Zepeda v. Paypal, Inc.
Plaintiff: Moises Zepeda, Michael Spear, Ronya Osman, Brian Pattee, Casey Ching, Denae Zamora, Michael Lavanga, Gary Miller, Devinda Fernando, Vadim Tsigel, Michael Zinger, Amy Rickel, Fred Rickel, Ira Gilman, Lacy Reintsma and Shaul Behr
Defendant: PayPal Inc
Petitioner: Dale J. Schubert
Intervenor: Reginald Burgess
Interested Party: Regina Gonzales, Rob Rawson, Evgenia Jansen and Dan Jansen
Interpleader: Zoho Corporation
Not Classified By Court: Larry A. Guess, Frank Phillips, Steve Schroeder, Paula Leach, Carmen M. DeBellis, Walley Collins, Lucinda Christian, Tammy Perkins, Sam A. Miorelli, E.I., Esq., Glenn Greene and Melanie Cantanese
Case Number: 4:2010cv02500
Filed: June 7, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Referring Judge: Joseph C Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER of USCA Petition is denied as to #371 USCA Case Number (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2018)
August 14, 2018 Filing 373 Mail sent to Theresa Bradley returned as undeliverable re #372 Order. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2018)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 372 ORDER DENYING THERESA BRADLEYS MOTION TO COMPEL PAYMENT. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 7/23/18. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2018)
June 11, 2018 Filing 371 USCA Case Number 18-71710, petition for writ of mandamus, Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2018)
May 15, 2018 Filing 370 Second Motion and Complaint with Entry of Order to Compel Inclusion and Payment of Bradley's Claim Issued to Bradley within 30 Days from Order of Court with Memorandum of Law In Support and Class Action Claimant, Theresa B. Bradley Requests the Court Take Judicial Notice of Fraud & Corruption by Zepeda v. Paypal, Inc. Settlement Administrator. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2018)
May 15, 2018 Filing 369 ***DISREGARD. FILED WITH ERROR. SEE DOCKET #370 FOR CORRECT DOCUMENT*** Second Motion and Complaint with Entry of Order to Compel Inclusion and Payment of Bradley's Claim Issued to Bradley within 30 Days from Order of Court with Memorandum of Law In Support and Class Action Claimant, Theresa B. Bradley Requests the Court Take Judicial Notice of Fraud & Corruption by Zepeda v. Paypal, Inc. Settlement Administrator. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2018) Modified on 5/22/2018 (jmlS, COURT STAFF).
March 26, 2018 Filing 368 Letter from Theresa B. Bradley regarding settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2018)
March 8, 2018 Filing 367 Letter from Theresa Berezney Bradley regarding settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2018)
January 3, 2018 Filing 366 Letter from Dale J. Schubert regarding settlement. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2018)
July 11, 2017 Filing 365 MANDATE of USCA as to #361 Notice of Appeal filed by Tammy Perkins. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2017)
June 14, 2017 Filing 364 Transcript of Proceedings held on 2-8-17, before Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kathy Wyatt, telephone number 925-212-5224. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #363 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/12/2017. (Related documents(s) #363 ) (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2017) Modified on 6/15/2017 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
May 18, 2017 Filing 363 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 2-8-17 before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong by Tammy Perkins, for Court Reporter Katherine Wyatt. (Tucker, Caroline) (Filed on 5/18/2017)
April 19, 2017 Filing 362 USCA Case Number 17-15780 Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals for #361 Notice of Appeal filed by Tammy Perkins. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2017)
April 19, 2017 Filing 361 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Tammy Perkins. (Appeal fee of $505 receipt number 0971-11326343 paid.) (Tucker, Caroline) (Filed on 4/19/2017)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 360 ORDER Granting #356 Substitution of Attorney for Objector Tammy Perkins: Caroline Tucker in place of Matthew Kurilich. Signed by District Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 3/29/17. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2017).
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 359 ORDER GRANTING JOINT ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO NAME EPIQ AS THE INDEPENDENT REVIEWER OF ALTERNATE CLAIMS AND INCREASE THE AMOUNT OF THE SETTLEMENT FUND TO BE USED TO PAY THE ADMINISTRATION COSTS FOR BASIC CLAIMS re #344 Joint Administrative Motion. Signed by District Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 3/29/17. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2017).
March 24, 2017 Filing 358 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Saundra B Armstrong on 3/24/17. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/24/2017: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER RE MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL AND MOTIONS FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND SERVICE AWARDS. Signed by Judge Saundra B Armstrong on 3/24/17. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/24/2017: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
March 23, 2017 Filing 356 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Consent Order Granting Substitution of Attorney filed by Tammy Perkins. (Tucker, Caroline) (Filed on 3/23/2017)
March 22, 2017 Filing 355 CLERK'S NOTICE RE DEFICIENCY Re: Docket Entry No. 354. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2017)
March 21, 2017 Filing 354 Proposed Consent Order Granting Substitution of Attorney by Tammy Perkins. (Tucker, Caroline) (Filed on 3/21/2017) Modified on 3/22/2017 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
March 21, 2017 Filing 353 NOTICE of Appearance by Caroline Victoria Tucker (Tucker, Caroline) (Filed on 3/21/2017)
February 8, 2017 Filing 352 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong: Motion Hearing held on 2/8/2017. Court Reporter Name Kathy Wyatt. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/8/2017)
February 6, 2017 Filing 351 CLERK'S NOTICE. You are hereby notified that the hearing on February 8, 2017 at 1:00 pm will take place in Courtoom 5, 2nd Floor, 1301 Clay St, Oakland CA. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2017)
January 31, 2017 Filing 350 Declaration of Cathy Wilson in Support of #340 MOTION for Final Approval of Amended Class Action Settlement Agreement filed byPaypal, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(Related document(s) #340 ) (Moon, David) (Filed on 1/31/2017)
January 31, 2017 Filing 349 Request for Judicial Notice re #348 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Supplemental filed byCasey Ching, Michael Lavanga, Gary Miller, Ronya Osman, Brian Pattee, Michael Spear, Denae Zamora, Moises Zepeda. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #348 ) (Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 1/31/2017)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 348 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN RESPONSE TO UNAUTHORIZED REPLY FILED BY OBJECTORS COLLINS AND CHRISTIAN by Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2017)
January 31, 2017 Filing 347 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice filed by Casey Ching, Michael Lavanga, Gary Miller, Ronya Osman, Brian Pattee, Michael Spear, Denae Zamora, Moises Zepeda. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Proposed Order Granting Leave to File Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice)(Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 1/31/2017)
January 31, 2017 Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used [err101]. Requests should be filed as Motions. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety using events: Motions - General - Leave to File Document Re: #346 Request for Judicial Notice, filed by Casey Ching, Brian Pattee, Michael Spear, Denae Zamora, Moises Zepeda, Ronya Osman, Gary Miller, Michael Lavanga (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2017)
January 30, 2017 Filing 346 ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY, PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT NO. #347 *** Request for Judicial Notice re #345 Opposition/Response to Motion,,, Request for Leave to File filed byCasey Ching, Michael Lavanga, Gary Miller, Ronya Osman, Brian Pattee, Michael Spear, Denae Zamora, Moises Zepeda. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental RJN, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #345 ) (Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 1/30/2017) Modified on 2/1/2017 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
January 27, 2017 Filing 345 REPY to Opposition (re #340 MOTION for Final Approval of Amended Class Action Settlement Agreement), filed by Lucinda Christian, Walley Collins. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of J. David Franklin ISO Objections of Class Members Walley Collins and Lucinda Christian to Settlement Agreement Pending Final Approval, #2 Exhibit Exhibits D & E to Supplemental Declaration of J. David Franklin ISO Objections of Class Members Walley ollins and Lucinda Christian to Settlement Agreement Pending Final Approval, #3 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service re Reply to Opposition of Class Counsel to Objections of Class Members Collins and Christian to Settlement Agreement and Supplemental Declaration of J. David Franlin in Support Thereof)(Franklin, John) (Filed on 1/27/2017) Modified on 1/30/2017 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
December 30, 2016 Filing 344 Joint ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Appoint Epiq Systems as the independent reviewer of alternate claims and increase the amount of the settlement fund to be used to pay the administration costs for basic claims, filed by Casey Ching, Michael Lavanga, Gary Miller, Ronya Osman, Brian Pattee, Michael Spear, Denae Zamora, Moises Zepeda. Responses due by 1/3/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Mark N. Todzo, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Proposed Order)(Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 12/30/2016) Modified on 1/3/2017 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING re #295 MOTION for Attorney Fees, #340 MOTION for Final Approval of Amended Class Action Settlement Agreement, #296 MOTION for Attorney Fees, #297 MOTION for Attorney Fees : Motion Hearing set for 2/8/2017 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Signed by Judge Saundra B Armstrong on 12/27/16. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2016)
November 28, 2016 Filing 342 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #341 Order Continuing Hearing (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2016)
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING as to #295 MOTION for Attorney Fees, #340 MOTION for Final Approval of Amended Class Action Settlement Agreement, #296 MOTION for Attorney Fees , #297 MOTION for Attorney Fees . Motion Hearing set for 1/11/2017 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Signed by Judge Saundra B Armstrong on 11/23/16. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2016)
November 14, 2016 Filing 340 MOTION for Final Approval of Amended Class Action Settlement Agreement, filed by Casey Ching, Michael Lavanga, Gary Miller, Ronya Osman, Brian Pattee, Michael Spear, Denae Zamora, Moises Zepeda. Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2016 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Responses due by 11/28/2016. Replies due by 12/5/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Jeffrey A. Leon ISO Final Settlement Approval, #2 Declaration Charles Marr ISO Final Settlement Approval, #3 Declaration Jennifer A. McCabe ISO Final Settlement Approval, #4 Proposed Order Granting Final Approval)(Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 11/14/2016) Modified on 11/15/2016 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
October 24, 2016 Filing 339 OBJECTIONS to Class Action Settlement, filed by Melanie Cantanese. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2016)
October 18, 2016 Filing 338 OBJECTIONS to Class Action Settlement, filed by Glenn Greene. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2016) Modified on 10/19/2016 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2016 Filing 337 OBJECTIONS to Class Action Settlement, filed by Glenn Greene. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2016)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 336 ORDER by Saundra Brown Armstrong: granting #321 Motion to be excluded from the class action settlement; granting #327 Motion for Opt-Out Exclusion from Class Action Settlement and Denying as moot to Correct Deadline; granting #328 Motion for Opt-Out Exclusion from Class Action Settlement and Denying as moot to Correct Deadline. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2016) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/3/2016: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (igS, COURT STAFF).
