Heroic Era, LTD. v. Evony, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Heroic Era, LTD.
Defendant: Regan Mercantile, LLC and Evony, LLC
Not Yet Classified: Derek Linke and Derek A Newman
Case Number: 4:2010cv02458
Filed: June 3, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Referring Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman GRANTING #129 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman, on 11/21/11 (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2011) Modified on 11/22/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman DENYING #109 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman, on 11/21/11 (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2011) Modified on 11/22/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 2, 2011 Filing 142 Declaration of Derek Linke re Billing Entries as to #141 Order, filed by Derek Linke. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - July 30, 2010-August 31, 2010 Billing Entries)(Linke, Derek) (Filed on 11/2/2011) Modified on 11/3/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 141 SECOND ORDER DIRECTING COUNSEL TO SUBMIT TIME RECORDS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 10/26/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2011)
October 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman re #129 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 10/14/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2011) Modified on 10/18/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 11, 2011 Filing 139 Reply memorandum re #129 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Heroic Era, LTD.. (Linke, Derek) (Filed on 10/11/2011) Modified on 10/12/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 7, 2011 Filing 138 Declaration of Derek Linke re Biling Entries re #135 Order, filed by Derek Linke. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - May 2010-June 2010 Billing Entries, #2 Exhibit B - November 15-December 20 2010 Billing Entries)(Linke, Derek) (Filed on 10/7/2011) Modified on 10/11/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 4, 2011 Filing 137 Memorandum in Opposition re #129 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Evony, LLC, Regan Mercantile, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven Cowely, #2 Proposed Order)(O'Connor, Andrew) (Filed on 10/4/2011) Modified on 10/5/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 4, 2011 Filing 136 Transcript of Proceedings held on September 28, 2011, before Judge Bernard Zimmerman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, Telephone number 415-255-6842. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 10/25/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/4/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/3/2012. (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 10/4/2011)
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER TO SUBMIT TIME RECORDS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 9/28/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2011)
September 28, 2011 Filing 134 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 9/28/2011 before Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman re #109 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1927 filed by Regan Mercantile, LLC, Evony, LLC; the matter was argued, the matter under submission. (Court Reporter Joan Columbini.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/28/2011)
September 26, 2011 Filing 133 REPORT on the determination of an action regarding COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT (cc: form mailed to register). (Attachments: #1 Final Judgment)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2011)
September 22, 2011 Filing 132 Supplemental Declaration of Derek Linke in Support of #129 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed byHeroic Era, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - September 22, 2011 Letter from A. O'Connor to Derek Linke and Derek Newman, #2 Exhibit B - Heroic Era Engagement Agreement)(Related document(s) #129 ) (Linke, Derek) (Filed on 9/22/2011) Modified on 9/23/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 22, 2011 Filing 131 FINAL JUDGMENT, entered in favor of Defendants Evony, LLC. and Regan Mercantile, LLC and against Plaintiff, Heroic Era, Ltd. as to all counterclaims in Evony's Answer and Counterclaims; All Heroic Era's claims set forth in its Complaint are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Heroic Era shall pay Evony $608,213.37. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 09/22/2011 ***Civil Case Terminated. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2011) Modified on 9/23/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 20, 2011 Filing 130 Brief: Memorandum in Support re #129 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, filed by Heroic Era, LTD.. (Related document(s) #129 ) (Linke, Derek) (Filed on 9/20/2011) Modified on 9/21/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 20, 2011 Filing 129 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and to Proceed Without Oral Argument, filed by Heroic Era, LTD.. Motion Hearing set for 10/25/2011 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Responses due by 10/4/2011. Replies due by 10/11/2011. