Hyosung (America), Inc. et al v. Hantle USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Hyosung (America), Inc. and Nautilus Hyosung Inc.
Defendant: Hantle USA, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2010cv02160
Filed: May 19, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 177 CONSENT JUDGMENT, ***Civil Case Terminated.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 7/9/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2012)
May 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 175 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 174 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Request to Modify Case Management Schedule filed by Hantle USA, Inc., Nautilus Hyosung Inc., Myung Won Suh, Nautilus Hyosung America, Inc., Won Gee Lee, Genmega, Inc.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 5/18/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2012)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER re 168 MOTION to Modify Case Management Schedule filed by Nautilus Hyosung Inc., Nautilus Hyosung America, Inc. Discovery due by 5/18/2012.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 3/27/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 160 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2011)
November 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 150 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 146 Stipulation, filed by Hantle USA, Inc., Nautilus Hyosung Inc., Myung Won Suh, Nautilus Hyosung America, Inc., Won Gee Lee, Genmega, Inc.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 11/29/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2011)
November 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER re 140 Stipulation, filed by Hantle USA, Inc., Nautilus Hyosung Inc., Myung Won Suh, Nautilus Hyosung America, Inc., Won Gee Lee, Genmega, Inc.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 11/14/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2011)
November 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER re 80 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Won Gee Lee. Order entered by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas 11/14/11, denying motion to file Answer under seal. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2011)
November 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 139 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 138 Stipulation, filed by Hantle USA, Inc., Nautilus Hyosung Inc., Myung Won Suh, Nautilus Hyosung America, Inc., Won Gee Lee, Genmega, Inc.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 11/7/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2011)
October 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 137 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 136 Stipulation, filed by Hantle USA, Inc., Nautilus Hyosung Inc., Myung Won Suh, Nautilus Hyosung America, Inc., Won Gee Lee, Genmega, Inc.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 10/6/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
September 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas VACATING Hearing re 123 Motion to Compel Hearing set for September 14, 2011. Matter submitted on the papers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas, on 09/08/11 (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2011) Modified on 9/9/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 106 STIPULATION AND ORDER PERMITTING SUBSTITUTION OF PARTIES. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 07/06/11. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
July 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas requiring further briefing re sealing of Answer. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2011)
June 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER RE: ATTENDANCE. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 6/2/2011. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2011)
May 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting in part and denying in part 80 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 77 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 76 Stipulation, filed by Hantle USA, Inc., Nautilus Hyosung Inc., Myung Won Suh, Hyosung (America), Inc., Won Gee Lee, Genmega, Inc.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 5/6/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2011)
March 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATION AND ORDER: That Plaintiff may file the Second Amended Complaint re 50 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 3/17/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2011) Modified on 3/22/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 50 Stipulation filed by Nautilus Hyosung Inc., Hyosung (America), Inc.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 3/15/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2011)
March 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 14 Motion to Dismiss (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2011)
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 43 Stipulation filed by Hantle USA, Inc., Nautilus Hyosung Inc., Hyosung (America), Inc.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 2/18/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
January 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 33 Stipulation filed by Nautilus Hyosung Inc., Hyosung (America), Inc.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 1/12/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hyosung (America), Inc. et al v. Hantle USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hyosung (America), Inc.
Represented By: Barbara Nora Barath
Represented By: Adam Aiken Lewis
Represented By: Grant L. Kim
Represented By: Alison M Tucher
Represented By: Alison Margaret Tucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nautilus Hyosung Inc.
Represented By: Barbara Nora Barath
Represented By: Grant L. Kim
Represented By: Adam Aiken Lewis
Represented By: Alison M Tucher
Represented By: Alison Margaret Tucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hantle USA, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Herman Poppe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?