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER MODIFYING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re #333 Amended Objection filed by Sam A. Miorelli, E.I., Esq. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 8/2/16. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2016)
August 1, 2016 Filing 334 Declaration of Sam A. Miorelli in Support of #333 Amended Objection to Class, filed by Sam A. Miorelli, E.I., Esq.. (Related document(s) #333 ) (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2016)
August 1, 2016 Filing 333 Amended OBJECTIONS to Class Action Settlement, filed by Sam A. Miorelli, E.I., Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2016)
July 27, 2016 Filing 332 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #331 Order on Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2016)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong granting in part and denying in part #323 Unopposed Motion for Reconsideration. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2016)
July 19, 2016 Filing 330 RESPONSE (re #327 MOTION for Opt-Out/Exclusion from Class Action Settlement, #328 MOTION to Amend) filed by Casey Ching, Michael Lavanga, Gary Miller, Ronya Osman, Brian Pattee, Michael Spear, Denae Zamora, Moises Zepeda. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Jeffrey A. Leon)(Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 7/19/2016) Modified on 7/20/2016 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER GRANTING #326 STIPULATION Setting Final Approval Hearing Date and Briefing Schedule. Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2016 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 07/06/2016. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2016) Modified on 7/13/2016 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
July 5, 2016 Filing 328 MOTION for Opt-Out/Exclusion from Class Action Settlement, MOTION to Correct Deadlines, filed by Evgenia Jansen. Responses due by 7/19/2016. Replies due by 7/26/2016. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2016)
July 5, 2016 Filing 327 MOTION for Opt-Out/Exclusion from Class Action Settlement, MOTION to Correct Deadlines, filed by Dan Jansen. Responses due by 7/19/2016. Replies due by 7/26/2016. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2016)
June 24, 2016 Filing 326 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Setting Final Approval Hearing Date and Briefing Schedule filed by Paypal, Inc.. (Moon, David) (Filed on 6/24/2016)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER GRANTING #324 STIPULATION Vacating Final Approval Hearing Date and Briefing Schedule. The parties shall submit their proposed, revised schedule for the Final Approval Hearing and related dates and deadlines within 14 days of the date this Order is filed. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 6/10/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2016)
June 6, 2016 Filing 324 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Vacating Final Approval Hearing Date and Briefing Schedule re #290 Order on Stipulation, filed by Paypal, Inc., Casey Ching, Michael Lavanga, Gary Miller, Ronya Osman, Brian Pattee, Michael Spear, Denae Zamora, Moises Zepeda. (Moon, David) (Filed on 6/6/2016) Modified on 6/7/2016 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2016 Filing 323 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration re #319 Order Striking Objection, filed by Sam A. Miorelli, E.I., Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sam A. Miorelli, #2 Proposed Order)(jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2016)
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO APPEAR AT FINAL APPROVAL HEARING. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 5/17/16. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2016)
May 16, 2016 Filing 321 MOTION for an Order for Exclusion for RobRawson@HotMail.Com with Proposed Order, filed by Rob Rawson. Responses due by 5/31/2016. Replies due by 6/7/2016. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2016)
May 13, 2016 Filing 320 NOTICE of Request to be Removed from ECF Notice List re #311 Order on Stipulation, filed by Zoho Corporation (Sparks, Stephanie) (Filed on 5/13/2016) Modified on 5/13/2016 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER re #318 Objection filed by Sam A. Miorelli, E.I., Esq.. Signed by Judge Saundra B. Armstrong on 5/13/16. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2016) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/13/2016: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (lrcS, COURT STAFF).
May 12, 2016 Filing 318 ***DOCUMENT HAS BEEN STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD BY ORDER OF THE COURT, PLEASE SEE DOCUMENT NO. #319 *** OBJECTIONS to to Class Settlement, filed by Sam A. Miorelli, E.I., Esq.. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2016) Modified on 5/13/2016 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
May 10, 2016 Filing 317 OBJECTIONS to re #276 Renotice motion hearing, by Perkins Tammy. (Kurilich, Matt) (Filed on 5/10/2016)
May 10, 2016 Filing 316 OBJECTIONS to [Docket No. 275-2 Settlement Agreement] of Class Members Walley Collins and Lucinda Christian to Settlement Agreement Pending Final Approval in this Court by Walley Collins, Lucinda Christian. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of J. David Franklin in Support of Objections of Class Members Walley Collins and Lucinda Christian to Settlement Agreement Pending Final Approval in this Court, #2 Exhibit Part 1 of Exhibits to Franklin Declaration in Support of Objections to Class Members Walley Collins and Lucinda Christian to Settlement Agreement, #3 Exhibit Part 2 of Exhibits to Franklin Declaration in Support of Objections to Class Members Walley Collins and Lucinda Christian to Settlement Agreement, #4 Exhibit Part 3 of Exhibits to Franklin Declaration in Support of Objections of Class Members Walley Collins and Lucinda Christian to Settlement Agreement, #5 Exhibit Part 4 of Exhibits to Franklin Declaration in Support of Objections of Class Members Walley Collins and Lucinda Christian to Settlement Agreement, #6 Exhibit Part 5 of Exhibits to Franklin Declaration in Support of Objections of Class Members Walley Collins and Lucinda Christian to Settlement Agreement, #7 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Service re Objections of Class Members Walley Collins and Lucinda Christian to Settlement Agreement and Declaration of J. David Franklin in Support of Objections of Class Members Walley Collins and Lucinda Christian to Settlement Agreement)(Franklin, John) (Filed on 5/10/2016)
May 3, 2016 Filing 315 OBJECTIONS to Class Settlement, filed by Carmen M. DeBellis. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2016) Modified on 5/12/2016 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 29, 2016 Filing 314 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion re #308 Motion (1) That the Parties Review Process by Which Class Members Were Identified, (2) That the Settlement Administrator Provide Submission of Claims in Paper Form as Well as Electronic Form, and (3) That the Court Review Prior Paypal Litigation [CV-02-01227-JF/PVT]; and Motion to Stay, filed by Dale J. Schubert (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2016)
April 25, 2016 Filing 313 RESPONSE (re #308 MOTION That Parties Review Process by Which Class Members Were Identified; That Settlement Administrator Provide Submission of Claims in Paper Form as Well as Electronic Form; and That the Court Review Prior Paypal Litigation [CV-02-01227-JF/PVT] and MOTION to Stay ) filed byCasey Ching, Michael Lavanga, Gary Miller, Ronya Osman, Brian Pattee, Michael Spear, Denae Zamora, Moises Zepeda. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Mark N. Todzo)(Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 4/25/2016)
April 25, 2016 Filing 312 RESPONSE (re #308 MOTION That Parties Review Process by Which Class Members Were Identified; That Settlement Administrator Provide Submission of Claims in Paper Form as Well as Electronic Form; and That the Court Review Prior Paypal Litigation [CV-02-01227-JF/PVT] and MOTION to Stay ) filed byPaypal, Inc.. (Moon, David) (Filed on 4/25/2016)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER by Judge Armstrong granting #310 Stipulation to Amend Order Granting Emergency Motion for Administrative Relief. (sbalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2016)
April 15, 2016 Filing 310 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER AMENDING THE ORDER GRANTING JOINT EMERGENCY MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF re #307 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11, filed by Paypal, Inc., Zoho Corporation, Moises Zepeda. (Moon, David) (Filed on 4/15/2016) Modified on 4/18/2016 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/18/2016 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
April 13, 2016 Filing 309 NOTICE OF INTENTION TO APPEAR at Motion Hearing set for 07/13/16 re #295 Motion for Attorney Fees, #297 Motion for Attorney Fees, #296 Motion for Attorney Fees, #290 Order on Stipulation, filed by Regina Gonzales (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2016)
April 11, 2016 Filing 308 MOTION (1) That the Parties Review Process by Which Class Members Were Identified, (2) That the Settlement Administrator Provide Submission of Claims in Paper Form as Well as Electronic Form, and (3) That the Court Review Prior Paypal Litigation [CV-02-01227-JF/PVT]; and MOTION to Stay, filed by Dale J. Schubert. Responses due by 4/25/2016. Replies due by 5/2/2016. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2016)
April 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER GRANTING JOINT EMERGENCY MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 7-11 AND THE ALL WRITS ACT by Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong granting #306 Administrative Motion. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2016)
April 8, 2016 Filing 306 Joint ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION Order Pursuant to All Writs Act Re: Fraudulent Settlement Website, filed by Paypal, Inc., Casey Ching, Michael Lavanga, Gary Miller, Ronya Osman, Brian Pattee, Michael Spear, Denae Zamora, Moises Zepeda. Responses due by 4/12/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David W. Moon, #2 Exhibit A-E, #3 Proposed Order)(Moon, David) (Filed on 4/8/2016) Modified on 4/11/2016 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
April 6, 2016 Filing 305 Declaration of David Hicks in Reply to #300 Response, #301 , [301-1] Response & [296-1] Declaration of Marina Trubitsky, (this replaces doc. 304) filed by Amy Rickel. (Hicks, David) (Filed on 4/6/2016) Modified on 4/7/2016 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
April 5, 2016 Filing 304 ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY, PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT NO. #305 *** Declaration of David Hicks in Reply to #300 Response, #301 , [301-1] Response & [296-1] Declaration of Marina Trubitsky, filed by Amy Rickel. (Hicks, David) (Filed on 4/5/2016) Modified on 4/6/2016 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/7/2016 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
March 29, 2016 Filing 303 OBJECTIONS to Class Settlement, filed by Paula Leach. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2016)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 302 ORDER TERMINATING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. (100 in 4:10-cv-01668-SBA, 135 in 4:10-cv-02500-SBA). Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 3/28/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2016)
March 25, 2016 Filing 301 RESPONSE (re #295 MOTION for Attorney Fees, #296 First MOTION for Attorney Fees ) filed byCasey Ching, Michael Lavanga, Gary Miller, Ronya Osman, Brian Pattee, Michael Spear, Denae Zamora, Moises Zepeda. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Mark N. Todzo)(Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 3/25/2016)
March 25, 2016 Filing 300 RESPONSE (re #295 MOTION for Attorney Fees, #296 First MOTION for Attorney Fees ) filed byPaypal, Inc.. (Moon, David) (Filed on 3/25/2016)
March 21, 2016 Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary re #299 Proposed Order. ***MOTION EVENT MUST ONLY BE USED WHEN FILING A MOTION, NOT FOR PROPOSED ORDER*** (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2016)
March 18, 2016 Filing 299 Proposed Order re #295 , #296 , #297 MOTIONS for Attorneys Fees filed by Devinda Fernando. (Hicks, David) (Filed on 3/18/2016) Modified on 3/21/2016 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
March 18, 2016 Filing 298 ERRATA re #295 MOTION for Attorney Fees MPA [295-1] by Devinda Fernando. (Hicks, David) (Filed on 3/18/2016)
March 11, 2016 Filing 297 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Casey Ching, Michael Lavanga, Gary Miller, Ronya Osman, Brian Pattee, Michael Spear, Denae Zamora, Moises Zepeda. Motion Hearing set for 7/13/2016 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Responses due by 3/25/2016. Replies due by 4/1/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Mark N. Todzo, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Declaration Jeffrey A. Leon, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Proposed Order)(Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 3/11/2016)
March 11, 2016 Filing 296 First MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Shaul Behr, Devinda Fernando, Ira Gilman, Lacy Reintsma, Amy Rickel, Fred Rickel, Vadim Tsigel, Michael Zinger. Motion Hearing set for 7/13/2016 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Responses due by 3/25/2016. Replies due by 4/1/2016. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Marina Trubitsky, #2 Exhibit Exhibit "A" to the Declaration of Marina Trubitsky, #3 Proposed Order)(Trubitsky, Marina) (Filed on 3/11/2016)
March 8, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #295 MOTION for Attorney Fees. Motion Hearing set for 7/13/2016 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2016)
March 8, 2016 Filing 295 MOTION for Attorney Fees, filed by Devinda Fernando. Responses due by 3/22/2016. Replies due by 3/29/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration memorandum of points & authorities, #2 Declaration of David Hicks, #3 Exhibit time records, #4 Declaration with exhibits, #5 Exhibit to Pearl Declaration)(Hicks, David) (Filed on 3/8/2016) Modified on 3/9/2016 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
February 29, 2016 Filing 294 OBJECTIONS to Class Settlement, filed by Steve Schroeder. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2016)
February 23, 2016 Filing 293 OBJECTIONS to Class Settlement, filed by Frank Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2016)
January 29, 2016 Filing 291 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, against Paypal, Inc.. Filed byMichael Lavanga, Ronya Osman, Denae Zamora, Moises Zepeda, Gary Miller, Casey Ching, Michael Spear, Brian Pattee. (Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 1/29/2016) Modified on 2/1/2016 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER SETTING FINAL APPROVAL SCHEDULE AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT by Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong granting #286 Stipulation. Plaintiffs shall file their Third Amended Complaint within two days of the date this order is filed. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2016) Modified on 1/29/2016 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
January 28, 2016 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Third Amended Complaint due by 2/1/2016. Final Approval Hearing set for 7/13/2016 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Objections due by 5/10/2016, per #290 Order. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2016)
