 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. Motion Hearing set for 6/2/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2011)
May 3, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated. #258 Order on Motion to Continue,. (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2011)
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING #256 Defendant SKS Associates LLC's Motion to Continue Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction, Extending Expiration Date of April 8, 2011 Temporary Restraining Order, and Continuing Hearing Date on Defendants Universal Card, Inc., et al.'s Motion to Compel Arbitration (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2011)
May 2, 2011 Filing 257 Declaration of Jennifer Nigro in Support of #256 MOTION to Continue Hearing Date of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed bySKS Associates LLC. (Related document(s) #256 ) (Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/2/2011) Modified on 5/3/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
May 2, 2011 Filing 256 MOTION to Continue Hearing Date of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by SKS Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Defendant SKS Associates LLC's Motion for an Order Continuing the Hearing Date)(Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 5/2/2011)
May 2, 2011 Filing 255 REPLY (re #208 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against SKS Associates ) filed byLewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Burlingame Motors Inc, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Kristen Simplicio)(Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 5/2/2011)
April 28, 2011 Filing 254 RESPONSE (re #208 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against SKS Associates ) in Opposition filed bySKS Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Krieger Declaration, #2 Mirsky Declaration, #3 Proposed Order)(Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/28/2011)
April 28, 2011 Filing 253 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss or Stay Action filed by SKS Associates LLC. Motion Hearing set for 6/2/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (Attachments: #1 Krieger Declaration, #2 Mirsky Declaration, #3 Proposed Order)(Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/28/2011)
April 21, 2011 Filing 252 REPLY (re #221 MOTION to Compel Arbitration ) filed byJason Moore, National Payment Processing, Universal Card, Inc.. (Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 4/21/2011)
April 20, 2011 Filing 251 NOTICE OF ERRATA re #249 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint, and to Compel Arbitration, Dismiss or Stay by Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Brian Fitzgerald, Golden Eagle Leasing LLC, Joseph I. Sussman, P.C., Sara Krieger, Lease Finance Group, LLC, Lease Source-LSI, LLC, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., RBL Capital Group, LLC, Joseph I. Sussman. (Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/20/2011) Modified on 4/21/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
April 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER EXTENDING EXPIRATION DATE OF TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER ENTERED APRIL 8, 2011. This order Grants #240 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/20/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2011)
April 15, 2011 Filing 249 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint, and to Compel Arbitration, Dismiss or Stay filed by Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Brian Fitzgerald, Golden Eagle Leasing LLC, Joseph I. Sussman, P.C., Sara Krieger, Lease Finance Group, LLC, Lease Source-LSI, LLC, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., RBL Capital Group, LLC, Joseph I. Sussman. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Nigro Declaration, #3 Cohen Declaration, #4 Krieger Declaration, #5 Krieger Declaration II, #6 Mezei Declaration, #7 Sussman Declaration, #8 Buono Declaration, #9 Fitzgerald Declaration, #10 Proposed Order)(Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/15/2011) Modified on 4/18/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
April 15, 2011 Filing 248 MOTION to Dismiss First Cause of Action of SAC; and Joinder in part re #247 Motion to Dismiss filed by Fiona Walshe. (Attachments: #1 Memo Points and Authorities in Support of Joinder and Mtn to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order Granting Defendant Walshe's Joinder and Motion to Dismiss)(Wegner, Matthew) (Filed on 4/15/2011) Modified on 4/18/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
April 15, 2011 Filing 247 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Nathan Jurczyk, Eric Madura, Merchant Services, Inc, Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Robert Parisi, Alicyn Roy, Universal Card, Inc., Universal Merchant Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 4/15/2011)
April 15, 2011 Filing 246 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by William Healy, MBF Merchant Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Trimble, Joan) (Filed on 4/15/2011)
April 15, 2011 Filing 245 MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by William Healy, MBF Merchant Capital, LLC. (Trimble, Joan) (Filed on 4/15/2011)
April 14, 2011 Filing 244 RESPONSE (re #221 MOTION to Compel Arbitration ) Plaintiffs' Opposition filed byLewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Burlingame Motors Inc, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kristen Simplicio)(Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 4/14/2011)
April 13, 2011 Filing 243 Notice of Withdrawal of re #138 Notice of Lis Pendens (2020 Happy Trails Road, San Luis Obispo, San Luis Obispo County) by Lewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Burlingame Motors Inc, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp(Moses, Shane) (Filed on 4/13/2011) Modified on 4/14/2011 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 13, 2011 Filing 242 Notice of Withdrawal of re #137 Notice of Lis Pendens (122 The Bluffs Drive, Pismo Beach, San Luis Obispo County) by Lewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Burlingame Motors Inc, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp(Moses, Shane) (Filed on 4/13/2011) Modified on 4/14/2011 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 13, 2011 Filing 241 Notice of Withdrawal re #131 Notice of Lis Pendens (21 Santa Rosa Mountain Lane, Rancho Mirage, Riverside County) by Lewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Burlingame Motors Inc, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp (Moses, Shane) (Filed on 4/13/2011) Modified on 4/14/2011 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
April 12, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #208 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against SKS Associates. Response due by 4/28/2011. Reply due by 5/2/2011. Motion Hearing set for 5/5/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2011)
April 12, 2011 Filing 240 STIPULATION re Temporary Restraining Order and Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction pursuant to re #237 Order by SKS Associates LLC. (Hayes, Daniel) (Filed on 4/12/2011) Modified on 4/13/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
April 11, 2011 Filing 239 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Keenan Wegner (Wegner, Matthew) (Filed on 4/11/2011)
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 238 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AGAINST DEFENDANT SKS ASSOCIATES. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/8/2011. (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2011) Modified on 4/9/2011 (cwlc2, COURT STAFF).
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING #231 Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for a Temporary Restraining Order; GRANTING in part #227 Defendant SKS Associates's Motion to Adjourn Return Date and Enlarge Time; and concerning Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/8/2011. (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2011) Modified on 4/9/2011 (cwlc2, COURT STAFF).
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #237 *** ORDER by Judge Wilken granting in part and denying in part #227 Motion for Extension of Time to File; granting #231 Motion for TRO (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2011) Modified on 4/8/2011 (cwlc3, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/9/2011 (cwlc2, COURT STAFF).
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 235 Order Granting #229 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/8/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2011)
April 7, 2011 Filing 234 DECLARATION of Jennifer Nigro in Response to #231 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Against SKS Associates filed by Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Brian Fitzgerald, Golden Eagle Leasing LLC, Joseph I. Sussman, P.C., Sara Krieger, Lease Finance Group, LLC, Lease Source-LSI, LLC, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., RBL Capital Group, LLC, SKS Associates LLC, Joseph I. Sussman. (Related document(s) #231 ) (Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/7/2011) Modified on 4/8/2011 (kc, COURT STAFF).
April 7, 2011 Filing 233 Declaration of Douglas C. Graham in Support of #232 Opposition/Response to Motion,, to Adjourn the Return Date of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Enlarge Time for Defendant SKS Associates LLC to Respond filed byLewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Burlingame Motors Inc, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Related document(s) #232 ) (Graham, Douglas) (Filed on 4/7/2011)
April 7, 2011 Filing 232 RESPONSE (re #227 MOTION to Adjourn the Return Date of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and for Extension of Time to Respond ) Opposition to Motion to Adjourn the Return Date of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Enlarge Time for Defendant SKS Associates LLC to Respond filed byLewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Burlingame Motors Inc, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Graham, Douglas) (Filed on 4/7/2011)
April 6, 2011 Filing 231 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Against SKS Associates; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Lewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Burlingame Motors Inc, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of D. Graham, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of D. Graham, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of D. Graham, #4 Proposed Order)(Graham, Douglas) (Filed on 4/6/2011) Modified on 4/7/2011 (kc, COURT STAFF).
April 6, 2011 Filing 230 DISREGARD, DUPLICATE OF DOCKET ENTRY #229 Proposed Order re #229 Stipulation, [Proposed] Stipulated Protective Order No. 1 by Lewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Burlingame Motors Inc, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Moses, Shane) (Filed on 4/6/2011) Modified on 4/7/2011 (kc, COURT STAFF).
April 6, 2011 Filing 229 [Proposed] Stipulated Protective Order No. 1 by Lewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Burlingame Motors Inc, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Moses, Shane) (Filed on 4/6/2011) Modified on 4/7/2011 (kc, COURT STAFF).