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration Derek Linke, #3 Certification of Compliance with Standing Order)(Linke, Derek) (Filed on 9/20/2011) Modified on 9/21/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2011 Filing 128 NOTICE of Compliance re #125 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, filed by Heroic Era, LTD. (Linke, Derek) (Filed on 9/19/2011) Modified on 9/20/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2011 Filing 127 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Judgment, filed by Evony, LLC, Regan Mercantile, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Judgment (with prejudgment interest), #2 Proposed Judgment (without prejudgment interest))(O'Connor, Andrew) (Filed on 9/19/2011) Modified on 9/20/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER FOR DELIVERY OF CHAMBERS COPIES by 09/21/11. A hearing on the motion is set for 09/28/11 at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, 450 Golden Gate Ave., S.F., CA 94102. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman, on 9/13/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2011) Modified on 9/14/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and entering JUDGMENT in favor of Evony on its Counterclaims against Heroic Era in the amount of $608,213.37, as to #108 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 9/7/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2011) Modified on 9/13/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 12, 2011 Filing 124 Reply Memorandum re #109 Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1927 filed by Evony, LLC, Regan Mercantile, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Andrew O'Connor, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(O'Connor, Andrew) (Filed on 8/12/2011) Modified on 8/15/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING #112 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #109 Motion for Sanctions. Responses due by 7/22/2011. Replies due by 8/12/2011. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2011) Modified on 8/15/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 3, 2011 Filing 122 Minute Entry: Telephonic Conference Re: Settlement held on 08/03/11 and 08/04/2011 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley (Date Filed: 8/3/2011). (Court Reporter: Not Reported) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/3/2011) Modified on 8/5/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 1, 2011 Filing 121 Minute Entry: Telephone Conference Re: Settlement held on August 1, 2011 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley (Date Filed: 8/1/2011). (Court Reporter: Not Reported) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/1/2011) Modified on 8/1/2011 (ahm, COURT STAFF).
July 27, 2011 Filing 120 Minute Entry: Telephone Conference Re: Settlement held on July 27, 2011 before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley (Date Filed: 7/27/2011). (Court Reporter: Not Reported) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/1/2011) Modified on 8/2/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 27, 2011 Filing 119 ERRATA re #116 Opposition/Response to Motion by Derek Linke, Derek A Newman. (Linke, Derek) (Filed on 7/27/2011)
July 22, 2011 Filing 118 Declaration of Derek Linke in Support of #116 Response to Motion for Sanctions filed by Derek Linke, Derek A Newman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Heroic Era's Rule 26 Initial Disclosures, #2 Exhibit B - Heroic Era's Answers to Evony, LLC's First Set of Interrogatories on Heroic Era, Ltd., #3 Exhibit C - Transcript of October 29, 2010 Hearing, #4 Exhibit D - Heroic Era's Supplemental Rule 26 Initial Disclosures, #5 Exhibit E - Heroic Era's Google Analytics Traffic Report, #6 Exhibit F - Heroic Era's First Discovery Requests to Defendants, #7 Exhibit G - Order on Motion to Quash, U.S.D.C. W.D. Wash. Case No. 10-cv-02062-MJP (Pechman, J.))(Related document(s) #116 ) (Linke, Derek) (Filed on 7/22/2011) Modified on 7/25/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 22, 2011 Filing 117 Declaration of Derek Newman in Support of #116 Response to Motion for Sanctions filed by Derek Linke, Derek A Newman. (Related document(s) #116 ) (Linke, Derek) (Filed on 7/22/2011) Modified on 7/25/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 22, 2011 Filing 116 Memorandum in Opposition re #109 Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1927 filed by Derek A Newman, Derek Linke. (Linke, Derek) (Filed on 7/22/2011) Modified on 7/25/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 22, 2011 Filing 115 Transcript of Proceedings of the Official Electronic Sound Recording held on October 29, 2010, before Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman. Transcriber Stacy Wegner, Email address: smwtyping@yahoo.com; telephone number: (859) 539-2802. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/20/2011. (djc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
July 14, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated pursuant to docket #114 Order. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2011)
July 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER VACATING SETTLMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 7/14/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2011)