January 25, 2016 Filing 292 OBJECTIONS to Class Settlement, filed by Larry A. Guess. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2016)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 289 STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING CLASS NOTICE by Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong granting #288 Stipulation. (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2016)
January 19, 2016 Filing 288 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Modifying Class Notice, filed by Paypal, Inc., Casey Ching, Michael Lavanga, Gary Miller, Ronya Osman, Brian Pattee, Michael Spear, Denae Zamora, Moises Zepeda. (Moon, David) (Filed on 1/19/2016) Modified on 1/20/2016 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
January 11, 2016 Filing 287 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Wesley M. Griffith, filed by Paypal, Inc.. (Moon, David) (Filed on 1/11/2016) Modified on 1/12/2016 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
December 24, 2015 Filing 286 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Final Approval Schedule as to #281 Order on Motion for Settlement, filed by Paypal, Inc., Casey Ching, Michael Lavanga, Gary Miller, Ronya Osman, Brian Pattee, Michael Spear, Denae Zamora, Moises Zepeda. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Moon, David) (Filed on 12/24/2015) Modified on 12/28/2015 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 285 Order by Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong granting #284 Stipulation Extending Time to Submit Final Approval Schedule.(tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2015)
December 8, 2015 Filing 284 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SUBMIT FINAL APPROVAL SCHEDULE re #281 Order on Motion for Settlement, filed by Paypal, Inc., Casey Ching, Michael Lavanga, Gary Miller, Ronya Osman, Brian Pattee, Michael Spear, Denae Zamora, Moises Zepeda. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David W. Moon)(Moon, David) (Filed on 12/8/2015) Modified on 12/9/2015 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 283 Order by Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong granting #282 Stipulation Extending Time to Submit Final Approval Schedule. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2015)
November 17, 2015 Filing 282 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to Submit Final Approval Schedule re #281 Order on Motion for Settlement, filed by Paypal, Inc., Casey Ching, Michael Lavanga, Gary Miller, Ronya Osman, Brian Pattee, Michael Spear, Denae Zamora, Moises Zepeda. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David W. Moon)(Moon, David) (Filed on 11/17/2015) Modified on 11/18/2015 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
November 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 281 Order by Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong granting #275 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Amended Class Action Settlement Agreement. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2015)
October 2, 2015 Filing 280 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the Court, on its own motion, shall take the #275 motion under submission on the papers. The hearing previously scheduled for October 14, 2015 at 1:00 p.m., is vacated. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jebS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2015)
September 30, 2015 Filing 279 Reply Memorandum re #275 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Amended Class Action Settlement Agreement, filed by Casey Ching, Michael Lavanga, Gary Miller, Ronya Osman, Brian Pattee, Michael Spear, Denae Zamora, Moises Zepeda. (Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 9/30/2015) Modified on 10/1/2015 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
September 30, 2015 Filing 278 Response re #277 Objection to Preliminary Approval of Settlement byPaypal, Inc.. (Moon, David) (Filed on 9/30/2015)
September 18, 2015 Filing 277 OBJECTIONS to #275 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Amended Class Action Settlement Agreement, filed by Reginald Burgess. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2015)
September 10, 2015 Filing 276 Renotice motion hearing re #275 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Amended Class Action Settlement Agreement Preliminary Approval filed byCasey Ching, Michael Lavanga, Gary Miller, Ronya Osman, Brian Pattee, Michael Spear, Denae Zamora, Moises Zepeda. Motion Hearing set for 10/14/2015 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Responses due by 9/23/2015. Replies due by 9/30/2015. (Related document(s) #275 ) (Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 9/10/2015)
September 9, 2015 Filing 275 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Amended Class Action Settlement Agreement filed by Casey Ching, Michael Lavanga, Gary Miller, Ronya Osman, Brian Pattee, Michael Spear, Denae Zamora, Moises Zepeda. Motion Hearing set for 10/14/2015 01:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Responses due by 9/23/2015. Replies due by 9/30/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark N. Todzo, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Proposed Order)(Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 9/9/2015) Modified on 9/10/2015 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong granting #273 Stipulation Extending Time to Submit Motion for Preliminary Approval of Amended Settlement Agreement. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2015)
August 26, 2015 Filing 273 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to Submit Motion for Preliminary Approval of Amended Settlement Agreement filed by Paypal, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David W. Moon)(Moon, David) (Filed on 8/26/2015)
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE Re: Motion for Preliminary Approval. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 7/29/2015. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2015) Modified on 7/30/2015 (mklS, COURT STAFF).
July 29, 2015 Filing 271 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong: Further Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 7/29/2015. Motion for Preliminary Approval due by 8/26/2015. Responses due by 9/9/2015. Replies due by 9/16/2015. Motion Hearing set for 10/14/2015 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. In the event Plaintiffs file their motion for preliminary approval prior to 8/26/2015, any response will be due two weeks any the filing of the motion and any reply will be due one week after the opposition is filed. (Not reported.) Plaintiff Attorney: Mark Todzo, Jeffrey Leon, David Hicks (Fernando). Defendant Attorney: Julia Strickland, David Moon. This is a text only Minute Entry (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/29/2015)
July 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 7/29/2015 03:30 PM. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 7/20/2015. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2015)
May 6, 2015 Filing 269 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT, filed by Paypal, Inc., Casey Ching, Michael Lavanga, Gary Miller, Ronya Osman, Brian Pattee, Michael Spear, Denae Zamora, Moises Zepeda . (Griffith, Wesley) (Filed on 5/6/2015) Modified on 5/7/2015 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
April 29, 2015 Filing 268 NOTICE of Change of Address as to Jonathan Shub, filed by Casey Ching, Michael Lavanga, Gary Miller, Ronya Osman, Brian Pattee, Michael Spear, Denae Zamora, Moises Zepeda (Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 4/29/2015) Modified on 4/30/2015 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong granting #266 Stipulation Extending Time to Submit Joint Case Management Conference Statement. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2015)
April 13, 2015 Filing 266 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to Submit Joint Case Management Conference Statement, filed by Paypal, Inc., Casey Ching, Michael Lavanga, Gary Miller, Ronya Osman, Brian Pattee, Michael Spear, Denae Zamora, Moises Zepeda. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Wesley M. Griffith)(Griffith, Wesley) (Filed on 4/13/2015) Modified on 4/14/2015 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
March 26, 2015 Filing 265 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel as to Lisa M. Simonetti and George S. Azadian, filed by Paypal, Inc. (Strickland, Julia) (Filed on 3/26/2015) Modified on 3/27/2015 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong DENYING #235 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND #241 OBJECTORS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2015) Modified on 3/26/2015 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
September 24, 2014 Filing 263 OBJECTIONS to #262 Notice Firm Name and Email Change, filed by Reginald Burgess, Lacy Reintsma. (Skelly, Garrett) (Filed on 9/24/2014) Modified on 9/25/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
September 24, 2014 Filing 262 NOTICE of Firm Name and Email Change, filed by Ronya Osman, Brian Pattee (Leon, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/24/2014) Modified on 9/25/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
September 11, 2014 Filing 261 Declaration of Lacy Reintsma in Support of #258 Notice of Damages as to Offer to Withdraw Objections by Stipulation, #238 Objection filed by Lacy Reintsma. (Related document(s) #258 , #238 ) (Skelly, Garrett) (Filed on 9/11/2014) Modified on 9/12/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
September 11, 2014 Filing 260 Declaration of Colette M. Tapia in Support of #258 Notice of Damages as to Offer to Withdraw Objections by Stipulation, #238 Objection, filed by Lacy Reintsma. (Related document(s) #258 , #238 ) (Skelly, Garrett) (Filed on 9/11/2014) Modified on 9/12/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
September 11, 2014 Filing 259 Declaration of Reginald Burgess in Support of #258 Notice of Damages as to Offer to Withdraw Objections by Stipulation, #238 Objection, filed by Reginald Burgess. (Related document(s) #258 , #238 ) (Skelly, Garrett) (Filed on 9/11/2014) Modified on 9/12/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
September 11, 2014 Filing 258 NOTICE of Offer of Judgment and Declaration of Garrett Skelly re Settlement Proffer of Objectors to Withdraw Objections to Settlement re #238 Objection, #235 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Agreement, by Reginald Burgess, Lacy Reintsma (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit_A_w_cert_serv)(Skelly, Garrett) (Filed on 9/11/2014) Modified on 9/12/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
September 11, 2014 Filing 257 CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the Court, on its own motion, shall take the #235 motion for preliminary approval of settlement agreement, under submission on the papers. The hearing previously scheduled for September 23, 2014, is vacated. (This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2014)
September 8, 2014 Filing 256 Second Request for Judicial Notice re Opposition to #245 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Leave to File Motion for Appointment of Proper Class Counsel, filed by Reginald Burgess, Lacy Reintsma, Amy Rickel, Fred Rickel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit_A_w_cert_serv)(Related document(s) #241 , #245 ) (Skelly, Garrett) (Filed on 9/8/2014) Modified on 9/9/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
September 8, 2014 Filing 255 NOTICE of Violation of Local Rule 11-4(b) as Bias to Class Member(s) re #253 Reply to Objection, filed by Reginald Burgess (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit_A_w_cert_serv)(Skelly, Garrett) (Filed on 9/8/2014) Modified on 9/9/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
September 5, 2014 Filing 254 Response to #235 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Agreement, filed by Paypal, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Key Settlement Terms and Citations to Settlement Agreement)(Moon, David) (Filed on 9/5/2014) Modified on 9/8/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
September 5, 2014 Filing 253 REPLY to Objection re #235 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Agreement, filed by Casey Ching, Michael Lavanga, Gary Miller, Ronya Osman, Brian Pattee, Michael Spear, Denae Zamora, Moises Zepeda. (Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 9/5/2014) Modified on 9/8/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting #243 Motion for Pro Hac Vice - Jeffrey Leon. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2014)
September 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER OVERRULING #225 OBJECTION TO ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 9/2/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2014)
September 2, 2014 Filing 250 Declaration of Reginald Burgess in Support of #241 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Appointment of Proper Class Counsel, filed by Reginald Burgess. (Related document(s) #241 ) (Skelly, Garrett) (Filed on 9/2/2014) Modified on 9/3/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
September 2, 2014 Filing 249 Declaration of Garrett Skelly in Support of #241 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Appointment of Proper Class Counsel, filed by Reginald Burgess, Lacy Reintsma, Amy Rickel, Fred Rickel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit_A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit_B_w_cert_serv)(Related document(s) #241 ) (Skelly, Garrett) (Filed on 9/2/2014) Modified on 9/3/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/3/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
September 2, 2014 Filing 248 Reply to Non-Opposition re #238 Objection to Preliminary Approval of Settlement filed by Reginald Burgess, Lacy Reintsma, Amy Rickel, Fred Rickel. (Skelly, Garrett) (Filed on 9/2/2014) Modified on 9/3/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
August 29, 2014 Filing 247 REPLY (re #241 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for appointment of proper class counsel ) re: dkt 245 and 246 filed byReginald Burgess, Lacy Reintsma, Amy Rickel, Fred Rickel. (Skelly, Garrett) (Filed on 8/29/2014)
August 29, 2014 Filing 246 RESPONSE (re #241 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for appointment of proper class counsel ) filed byCasey Ching, Michael Lavanga, Gary Miller, Ronya Osman, Brian Pattee, Michael Spear, Denae Zamora, Moises Zepeda. (Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 8/29/2014)
August 29, 2014 Filing 245 RESPONSE (re #241 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for appointment of proper class counsel ) filed byPaypal, Inc.. (Moon, David) (Filed on 8/29/2014)
August 28, 2014 Filing 244 OBJECTIONS to re #243 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Jeffrey Leon ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8880033.) by Reginald Burgess, Lacy Reintsma, Amy Rickel, Fred Rickel. (Skelly, Garrett) (Filed on 8/28/2014)
August 28, 2014 Filing 243 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Jeffrey Leon ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8880033.) filed by Casey Ching, Michael Lavanga, Gary Miller, Ronya Osman, Brian Pattee, Michael Spear, Denae Zamora, Moises Zepeda. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 8/28/2014)
August 25, 2014 Filing 242 Proposed Order re #241 Motion for Leave to File for appointment of proper class counsel, by Reginald Burgess, Lacy Reintsma, Amy Rickel, Fred Rickel. (Skelly, Garrett) (Filed on 8/25/2014) Modified on 8/26/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
August 25, 2014 Filing 241 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for appointment of proper class counsel, filed by Reginald Burgess, Lacy Reintsma, Amy Rickel, Fred Rickel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit_A_w_cert_serv)(Skelly, Garrett) (Filed on 8/25/2014) Modified on 8/26/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