April 4, 2011 Filing 228 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SKS Associates LLC re #225 Certificate of Interested Entities, #226 Notice (Other), #227 MOTION for Extension of Time to File (Hayes, Daniel) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
April 4, 2011 Filing 227 MOTION to Adjourn the Return Date of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction and for Extension of Time to Respond filed by SKS Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Decl. of Jennifer Nigro, #2 Proposed Order)(Hayes, Daniel) (Filed on 4/4/2011) Modified on 4/5/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
April 4, 2011 Filing 226 NOTICE by SKS Associates LLC of Interested Parties and Entities, Rule 7.1 (Hayes, Daniel) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
April 4, 2011 Filing 225 Certificate of Interested Entities by SKS Associates LLC (Hayes, Daniel) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
March 31, 2011 Filing 224 Declaration of Howard C. Rile, Jr. in Support of #221 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed byJason Moore, National Payment Processing, Universal Card, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C (1 of 3), #4 Exhibit C (2 of 3), #5 Exhibit C (3 of 3))(Related document(s) #221 ) (Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 3/31/2011)
March 31, 2011 Filing 223 Declaration of Nathan Jurczyk in Support of #221 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed byJason Moore, National Payment Processing, Universal Card, Inc.. (Related document(s) #221 ) (Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 3/31/2011)
March 31, 2011 Filing 222 Declaration of Jason Moore in Support of #221 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed byJason Moore, National Payment Processing, Universal Card, Inc.. (Related document(s) #221 ) (Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 3/31/2011)
March 31, 2011 Filing 221 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Universal Card, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/5/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 3/31/2011)
March 31, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #208 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against SKS Associates. Motion Hearing set for 5/5/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2011)
March 30, 2011 Filing 220 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing re #208 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against SKS Associates; Hearing reset to 5/5/2011 at 2:00pm by Lewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Burlingame Motors Inc, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 3/30/2011) Modified on 3/31/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
March 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting #215 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2011)
March 29, 2011 Filing 218 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Burlingame Motors Inc, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp re #209 Declaration in Support, #211 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), #210 Declaration in Support, #208 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against SKS Associates, #207 Amended Complaint,,, (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 3/29/2011)
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting #212 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint and to Amend the Court's March 4, 2011 Order. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2011)
March 25, 2011 Filing 216 Declaration of Jennifer Nigro, Esq. in Support of #215 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed bySam Buono, Jay Cohen, Brian Fitzgerald, Golden Eagle Leasing LLC, Joseph I. Sussman, P.C., Sara Krieger, Lease Finance Group, LLC, Lease Source-LSI, LLC, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., RBL Capital Group, LLC, Joseph I. Sussman. (Related document(s) #215 ) (Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/25/2011)
March 25, 2011 Filing 215 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Brian Fitzgerald, Golden Eagle Leasing LLC, Joseph I. Sussman, P.C., Sara Krieger, Lease Finance Group, LLC, Lease Source-LSI, LLC, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., RBL Capital Group, LLC, Joseph I. Sussman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Enlarge Number of Pages for Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint)(Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/25/2011)
March 23, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #208 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against SKS Associates. Motion Hearing set for 4/28/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2011)
March 23, 2011 Filing 214 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Burlingame Motors Inc, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp re #208 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Injunction Against SKS Associates; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof (Graham, Douglas) (Filed on 3/23/2011)
March 22, 2011 Filing 213 Declaration of Jennifer Nigro in Support of #212 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint and to Amend the Court's March 4, 2011 Order filed bySam Buono, Jay Cohen, Brian Fitzgerald, Golden Eagle Leasing LLC, Joseph I. Sussman, P.C., Sara Krieger, Lease Finance Group, LLC, Lease Source-LSI, LLC, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., RBL Capital Group, LLC, Joseph I. Sussman. (Related document(s) #212 ) (Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/22/2011)
March 22, 2011 Filing 212 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint and to Amend the Court's March 4, 2011 Order filed by Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Brian Fitzgerald, Golden Eagle Leasing LLC, Joseph I. Sussman, P.C., Sara Krieger, Lease Finance Group, LLC, Lease Source-LSI, LLC, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., RBL Capital Group, LLC, Joseph I. Sussman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/22/2011)
March 22, 2011 Filing 211 AMENDED NOTICE of hearing re #208 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against SKS Associates; Hearing set for 4/28/2011 2:00pm by Lewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Burlingame Motors Inc, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp(Graham, Douglas) (Filed on 3/22/2011) Modified on 3/23/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
March 22, 2011 Filing 210 Declaration of Kristen Simplicio in Support of #208 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against SKS Associates filed byLewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Burlingame Motors Inc, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #208 ) (Sweet, Michael) (Filed on 3/22/2011) Modified on 3/23/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
March 22, 2011 Filing 209 Declaration of Erin Campbell in Support of #208 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed byLewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Burlingame Motors Inc, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #208 ) (Sweet, Michael) (Filed on 3/22/2011) Modified on 3/23/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
March 22, 2011 Filing 208 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against SKS Associates; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Lewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Burlingame Motors Inc, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sweet, Michael) (Filed on 3/22/2011) Modified on 3/23/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
March 18, 2011 Filing 207 AMENDED COMPLAINT (SECOND) against Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Brian Fitzgerald, Golden Eagle Leasing LLC, Rich Hahn, William Healy, Joseph I. Sussman, P.C., Nathan Jurczyk, Lina Kravic, Sara Krieger, Lease Finance Group, LLC, Lease Source-LSI, LLC, MBF Leasing LLC, MBF Merchant Capital, LLC, Eric Madura, Merchant Services, Inc, Leonard Mezei, Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., Robert Parisi, RBL Capital Group, LLC, Alicyn Roy, Joseph I. Sussman, Universal Card, Inc., Universal Merchant Services LLC, Fiona Walshe. Filed byLewis Bae, The Rose Dress Inc, Dietz Towing Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp, Terry Jordan, Burlingame Motors Inc, Jerry Su, Verena Baumgartner, Rainbow Business Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (part 1), #2 Exhibit A (part 2), #3 Exhibit A (part 3))(Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 3/18/2011)
March 18, 2011 Filing 206 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Rich Hahn and Lina Kravic by Lewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Burlingame Motors Inc, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 3/18/2011)
March 15, 2011 Filing 205 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Burlingame Motors Inc, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp re #204 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), #202 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), #203 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) (Moses, Shane) (Filed on 3/15/2011)
March 15, 2011 Filing 204 NOTICE of Withdrawal of re #134 Notice of Lis Pendens (25 Calvados, Newport Coast, Orange County) by Lewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Burlingame Motors Inc, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp (Moses, Shane) (Filed on 3/15/2011) Modified on 3/16/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
March 15, 2011 Filing 203 NOTICE of Withdrawal of re #133 Notice of Lis Pendens (14 Alessandria, Newport Beach, Orange County)by Lewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Burlingame Motors Inc, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp (Moses, Shane) (Filed on 3/15/2011) Modified on 3/16/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
March 15, 2011 Filing 202 Notice of Withdrawal of re #132 Notice of Lis Pendens (1 Alessandria, Newport Beach, Orange County) by Lewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Burlingame Motors Inc, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp (Moses, Shane) (Filed on 3/15/2011) Modified on 3/16/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
March 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING SCHEIN & CAI, LLPS #193 MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS, CROSS-CLAIMANTS AND CROSS-DEFENDANTS ATLAS PAYMENT PROCESSING; FIONA WALSHE; ANTHONY KUTSCHER; ROVER ENTERPRISES, INC.; PROTG INVESTMENTS, INC.; AND MERCHANT SERVICES F.A., INC. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2011)
March 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING #186 Defendants Universal Card, Inc.; National Payment Processing, Inc.; and Jason Moore's Motion to Amend the Court's November 29, 2010 Order; DENYING as moot #188 Defendants Universal Card, Inc.; National Payment Processing, Inc.; and Jason Moore's Motion to Shorten Time and #121 TransFirst Entities and Columbus Bank & Trust's Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue; DENYING without prejudice #195 Defendants Universal Card, Inc.; National Payment Processing, Inc.; and Jason Moore's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2011)
March 3, 2011 Filing 199 Declaration of Howard C. Rile, Jr. in Support of #195 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed byJason Moore, National Payment Processing, Universal Card, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C (1 of 5), #4 Exhibit C (2 of 5), #5 Exhibit C (3 of 5), #6 Exhibit C (4 of 5), #7 Exhibit C (5 of 5))(Related document(s) #195 ) (Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