July 7, 2011 Filing 113 Declaration of Derek Linke in Support of #112 Motion for Extension of Time to File Memorandum in Opposition filed by Heroic Era, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - July 5, 2011 Cowley email to Linke, #2 Exhibit B - July 1, 2011 Linke letter to Cowley)(Related document(s) #112 ) (Linke, Derek) (Filed on 7/7/2011) Modified on 7/8/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 7, 2011 Filing 112 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Memorandum in Opposition, filed by Heroic Era, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certification of Compliance with Standing Order)(Linke, Derek) (Filed on 7/7/2011) Modified on 7/8/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 28, 2011 Filing 111 Reply Memorandum re #109 Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1927 filed by Evony, LLC, Regan Mercantile, LLC. (O'Connor, Andrew) (Filed on 6/28/2011) Modified on 6/29/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 13, 2011 Filing 110 CLERKS NOTICE: Continuing Motion Hearing as to #109 Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1927. Motion Hearing set for 10/4/2011 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011) Modified on 6/14/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 7, 2011 Filing 109 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1927, filed by Evony, LLC, Regan Mercantile, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 7/12/2011 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Andrew O'Connor, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Proposed Order)(O'Connor, Andrew) (Filed on 6/7/2011) Modified on 6/8/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 23, 2011 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for Settlement: Due to Judge Chen's elevation to Article III status, this case is re-referred to Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley for settlement. All settlement conference dates and related deadlines set by Judge Chen will remain in effect. Confidential settlement conference statements should be both sent via email to JSCpo@cand.uscourts.gov, and lodged (not e-filed) with Judge Corley's chambers. Settlement conferences before Judge Corley will take place in Courtroom D on the 15th Floor of 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco, CA 94102. Please contact Judge Corley's courtroom deputy, Ada Means, at (415) 522-2015 or Ada_Means@cand.uscourts.gov with any questions or concerns. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2011)
May 5, 2011 Filing 108 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #92 Motion for Default Judgment as to Counterclaims. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman, on 5/5/11. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2011) Modified on 5/6/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 107 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS FOR ORDER FREEZING ASSETS re #94 Emergency Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 5/5/11. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2011) Modified on 5/6/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER by MagistrateJudge Bernard Zimmerman granting #93 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (ahy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2011)
May 4, 2011 Filing 105 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 5/4/2011 before Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman (Date Filed: 5/4/2011) re #92 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Counterclaims filed by Regan Mercantile, LLC, Evony, LLC. (Court Reporter: Margo Gurule) (ahy, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/4/2011)
May 3, 2011 Filing 104 APPENDIX: Supplemental Authorities in Support re Motion for Default Judgment and Temporary Restraining Order re #102 Order, filed by Evony, LLC, Regan Mercantile, LLC (Gardner, Joshua) (Filed on 5/3/2011) Modified on 5/4/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/4/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 29, 2011 Filing 103 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Evony's Motion for Fees and Costs filed by Evony, LLC, Regan Mercantile, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Andrew O'Connor, #2 Proposed Order)(O'Connor, Andrew) (Filed on 4/29/2011) Modified on 5/2/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER REQUESTING SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 4/29/2011. (ahy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2011)
April 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER: That Evony is to file its Motion for Attorney's Fees by 04/29/11. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 4/25/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2011) Modified on 4/26/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman GRANTING #99 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Evony, LLC is permitted to appear telephonically. Signed by 04/21/11 (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2011) Modified on 4/22/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 20, 2011 Filing 99 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Evony, LLC, Regan Mercantile, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 5/4/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman. (O'Connor, Andrew) (Filed on 4/20/2011)
March 29, 2011 MOTIONS #94 Emergency Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2011)
March 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman for Report and Recommendation re #94 Emergency Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 3/28/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2011) Modified on 3/30/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #92 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Counterclaims : Motion Hearing set for 5/4/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/24/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2011)
March 22, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2011)