August 21, 2014 Filing 240 Request for Judicial Notice re #238 Objection to Motion for for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Agreement EFTA changes, Oct, 2013, filed by Reginald Burgess, Lacy Reintsma, Amy Rickel, Fred Rickel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit_A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit_B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit_C_w_cert_serv)(Related document(s) #238 ) (Skelly, Garrett) (Filed on 8/21/2014) Modified on 8/22/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/22/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2014 Filing 239 Proposed Order re #235 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Agreement, by Reginald Burgess, Lacy Reintsma, Amy Rickel, Fred Rickel. (Skelly, Garrett) (Filed on 8/19/2014) Modified on 8/20/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2014 Filing 238 OBJECTION to #235 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Agreement, filed by Reginald Burgess, Lacy Reintsma, Amy Rickel, Fred Rickel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit_A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit_B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit_C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit_D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit_E_w_cert_serv)(Skelly, Garrett) (Filed on 8/19/2014) Modified on 8/20/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2014 Reset Deadlines as to #235 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Agreement. Responses due by 8/29/2014; Replies due by 9/5/2014; Motion Hearing set for 9/23/2014 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2014)
August 18, 2014 Filing 237 Joinder re #235 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Agreement, filed by Paypal, Inc., . (Strickland, Julia) (Filed on 8/18/2014) Modified on 8/19/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
August 18, 2014 Filing 236 Proposed Order re #235 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Agreement by Casey Ching, Michael Lavanga, Gary Miller, Ronya Osman, Brian Pattee, Michael Spear, Denae Zamora, Moises Zepeda. (Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 8/18/2014)
August 15, 2014 Filing 235 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Settlement Agreement, filed by Casey Ching, Michael Lavanga, Gary Miller, Ronya Osman, Brian Pattee, Michael Spear, Denae Zamora, Moises Zepeda. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 8/15/2014) Modified on 8/18/2014 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting #232 Stipulation (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2014)
June 26, 2014 Filing 233 OBJECTIONS to #232 THIRD STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SUBMIT AMENDED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL re #217 Order by Reginald Burgess, Lacy Reintsma, Amy Rickel, Fred Rickel. (Skelly, Garrett) (Filed on 6/26/2014) Modified on 6/27/2014 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
June 25, 2014 Filing 232 THIRD STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SUBMIT AMENDED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL re #217 Order, filed by Paypal, Inc., Casey Ching, Michael Lavanga, Gary Miller, Ronya Osman, Brian Pattee, Michael Spear, Denae Zamora, Moises Zepeda. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Wesley M. Griffith)(Griffith, Wesley) (Filed on 6/25/2014) Modified on 6/26/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
June 23, 2014 Filing 231 NOTICE of Appearance of Wesley Michael Griffith as Counsel, filed by Paypal, Inc.. (Griffith, Wesley) (Filed on 6/23/2014) Modified on 6/24/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
May 19, 2014 Filing 230 Reply to #229 Response to Objection to Order of Magistrate Judge, filed by Reginald Burgess, Lacy Reintsma, Amy Rickel, Fred Rickel. (Skelly, Garrett) (Filed on 5/19/2014) Modified on 5/20/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
May 19, 2014 Filing 229 RESPONSE to #225 Objection to Order of Magistrate Judge, filed by Casey Ching, Michael Lavanga, Gary Miller, Ronya Osman, Brian Pattee, Michael Spear, Denae Zamora, Moises Zepeda. (Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 5/19/2014) Modified on 5/20/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
May 19, 2014 Filing 228 Reply to #227 Response to Objection to Order of Magistrate Judge, filed by Reginald Burgess, Lacy Reintsma, Amy Rickel, Fred Rickel. (Skelly, Garrett) (Filed on 5/19/2014) Modified on 5/20/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
May 16, 2014 Filing 227 RESPONSE to #225 Objection to Order of Magistrate, filed by Paypal, Inc.. (Potter, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/16/2014) Modified on 5/19/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE #225 Objection: Responses due by 5/16/2014; Replies due by 5/23/2014. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 5/1/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2014)
May 1, 2014 Filing 225 OBJECTIONS to re #224 Order on Motion to Intervene per Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, 28 USC 636(b) by Reginald Burgess, Lacy Reintsma, Amy Rickel, Fred Rickel. (Skelly, Garrett) (Filed on 5/1/2014)
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero denying #200 Motion to Intervene (jcslc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2014)
April 22, 2014 Filing 223 CLERKS NOTICE VACTING HEARING DATE. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-1(b), the Court finds that the Second Motion to Intervene to File Amended Complaint currently set for hearing on April 25, 2014, at 2:00 P.M. is appropriate for decision without oral argument.Accordingly, the hearing date is hereby VACATED. The motion will be taken under submission and decided on the papers. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2014)
April 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER GRANTING re #220 Letter filed by Paypal, Inc., for Benjamin Potter to appear by phone on 4/25/14 at 2:00 PM for hearing on the Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/21/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2014) Modified on 4/22/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
April 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER GRANTING re #218 Letter filed by Devinda Fernando for David Hicks to appear by phone on 4/25/14 at 2:00 PM fopr the Motion to Intervene.Mr. Hicks shall use the conference call number and pass code that has been arranged by Mr. Potter.. Signed, as modified, by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/21/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2014)
April 18, 2014 Filing 220 Request to Appear Telephonically for the Hearing on Putative Interveners' Second Motion to Intervene and Amend Complaint, filed by Paypal, Inc., Ebay Inc.. (Potter, Benjamin) (Filed on 4/18/2014) Modified on 4/21/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
April 18, 2014 Filing 219 OBJECTIONS to re #218 Letter by Reginald Burgess, Lacy Reintsma, Amy Rickel, Fred Rickel. (Skelly, Garrett) (Filed on 4/18/2014)
April 18, 2014 Filing 218 Letter to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero re request for leave to appear by telephone, from David Hicks, dated 04/17/14 (Hicks, David) (Filed on 4/18/2014) Modified on 4/21/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
April 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting #215 Stipulation EXTENDING TIME TO SUBMIT AN AMENDED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2014)
April 9, 2014 Reset Deadline (see docket no. #217 ): Motions due by 7/9/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2014)
April 8, 2014 Filing 216 OBJECTIONS to re #215 Stipulation filed by Reginald Burgess, Lacy Reintsma, Amy Rickel, Fred Rickel. (Skelly, Garrett) (Filed on 4/8/2014) Modified on 4/9/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
April 7, 2014 Filing 215 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SUBMIT AN AMENDED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL re #210 Order on Stipulation, filed by Paypal, Inc., Casey Ching, Michael Lavanga, Gary Miller, Ronya Osman, Brian Pattee, Michael Spear, Denae Zamora, Moises Zepeda. (Potter, Benjamin) (Filed on 4/7/2014) Modified on 4/8/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
March 24, 2014 Filing 214 Reply to Response re #212 Reply to Response, and #213 Notice of Concurrence with Memorandum in Opposition, filed by Reginald Burgess, Lacy Reintsma, Amy Rickel, Fred Rickel. (Skelly, Garrett) (Filed on 3/24/2014) Modified on 3/25/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
March 24, 2014 Filing 213 Notice of Concurrence with Memorandum in Opposition re #200 Second Motion to Intervene to File Amended Complaint, filed by Devinda Fernando. (Hicks, David) (Filed on 3/24/2014) Modified on 3/25/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
March 24, 2014 Filing 212 Reply to Response re #200 Second Motion to Intervene to File Amended Complaint, filed by Reginald Burgess, Lacy Reintsma, Amy Rickel, Fred Rickel. (Skelly, Garrett) (Filed on 3/24/2014) Modified on 3/25/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
March 21, 2014 Filing 211 Memorandum in Opposition re #200 Second Motion to Intervene to file Amended Complaint, filed by Paypal, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David W. Moon)(Moon, David) (Filed on 3/21/2014) Modified on 3/24/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting #209 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO SUBMIT AN AMENDED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2014)
March 12, 2014 Filing 209 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO SUBMIT AN AMENDED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL re #205 Order, filed by Paypal, Inc., Casey Ching, Michael Lavanga, Gary Miller, Ronya Osman, Brian Pattee, Michael Spear, Denae Zamora, Moises Zepeda. (Potter, Benjamin) (Filed on 3/12/2014) Modified on 3/13/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
March 12, 2014 Set Deadline (See Docket No. #210 ): Motions due by 5/27/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2014)
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 208 AMENDED NOTICE OF REFERENCE, TIME AND PLACE OF HEARING AND ORDER as to #200 Second MOTION to Intervene to file amended complaint. Responses due by 3/21/2014. Replies due by 3/28/2014. Motion Hearing set for 4/25/2014 02:00 PM* in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/11/14. *Amended to correct time from 9:30 AM to 2:00 PM.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2014)
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 207 NOTICE OF REFERENCE, TIME AND PLACE OF HEARING AND ORDER ON #200 Second MOTION to Intervene to file amended complaint. Responses due by 3/21/2014. Replies due by 3/28/2014. Motion Hearing set for 4/25/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/11/2014. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2014)
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER OVERRULING OBJECTION TO ORDER OF REFERENCE, AMENDING ORDER OF REFERENCE, AND SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 3/7/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2014)
March 7, 2014 Reset Deadlines (See Docket No. #206 ) as to #200 Second MOTION to Intervene to file amended complaint: Responses due by 3/21/2014. Replies due by 3/28/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2014)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong DENYING #166 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement Agreement (terminating #167 Stipulation; terminating #194 Motion for Leave to File) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2014) Modified on 2/25/2014 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
February 19, 2014 Filing 204 NOTICE of Refusal to Consent to, and Objection to, Proceedings before Magistrate re #203 Order, filed by Reginald Burgess, Lacy Reintsma, Amy Rickel, Fred Rickel (Skelly, Garrett) (Filed on 2/19/2014) Modified on 2/20/2014 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER REFERRING #200 SECOND MOTION TO INTERVENE AND AMEND COMPLAINT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOSEPH SPERO. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 2/14/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2014)
February 18, 2014 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for Report and Recommendation re Dkt. 200. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2014)
February 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 2/13/2014 Denying #198 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2014)
February 14, 2014 Filing 201 Proposed Order re #200 Second MOTION to Intervene to file amended complaint by Reginald Burgess, Lacy Reintsma, Amy Rickel, Fred Rickel. (Skelly, Garrett) (Filed on 2/14/2014)
February 14, 2014 Filing 200 Second MOTION to Intervene to file amended complaint filed by Reginald Burgess, Lacy Reintsma, Amy Rickel, Fred Rickel. Motion Hearing set for 3/18/2014 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Responses due by 2/28/2014. Replies due by 3/7/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit_A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit_B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit_C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit_D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit_E)(Skelly, Garrett) (Filed on 2/14/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 199 Proposed Order re #198 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration or Certification per 28 USC 1292(b) to the 9th circuit by Reginald Burgess, Lacy Reintsma, Amy Rickel, Fred Rickel. (Skelly, Garrett) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 11, 2014 Filing 198 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration or Certification per 28 USC 1292(b) filed by Reginald Burgess, Lacy Reintsma, Amy Rickel, Fred Rickel. (Skelly, Garrett) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong DENYING #183 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECUSAL AND TRANSFER. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong DENYING #176 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO RE-FILE MOTION TO INTERVENE AND AMEND THE COMPLAINT RE: MOTIONS TO INTERVENE PER ZEPEDA. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
October 4, 2013 Filing 195 Proposed Order re #194 MOTION for Leave to File Objection, to Dkt 189 and 192 as corrected by Reginald Burgess, Lacy Reintsma, Amy Rickel, Fred Rickel. (Skelly, Garrett) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
October 4, 2013 Filing 194 MOTION for Leave to File Objection, to Dkt 189 and 192 as corrected filed by Reginald Burgess, Lacy Reintsma, Amy Rickel, Fred Rickel. (Skelly, Garrett) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
October 4, 2013 Filing 193 CLERKS NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE #190 (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2013) Modified on 10/4/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2013 Filing 192 NOTICE of Non-Opposition (Consent) re #166 Motion for Settlement Preliminary Approval, filed by Devinda Fernando (Hicks, David) (Filed on 10/3/2013) Modified on 10/3/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2013 Filing 191 Proposed Order re #190 Response, by Reginald Burgess, Lacy Reintsma, Amy Rickel, Fred Rickel. (Skelly, Garrett) (Filed on 10/3/2013) Modified on 10/4/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2013 Filing 190 See document #194 For Corrected Entry.RESPONSE to re #189 Notice (Other) Objection, and Motion for Leave to File by Reginald Burgess, Lacy Reintsma, Amy Rickel, Fred Rickel. (Skelly, Garrett) (Filed on 10/3/2013) Modified on 10/7/2013 (vlkS, COURT STAFF).