March 3, 2011 Filing 198 Declaration of Fiona Walshe in Support of #195 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed byJason Moore, National Payment Processing, Universal Card, Inc.. (Related document(s) #195 ) (Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
March 3, 2011 Filing 197 Declaration of Alicyn Roy in Support of #195 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed byJason Moore, National Payment Processing, Universal Card, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) #195 ) (Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
March 3, 2011 Filing 196 Declaration of Nathan Jurczyk in Support of #195 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed byJason Moore, National Payment Processing, Universal Card, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (1 of 2), #2 Exhibit A (2 of 2), #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C (1 of 2), #5 Exhibit C (2 of 2), #6 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) #195 ) (Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
March 3, 2011 Filing 195 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Universal Card, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/31/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 3/3/2011)
February 17, 2011 Filing 194 (Proposed) Order re MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Fiona Walshe. (Cai, Jingming James) (Filed on 2/17/2011) Modified on 2/18/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
February 17, 2011 Filing 193 MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel of Record filed by Fiona Walshe. Motion Hearing set for 3/31/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (Cai, Jingming James) (Filed on 2/17/2011)
February 10, 2011 Filing 192 Reply Memorandum re #186 MOTION to Amend November 29,2010 Order #179 filed byJason Moore, National Payment Processing, Universal Card, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Supporting Declaration of Cary D. Sullivan)(Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 2/10/2011) Modified on 2/11/2011 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
February 7, 2011 Filing 191 CLERKS NOTICE TAKING MOTION UNDER SUBMISSION. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2011)
February 3, 2011 Filing 190 Memorandum in Opposition re #186 MOTION to Amend November 29,2010 Order #179 filed byVerena Baumgartner, Burlingame Motors Inc, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kristen Simplicio, #2 Proposed Order)(Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 2/3/2011) Modified on 2/4/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 19, 2011 Filing 189 Declaration of Cary D. Sullivan in Support of #188 MOTION to Shorten Time for Briefing and Hearing Motion to Amend Court's November 29, 2010 Order filed byJason Moore, National Payment Processing, Universal Card, Inc.. (Related document(s) #188 ) (Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 1/19/2011)
January 19, 2011 Filing 188 MOTION to Shorten Time for Briefing and Hearing Motion to Amend Court's November 29, 2010 Order filed by Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Universal Card, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 1/19/2011)
January 19, 2011 Filing 187 Declaration of Cary D. Sullivan in Support of #186 MOTION to Amend November 29, 2010 Order #179 filed byJason Moore, National Payment Processing, Universal Card, Inc.. (Related document(s) #186 ) (Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 1/19/2011) Modified on 1/21/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 19, 2011 Filing 186 MOTION to Amend November 29,2010 Order #179 filed by Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Universal Card, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/24/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 1/19/2011) Modified on 1/21/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting #182 Stipulated Request for Substitution of Counsel. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2011)
January 19, 2011 Filing 184 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Columbus Bank & Trust by Lewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Burlingame Motors Inc, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 1/19/2011)
January 18, 2011 Filing 183 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of TransFirst Holdings, Inc.; TransFirst, LLC; and TransFirst Third Party Sales, LLC by Lewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Burlingame Motors Inc, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
January 18, 2011 Filing 182 Stipulated Request for Substitution of Counsel and Proposed Order Thereon filed by Transfirst Holdings, Inc., TransFirst Third Party Sales, LLC, TransFirst LLC. (Tendolkar, Seema) (Filed on 1/18/2011) Modified on 1/21/2011 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 6, 2011 Filing 181 NOTICE by Anthony Kutscher, Jr of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Cai, Jingming James) (Filed on 1/6/2011)
December 30, 2010 Filing 180 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Fifth Third Bank by Lewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Burlingame Motors Inc, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 12/30/2010)
November 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER re Defendants' #108 , #109 , #112 , #114 , #115 , #121 , #122 Motions to Dismiss. Case Management Statement due by 3/24/2011. Case Management Conference set for 3/31/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/29/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2010)
November 23, 2010 Filing 178 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Merrick Bank by Lewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Burlingame Motors Inc, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 11/23/2010)
November 16, 2010 Filing 177 JOINT STATUS REPORT by JWM Holdings LLC, Nathan Jurczyk, La Quinta Holdings LLC, Eric Madura, Merchant Services, Inc, Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Robert Parisi, Alicyn Roy, Universal Card, Inc., Universal Merchant Services LLC, Atlas Payment Processing, et al. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C (part 1 of 3), #4 Exhibit C (part 2 of 3), #5 Exhibit C (part 3 of 3))(Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 11/16/2010) Modified on 11/17/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 21, 2010 Filing 175 ANSWER TO CROSSCLAIM #166 Crossclaim byMerchant Services, Inc, Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Universal Card, Inc.. (Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 9/21/2010)
September 16, 2010 Filing 176 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 9/16/2010 before Claudia Wilken (Date Filed: 9/16/2010) Case Management Statement due by 3/8/2011. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/15/2011 02:00 PM. (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/16/2010)
September 9, 2010 Filing 174 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by JWM Holdings LLC, Nathan Jurczyk, La Quinta Holdings LLC, Eric Madura, Merchant Services, Inc, Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Robert Parisi, Alicyn Roy, Universal Card, Inc., Universal Merchant Services LLC, Lewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Burlingame Motors Inc, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp, Fifth Third Bank, Columbus Bank and Trust, Transfirst LLC, TransFirst Third Party Sales, TransFirst Holdings Inc., Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Golden Eagle Leasing LLC, Rich Hahn, Lina Kravic, Sara Krieger, Lease Finance Group, LLC, MBF Leasing LLC, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., RBL Capital Group, LLC, Atlas Payment Processing, Fiona Walshe, William Healy . (Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 9/9/2010) Modified on 9/10/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
September 8, 2010 Filing 173 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options, filed by Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 9/8/2010) Modified on 9/9/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 8, 2010 Filing 172 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options, filed by Just Film, Inc., Volker Von Glasenapp (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 9/8/2010) Modified on 9/9/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 8, 2010 Filing 171 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options, filed by Dietz Towing Inc., Terry Jordan (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 9/8/2010) Modified on 9/9/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 8, 2010 Filing 170 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options, filed by Lewis Bae, The Rose Dress Inc. (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 9/8/2010) Modified on 9/9/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 8, 2010 Filing 169 Certificate of Interested Entities, filed by The Rose Dress Inc (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 9/8/2010) Modified on 9/9/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 8, 2010 Filing 168 Certificate of Interested Entities, filed by Burlingame Motors Inc (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 9/8/2010) Modified on 9/9/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 8, 2010 Filing 167 Certificate of Interested Entities, filed by Dietz Towing Inc (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 9/8/2010) Modified on 9/9/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 7, 2010 Filing 166 CROSSCLAIM against Merchant Services, Inc, Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Universal Card, Inc.. Filed byProtege Investments, Inc., Anthony Kutscher, Jr. (Cai, Jingming James) (Filed on 9/7/2010)
September 7, 2010 Filing 165 ANSWER TO CROSSCLAIM byAnthony Kutscher, Jr, Protege Investments, Inc.. (Cai, Jingming James) (Filed on 9/7/2010)
September 3, 2010 Filing 164 Certificate of Interested Entities by La Quinta Holdings LLC (Logan, Kevin) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
September 3, 2010 Filing 163 Certificate of Interested Entities by JWM Holdings LLC (Logan, Kevin) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
September 3, 2010 Filing 162 Certificate of Interested Entities by Universal Merchant Services LLC (Logan, Kevin) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
September 3, 2010 Filing 161 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options as to La Quinta Holdings, LLC (Logan, Kevin) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
September 3, 2010 Filing 160 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options as to JWM Holdings, LLC (Logan, Kevin) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
September 3, 2010 Filing 159 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options as to Universal Merchant Services, LLC (Logan, Kevin) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
September 3, 2010 Filing 158 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options as to National Payment Processing, Inc. (Logan, Kevin) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
September 3, 2010 Filing 157 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options as to Universal Card, Inc. (Logan, Kevin) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
September 3, 2010 Filing 156 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options as to Merchant Services, Inc. (Logan, Kevin) (Filed on 9/3/2010)