March 22, 2011 Filing 96 Transcript of Proceedings of the Official Electronic Sound Repording held on March 9, 2011, before Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman. Transcriber Stacy Wegner, Email address: smwtyping@yahoo.com; telephone number: (859) 539-2802. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/20/2011. (djc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2011)
March 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER REFERRING MOTIONs to Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman for Report and Recommendation re #93 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #92 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 3/17/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2011) Modified on 3/23/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 21, 2011 Filing 94 Emergency Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, filed by Evony, LLC, Regan Mercantile, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Affidavit of Marco Mereu, #3 Affidavit of Andrew O'Connor, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15, #19 Exhibit 16, #20 Exhibit 17, #21 Exhibit 18, #22 Exhibit 19, #23 Exhibit 20, #24 Exhibit 21, #25 Exhibit 22, #26 Exhibit 23, #27 Exhibit 24, #28 Proposed Order)(O'Connor, Andrew) (Filed on 3/21/2011) Modified on 3/22/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 15, 2011 Filing 93 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Evony, LLC, Regan Mercantile, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Andrew O'Connor, #2 Proposed Order to Seal Document)(O'Connor, Andrew) (Filed on 3/15/2011)
March 15, 2011 Filing 92 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Counterclaims filed by Evony, LLC, Regan Mercantile, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 4/19/2011 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Affidavit of Mark Frappier (Redacted), #3 Affidavit of Andrew O'Connor, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Proposed Order)(O'Connor, Andrew) (Filed on 3/15/2011)
March 15, 2011 Filing 91 Amended Transcript of Proceedings (amended to reflect appropriate case number)held on 02/25/2011, before Judge Bernard Zimmerman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/13/2011. (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 3/15/2011)
March 14, 2011 Filing 90 ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY, PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT #91 *** Transcript of Proceedings held on 02/25/2011, before Judge Bernard Zimmerman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/13/2011. (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 3/14/2011) Modified on 3/17/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 9, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated re Discovery Deadline as to #34 Case Management Scheduling Order. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2011)
March 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER IMPOSING SANCTIONS ON HEROIC ERA, LTD.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/9/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2011)
March 9, 2011 Filing 88 Declaration of Randall Moeller re #78 Order, filed by Heroic Era, LTD.. (Linke, Derek) (Filed on 3/9/2011) Modified on 3/10/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 9, 2011 Filing 87 Minute Entry: Status Conference held on 3/9/2011 before Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman (Date Filed: 3/9/2011). (FTR 9:15-9:32) (ahy, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/9/2011)
March 8, 2011 Filing 86 NOTICE of Nonattendance at Deposition re #78 Order, #82 Notice, #81 Order (Linke, Derek) (Filed on 3/8/2011) Modified on 3/9/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ***DUPLICATE ENTRY, SAME AS DOCUMENT #84 *** ORDER RELATING CASE: C-11-00141-WHA. Create association to 4:11-cv-00141-WHA. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 03/07/2011. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2011) Modified on 3/8/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/8/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING #65 Motion to Relate Case: C-11-141-SBA. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 03/07/11 (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2011) Modified on 3/8/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge. Settlement Conference set for 7/18/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/7/2011. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2011)
March 1, 2011 Filing 82 NOTICE of Attendance at Deposition, filed by Heroic Era, LTD. re #78 Order, #81 Order (Linke, Derek) (Filed on 3/1/2011) Modified on 3/2/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER RE 30(b)(6) DEPOSITION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 2/28/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2011)