October 2, 2013 Filing 189 ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY, PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT NO. #192 *** NOTICE of Non-Opposition (Consent) re #166 Motion for Settlement Preliminary Approval, filed by Devinda Fernando (Hicks, David) (Filed on 10/2/2013) Modified on 10/3/2013 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/3/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2013 Filing 188 NOTICE of Change of Address by David K. Hicks (Hicks, David) (Filed on 8/10/2013)
July 10, 2013 Filing 187 RESPONSE and OBJECTIONS to #182 Motion to Withdraw of Counsel, filed by Reginald Burgess, Lacy Reintsma, Amy Rickel, Fred Rickel. (Skelly, Garrett) (Filed on 7/10/2013) Modified on 7/11/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 8, 2013 Filing 186 Proposed Order re #183 Motion for Leave to File Motion under 28 USC 144 to Recuse and Transfer, by Reginald Burgess. (Skelly, Garrett) (Filed on 7/8/2013) Modified on 7/9/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 8, 2013 Filing 185 Certificate of Counsel re #183 Motion for Leave to File Motion under 28 USC 144 to Recuse and Transfer, #184 Affidavit in Support of Motion, filed by Reginald Burgess. (Skelly, Garrett) (Filed on 7/8/2013) Modified on 7/9/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 8, 2013 Filing 184 AFFIDAVIT of Reginald Burgess in Support re #183 Motion for Leave to File Motion under 28 USC 144 to Recuse and Transfer, filed by Reginald Burgess. (Related document(s) #183 ) (Skelly, Garrett) (Filed on 7/8/2013) Modified on 7/9/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 8, 2013 Filing 183 MOTION for Leave to File Motion under 28 USC 144 to Recuse and Transfer, filed by Reginald Burgess. (Skelly, Garrett) (Filed on 7/8/2013) Modified on 7/9/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 8, 2013 Filing 182 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Julie D. Miller, filed by Ronya Osman, Brian Pattee, Moises Zepeda. (Leon, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/8/2013) Modified on 7/9/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 24, 2013 Filing 181 OBJECTIONS to Evidence re #175 Response to Objection to Preliminary Approval of Settlement, filed by Reginald Burgess, Lacy Reintsma, Amy Rickel, Fred Rickel. (Skelly, Garrett) (Filed on 6/24/2013) Modified on 6/25/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 18, 2013 Filing 180 REPLY and OBJECTION to #176 Motion for Leave to File (re-file) Motion to Intervene to Amend the Complaint, filed by Reginald Burgess, Lacy Reintsma, Amy Rickel, Fred Rickel. (Skelly, Garrett) (Filed on 6/18/2013) Modified on 6/19/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2013 Filing 179 Memorandum in Opposition re #176 Motion for Leave to File (re-file) Motion to Intervene to Amend the Complaint, filed by Paypal, Inc.. (Potter, Benjamin) (Filed on 6/17/2013) Modified on 6/18/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG terminating #168 Motion for Leave to File (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2013)
June 12, 2013 Filing 177 Proposed Order re #176 MOTION for Leave to File (re-file) Motion to Intervene to Amend the Complaint, #164 Case Management Conference - Further, #175 Reply to Opposition/Response, #163 Order to allow re-filng of a Motion to Intervene and Amend the Complaint by Reginald Burgess, Lacy Reintsma, Amy Rickel, Fred Rickel. (Skelly, Garrett) (Filed on 6/12/2013)
June 12, 2013 Filing 176 MOTION for Leave to File (re-file) Motion to Intervene to Amend the Complaint filed by Reginald Burgess, Lacy Reintsma, Amy Rickel, Fred Rickel. (Skelly, Garrett) (Filed on 6/12/2013)
June 10, 2013 Filing 175 Response to #166 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement, filed by Paypal, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David W. Moon in Support of Response to Putative Intervenoers' Objection to Preliminary Approval of Settlement) (Potter, Benjamin) (Filed on 6/10/2013) Modified on 6/11/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 5, 2013 Filing 174 Second Supplemental Declaration of Garrett Skelly in Support of Reply to Response to Paypal re Teleconference Call of 05/23/13, filed by Reginald Burgess, Lacy Reintsma, Amy Rickel, Fred Rickel. (Skelly, Garrett) (Filed on 6/5/2013) Modified on 6/6/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 4, 2013 Filing 173 Memorandum in Opposition re #168 Motion for Leave to File Motion to continue Meet and confer under Rule 7-11, filed by Paypal, Inc.. (Moon, David) (Filed on 6/4/2013) Modified on 6/5/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 1, 2013 Filing 172 Supplemental Declaration of Garrett Skelly re Meet and Confer Shorthand Partial Transcription of Teleconference Call filed by Reginald Burgess, Lacy Reintsma, Amy Rickel, Fred Rickel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (Skelly, Garrett) (Filed on 6/1/2013) Modified on 6/3/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 1, 2013 Filing 171 OBJECTION to #167 Stipulation with Proposed Order re #166 Motion for Preliminary Settlement Approval, filed by Reginald Burgess, Lacy Reintsma, Amy Rickel, Fred Rickel. (Skelly, Garrett) (Filed on 6/1/2013) Modified on 6/3/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/3/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 31, 2013 Filing 170 Proposed Order re #167 Stipulation and Proposed Order, #166 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement, #168 Motion for Leave to File Motion to continue Meet and confer under Rule 7-11, #169 Declaration in Support, #166 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement as objection to Dkt 166, by Reginald Burgess, Lacy Reintsma, Amy Rickel, Fred Rickel. (Skelly, Garrett) (Filed on 5/31/2013) Modified on 6/3/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 31, 2013 Filing 169 Declaration of Garrett Skelly in Support of Meet and Confer, filed by Reginald Burgess, Lacy Reintsma, Amy Rickel, Fred Rickel. (Skelly, Garrett) (Filed on 5/31/2013) Modified on 6/3/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 31, 2013 Filing 168 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to continue Meet and confer under Rule 7-11, filed by Reginald Burgess, Lacy Reintsma, Amy Rickel, Fred Rickel. (Skelly, Garrett) (Filed on 5/31/2013) Modified on 6/3/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 31, 2013 Filing 167 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #166 Motion for Settlement Preliminary Approval filed by Casey Ching, Michael Lavanga, Gary Miller, Ronya Osman, Brian Pattee, Michael Spear, Denae Zamora, Moises Zepeda, Paypal, Inc.. (Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 5/31/2013) Modified on 6/3/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 31, 2013 Filing 166 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval filed by Casey Ching, Michael Lavanga, Gary Miller, Ronya Osman, Brian Pattee, Michael Spear, Denae Zamora, Moises Zepeda. Motion Hearing set for 6/11/2013 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Responses due by 6/14/2013. Replies due by 6/21/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, #2 Proposed Order PRELIMINARILY APPROVING SETTLEMENT, CONDITIONALLY CERTIFYING SETTLEMENT CLASS AND APPOINTING CLASS COUNSEL)(Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 5/31/2013)
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ***DUPLICATE ENTRY, SAME AS DOCUMENT NO. #162 *** ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong DENYING #152 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 05/15/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2013) Modified on 5/20/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/20/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 16, 2013 Filing 164 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 5/16/2013 before Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong (Date Filed: 5/16/2013). (Court Reporter: Not Reported) (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/16/2013) Modified on 5/20/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER RE MEET AND CONFER REQUIREMENT. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 5/16/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2013)
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong DENYING #152 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 05/15/13 (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2013) Modified on 5/16/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 15, 2013 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 5/16/2013 10:00 AM. VIA TELEPHONE. THIS IS A TEXT ENTRY ONLY. THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2013)
May 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY, PLEASE SEE DOCUMENT NO. #165 *** ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong DENYING #130 Motion to Amend, DENYING #146 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response; DENYING #147 Motion to Continue in case 4:10-cv-01668-SBA. DENYING #149 Motion to Amend; DENYING #154 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response; DENYING #155 Motion to Continue in case 4:10-cv-02500-SBA. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 05/14/13 (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2013) Modified on 5/20/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/20/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/20/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 13, 2013 Filing 160 Request for Judicial Notice re #154 Motion to Modify Briefing Schedule on #149 Motion to Intervene and Amend Complaint, #149 Motion to Intervene and Amend Complaint #158 Opposition/Response to Motion, #155 Motion to Continue CMC for 5/16/13 and any ruling on Dkt 154 as improperly filed showing state court pro hac vice ruling and procedure, filed by Reginald Burgess, Lacy Reintsma, Amy Rickel, Fred Rickel. (Related document(s) #154 , #149 , #158 , #155 ) (Skelly, Garrett) (Filed on 5/13/2013) Modified on 5/14/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 13, 2013 Filing 159 DECLARATION of Garrett Skelly re #154 Motion to Modify Briefing Schedule #149 Motion to Intervene and Amend Complaint, #158 Opposition/Response to Motion as untimely and improperly filed, filed by Reginald Burgess, Lacy Reintsma, Amy Rickel, Fred Rickel. (Related document(s) #154 , #158 ) (Skelly, Garrett) (Filed on 5/13/2013) Modified on 5/14/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 13, 2013 Filing 158 RESPONSE to #154 Motion to Modify Briefing Schedule on #149 Motion to Intervene and Amend Complaint as improperly filed, filed by Reginald Burgess, Lacy Reintsma, Amy Rickel, Fred Rickel. (Skelly, Garrett) (Filed on 5/13/2013) Modified on 5/14/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 10, 2013 Filing 157 Proposed Order re #154 Motion to Modify Briefing Schedule on #149 Motion to Intervene and Amend Complaint, #155 Motion to Continue CMC for 5/16/13 and any ruling on Dkt 154 as improperly filed, by Reginald Burgess, Lacy Reintsma, Amy Rickel, Fred Rickel. (Skelly, Garrett) (Filed on 5/10/2013) Modified on 5/13/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 10, 2013 Filing 156 Declaration of Garrett Skelly in Support of #154 Motion to Modify Briefing Schedule on #149 Motion to Intervene and Amend Complaint, #155 Motion to Continue CMC for 5/16/13 and any ruling on Dkt 154 as improperly filed, filed by Reginald Burgess, Lacy Reintsma, Amy Rickel, Fred Rickel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #154 , #155 ) (Skelly, Garrett) (Filed on 5/10/2013) Modified on 5/13/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 10, 2013 Filing 155 MOTION to Continue CMC for 5/16/13 and any ruling on Dkt 154 as improperly filed filed by Reginald Burgess, Lacy Reintsma, Amy Rickel, Fred Rickel. (Skelly, Garrett) (Filed on 5/10/2013)
May 9, 2013 Filing 154 MOTIONto Modify Briefing Schedule on #149 Motion to Intervene and Amend Complaint filed by Paypal, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin T. Potter in support of Motion for Adminstrative Relief to Modify Briefing Schedule, #2 Proposed Order)(Potter, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/9/2013) Modified on 5/10/2013 (kcS, COURT STAFF).