September 2, 2010 Filing 155 Consolidated Reply Memorandum re #109 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint, #114 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint, #112 MOTION to Dismiss plaintiffs' first amended complaint, #122 MOTION to Dismiss, #121 MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, STAY THIS MATTER PENDING ARBITRATION, #108 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction to First Amended Complaint, #115 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by JWM Holdings LLC, Nathan Jurczyk, La Quinta Holdings LLC, Eric Madura, Merchant Services, Inc, Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Robert Parisi, Alicyn Roy, Universal Card, Inc., Universal Merchant Services LLC. (Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 9/2/2010) Modified on 9/3/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
August 30, 2010 Filing 154 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Tendolkar, Seema) (Filed on 8/30/2010)
August 27, 2010 Filing 153 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Northing Leasing Systems, Inc. (Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/27/2010)
August 27, 2010 Filing 152 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options of MBF Leasing, LLC (Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/27/2010)
August 27, 2010 Filing 151 ERRATA re #150 Memorandum in Opposition,,, to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss by Lewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Burlingame Motors Inc, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Sweet, Michael) (Filed on 8/27/2010)
August 26, 2010 Filing 150 Memorandum in Opposition re #109 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint, #114 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint, #112 MOTION to Dismiss plaintiffs' first amended complaint, #122 MOTION to Dismiss, #121 MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, STAY THIS MATTER PENDING ARBITRATION, #108 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction to First Amended Complaint, #115 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction First Amended Class Action Complaint filed byLewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Burlingame Motors Inc, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of V. von Glasenapp, #2 Affidavit Declaration of T. Jordan, #3 Affidavit Declaration of V. Baumgartner)(Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 8/26/2010)
August 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER re #145 Granting Stipulation TO CONSOLIDATE PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITIONS TO DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND TO SUSPEND RULE 7-4(B). Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/26/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2010)
August 26, 2010 Filing 148 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Lewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Burlingame Motors Inc, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 8/26/2010)
August 25, 2010 Filing 147 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Joseph I. Sussman, P.C. (Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/25/2010)
August 25, 2010 Filing 146 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Joseph I. Sussman (Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/25/2010)
August 24, 2010 Filing 145 STIPULATION (AND (PROPOSED) ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITIONS TO DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND TO SUSPEND RULE 7-4(B) by Lewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Burlingame Motors Inc, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp, Merchant Services, Inc. et al. (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 8/24/2010) Modified on 8/25/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2010 Filing 144 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Brian Fitzgerald (Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
August 24, 2010 Filing 143 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Lina Kravic (Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
August 24, 2010 Filing 142 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Sam Buono (Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
August 24, 2010 Filing 141 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Rich Hahn (Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
August 24, 2010 Filing 140 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Sara Krieger (Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
August 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER re #135 Granting Stipulation PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 6-1(A) TO RESCHEDULE THE HEARING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS and PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 6-2(A) TO RESCHEDULE THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 9/16/2010 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 9/16/2010 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/23/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
August 20, 2010 Filing 138 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Shane Jefferson Moses Notice of Pendency of Action (2020 Happy Trails Road, San Luis Obispo, San Luis Obispo County) (Moses, Shane) (Filed on 8/20/2010)
August 20, 2010 Filing 137 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Shane Jefferson Moses Notice of Pendency of Action (122 The Bluffs Drive, Pismo Beach, San Luis Obispo County) (Moses, Shane) (Filed on 8/20/2010)
August 19, 2010 Filing 136 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (McGuire, James) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 18, 2010 Filing 135 STIPULATION PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 6-1(A) TO RESCHEDULE THE HEARING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS and PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 6-2(A) TO RESCHEDULE THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; (PROPOSED) ORDER by Lewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Burlingame Motors Inc, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc, Volker Von Glasenapp, Transfirst Holdings Inc, et al. (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 8/18/2010) Modified on 8/20/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 18, 2010 Filing 134 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Shane Jefferson Moses Notice of Pendency of Action (25 Calvados, Newport Coast, Orange County) (Moses, Shane) (Filed on 8/18/2010)
August 18, 2010 Filing 133 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Shane Jefferson Moses Notice of Pendency of Action (14 Alessandria, Newport Beach, Orange County) (Moses, Shane) (Filed on 8/18/2010)
August 18, 2010 Filing 132 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Shane Jefferson Moses Notice of Pendency of Action (1 Alessandria, Newport Beach, Orange County) (Moses, Shane) (Filed on 8/18/2010)
August 18, 2010 Filing 131 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Shane Jefferson Moses Notice of Pendency of Action (21 Santa Rosa Mountain Lane, Rancho Mirage, Riverside County) (Moses, Shane) (Filed on 8/18/2010)
August 18, 2010 Filing 130 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options - Fifth Third Bank (Michel, Hayes) (Filed on 8/18/2010)
August 16, 2010 Filing 129 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options as to Alicyn Roy (Logan, Kevin) (Filed on 8/16/2010)
August 16, 2010 Filing 128 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options as to Eric Madura (Logan, Kevin) (Filed on 8/16/2010)
August 16, 2010 Filing 127 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options as to Robert Parisi (Logan, Kevin) (Filed on 8/16/2010)
August 16, 2010 Filing 126 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options as to Nathan Jurczyk (Logan, Kevin) (Filed on 8/16/2010)
August 16, 2010 Filing 125 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options as to Jason Moore (Logan, Kevin) (Filed on 8/16/2010)
August 16, 2010 Filing 124 Notice of Joinder and Joinder re Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Lease Source-LSI, LLC. (Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/16/2010) Modified on 8/17/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 11, 2010 Filing 123 Notice of Joinder and Joinder by Defendant Merrick Bank Corporation in Motion to Dismiss filed by Merrick Bank. Motion Hearing set for 9/9/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Pearson, Scott) (Filed on 8/11/2010) Modified on 8/12/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 9, 2010 Filing 122 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Joseph I. Sussman, P.C., Joseph I. Sussman. Motion Hearing set for 9/9/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: #1 Joseph Sussman Declaration, #2 Jennifer Nigro Declaration, #3 Proposed Order)(Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 8/9/2010)
August 9, 2010 Filing 121 MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, STAY THIS MATTER PENDING ARBITRATION filed by TransFirst LLC, TransFirst Third Party Sales, LLC, Transfirst Holdings, Inc., Columbus Bank and Trust Company; Motion Hearing set for 9/9/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Decl. of Andrew Rueff ISO Defs. TransFirst Holdings, Inc., TransFirst, LLC, TransFirst Third Party Sales, LLC and Columbus Bank and Trust Company's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Class Action Complaint or, In The Alternative, Stay This Matter Pending Arbitration, #2 Affidavit Decl. of Seema Tendolkar ISO Defs. TransFirst Holdings, Inc., TransFirst, LLC, TransFirst Third Party Sales, LLC and Columbus Bank and Trust Company's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Class Action Complaint or, In The Alternative, Stay This Matter Pending Arbitration, #3 Affidavit Decl. of N. Fraser Cruickshank ISO Defendants TransFirst Holdings, Inc., TransFirst, LLC, TransFirst Third Party Sales, LLC and Columbus Bank and Trust Company's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Class Action Complaint or, In the Alternative, Stay This Matter Pending Arbitration, #4 Affidavit Decl. of Curtis Bauer ISO Defendants TransFirst Holdings, Inc., TransFirst, LLC, TransFirst Third Party Sales, LLC and Columbus Bank and Trust Company's Notice of Motion and Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Class Action Complaint or, In The Alternative, Stay This Matter Pending Arbitration, #5 Exhibit Curtis Bauer Decl. Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit Curtis Bauer Decl. Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit Curtis Bauer Decl. Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit Curtis Bauer Decl. Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit Curtis Bauer Decl. Exhibit 5, #10 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Defendants TransFirst Holdings, Inc., TransFirst, LLC, TransFirst Third Party Sales, LLC and Columbus Bank and Trust Company's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Class Action Complaint or, In The Alternative, Stay This Matter Pending Arbitration)(Ellinikos, Maria) (Filed on 8/9/2010) Modified on 8/10/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 29, 2010 Filing 120 Joinder by William Healy, MBF Merchant Capital, LLC. (Trimble, Joan) (Filed on 7/29/2010)
July 28, 2010 Filing 119 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Halldin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/28/2010)
July 28, 2010 Filing 118 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Halldin, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/28/2010)