February 28, 2011 Filing 80 NOTICE of List of Documents to be Produced by Heroic Era, filed by Evony, LLC, Regan Mercantile, LLC (O'Connor, Andrew) (Filed on 2/28/2011) Modified on 3/1/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 28, 2011 Filing 79 Supplemental NOTICE of Deposition, Pursuant to Rule 30(b)(6), filed by Evony, LLC, Regan Mercantile, LLC (O'Connor, Andrew) (Filed on 2/28/2011) Modified on 3/1/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER AFTER HEARING by by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman GRANTING WITHOUT PREJUDICE Plaintiff's Motion to Quash, DENYING #37 Motion to Compel, and DENYING Plaintiff's Request for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman, on 2/25/2011. (ahy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2011) Modified on 2/28/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/28/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2011 Filing 77 NOTICE of FRCP 30(b)(6) Deposition of Heroic Era, filed by Evony, LLC, Regan Mercantile, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(O'Connor, Andrew) (Filed on 2/25/2011) Modified on 2/28/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 25, 2011 Filing 76 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing (Plaintiff's Motion to Quash, Defendant's Motion to Compel, and Defendant's Motion for Contempt) held on 2/25/2011 before Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman (Date Filed: 2/25/2011). (Court Reporter: Lydia Zinn) (ahy, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/25/2011)
February 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion: Motion Hearing on defendants' Motion For Contempt and To Compel and on Plaintiff's Motion to Quash set for 2/25/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 2/22/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2011)
February 11, 2011 Filing 74 EXHIBITS 31-37 re #70 Notice of Filing Pursuant to Order on Motion to Seal filed by Evony, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 32, #2 Exhibit 33, #3 Exhibit 34, #4 Exhibit 35, #5 Exhibit 36, #6 Exhibit 37)(Related document(s) #70 ) (Gardner, Joshua) (Filed on 2/11/2011) Modified on 2/14/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/14/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Counsel did not present papers as required by Civil L.R. 3-4)
February 11, 2011 Filing 73 EXHIBITS 21-30 re #70 Notice of Filing Pursuant to Order on Motion to Seal filed by Evony, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 22, #2 Exhibit 23, #3 Exhibit 24, #4 Exhibit 25, #5 Exhibit 26, #6 Exhibit 27, #7 Exhibit 28, #8 Exhibit 29, #9 Exhibit 30)(Related document(s) #70 ) (Gardner, Joshua) (Filed on 2/11/2011) Modified on 2/14/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Counsel did not present papers as required by Civil L.R. 3-4)
February 11, 2011 Filing 72 EXHIBITS 11-20 re #70 Notice of Filing Pursuant to Order on Motion to Seal filed by Evony, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 12, #2 Exhibit 13, #3 Exhibit 14, #4 Exhibit 15, #5 Exhibit 16, #6 Exhibit 17, #7 Exhibit 18, #8 Exhibit 19, #9 Exhibit 20)(Related document(s) #70 ) (Gardner, Joshua) (Filed on 2/11/2011) Modified on 2/14/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Counsel did not present papers as required by Civil L.R. 3-4)
February 11, 2011 Filing 71 EXHIBITS 1-10 re #70 Notice of Filing Pursuant to Order on Motion to Seal filed by Evony, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 8, #8 Exhibit 9, #9 Exhibit 10)(Related document(s) #70 ) (Gardner, Joshua) (Filed on 2/11/2011) Modified on 2/14/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Counsel did not present papers as required by Civil L.R. 3-4) Modified on 2/14/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 11, 2011 Filing 70 NOTICE of Filing Pursuant to Order on Motion to Seal, filed by Evony, LLC (Attachments: #1 Motion, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Affidavit)(Gardner, Joshua) (Filed on 2/11/2011) Modified on 2/14/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman DENYING #58 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman, on 2/10/2011. (ahy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2011) Modified on 2/14/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 9, 2011 Filing 68 NOTICE of Filing Pursuant to Third Discovery Order re #64 Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff Heroic Era, Ltd.s Motion to Quash Defendants Subpoena for Deposition of Plaintiffs Counsel, #2 Exhibit B - (Proposed) Order Granting Plaintiff Heroic Era, Ltd.s Motion to Quash Defendants Subpoena for Deposition of Plaintiffs Counsel, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Derek Linke in Support of Plaintiff Heroic Era, Ltd.s Motion to Quash Defendants Subpoena for Deposition of Plaintiffs Counsel and exhibits thereto, #4 Exhibit D - Plaintiff Heroic Era, Ltd.s Reply in Support of Motion to Quash Defendants Subpoena for Deposition of Plaintiffs Counsel, #5 Exhibit E - Supplemental Declaration of Derek Linke in Support of Plaintiff Heroic Era, Ltd.s Motion to Quash Defendants Subpoena for Deposition of Plaintiffs Counsel), filed by Heroic Era, LTD (Linke, Derek) (Filed on 2/9/2011) Modified on 2/10/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Quash Subpoena filed by Evony, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Proposed Order, #6 Affidavit)(Gardner, Joshua) (Filed on 2/8/2011) Modified on 2/9/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF). (Counsel did not present papers as required by Civil L.R. 3-4, pursuant to Order by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman's Order #64 )
February 7, 2011 Filing 66 Reply Memoranum re #37 Motion for Contempt and to Compel filed by Evony, LLC, Regan Mercantile, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Mark Frappier, #2 Affidavit of Andrew O'Connor, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E)(O'Connor, Andrew) (Filed on 2/7/2011) Modified on 2/8/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/8/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 3, 2011 Filing 65 MOTION to Relate Case C-11-141-EMC, filed by Evony, LLC, Regan Mercantile, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gardner, Joshua) (Filed on 2/3/2011) Modified on 2/4/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 THIRD DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 2/2/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2011)