May 3, 2013 Filing 153 Proposed Order re #152 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration and or to Vacate by Reginald Burgess. (Skelly, Garrett) (Filed on 5/3/2013)
May 3, 2013 Filing 152 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration and or to Vacate filed by Reginald Burgess. (Skelly, Garrett) (Filed on 5/3/2013)
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong in case 4:10-cv-01668-SBA; STRIKING #144 Motion to Enforce Judgment in case 4:10-cv-02500-SBA. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 05/01/13 (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2013)
May 1, 2013 Filing 150 Proposed Order re #149 Motion for Intervention and Leave to File Amended Complaint, by Reginald Burgess. (Skelly, Garrett) (Filed on 5/1/2013) Modified on 5/2/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2013 Filing 149 MOTION to Intervene and Amend Complaint re #110 Amended Complaint filed by Reginald Burgess. Motion Hearing set for 7/2/2013 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Responses due by 5/15/2013. Replies due by 5/22/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Skelly, Garrett) (Filed on 5/1/2013) Modified on 5/2/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 29, 2013 Filing 148 AMENDED NOTICE of Appearance, filed by Reginald Burgess. (Skelly, Garrett) (Filed on 4/29/2013) Modified on 4/30/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER STRIKING #142 Notice of Appearance filed by Reginald Burgess. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 4/26/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2013)
April 24, 2013 Filing 146 Proposed Order re #144 First MOTION to Enforce Judgment / Settlement of Comb v Paypal, #145 Declaration in Support, re: Status as Invited Plaintiff Party by Reginald Burgess. (Skelly, Garrett) (Filed on 4/24/2013)
April 24, 2013 Filing 145 Declaration of Reginald Burgess in Support of #144 First MOTION to Enforce Judgment / Settlement of Comb v Paypal re: Status as Invited Plaintiff Party filed byReginald Burgess. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supporting Declaration)(Related document(s) #144 ) (Skelly, Garrett) (Filed on 4/24/2013)
April 24, 2013 Filing 144 ***DOCUMENT HAS BEEN STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD BY ORDER OF THE COURT, PLEASE SEE DOCUMENT NO. #151 ***
April 22, 2013 Filing 143 SUPPLEMENT TO CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT, filed by Reginald Burgess. (Skelly, Garrett) (Filed on 4/22/2013) Modified on 4/23/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 22, 2013 Filing 142 ***DOCUMENT HAS BEEN STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD BY ORDER OF THE COURT, PLEASE SEE DOCUMENT NO. #147 ***
March 27, 2013 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference continued to 5/16/2013 02:45 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. THIS IS A TEXT ENTRY ONLY. THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2013)
March 25, 2013 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference CONTINUED TO 3/28/2013 02:30 PM. VIA TELEPHONE.THIS IS A TEXT ENTRY ONLY. THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2013)
March 21, 2013 Filing 140 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT, filed by Paypal, Inc., Ronya Osman, Michael Spear, Denae Zamora, Moises Zepeda, Casey Ching, Michael Lavanga, Gary Miller . (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Benjamin T. Potter in support of Joint Case Management Statement)(Potter, Benjamin) (Filed on 3/21/2013) Modified on 3/22/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 20, 2013 Filing 141 Minute Entry: Order to Show Cause Hearing held on 3/20/2013 before Judge Cousins. Court takes matter under submission. (Court Reporter Joan Columbini) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/20/2013)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 139 Order by Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins denying (115) Motion to Continue. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2013)
March 14, 2013 Filing 138 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Paypal, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David W. Moon in Support of Defendants' Reply to OSC, #2 Declaration of John C. Dwyer in Support of Defendants' Reply to OSC)(Moon, David) (Filed on 3/14/2013) Modified on 3/15/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 28, 2013 Filing 137 STATEMENT of Settlement Conference Fees and Expenses, filed by Paypal, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David W. Moon in Support of Defendants' Statement of Settlement Conference Fees and Expenses, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Declaration of Aaron M. Johnson in Support of Defendants' Statement of Settlement Conference Fees and Expenses, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Declaration of Jessica W. Rossman in Support of Defendants' Statement of Settlement Conference Fees and Expenses)(Moon, David) (Filed on 2/28/2013) Modified on 3/1/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 28, 2013 Filing 136 STATEMENT in Support of Request for Reimbursement of Fees and Costs Relating to the Settlement Conference, filed by Casey Ching, Michael Lavanga, Gary Miller, Ronya Osman, Brian Pattee, Michael Spear, Denae Zamora, Moises Zepeda (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 2/28/2013) Modified on 3/1/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 3/20/2013 03:00 PM. Show Cause Response due by 3/7/2013.. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 02/14/2013. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2013)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 134 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 3/27/2013 03:15 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 2/8/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2013)
February 8, 2013 Filing 133 Minute Entry: Further Settlement Conference held as to Zepeda case only. Attorney Hicks appeared for plaintiffs in Fernando matter; attorney Trutbitsky failed to appear for Fernando plaintiffs. Attorney Woods, counsel in Dunkel, also present. Court will issue OSC re sanctions to Trubitsky and the Fernando plaintiffs. Fernando case did not settle. Settlement conference complete and cases should proceed. (Court Reporter: Not Reported) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/8/2013) Modified on 2/11/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
February 7, 2013 Filing 132 Minute Entry: Settlement Conference held with Judge Cousins on 2/7/2013. Further Settlement Conference set for 2/8/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter: Not Reported) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/7/2013) Modified on 2/11/2013 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER RE Settlement Conference Statement of Reginald Burgess. The Court will disregard the statement submitted by Reginal Burgess. Burgess may not submit any further settlement-related communications to this Court without advance leave of Court. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 1/31/13. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2013)
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying AS MOOT (73) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 4:10-cv-01668-SBA; denying AS MOOT (92) Stipulation in case 4:10-cv-02500-SBA (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2013)
December 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying #128 Motion for Reconsideration. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2012) Modified on 12/17/2012 (kcS, ).
December 13, 2012 Filing 128 MOTION for Reconsideration re #125 Order on Motion to Intervene, filed by Reginald Burgess. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2012)
December 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER CONTINUING Settlement Conference to 2/7/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 12/12/12.(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2012)
December 12, 2012 Filing 126 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Date of Mandatory Settlement Conference re #124 Order Setting Settlement Conference, filed by Paypal, Inc., Casey Ching, Michael Lavanga, Gary Miller, Ronya Osman, Brian Pattee, Michael Spear, Denae Zamora, Moises Zepeda. (Moon, David) (Filed on 12/12/2012) Modified on 12/13/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying (119) Motion REQUEST TO BE HEARD; denying (120) Motion for Hearing; denying (121) Motion to Intervene in case 4:10-cv-02500-SBA (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2012)
November 28, 2012 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas for Settlement (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2012)
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 124 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND ORDER - Settlement Conference set for 1/17/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 11/27/12. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2012)
November 27, 2012 Filing 123 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re (82 in 4:10-cv-01668-SBA, 82 in 4:10-cv-01668-SBA, 82 in 4:10-cv-01668-SBA, 82 in 4:10-cv-01668-SBA) Order on Motion to Intervene, Order on Motion for Settlement, Order on Motion to Vacate, Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2012) Modified on 11/28/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying (79) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 4:10-cv-01668-SBA; denying (97) Motion to Intervene; denying (112) Motion for Settlement; denying (114) Motion to Vacate in case 4:10-cv-02500-SBA (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2012)
November 27, 2012 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins for Settlement (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2012)
November 19, 2012 Filing 121 MOTION to Intervene and Joinder to #38 Notice, filed by Reginald Burgess. Responses due by 12/3/2012. Replies due by 12/10/2012. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2012) Modified on 11/21/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 19, 2012 Filing 120 MOTION for Hearing re #114 Motion to Vacate, filed by Reginald Burgess. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2012)
November 19, 2012 Filing 119 NOTICE of Appearance and MOTION for Leave to File Documents Electronically, filed by Reginald Burgess. Responses due by 12/3/2012. Replies due by 12/10/2012. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2012)
November 8, 2012 Filing 118 RESPONSE to #115 Objection of Class Members to the Proposed Class Action Settlement Agreement, filed by Paypal, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David W. Moon, #2 Exhibit A-J)(Moon, David) (Filed on 11/8/2012) Modified on 11/9/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 8, 2012 Filing 117 Response to #112 Motion for Settlement Preliminary Approval, filed by Casey Ching, Michael Lavanga, Gary Miller, Ronya Osman, Brian Pattee, Michael Spear, Denae Zamora, Moises Zepeda. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 11/8/2012) Modified on 11/9/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 25, 2012 Filing 116 RESPONSE (re #114 DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO CONSOLIDATE HEARING ON MOTION TO INTERVENE AND FOR A STAY OF PROCEEDINGS WITH MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL filed byAmy Rickel, Fred Rickel. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Trubitsky, Marina) (Filed on 10/25/2012) Modified on 10/26/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 25, 2012 Filing 115 OBJECTION OF CLASS MEMBERS TO THE PROPOSED CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR by Amy Rickel, Fred Rickel. (Trubitsky, Marina) (Filed on 10/25/2012) Modified on 10/26/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
October 24, 2012 Filing 114 MOTION to Consolidate Hearing re #97 Motion to Intervene and for Stay of Hearing and on Motion for Preliminary Approval, filed by Paypal, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/4/2014 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Responses due by 11/7/2012. Replies due by 11/14/2012. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David Moon in Support of Motion for Administrative Relief to Consolidate Hearing Dates, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Consolidate Hearing Dates)(Moon, David) (Filed on 10/24/2012) Modified on 10/25/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 18, 2012 Filing 113 Proposed Order re #112 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval by Casey Ching, Michael Lavanga, Gary Miller, Ronya Osman, Brian Pattee, Michael Spear, Denae Zamora, Moises Zepeda. (Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 10/18/2012)
October 18, 2012 Filing 112 Memorandum in Support and MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval, filed by Casey Ching, Michael Lavanga, Gary Miller, Ronya Osman, Brian Pattee, Michael Spear, Denae Zamora, Moises Zepeda. Motion Hearing set for 12/4/2012 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Responses due by 11/5/2012. Replies due by 11/13/2012. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 10/18/2012) Modified on 10/19/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER CONTINUING MOTION HEARING as to ( #97 in 4:10-cv-02500-SBA) Motion to Intervene and for Stay. Motion Hearing set for 11/13/2012 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 10/11/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2012) Modified on 10/12/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 9, 2012 Filing 110 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, againstPaypal, Inc., E-Bay Inc.. Filed by Michael Lavanga, Ronya Osman, Denae Zamora, Moises Zepeda, Gary Miller, Casey Ching, Michael Spear, Brian Pattee. (Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 10/9/2012) Modified on 10/10/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2012 Filing 109 Amended NOTICE of Change In Counsel, filed by Moises Zepeda (Miller, Julie) (Filed on 10/3/2012) Modified on 10/4/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2012 Filing 108 NOTICE of Change of Address, filed by Moises Zepeda (Miller, Julie) (Filed on 10/3/2012) Modified on 10/4/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong GRANTING #106 in 4:10-cv-02500-SBA) Motion to Vacate Motion to Intervene and for Stay. Motion Hearing set for 10/16/2012 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 9/17/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2012) Modified on 9/18/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/18/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 14, 2012 Filing 106 MOTION to Vacate #97 First MOTION to Intervene and for Stay filed by Casey Ching, Michael Lavanga, Gary Miller, Ronya Osman, Brian Pattee, Michael Spear, Denae Zamora, Moises Zepeda. Responses due by 9/28/2012. Replies due by 10/5/2012. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 9/14/2012)
September 14, 2012 Filing 105 CLERKS NOTICE RE DEFICIENCY RE #102 (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2012)
September 13, 2012 Filing 104 Memorandum in Opposition re #97 Motion to Intervene and for Stay, filed by Amy Rickel, Fred Rickel. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Trubitsky, Marina) (Filed on 9/13/2012) Modified on 9/14/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 13, 2012 Filing 103 Proposed Order re #102 Proposed Order, by Casey Ching, Michael Lavanga, Gary Miller, Ronya Osman, Brian Pattee, Michael Spear, Denae Zamora, Moises Zepeda. (Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 9/13/2012) Modified on 9/14/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 13, 2012 Filing 102 ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY, PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT NO. #106 *** Proposed Order re #97 First MOTION to Intervene and for Stay MOTION FOR ADMIN RELIEF TO VACATE HEARING DATE ON INTERVENERS MOTION TO INTERVENE by Casey Ching, Michael Lavanga, Gary Miller, Ronya Osman, Brian Pattee, Michael Spear, Denae Zamora, Moises Zepeda. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 9/13/2012) Modified on 9/17/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
August 1, 2012 Filing 101 Reply Memorandum re #97 Motion to Intervene and for Stay filed by Shaul Behr, Devinda Fernando, Ira Gilman, Lacy Reintsma, Amy Rickel, Fred Rickel, Vadim Tsigel, Michael Zinger. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Trubitsky, Marina) (Filed on 8/1/2012) Modified on 8/2/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2012 Filing 100 RESPONSE (re #97 First MOTION to Intervene and for Stay ) filed byCasey Ching, Michael Lavanga, Gary Miller, Ronya Osman, Brian Pattee, Michael Spear, Denae Zamora, Moises Zepeda. (Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 7/26/2012)
July 25, 2012 Filing 99 RESPONSE (re #97 First MOTION to Intervene and for Stay ) filed byPaypal, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David W. Moon, #2 Proposed Order)(Moon, David) (Filed on 7/25/2012) Modified on 7/26/2012 (cpS, COURT STAFF).