July 28, 2010 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #108 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction to First Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 9/9/2010 02:00 PM. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2010)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER re #107 Granting Stipulation Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 6-1(a) To Extend Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to First Amended Class Action Complaint. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/27/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2010)
July 27, 2010 Filing 116 NOTICE by William Healy, MBF Merchant Capital, LLC re #108 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction to First Amended Complaint NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (Trimble, Joan) (Filed on 7/27/2010)
July 26, 2010 Filing 115 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Brian Fitzgerald. Motion Hearing set for 9/9/2009 09:30 AM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: #1 Brian Fitzgerald Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/26/2010)
July 26, 2010 Filing 114 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Brian Fitzgerald, Golden Eagle Leasing LLC, Rich Hahn, Lina Kravic, Sara Krieger, Lease Finance Group, LLC, MBF Leasing LLC, Leonard Mezei, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., RBL Capital Group, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 9/9/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: #1 Sara Krieger Declaration, #2 Jennifer Nigro Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Nigro Decl., #4 Proposed Order)(Nigro, Jennifer) (Filed on 7/26/2010)
July 26, 2010 Filing 113 Declaration of Cary D. Sullivan in Support of #112 MOTION to Dismiss plaintiffs' first amended complaint filed byJWM Holdings LLC, Nathan Jurczyk, La Quinta Holdings LLC, Eric Madura, Merchant Services, Inc, Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Robert Parisi, Alicyn Roy, Universal Card, Inc., Universal Merchant Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Related document(s) #112 ) (Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 7/26/2010)
July 26, 2010 Filing 112 MOTION to Dismiss plaintiffs' first amended complaint filed by JWM Holdings LLC, Nathan Jurczyk, La Quinta Holdings LLC, Eric Madura, Merchant Services, Inc, Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Robert Parisi, Alicyn Roy, Universal Card, Inc., Universal Merchant Services LLC. Motion Hearing set for 9/9/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 7/26/2010)
July 26, 2010 Filing 111 Joinder re #109 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint by Merrick Bank. (Pearson, Scott) (Filed on 7/26/2010)
July 26, 2010 Filing 110 NOTICE of Joinder and Joinder in Motions to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Fiona Walshe. (Cai, Jingming James) (Filed on 7/26/2010) Modified on 7/27/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2010 Filing 109 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Fifth Third Bank. Motion Hearing set for 9/9/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities in support of Fifth Third Bank's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Jocelyn N. Prewitt-Stanley in support of Defendant Fifth Third Bank's Motion to Dismiss, #4 Exhibit A - Part 1, #5 Exhibit A - Part 2, #6 Exhibit A - Part 3, #7 Exhibit A - Part 4)(Michel, Hayes) (Filed on 7/26/2010)
July 26, 2010 Filing 108 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction to First Amended Complaint filed by William Healy, MBF Merchant Capital, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 9/2/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration in Support of Motion, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Proof of Service)(Trimble, Joan) (Filed on 7/26/2010)
July 26, 2010 Filing 107 STIPULATION Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 6-1(a) To Extend Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to First Amended Class Action Complaint by TransFirst LLC, TransFirst Third Party Sales, LLC, Transfirst Holdings, Inc., Lewis Bae, Verena Baumgartner, Burlingame Motors Inc, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc., Volker Von Glasenapp, Columbus Bank and Trust. (Ellinikos, Maria) (Filed on 7/26/2010) Modified on 7/27/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 22, 2010 Filing 106 ANSWER TO CROSSCLAIM #72 Crossclaim byMerchant Services, Inc, Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Universal Card, Inc.. (Logan, Kevin) (Filed on 7/22/2010)
July 22, 2010 Filing 105 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss the Cross-Claim filed byMerchant Services, Inc, Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Universal Card, Inc.. (Logan, Kevin) (Filed on 7/22/2010)
July 22, 2010 Filing 104 STIPULATION Regarding Atlas Payment Processing's Dismissal Of Cross-Claim by Atlas Payment Processing, Merchant Services, Inc, Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Universal Card, Inc., Fiona Walshe. (Cai, Jingming James) (Filed on 7/22/2010)
July 22, 2010 Filing 103 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #104 . *** STIPULATION Regarding Atlas Payment Processing's Dismissal of Cross-Claim by Atlas Payment Processing, Merchant Services, Inc, Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Universal Card, Inc., Fiona Walshe. (Cai, Jingming James) (Filed on 7/22/2010) Modified on 7/22/2010 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
July 16, 2010 Filing 102 ANSWER TO CROSSCLAIM #89 Crossclaim byMerchant Services, Inc, Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Universal Card, Inc.. (Logan, Kevin) (Filed on 7/16/2010)
July 13, 2010 Filing 101 NOTICE by Merchant Services F.A., Inc., Rover Enterprises, Inc., Fiona Walshe of Withdrawal of Motion to Strike or Dismiss (Cai, Jingming James) (Filed on 7/13/2010)
July 13, 2010 Filing 100 ANSWER TO CROSSCLAIM of Universal Card, Inc. and National Payment Processing, Inc. byMerchant Services F.A., Inc., Rover Enterprises, Inc., Fiona Walshe. (Cai, Jingming James) (Filed on 7/13/2010)
July 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER re #94 Granting Stipulation TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT and STIPULATED REQUEST PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 6-2(a) TO WITHDRAW MOTIONS TO DISMISS SET FOR HEARING ON AUGUST 5, 2010. Case Management Conference set for 9/9/2010 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/12/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2010)
July 9, 2010 Filing 98 Memorandum in Opposition re #96 Joint MOTION to Continue DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND RULE 26 OBLIGATIONS filed byVerena Baumgartner, Dietz Towing Inc, Terry Jordan, Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, The Rose Dress Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Kristen Simplicio, #2 Proposed Order)(Sweet, Michael) (Filed on 7/9/2010)
July 9, 2010 Filing 96 Joint MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference, Case Management Statement and Rule 26 Obligations filed by TransFirst LLC, TransFirst Third Party Sales, LLC, Transfirst Holdings, Inc., Atlas PaymentProcessing, Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Columbus Bank and Trust, Fifth Third Bank, Golden Eagle Leasing LLC, Rich Hahn, William Healy, LIna Kravic, Sara Krieger, Lease Finance Group LLC, MBF Leasing LLC, MBF Merchang Capital LLC, Eric Madura, Merchant Services Inc., Merrick Bank, Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., RBL Capital Group LLC, Universal Card Inc, Fiona Walshe Motion Hearing set for 7/22/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order)(Ellinikos, Maria) (Filed on 7/9/2010) Modified on 7/12/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 9, 2010 Filing 95 Joint MOTION to Shorten Time DEFENDANTS' JOINT MOTION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME filed by TransFirst LLC, TransFirst Third Party Sales, LLC, Transfirst Holdings, Inc., Transfirst Independent Sales Services, Atlas PaymentProcessing, Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Columbus Bank and Trust, Fifth Third Bank, Golden Eagle Leasing LLC, Rich Hahn, William Healy, LIna Kravic, Sara Krieger, Lease Finance Group LLC, MBF Leasing LLC, MBF Merchang Capital LLC, Eric Madura, Merchant Services Inc., Merrick Bank, Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., RBL Capital Group LLC, Universal Card Inc, Fiona Walshe . Motion Hearing set for 7/22/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ellinikos, Maria) (Filed on 7/9/2010) Modified on 7/12/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 8, 2010 Filing 97 Summons Issued as to JWM Holdings LLC, Joseph I. Sussman, P.C., Nathan Jurczyk, La Quinta Holdings LLC, Lease Source LLC, Leonard Mezei, Robert Parisi, Alicyn Roy, Joseph I. Sussman, Universal Merchant Services LLC. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2010)
July 7, 2010 Filing 94 STIPULATION PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 6-1(a) TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT and STIPULATED REQUEST PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 6-2(a) TO WITHDRAW MOTIONS TO DISMISS SET FOR HEARING ON AUGUST 5, 2010 AND [PROPOSED] ORDER THEREON by Transfirst Financial Institutions Services, Transfirst Holdings, Inc., Transfirst Independent Sales Services, Columbus Bank and Trust, Atlas Payment Processing, et al. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Maria Ellinikos In Support of Stipulations to Extend Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to First Amended Class Action Complaint and Withdraw Motions to Dismiss Set For Hearing on August 5, 2010)(Ellinikos, Maria) (Filed on 7/7/2010) Modified on 7/8/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
July 6, 2010 Filing 93 Memorandum in Opposition re #87 MOTION to Dismiss Cross-Claim filed byAtlas Payment Processing, Fiona Walshe. (Cai, Jingming James) (Filed on 7/6/2010)
July 2, 2010 Filing 92 Letter from Michael Sweet to Hon. Claudia Wilken re Vacating Hearing Date on Motions to Dismiss. (Sweet, Michael) (Filed on 7/2/2010)
June 25, 2010 Filing 91 AMENDED COMPLAINT: Jury Demand against Atlas Payment Processing, Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Columbus Bank and Trust, Brian Fitzgerald, Golden Eagle Leasing LLC, Rich Hahn, William Healy, Lina Kravic, Sara Krieger, Lease Finance Group, LLC, Lease Source, Inc., MBF Leasing LLC, MBF Merchant Capital, LLC, Eric Madura, Merchant Services, Inc, Merrick Bank, Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., RBL Capital Group, LLC, Third Fifth Bank, Transfirst Financial Institutions Services, Transfirst Holdings, Inc., Transfirst Independent Sales Services, Universal Card, Inc., Universal Merchant Services Corporation, Fiona Walshe. Filed byJust Film, Inc., Jerry Su, Volker Von Glasenapp, Rainbow Business Services. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix A part 1, #2 Appendix Appendix A part 2, #3 Appendix Appendix A part 3, #4 Appendix Appendix A part 4, #5 Appendix Appendix A part 5, #6 Appendix Appendix A part 6)(Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 6/25/2010) Modified on 6/28/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
June 25, 2010 Filing 90 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Of Universal Merchant Services Corporation; United Bank Card, Inc.; SPC, Inc. d/b/a First National Merchant Solutions; and First National Bank of Omaha by Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, Volker Von Glasenapp (Simplicio, Kristen) (Filed on 6/25/2010)
June 25, 2010 Filing 89 CROSSCLAIM against Merchant Services, Inc, Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Universal Card, Inc.. Filed byRover Enterprises, Inc., Merchant Services F.A., Inc.. (Cai, Jingming James) (Filed on 6/25/2010)