February 1, 2011 Filing 63 Letter to Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman re Transfer of Motion from U.S. District Court, Western District of Washington, from Steven M. Cowley, dated 02/01/11 (O'Connor, Andrew) (Filed on 2/1/2011) Modified on 2/2/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 31, 2011 Filing 62 Declaration of Derek Linke in Support of #60 Memorandum in Opposition filed byHeroic Era, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - ehow webpage, #2 Exhibit B - ehow webpage, #3 Exhibit C - January 20, 2011 Letter to J. Gardner)(Related document(s) #60 ) (Linke, Derek) (Filed on 1/31/2011)
January 31, 2011 Filing 61 Declaration of Mach Lai in Support of #60 Memorandum in Opposition filed byHeroic Era, LTD.. (Related document(s) #60 ) (Linke, Derek) (Filed on 1/31/2011)
January 31, 2011 Filing 60 Memorandum in Opposition re #37 MOTION to Compel filed byHeroic Era, LTD.. (Linke, Derek) (Filed on 1/31/2011)
January 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 BRIEFING ORDER: That oppositions shall be filed by 01/31/11; replies shall be filed by 02/07/11. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman, on 1/20/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2011) Modified on 1/21/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 18, 2011 Filing 58 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Evony, LLC, Regan Mercantile, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Gardner, Joshua) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
January 18, 2011 Filing 57 Transcript of Proceedings of the Official Electronic Sound Recording held on December 7, 2010, before Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman. Transcriber Stacy Wegner, Email address: smwtyping@yahoo.com; Telephone number (859) 539-2802. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/18/2011. (djc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2011)
January 4, 2011 Filing 56 Letter to Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman re request for permission to motion for issuance of a subpoena to Heroic Era's law firm seeking information and documents concerning Heroic Era's communication with its counsel, from Derek Linke, dated 01/04/11. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit December 27, 2010 Teleconference)(Linke, Derek) (Filed on 1/4/2011) Modified on 1/5/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/5/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 30, 2010 Filing 55 Letter to Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman re discovery dispute, from Steven M. Cowley, dated 12/30/10. (Gardner, Joshua) (Filed on 12/30/2010) Modified on 1/3/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 54 SECOND DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/7/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2010)
December 7, 2010 Filing 53 Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 12/7/2010 before Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman (Date Filed: 12/7/2010). (Recording #TC 37-10.) (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/7/2010) Modified on 12/9/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 6, 2010 Filing 52 Letter to Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman re #37 Motion to Compel, from Derek Linke, dated 12/6/10 (Linke, Derek) (Filed on 12/6/2010) Modified on 12/7/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/8/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 2, 2010 Filing 51 Letter to Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman re Discovery Disputes, from Steven M. Cowley, dated 12/2/10 . (Cowley, Steven) (Filed on 12/2/2010) Modified on 12/3/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 SUPPLEMENTAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/1/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2010)
December 1, 2010 Filing 48 NOTICE of Change of Address, filed by Heroic Era, LTD. (Linke, Derek) (Filed on 12/1/2010) Modified on 12/3/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING #45 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Joshua W. Gardner (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2010)
November 24, 2010 Filing 47 Letter from Derek Linke re Motion to Compel (Dkt. No. 46). (Linke, Derek) (Filed on 11/24/2010)
November 22, 2010 Filing 46 Letter to Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman re Discovery Disputes, from Steven M. Cowley, dated 11/22/10 (Cowley, Steven) (Filed on 11/22/2010) Modified on 11/23/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 22, 2010 Filing 45 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Joshua W. Gardner ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 44611006036.) filed by Evony, LLC, Regan Mercantile, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2010)
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 11/1/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
October 29, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated re Discovery Hearing as to #42 Discovery Hearing. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2010)