July 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 98 AMENDED ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong STRIKING #94 Motion to Intervene and for Stay of Proceedings. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 7/11/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2012) Modified on 7/13/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 11, 2012 Filing 97 MOTION to Intervene and for Stay, filed by Amy Rickel, Fred Rickel. Motion Hearing set for 9/18/2012 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Responses due by 7/25/2012. Replies due by 8/1/2012. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Exhibit "A", #3 Exhibit Exhibit "B", #4 Proposed Order)(Trubitsky, Marina) (Filed on 7/11/2012) Modified on 7/12/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 11, 2012 Filing 96 ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY, PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT NO. #97 *** MOTION to Intervene and for Stay, filed by Amy Rickel, Fred Rickel. Motion Hearing set for 9/18/2012 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Responses due by 7/25/2012. Replies due by 8/1/2012. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Exhibit "A", #3 Exhibit Exhibit "B", #4 Proposed Order)(Trubitsky, Marina) (Filed on 7/11/2012) Modified on 7/12/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/12/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ***[DOCUMENT LOCKED, PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT NO. #98 ]*** ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG striking #94 Motion to Intervene (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2012) Modified on 7/12/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
July 10, 2012 Filing 94 ***DOCUMENT HAS BEEN STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD BY ORDER OF THE COURT, PLEASE SEE DOCUMENT NO. #98 *** (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 20, 2012 Filing 93 NOTICE OF AMENDED STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER re Revised Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date in Connection with the Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement, filed by Paypal, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Moon, David) (Filed on 6/20/2012) Modified on 6/21/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 19, 2012 Filing 92 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Revised Briefing Schedule and Hearing Date in Connection with the Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement, filed by Paypal, Inc, Shaul Behr, Casey Ching, Davinda Fernando, Ira Gilman, Michael Lavanga, Gary Miller, Ronya Osman, Brian Pattee, Lacy Reintsma, Amy Rickel, Fred Rickel, Michael Spear, Vadim Tsigel, Denae Zamora, Moises Zepeda, Michael Zinger. (Moon, David) (Filed on 6/19/2012) Modified on 6/20/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/20/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
June 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER re (90 in 4:10-cv-02500-SBA, 90 in 4:10-cv-02500-SBA) Order on Stipulation,. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 6/12/12. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2012)
June 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying (69) Stipulation in case 4:10-cv-01668-SBA; denying (89) Stipulation in case 4:10-cv-02500-SBA (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2012)
June 8, 2012 Filing 89 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Converting Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Approval to Telephonic Case Management Conference, filed by Paypal, Inc., Casey Ching, Michael Lavanga, Gary Miller, Ronya Osman, Brian Pattee, Michael Spear, Denae Zamora, Moises Zepeda. (Moon, David) (Filed on 6/8/2012) Modified on 6/11/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 24, 2012 Filing 88 Memorandum in Opposition re Motion to Extend Deadline to File Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of the Settlement, filed by Casey Ching, Michael Lavanga, Gary Miller, Ronya Osman, Brian Pattee, Michael Spear, Denae Zamora, Moises Zepeda. (Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 5/24/2012) Modified on 5/25/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/19/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 87 STIPULATION AND ORDER: Continuing Date as to Motion for Preliminary. The date to file Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement shall be CONTINUED to 05/15/12. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 5/10/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2012) Modified on 5/11/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
May 8, 2012 Filing 86 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Continuing Date to File Motion for Preliminary Approval filed by Paypal, Inc, Shaul Behr, Casey Ching, Davinda Fernando, Ira Gilman, Michael Lavanga, Gary Miller, Ronya Osman, Brian Pattee, Lacy Reintsma, Amy Rickel, Fred Rickel, Michael Spear, Vadim Tsigel, Denae Zamora, Moises Zepeda, Michael Zinger. (Moon, David) (Filed on 5/8/2012) Modified on 5/9/2012 (cjl, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/10/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2012 Filing 85 RESPONSE to Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Cases Should be Related Pursuant to Civil L.R. 3-12 and 7-11 filed in case no. C-10-1668-SBA, filed by Paypal, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Moon, David) (Filed on 4/30/2012) Modified on 5/1/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 19, 2012 Filing 84 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 4/19/2012 before Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong (Date Filed: 4/19/2012). Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement due by 5/8/12. Motion Hearing set for 6/12/2012 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. (Court Reporter: Not Reported) (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/19/2012) Modified on 4/23/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 83 STIPULATION AND ORDER Case Management Conference set for 4/19/2012 02:30 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 4/10/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2012)
April 9, 2012 Filing 82 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference, filed by Paypal, Inc., Casey Ching, Michael Lavanga, Gary Miller, Ronya Osman, Brian Patee, Michael Spear, Denae Zamora, Moises Zepeda . (Moon, David) (Filed on 4/9/2012) Modified on 4/10/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
April 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 81 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Case Management Conference CONTINUED to 4/11/2012 at 03:00 PM. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 04/05/12. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2012)
March 29, 2012 Filing 80 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT, filed by Paypal, Inc., Casey Ching, Michael Lavanga, Gary Miller, Ronya Osman, Brian Pattee, Michael Spear, Denae Zamora, Moises Zepeda. (Moon, David) (Filed on 3/29/2012) Modified on 3/30/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 79 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 4/5/2012 03:30 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 3/14/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2012)
January 26, 2012 Filing 78 NOTICE of Change In Counsel, filed by Ronya Osman, Brian Pattee (Miller, Julie) (Filed on 1/26/2012) Modified on 1/27/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 26, 2012 Filing 77 NOTICE of Firm Name Change, filed by Ronya Osman, Brian Pattee (Miller, Julie) (Filed on 1/26/2012) Modified on 1/27/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 23, 2012 Filing 76 Case Management Conference set for 3/14/2012 02:45 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 1/20/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2012) (lrc, COURT STAFF).
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 75 STIPULATION AND ORDER VACATING Hearing Dates and Deadlines as to #66 Motion to Intervene and strike class allegations in Zepeda action. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 1/20/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2012) Modified on 1/24/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 18, 2012 Filing 74 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Vacating Hearing Dates on: (1) Defendant's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim; and (2) Plaintiffs' Motion to Consolidate Case and Appoint Lead Counsel for the Class filed by Paypal, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David W. Moon i/s/o Stipulation Vacating the Hearing Date Set by the Court for Intervener's Motion to Intervene and Strike Zepeda's Class Allegations)(Moon, David) (Filed on 1/18/2012) Modified on 1/19/2012 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 21, 2011 Filing 73 Memorandum in Opposition re #66 Motion to Intervene and Strike Class Allegations in Zepeda action filed by Casey Ching, Michael Lavanga, Gary Miller, Ronya Osman, Brian Pattee, Michael Spear, Denae Zamora, Moises Zepeda. (Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 11/21/2011) Modified on 11/22/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 7, 2011 Filing 72 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time for a Reply, filed by Shaul Behr, Devinda Fernando, Ira Gilman, Ronya Osman, Lacy Reintsma, Amy Rickel, Fred Rickel, Vadim Tsigel, Michael Zinger, Paypal, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Trubitsky, Marina) (Filed on 11/7/2011) Modified on 11/8/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 7, 2011 Filing 71 Reply to Opposition re #66 Motion to Intervene and Strike Class Allegations in Zepeda Action filed by Shaul Behr, Devinda Fernando, Ira Gilman, Ronya Osman, Lacy Reintsma, Amy Rickel, Fred Rickel, Vadim Tsigel, Michael Zinger. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Trubitsky, Marina) (Filed on 11/7/2011) Modified on 11/8/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 24, 2011 Filing 70 Memorandum in Opposition re #66 Motion to Intervene and to Strike Class Allegations in Zepeda Action, filed by Paypal, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David W. Moon)(Moon, David) (Filed on 10/24/2011) Modified on 10/25/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 21, 2011 Filing 69 Statement in Response to #59 Order to Show Cause Re: Settlement filed by Paypal, Inc.. (Moon, David) (Filed on 10/21/2011) Modified on 10/24/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 18, 2011 Filing 68 AMENDED CLERKS NOTICE (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2011)
October 12, 2011 Filing 67 CLERKS NOTICE: That the hearing has been CONTINUED as to #66 Motion to Intervene and strike class allegations in Zepeda action. Motion Hearing set for 2/14/2012 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2011) Modified on 10/13/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 10, 2011 Filing 66 First MOTION to Intervene and strike class allegations in Zepeda action filed by Devinda Fernando, Vadim Tsigel, Michael Zinger, Amy Rickel, Fred Rickel, Ira Gilman, Lacy Reintsma, Shaul Behr. Motion Hearing set for 12/2/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Responses due by 10/24/2011. Replies due by 10/31/2011. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Trubitsky, Marina) (Filed on 10/10/2011)
October 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASES: Case Management Conference set for 2/14/2012 01:00 PM. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 10/4/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2011) Modified on 10/5/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
October 4, 2011 Filing 64 CLERKS NOTICE: That the hearing is continued as to #40 in 4:10-cv-01668-SBA Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel, Motion to Consolidate Cases. Motion Hearing set for 2/14/2012 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2011) Modified on 10/5/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
September 30, 2011 Filing 63 Case assigned to Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong for all further proceedings. Judge Jeremy Fogel no longer assigned to the case.Signed by The Executive Committee on 09/28/2011
September 28, 2011 Filing 62 ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE DISREGARD.*** ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Claudia Wilken for all further proceedings. Judge Jeremy Fogel no longer assigned to the case.Signed by The Executive Committee on 09/28/2011. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2011) Modified on 9/30/2011 (tshS, COURT STAFF).
September 1, 2011 Pursuant to Signed Related Case Order ( #61 ). Case reassigned to Judge Jeremy Fogel for all futher proceedings. Judge Edward J. Davila no longer assigned to the case. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2011)
August 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 RELATED CASE ORDER. C 10-01668 JF and C 10-02500 EJD Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 8/22/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2011) Modified on 9/1/2011 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 16, 2011 Filing 60 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by David Wesley Moon (Moon, David) (Filed on 8/16/2011)
August 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Settlement. Stipulated Dismissal or Show Cause Response due by 10/21/2011. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 10/28/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/15/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2011)
August 15, 2011 ***8/19/2011 CMC Deadlines terminated pursuant to #59 Order to Show Cause. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2011)
August 12, 2011 Filing 58 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Paypal, Inc.. (Moon, David) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO VACATE PLAINTIFFS DEADLINE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINre #56 Stipulation. The Court shall reschedule Plaintiffs' deadline to file a Second Amended Complaint at the Case Management Conference set for August 19, 2011 at 10:00 a.m., or such other date and time as is convenient for the Court. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/15/2011. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2011)
June 14, 2011 Filing 56 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER VACATING PLAINTIFFS DEADLINE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Casey Ching, Michael Lavanga, Gary Miller, Ronya Osman, Brian Pattee, Michael Spear, Denae Zamora, Moises Zepeda. (Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 6/14/2011)
May 26, 2011 Filing 55 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Updated Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/12/2011. Case Management Conference set for 8/19/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 5th Floor, San Jose. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
May 18, 2011 Filing 54 NOTICE of Change of Address by Mark N. Todzo (Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 5/18/2011)
May 5, 2011 Filing 53 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Casey Ching, Michael Lavanga, Gary Miller, Ronya Osman, Brian Pattee, Michael Spear, Denae Zamora, Moises Zepeda. (Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 5/5/2011)
April 27, 2011 Pursuant to the Order Reassigning Case all hearings on motions and further deadlines terminated and must be renoticed in front of newly assigned Judge.