June 25, 2010 Filing 88 Joinder re #74 MOTION to Strike or Dismiss Cross-Claim of Universal Card, Inc. and National Payment Processing, Inc. and for Sanctions by Merchant Services F.A., Inc., Rover Enterprises, Inc.. (Cai, Jingming James) (Filed on 6/25/2010)
June 25, 2010 Filing 87 MOTION to Dismiss Cross-Claim filed by Merchant Services, Inc, Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Universal Card, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/5/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 6/25/2010)
June 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER re #76 Stipulation, filed by National Payment Processing, Jason Moore, Fiona Walshe, Universal Card, Inc., Atlas Payment Processing, Merchant Services, Inc; DENYING Request to Seal Previously Filed Document and ORDERING Removal of Documents from Public Record. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/23/2010. (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2010)
June 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #63 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for John M. Heaphy (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2010)
June 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #62 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Jeffrey J. Halldin (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2010)
June 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #43 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Jennifer Nigro (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2010)
June 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting #42 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Abraham Y Skoff (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2010)
June 22, 2010 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #61 MOTION to Dismiss, #58 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Brian Fitzgerald. Motion Hearing set for 8/5/2010 02:00 PM. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2010)
June 21, 2010 Filing 81 Reply to Opposition to Stipulation to Seal Previously filed document re: #80 filed by Atlas Payment Processing, Fiona Walshe. (Cai, Jingming James) (Filed on 6/21/2010) Modified on 6/21/2010 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
June 21, 2010 Filing 80 Reply to Opposition to stipulation to seal previously filed document filed byMerchant Services, Inc, Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Universal Card, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 6/21/2010)
June 21, 2010 Filing 79 NOTICE OF REVISED HEARING DATE AND PLACE re #58 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Brian Fitzgerald (Gaut, Kevin) (Filed on 6/21/2010) Modified on 6/22/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
June 21, 2010 Filing 78 NOTICE OF REVISED HEARING DATE AND PLACE re #61 MOTION to Dismiss by Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Brian Fitzgerald, Golden Eagle Leasing LLC, Rich Hahn, Lina Kravic, Sara Krieger, Lease Finance Group, LLC, MBF Leasing LLC, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., RBL Capital Group, LLC(Gaut, Kevin) (Filed on 6/21/2010) Modified on 6/22/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
June 18, 2010 Filing 77 ***REMOVED PURSUANT TO ORDER, DOCUMENT #86 *** Memorandum in Opposition to Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Seal Previously Filed Document filed byJust Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, Volker Von Glasenapp. (Safier, Seth) (Filed on 6/18/2010) Modified on 6/24/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
June 18, 2010 Filing 76 STIPULATION and [PROPOSED] Order to Seal Previously Filed Document Pursuant to Civil Local Rules 7-12 and 79-5 by Atlas Payment Processing, Fiona Walshe, Merchant Services Inc, Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Universal Card Inc. (Cai, Jingming James) (Filed on 6/18/2010) Modified on 6/21/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2010 Filing 75 Proposed Order re #74 MOTION to Strike or Dismiss Cross-Claim of Universal Card, Inc. and National Payment Processing, Inc. and for Sanctions by Fiona Walshe. (Cai, Jingming James) (Filed on 6/17/2010)
June 17, 2010 Filing 74 MOTION to Strike or Dismiss Cross-Claim of Universal Card, Inc. and National Payment Processing, Inc. and for Sanctions filed by Fiona Walshe. Motion Hearing set for 8/5/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-B)(Cai, Jingming James) (Filed on 6/17/2010)
June 14, 2010 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #51 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 8/5/2010 02:00 PM. (cp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
June 11, 2010 Filing 73 Amended Notice #51 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Third Fifth Bank. Motion Hearing set for 8/5/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Michel, Hayes) (Filed on 6/11/2010) Modified on 6/14/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
June 10, 2010 Filing 72 Amended CROSSCLAIM against Merchant Services, Inc, Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Universal Card, Inc.. Filed byFiona Walshe, Atlas Payment Processing. (Cai, Jingming James) (Filed on 6/10/2010)
June 10, 2010 Filing 71 Amended Notice of Motion re #45 MOTION to Dismiss NONPARTY UNITED BANK CARD, INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER F.R.C.P. 12(b)4 AND 12(b)(5); POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF MOTION to Dismiss filed by United Bank Card of America, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/5/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Elliott, Robert) (Filed on 6/10/2010) Modified on 6/11/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
June 9, 2010 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Motion Hearing set for 8/5/2010 02:00 PM. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2010)
June 9, 2010 Filing 70 NOTICE of Motion by William Healy, MBF Merchant Capital, LLC re #41 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(B)(2) AND FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 12(B)(6). Motion Hearing set for 8/5/2010 at 2:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (Trimble, Joan) (Filed on 6/9/2010) Modified on 6/10/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
June 8, 2010 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #52 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Or, In The Alternative, Stay This Matter Pending Arbitration, #59 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 8/5/2010 at 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2010)
June 8, 2010 Filing 69 AMENDED Notice of Motion re #59 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Eric Madura, Merchant Services, Inc, Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Universal Card, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/5/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 6/8/2010) Modified on 6/9/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
June 8, 2010 Filing 68 Joinder in #41 Motion to Dismiss, #46 Motion to Dismiss, #51 Motion to Dismiss, #52 Motion to Dismiss, #59 Motion to Dismiss filed by William Healy, MBF Merchant Capital, LLC. (Trimble, Joan) (Filed on 6/8/2010) Modified on 6/9/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
June 8, 2010 Filing 67 AMENDED Notice of Motion re #52 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Or, In the Alternative, Stay This Matter Pending Arbitration filed by Transfirst Financial Institutions Services, Transfirst Holdings, Inc., Transfirst Independent Sales Services. Motion Hearing set for 8/5/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ellinikos, Maria) (Filed on 6/8/2010) Modified on 6/9/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
June 8, 2010 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #46 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Motion Hearing set for 8/5/2010 at 02:00 PM. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2010)
June 8, 2010 Filing 66 Second Amended Notice of Motion re #46 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by First National Bank of Omaha, SPC, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 8/5/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. (Narita, Tomio) (Filed on 6/8/2010) Modified on 6/8/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
June 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 65 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE: Case Management Statement due by 8/3/2010. Case Management Conference set for 8/10/2010 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/8/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2010) Modified on 6/8/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
June 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Claudia Wilken for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge James Larson no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/7/10. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2010)
June 4, 2010 Filing 63 MOTION for attorney John M. Heaphy leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 346110046567.) filed by William Healy, MBF Merchant Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
June 4, 2010 Filing 62 MOTION for attorney Jeffrey J. Halldin leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611046567.) filed by William Healy, MBF Merchant Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
June 4, 2010 Filing 61 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Brian Fitzgerald, Golden Eagle Leasing LLC, Rich Hahn, Lina Kravic, Sara Krieger, Lease Finance Group, LLC, MBF Leasing LLC, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., RBL Capital Group, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 8/4/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Sara Krieger Declaration, #2 Jennifer Nigro Declaration, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(Gaut, Kevin) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
June 4, 2010 Filing 60 Declaration of Cary D. Sullivan in Support of #59 MOTION to Dismiss filed byEric Madura, Merchant Services, Inc, Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Universal Card, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, part 1 of 2, #3 Exhibit B, part 2 of 2, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, part 1 of 2, #7 Exhibit E, part 2 of 2, #8 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) #59 ) (Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
June 4, 2010 Filing 59 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Eric Madura, Merchant Services, Inc, Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Universal Card, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/4/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
June 4, 2010 Filing 58 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Brian Fitzgerald filed by Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Brian Fitzgerald, Golden Eagle Leasing LLC, Rich Hahn, Lina Kravic, Sara Krieger, Lease Finance Group, LLC, MBF Leasing LLC, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., RBL Capital Group, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 8/4/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian Fitzgerald, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certifcate of Service)(Gaut, Kevin) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
June 4, 2010 Filing 57 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Congress Financial Corporation by Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Volker Von Glasenapp (Sweet, Michael) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