October 29, 2010 Filing 43 STIPULATION and Proposed Protective Order, filed by Evony, LLC, Regan Mercantile, LLC., Heroic Era, LTD. (Cowley, Steven) (Filed on 10/29/2010) Modified on 11/1/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 29, 2010 Filing 42 Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 10/29/2010 before Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman (Date Filed: 10/29/2010). (Recording #TC 33-10.) (Attachments: #1 Appearance Sheet) (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/29/2010)
October 28, 2010 Filing 41 Letter to Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman re #40 Discovery Order, from Derek Linke, dated 10/28/10 (Linke, Derek) (Filed on 10/28/2010) Modified on 10/29/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 26, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephonic Discovery Hearing set for 10/29/2010 09:00 AM. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2010)
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE: That the Telephonic Discovery Hearing is set for 10/29/2010 09:00 AM.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman, signed on 10/26/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2010) Modified on 10/27/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 INITIAL DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 10/26/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2010)
October 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for ALL Discovery purposes. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 10/22/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
October 21, 2010 Filing 37 MOTION to Compel filed by Evony, LLC, Regan Mercantile, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew O'Connor, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Proposed Order)(O'Connor, Andrew) (Filed on 10/21/2010)
October 21, 2010 Filing 36 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Evony, LLC, Regan Mercantile, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Connor, Andrew) (Filed on 10/21/2010)
October 4, 2010 Filing 35 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR (Mediation) by Heroic Era, LTD., Evony, LLC., Regan Mercantile, LLC. (Linke, Derek) (Filed on 10/4/2010) Modified on 10/4/2010 (cmf, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/5/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/9/2011. Jury Trial set for 9/19/2011 08:30 AM. Motions due by 6/7/2011. Pretrial Conference set for 9/13/2011 01:00 PM. Jury Selection set for 9/19/2011 08:30AM.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 10/1/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2010)
September 30, 2010 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen for Settlement (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2010)
September 30, 2010 Filing 33 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 9/30/2010 before Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong's Law Clerk. General Discovery Cut-off 03/09/11; Motion Cut-off 06/07/11; Pretrial Conference Continued to 09/13/11 at 1:00 PM; Jury Trial Continued to 09/19/11 at 8:30 AM; Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE to be held during the month of July 2011. (Date Filed: 9/30/2010). (Court Reporter: Not Reported) (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/30/2010) Modified on 10/4/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 28, 2010 Filing 32 NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, filed by Heroic Era, LTD.. (Linke, Derek) (Filed on 9/28/2010) Modified on 9/29/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 28, 2010 Filing 31 Certificate of Interested Entities by Heroic Era, LTD. identifying Corporate Parent Heroic Era, Ltd. for Heroic Era, LTD., Heroic Era, LTD.. (Linke, Derek) (Filed on 9/28/2010)
September 24, 2010 Filing 30 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options, filed Heroic Era, LTD. (Linke, Derek) (Filed on 9/24/2010) Modified on 9/27/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 21, 2010 Filing 29 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Evony, LLC, Regan Mercantile, LLC. (O'Connor, Andrew) (Filed on 9/21/2010) Modified on 9/22/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
September 20, 2010 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to File Case Management Statement on September 21, 2010 filed by Evony, LLC, Regan Mercantile, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Andrew O'Connor, #2 Exhibit A)(O'Connor, Andrew) (Filed on 9/20/2010) Modified on 9/21/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2010 Filing 27 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM with Jury Demand re #19 Counterclaim filed by Heroic Era, LTD.. (Linke, Derek) (Filed on 9/10/2010) Modified on 9/13/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2010 Filing 26 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options, filed by Evony, LLC., Regan Merchantile, LLC. (O'Connor, Andrew) (Filed on 9/10/2010) Modified on 9/13/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING #22 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Andrew T. O'Connor (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2010)
September 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING #23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Steven M. Cowley (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2010)
August 27, 2010 Filing 23 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Steven M. Cowley ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611005613.), filed by Evony, LLC, Regan Mercantile, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2010)
August 27, 2010 Filing 22 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Andrew T. O'Connor ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611005614.), filed by Evony, LLC, Regan Mercantile, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2010)
August 13, 2010 Filing 21 Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Statement by Evony, LLC, Regan Mercantile, LLC. (Lapointe, Jon-Paul) (Filed on 8/13/2010) Modified on 8/16/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
August 13, 2010 Filing 20 Certificate of Interested Entities by Evony, LLC, Regan Mercantile, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Regan Mercantile (Hong Kong). (Lapointe, Jon-Paul) (Filed on 8/13/2010) Modified on 8/16/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
August 13, 2010 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand, COUNTERCLAIMS by Evony, LLC, Regan Mercantile, LLC. (Lapointe, Jon-Paul) (Filed on 8/13/2010) Modified on 8/16/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
August 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASES: Case Management Conference set for 9/30/2010 03:15 PM., via Telephone. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 8/4/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2010) Modified on 8/5/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong for all further proceedings. Judge Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/29/10. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2010)
July 29, 2010 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2010)
July 28, 2010 Filing 15 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Heroic Era, LTD.. (Linke, Derek) (Filed on 7/28/2010)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #13 Second Stipulation Extending Time for Devendant Evony to Respond to Complaint filed by Heroic Era, LTD. Response due by 8/1/10. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/26/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2010)
July 23, 2010 Filing 13 SECOND Stipulation extending time for defendant Evony, LLC to respond to complaint by Heroic Era, LTD.. (Linke, Derek) (Filed on 7/23/2010) Modified on 7/26/2010 (gba, COURT STAFF).
July 23, 2010 Filing 12 ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY, PLEASE DISREGARD FILED IN A WRONG COURT*** NOTICE by Heroic Era, LTD. re Second Stipulation Extending Time for Defendant Evony, LLC to Respond to Complaint Civil L.R. 6-1(a) (Linke, Derek) (Filed on 7/23/2010) Modified on 7/26/2010 (gba, COURT STAFF).
July 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING re #9 Stipulation Extending Time For Dft Evony to Respond to Complaint filed by Heroic Era, LTD. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/14/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2010)
July 14, 2010 Filing 10 CLERKS SECOND NOTICE to Plaintiff re: Consent or Declination to Proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Form due by 7/28/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2010)
June 25, 2010 Filing 9 NOTICE by Heroic Era, LTD. re Stipulation Extending Time for Defendant Evony, LLC to Respond to Complaint Civil L.R. 6-1(a) (Linke, Derek) (Filed on 6/25/2010)
June 15, 2010 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Regan Mercantile, LLC. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2010)
June 9, 2010 Filing 7 CLERKS NOTICE To Plaintiff re: Consent or Declination to Proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Form due by 6/23/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2010)
June 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER, by Judge Joseph C. Spero, signed 6/9/10,granting #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Derek Linke. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2010)
June 8, 2010 Filing 5 MOTION for Admission of Attorney Derek Linke Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 210.00, receipt number 34611046749) filed by Heroic Era, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2010)
June 3, 2010 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Copyright Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2010)
June 3, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2010)
June 3, 2010 Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 9/3/2010. Case Management Conference set for 9/10/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2010)
June 3, 2010 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Evony, LLC, (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2010)
June 3, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT; Demand for Jury Trial against Evony, LLC, Regan Mercantile, LLC (Filing fee $ 350.00, receipt number 34611046542). Filed by Heroic Era, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heroic Era, LTD. v. Evony, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regan Mercantile, LLC
Represented By: Andrew T. O'Connor
Represented By: Jon-Paul Manuel Lapointe
Represented By: Steven M. Cowley
Represented By: Joshua William Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evony, LLC
Represented By: Andrew T. O'Connor
Represented By: Jon-Paul Manuel Lapointe
Represented By: Steven M. Cowley
Represented By: Joshua William Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Derek Linke
Represented By: Derek Linke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Derek A Newman
Represented By: Derek Linke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heroic Era, LTD.
Represented By: Derek Alan Newman
Represented By: Derek Linke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?