June 4, 2010 Filing 56 ***REMOVED PURSUANT TO ORDER, DOCUMENT #86 *** CROSSCLAIM against Merchant Services, Inc, Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Universal Card, Inc.. Filed byFiona Walshe, Atlas Payment Processing. (Cai, Jingming James) (Filed on 6/4/2010) Modified on 6/21/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/24/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
June 4, 2010 Filing 55 Joinder re #41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, #52 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Or, In The Alternative, Stay This Matter Pending Arbitration by Merrick Bank. (Pearson, Scott) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
June 4, 2010 Filing 54 Defendants Atlas Payment Processing and Fiona Walshe's ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) byAtlas Payment Processing. (Cai, Jingming James) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
June 4, 2010 Filing 53 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
June 4, 2010 Filing 52 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Or, In The Alternative, Stay This Matter Pending Arbitration filed by Transfirst Financial Institutions Services, Transfirst Holdings, Inc., Transfirst Independent Sales Services. Motion Hearing set for 8/4/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Seema Tendolkar, #2 Affidavit Declaration of N. Fraser Cruickshank, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Andrew Rueff, #4 Exhibit Ex. 1 to Decl. of Andrew Rueff, #5 Exhibit Ex. 2 to Decl. of Andrew Rueff, #6 Exhibit Ex. 3 to Decl. of Andrew Rueff)(Ellinikos, Maria) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
June 4, 2010 Filing 51 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Third Fifth Bank. Motion Hearing set for 8/4/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities in Support, #2 Declaration of Jocelyn N. Prewitt-Stanley in Support, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Proof of Service)(Inesta, Nancy) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
June 4, 2010 Filing 50 Amended Notice of Motion re #46 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by First National Bank of Omaha, SPC, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/4/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Narita, Tomio) (Filed on 6/4/2010) Modified on 6/8/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
June 4, 2010 Filing 49 Proposed Order re #45 MOTION to Dismiss NONPARTY UNITED BANK CARD, INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER F.R.C.P. 12(b)4 AND 12(b)(5); POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF MOTION to Dismiss NONPARTY UNITED BANK CARD, INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER F.R.C.P. 12(b)4 AND 12(b)(5); POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF by United Bank Card of America, Inc.. (Elliott, Robert) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
June 4, 2010 Filing 48 Declaration of Jordan Frankel in Support of #45 MOTION to Dismiss NONPARTY UNITED BANK CARD, INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER F.R.C.P. 12(b)4 AND 12(b)(5); POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF MOTION to Dismiss NONPARTY UNITED BANK CARD, INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER F.R.C.P. 12(b)4 AND 12(b)(5); POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed byUnited Bank Card of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) #45 ) (Elliott, Robert) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
June 4, 2010 Filing 47 Declaration of Robert Elliott in Support of #45 MOTION to Dismiss NONPARTY UNITED BANK CARD, INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER F.R.C.P. 12(b)4 AND 12(b)(5); POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF MOTION to Dismiss NONPARTY UNITED BANK CARD, INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER F.R.C.P. 12(b)4 AND 12(b)(5); POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed byUnited Bank Card of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6)(Related document(s) #45 ) (Elliott, Robert) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
June 4, 2010 Filing 46 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by First National Bank of Omaha, SPC, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Rose Lulla)(Narita, Tomio) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
June 4, 2010 Filing 45 MOTION to Dismiss NONPARTY UNITED BANK CARD, INC.S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER F.R.C.P. 12(b)4 AND 12(b)(5); POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by United Bank Card of America, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/4/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Elliott, Robert) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
June 4, 2010 Filing 44 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Transfirst Financial Institutions Services, Transfirst Holdings, Inc., Transfirst Independent Sales Services And Request For Reassignment To A United States District Judge. (Ellinikos, Maria) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
June 4, 2010 Filing 41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by William Healy, MBF Merchant Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration in Support of Motion, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #4 Proof of Service)(Trimble, Joan) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
June 3, 2010 Filing 43 MOTION for attorney Jennifer Nigro leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611046548.) filed by Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Brian Fitzgerald, Golden Eagle Leasing LLC, Rich Hahn, Lina Kravic, Sara Krieger, Lease Finance Group, LLC, MBF Merchant Capital, LLC, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., RBL Capital Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2010)
June 3, 2010 Filing 42 MOTION for attorney Abraham Y Skoffleave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611046548.) filed by Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Brian Fitzgerald, Golden Eagle Leasing LLC, Rich Hahn, Lina Kravic, Sara Krieger, Lease Finance Group, LLC, MBF Merchant Capital, LLC, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., RBL Capital Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2010)
June 3, 2010 Filing 40 Certificate of Interested Entities by Fiona Walshe and Atlas Payment Processing (Cai, Jingming James) (Filed on 6/3/2010)
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge James Larson Granting Admission of Attorney Webner #32 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2010)
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge James Larson Granting Admission of Attorney Saffer #34 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2010)
June 2, 2010 Filing 646 Summons Issued as to Anthony Kutscher, Jr, Merchant Services F.A., Inc., Protege Investments, Inc., Rover Enterprises, Inc.. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2010) (cpS, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2010 Filing 37 CROSSCLAIM and Joinder of Cross-Defendants against Fiona Walshe. Filed byNational Payment Processing, Universal Card, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, part 1, #2 Exhibit A, part 2, #3 Exhibit B)(Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 6/2/2010)
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by Judge James Larson Granting Admission of Seema Tendolkar #31 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2010)
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge James Larson Granting Admission of K. Todd Phillipps #30 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2010)
June 1, 2010 Filing 34 MOTION for attorney Michael A. Saffer leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611046427.) filed by United Bank Card of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2010)
May 26, 2010 Filing 33 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Robert Latousek and Peter DePalma by Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, Volker Von Glasenapp (Safier, Seth) (Filed on 5/26/2010)
May 21, 2010 Filing 32 MOTION for attorney Robert N. Webner leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611046086.) filed by Third Fifth Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2010)
May 18, 2010 Filing 31 MOTION for Attorney Seema Tendolkar leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611045961.) filed by Transfirst Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2010)
May 18, 2010 Filing 30 MOTION for attorney Todd Phillips leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611045960.) filed by Transfirst Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2010)
May 18, 2010 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Transfirst Holdings, Inc. Of Order Setting Initial CMC and ADR Deadlines; Consenting To A Magistrate Judge's Jurisdiction in the Northern District of California; Notice of Assignment of Case To A U.S. Magistrate Judge For Trial (Ellinikos, Maria) (Filed on 5/18/2010)
May 18, 2010 Filing 28 Certificate of Interested Entities by William Healy, MBF Merchant Capital, LLC and Disclosure Statement (Trimble, Joan) (Filed on 5/18/2010)
May 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Judge James Larson Granting Admission of Stephen Colangelo #24 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2010)
May 17, 2010 Filing 26 Certificate of Interested Entities by Just Film, Inc., Rainbow Business Services, Jerry Su, Volker Von Glasenapp and Disclosure Statement (Sweet, Michael) (Filed on 5/17/2010)
May 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER TO EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND ORDER REGARDING SERVICE re #11 Stipulation filed by Eric Madura, National Payment Processing, Jason Moore, Universal Card, Inc., Merchant Services, Inc. Signed by Judge James Larson on 5/13/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
May 13, 2010 Filing 24 MOTION for attorney Stephen M. Colangelo leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611045793.) filed by Columbus Bank and Trust. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
May 13, 2010 Filing 23 Certificate of Interested Entities by United Bank Card of America, Inc. (Elliott, Robert) (Filed on 5/13/2010)
May 12, 2010 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Merrick Bank PROOF OF SERVICE (Pearson, Scott) (Filed on 5/12/2010)
May 12, 2010 Filing 21 Certificate of Interested Entities by Merrick Bank (Pearson, Scott) (Filed on 5/12/2010)
May 12, 2010 Filing 20 Certificate of Interested Entities by Third Fifth Bank and Disclosure Statement (Michel, Hayes) (Filed on 5/12/2010)
May 12, 2010 Filing 17 Certificate of Interested Entities by Columbus Bank and Trust and Disclosure Statement (McGuire, James) (Filed on 5/12/2010)
May 11, 2010 Filing 16 Certificate of Interested Entities by First National Bank of Omaha, SPC, Inc. (Narita, Tomio) (Filed on 5/11/2010)
May 11, 2010 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Entities by National Payment Processing and Disclosure Statement (Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 5/11/2010)
May 11, 2010 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Entities by Merchant Services, Inc and Disclosure Statement (Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 5/11/2010)
May 11, 2010 Filing 13 Certificate of Interested Entities by Universal Card, Inc. and Disclosure Statement (Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 5/11/2010)
May 11, 2010 Filing 12 Declaration of Cary D. Sullivan in Support of #11 Stipulation to Extend Time, Establish Briefing Schedule and Regarding Electronic Mail Service filed byEric Madura, Merchant Services, Inc, Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Universal Card, Inc.. (Related document(s) #11 ) (Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 5/11/2010)
May 11, 2010 Filing 11 STIPULATION to Extend Time, Establish Briefing Schedule and Regarding Electronic Mail Service by Eric Madura, Merchant Services, Inc, Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Universal Card, Inc.. (Sullivan, Cary) (Filed on 5/11/2010)
May 7, 2010 Filing 19 Statement by Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Golden Eagle Leasing LLC, Rich Hahn, Lina Kravic, Sara Krieger, Lease Finance Group, LLC, MBF Leasing LLC, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., RBL Capital Group, LLC. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2010)
May 7, 2010 Filing 18 Certificate of Interested Entities by Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Golden Eagle Leasing LLC, Rich Hahn, Lina Kravic, Sara Krieger, Lease Finance Group, LLC, MBF Leasing LLC, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., RBL Capital Group, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2010)
May 7, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2010)
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 8/11/2010. Case Management Conference set for 8/18/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge James Larson on 5/7/10. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2010)
May 7, 2010 Filing 9 Certificate of Interested Entities by Congress Financial Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal, (Jacob, Thomas) (Filed on 5/11/2010)
May 7, 2010 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Transfirst Holdings, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, #3 Declaration in Support, #4 Declaration in Support, #6 Certificate of Interested Entities, #7 Joinder,, #2 Declaration in Support, #5 Declaration in Support, (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2010)
May 7, 2010 Filing 7 Joinder re #1 Notice of Removal, by Atlas Payment Processing, Sam Buono, Jay Cohen, Columbus Bank and Trust, Congress Financial Corporation, First National Bank of Omaha, Golden Eagle Leasing LLC, Rich Hahn, William Healy, Lina Kravic, Sara Krieger, Lease Finance Group, LLC, MBF Leasing LLC, MBF Merchant Capital, LLC, Eric Madura, Merchant Services, Inc, Merrick Bank, Jason Moore, National Payment Processing, Northern Funding, LLC, RBL Capital Group, LLC, SPC, Inc., Third Fifth Bank, United Bank Card of America, Inc., Universal Card, Inc., Fiona Walshe. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2010)
May 7, 2010 Filing 6 Certificate of Interested Entities by Transfirst Holdings, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2010)
May 7, 2010 Filing 5 Declaration of Sara Krieger in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, filed bySam Buono, Jay Cohen, Golden Eagle Leasing LLC, Rich Hahn, Lina Kravic, Sara Krieger, Lease Finance Group, LLC, MBF Leasing LLC, Northern Funding, LLC, Northern Leasing Systems, Inc., RBL Capital Group, LLC. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2010)
May 7, 2010 Filing 4 Declaration of Stephen Cadden in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, filed byTransfirst Holdings, Inc.. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2010)
May 7, 2010 Filing 3 Declaration of Seema Tendolkar in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, filed byTransfirst Holdings, Inc.. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2010)
May 7, 2010 Filing 2 Declaration of Maria Ellinikos in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, filed byTransfirst Holdings, Inc.. (Related document(s) #1 ) (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/30/2010: #1 Exhibits A-B) (cpS, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2010 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL /no process from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is CGC 10-498225. (Filing fee $350 receipt number 34611045597). Filed byTransfirst Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rainbow Business Solutions et al v. Merchant Services, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rich Hahn
Represented By: Daniel Manning Hayes
Represented By: Jennifer Nigro
Represented By: Abraham Y. Skoff,
Represented By: Kevin Elliott Gaut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph I. Sussman, P.C.
Represented By: Scott E. Silberfein
Represented By: Jennifer Nigro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merchant Services, Inc
Represented By: Cary Donahue Sullivan
Represented By: Thomas Reed Malcolm
Represented By: Travis Biffar
Represented By: Brian D. Hershman
Represented By: Kevin Hugh Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Card, Inc.
Represented By: Cary Donahue Sullivan
Represented By: Thomas Reed Malcolm
Represented By: Travis Biffar
Represented By: Brian D. Hershman
Represented By: Kevin Hugh Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard Mezei
Represented By: Rod Divelbiss
Represented By: John Vincent Erickson
Represented By: Kevin Elliott Gaut
Represented By: Jennifer Nigro
Represented By: Robert Lillienstein
Represented By: Thomas J Kavaler
Represented By: Scott E. Silberfein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transfirst Independent Sales Services
Represented By: Maria Ellinikos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Merchant Services LLC
Represented By: Cary Donahue Sullivan
Represented By: Travis Biffar
Represented By: Kevin Hugh Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First National Bank of Omaha
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Topor
Represented By: Tomio Buck Narita
Represented By: Michael John Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Jurczyk
Represented By: Cary Donahue Sullivan
Represented By: Travis Biffar
Represented By: Kevin Hugh Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Bank Card of America, Inc.
Represented By: Michael A. Saffer
Represented By: Robert Norman Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Han
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Payment Processing
Represented By: Cary Donahue Sullivan
Represented By: Thomas Reed Malcolm
Represented By: Travis Biffar
Represented By: Brian D. Hershman
Represented By: Kevin Hugh Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SKS Associates LLC
Represented By: Daniel Manning Hayes
Represented By: Rod Divelbiss
Represented By: John Vincent Erickson
Represented By: Kevin Elliott Gaut
Represented By: Jennifer Nigro
Represented By: Robert Lillienstein
Represented By: Thomas J Kavaler
Represented By: Scott E. Silberfein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transfirst Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Reginald David Steer
Represented By: Maria Ellinikos
Represented By: Seema Tendolkar
Represented By: K. Todd Phillips
Represented By: Michael Thomas Tinan Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Quinta Holdings LLC
Represented By: Cary Donahue Sullivan
Represented By: Kevin Hugh Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Moore
Represented By: Cary Donahue Sullivan
Represented By: Thomas Reed Malcolm
Represented By: Travis Biffar
Represented By: Brian D. Hershman
Represented By: Kevin Hugh Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPC, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Topor
Represented By: Tomio Buck Narita
Represented By: Michael John Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Cohen
Represented By: Daniel Manning Hayes
Represented By: Rod Divelbiss
Represented By: John Vincent Erickson
Represented By: Abraham Y. Skoff,
Represented By: Kevin Elliott Gaut
Represented By: Robert Lillienstein
Represented By: Thomas J Kavaler
Represented By: Scott E. Silberfein
Represented By: Jennifer Nigro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fifth Third Bank
Represented By: Nancy Inesta
Represented By: Robert N. Webner
Represented By: Hayes F. Michel, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlas Payment Processing
Represented By: James Cai
Represented By: Seth Wesley Wiener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lease Finance Group, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Manning Hayes
Represented By: Jennifer Nigro
Represented By: Abraham Y. Skoff,
Represented By: Scott E. Silberfein
Represented By: Kevin Elliott Gaut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBL Capital Group, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Manning Hayes
Represented By: Jennifer Nigro
Represented By: Abraham Y. Skoff,
Represented By: Scott E. Silberfein
Represented By: Kevin Elliott Gaut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Congress Financial Corporation
Represented By: Thomas Octavian Jacob
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lease Source-LSI, LLC
Represented By: Scott E. Silberfein
Represented By: Jennifer Nigro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransFirst Third Party Sales, LLC
Represented By: Maria Ellinikos
Represented By: Michael Thomas Tinan Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Eagle Leasing LLC
Represented By: Daniel Manning Hayes
Represented By: Jennifer Nigro
Represented By: Abraham Y. Skoff,
Represented By: Scott E. Silberfein
Represented By: Kevin Elliott Gaut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Latousek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lease Source, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lease Source LLC
Represented By: Scott E. Silberfein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrick Bank
Represented By: Stephen J Newman
Represented By: Scott Michael Pearson
Represented By: Julie Sorenson Stanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Merchant Services Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Madura
Represented By: Cary Donahue Sullivan
Represented By: Thomas Reed Malcolm
Represented By: Travis Biffar
Represented By: Brian D. Hershman
Represented By: Kevin Hugh Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MBF Merchant Capital, LLC
Represented By: Joan Eve Trimble
Represented By: Jeffrey James Halldin
Represented By: Lee Alan Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transfirst Financial Institutions Services
Represented By: Maria Ellinikos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern Leasing Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Scott E. Silberfein
Represented By: Daniel Manning Hayes
Represented By: Rod Divelbiss
Represented By: John Vincent Erickson
Represented By: Abraham Y. Skoff,
Represented By: Kevin Elliott Gaut
Represented By: Robert Lillienstein
Represented By: Thomas J Kavaler
Represented By: Jennifer Nigro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbus Bank and Trust
Represented By: James R. McGuire
Represented By: Stephen M. Colangelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransFirst LLC
Represented By: Maria Ellinikos
Represented By: Michael Thomas Tinan Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Fitzgerald
Represented By: Daniel Manning Hayes
Represented By: Jennifer Nigro
Represented By: Abraham Y. Skoff,
Represented By: Kevin Elliott Gaut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fiona Walshe
Represented By: James Cai
Represented By: Janet Suejean Park
Represented By: Matthew Allen Berliner
Represented By: Matthew Keenan Wegner
Represented By: Seth Wesley Wiener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph I. Sussman
Represented By: Scott E. Silberfein
Represented By: Jennifer Nigro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JWM Holdings LLC
Represented By: Cary Donahue Sullivan
Represented By: Kevin Hugh Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Parisi
Represented By: Cary Donahue Sullivan