April 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Judge Jeremy Fogel no longer assigned to the case.Signed by The Executive Committee on 4/25/2011. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2011)
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR PLAINTIFFS TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re #50 . Case Management Conference set for 7/29/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 3/23/11. (dlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2011)
March 17, 2011 Filing 50 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Extending Time for Plaintiffs to File Second Amended Complaint and Continuing Case Management Conference by Casey Ching, Michael Lavanga, Gary Miller, Ronya Osman, Brian Pattee, Michael Spear, Denae Zamora, Moises Zepeda. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark N. Todzo In Support of Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Time for Plaintiffs to File Second Amended Complaint and Continuing Case Management Conference)(Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 3/17/2011)
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING #26 , #28 MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND TO APPOINT INTERIM LEAD, LIASON, AND CLASS COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 2/14/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2011)
February 4, 2011 Filing 48 Transcript of Proceedings held on 01/21/2011, before Judge Jeremy Fogel. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, Telephone number 408-288-6150. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/5/2011. (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 2/4/2011)
January 21, 2011 Filing 47 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 1/21/2011 before Judge Jeremy Fogel (Date Filed: 1/21/2011) re #28 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Interim Lead, Liaison and Class Counsel, #26 MOTION to Dismiss. The motions are taken under submission. Case Management Conference set for 4/1/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Court Reporter Summer Fisher.) (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/21/2011)
January 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO CONDUCT RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE AND FILE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (approving #42 ). Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 1/12/2011. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2011)
January 7, 2011 Filing 45 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Casey Ching, Michael Lavanga, Gary Miller, Ronya Osman, Brian Pattee, Michael Spear, Denae Zamora, Moises Zepeda. (Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
January 7, 2011 Filing 44 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Paypal, Inc.. (Azadian, George) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
January 7, 2011 Filing 43 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #28 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Interim Lead, Liaison and Class Counsel (Non-Opposition and Reservation of Rights of Defendant PayPal to Plaintiffs Motion to Appoint Counsel Interim Lead, Liaison and Class Counsel filed byPaypal, Inc.. (Related document(s) #28 ) (Azadian, George) (Filed on 1/7/2011)
December 27, 2010 Filing 42 STIPULATION re #39 Stipulation and Order,, Set Hearings, Extending Time To Conduct Rule 26(f) Conference And File Joint Case Management Statement by Paypal, Inc.. (Azadian, George) (Filed on 12/27/2010)
December 15, 2010 Filing 41 RESPONSE in Support re #26 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim and For Failure to Plead Fraud with Particularity filed byPaypal, Inc.. (Strickland, Julia) (Filed on 12/15/2010)
December 6, 2010 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal for all discovery purposes. Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull no longer assigned to the case. (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2010)
November 19, 2010 Filing 40 Memorandum in Opposition To Defendant's #26 Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed byCasey Ching, Michael Lavanga, Gary Miller, Ronya Osman, Brian Pattee, Michael Spear, Denae Zamora, Moises Zepeda. (Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 11/19/2010) Modified on 11/22/2010 (gm, COURT STAFF).
November 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTION OF DEFENDANTS PAYPAL, INC. TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED COMPLAINT AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (approving #37 ). Motion Hearing set for 1/21/2010 at 9:00 AM. The Case Management Conference set for 12/3/2010 is RESET for 1/21/2010 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 11/4/2010. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2010)
November 2, 2010 Filing 38 NOTICE by Casey Ching, Michael Lavanga, Gary Miller, Ronya Osman, Brian Pattee, Michael Spear, Denae Zamora, Moises Zepeda OF HEARING ON APPOINTMENT OF INTERIM LEAD, LIAISON AND CLASS COUNSEL PURSUANT TO FED R. CIV. P. 23(g) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 11/2/2010)
November 1, 2010 Filing 37 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Setting Briefing Schedule on Motion of Defendant Paypal, Inc. to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint and Continuing Case Management Conference by Paypal, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Azadian, George) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
November 1, 2010 Filing 36 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT #37 . *** STIPULATION (and [Proposed] Order Setting Briefing Schedule on Motion of Defendant Paypal, Inc. to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint and Continuing Case Management Conference) by Paypal, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Azadian, George) (Filed on 11/1/2010) Modified on 11/1/2010 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
November 1, 2010 Filing 35 NOTICE by Paypal, Inc. re #26 MOTION to Dismiss (Hearing set for 1/21/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose) (Azadian, George) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
October 26, 2010 Filing 34 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 12/3/2010 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2010)
October 21, 2010 Filing 33 Case Reassigned to Judge Jeremy Fogel for all further proceedings. Judge Lucy H. Koh no longer assigned to the case. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2010)
October 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Koh on 10/21/2010. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2010)
October 21, 2010 Filing 31 STIPULATION (Proposed Order) re Briefing Schedule by Paypal, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Azadian, George) (Filed on 10/21/2010)
October 21, 2010 Filing 30 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT #31 . *** STIPULATION (and Proposed Order) re Briefing Schedule by Paypal, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Azadian, George) (Filed on 10/21/2010) Modified on 10/21/2010 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
October 21, 2010 Filing 29 Proposed Order re #28 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Interim Lead, Liaison and Class Counsel by Casey Ching, Michael Lavanga, Gary Miller, Ronya Osman, Brian Pattee, Michael Spear, Denae Zamora, Moises Zepeda. (Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 10/21/2010)
October 21, 2010 Filing 28 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Interim Lead, Liaison and Class Counsel filed by Casey Ching, Michael Lavanga, Gary Miller, Ronya Osman, Brian Pattee, Michael Spear, Denae Zamora, Moises Zepeda. Motion Hearing set for 1/13/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Certificate of Service)(Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 10/21/2010)
October 1, 2010 Filing 27 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO FOLLOW MOTION HEARING Case Management Conference continued to 1/13/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Case Management Conference statement due 1/6/11. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2010)
September 30, 2010 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Paypal, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/13/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Strickland, Julia) (Filed on 9/30/2010)
September 30, 2010 Filing 25 Certificate of Interested Entities by Paypal, Inc. (Strickland, Julia) (Filed on 9/30/2010)
September 22, 2010 Filing 24 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jonathan Shub AND FIRM AFFILIATION (Shub, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/22/2010)
August 18, 2010 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark N. Todzo (Todzo, Mark) (Filed on 8/18/2010)
August 13, 2010 Filing 22 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Paypal, Inc.. Filed by Moises Zepeda, Michael Spear, Ronya Osman, Brian Pattee, Casey Ching, Denae Zamora, Michael Lavanga, Gary Miller. (Kellner, Richard) (Filed on 8/13/2010) Modified text on 8/24/2010 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
August 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference re #19 . Case Management Statement due by 11/17/2010. Case Management Conference set for 12/1/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Koh on 8/12/10. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2010)
August 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #18 extending time for Defendant Paypal to respond. Signed by Judge Koh on 8/12/2010. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2010)
August 12, 2010 Filing 19 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Continuing Case Management Conference by Paypal, Inc.. (Moon, David) (Filed on 8/12/2010)
August 11, 2010 Filing 18 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Extending Time for Defendant Paypal, Inc. to Respond by Paypal, Inc.. (Moon, David) (Filed on 8/11/2010)
August 11, 2010 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric David Freed (Freed, Eric) (Filed on 8/11/2010)
August 9, 2010 Filing 16 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 9/29/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2010)
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings. Judge James Ware no longer assigned to the case.Signed by The Executive Committee on 08/02/2010. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
June 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time to Respond to Complaint re #9 Stipulation. Response due 8/16/2010. Signed by Judge James Ware on 6/28/2010. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2010)
June 22, 2010 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia B. Strickland (Strickland, Julia) (Filed on 6/22/2010)
June 22, 2010 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Marie Simonetti (Simonetti, Lisa) (Filed on 6/22/2010)
June 22, 2010 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by David Wesley Moon (Moon, David) (Filed on 6/22/2010)
June 22, 2010 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by George Stephen Azadian (Azadian, George) (Filed on 6/22/2010)
June 22, 2010 Filing 9 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order re Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by Paypal, Inc.. (Azadian, George) (Filed on 6/22/2010) Modified on 6/22/2010 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 16, 2010 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Moises Zepeda. Paypal, Inc. served on 6/15/2010, answer due 7/6/2010. (Kellner, Richard) (Filed on 6/16/2010)
June 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge James Ware for all further proceedings and Magistrate Judge Patricia V. Trumbull for all discovery matters. Signed by The Executive Committee on 06/11/2010. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2010)
June 10, 2010 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2010)
June 10, 2010 Set Deadlines/Hearings:, ***Deadlines terminated. #6 Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment. Case Management Statement due by 9/3/2010. Case Management Conference set for 9/13/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 4th Floor, San Jose. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2010)
June 9, 2010 Filing 5 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge by Paypal, Inc. (Kellner, Richard) (Filed on 6/9/2010) Modified on 6/10/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 9, 2010 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Vincent Storti (Storti, Michael) (Filed on 6/9/2010)
June 7, 2010 Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 8/24/2010. Case Management Conference set for 8/31/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/8/2010: #2 Standing Order Regarding Case Management in Civil Cases for all San Jose Judges, #3 Standing Orders for All Judges of the Northern California District Court) (bw, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/8/2010: #4 Judge Trumbull Standing Order for Civil Practice in Assigned Cases for all Purposes) (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/8/2010 (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 7, 2010 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Paypal, Inc. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2010) (bw, COURT STAFF).
June 7, 2010 Filing 1 Class Action Complaint (Summons Issued):jury demand: against Paypal, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 54611007480). Filed by Moises Zepeda. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/8/2010: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (bw, COURT STAFF). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/16/2016: #2 Filing Fee Receipt) (jlmS, COURT STAFF).
June 7, 2010 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2010)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zepeda v. Paypal, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moises Zepeda
Represented By: Michael Vincent Storti
Represented By: Alfredo Torrijos
Represented By: Brian Stephen Kabateck
Represented By: Eric David Freed
Represented By: Howard Judd Hirsch
Represented By: Jeffrey A Leon
Represented By: Jonathan Shub
Represented By: Julie Diane Miller
Represented By: Mark N. Todzo
Represented By: Seth Michael Lehrman
Represented By: Richard Kellner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Spear
Represented By: Michael Vincent Storti
Represented By: Alfredo Torrijos
Represented By: Brian Stephen Kabateck
Represented By: Eric David Freed
Represented By: Howard Judd Hirsch
Represented By: Jonathan Shub
Represented By: Mark N. Todzo
Represented By: Seth Michael Lehrman
Represented By: Richard Kellner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronya Osman
Represented By: Marina Trubitsky
Represented By: Michael Vincent Storti
Represented By: Alfredo Torrijos
Represented By: Brian Stephen Kabateck
Represented By: Eric David Freed
Represented By: Howard Judd Hirsch
Represented By: Jeffrey A Leon
Represented By: Jonathan Shub
Represented By: Julie Diane Miller
Represented By: Mark N. Todzo
Represented By: Seth Michael Lehrman
Represented By: Richard Kellner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Pattee
Represented By: Michael Vincent Storti
Represented By: Alfredo Torrijos
Represented By: Brian Stephen Kabateck
Represented By: Eric David Freed
Represented By: Howard Judd Hirsch
Represented By: Jeffrey A Leon
Represented By: Jonathan Shub
Represented By: Julie Diane Miller
Represented By: Mark N. Todzo
Represented By: Seth Michael Lehrman
Represented By: Richard Kellner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casey Ching
Represented By: Michael Vincent Storti
Represented By: Alfredo Torrijos
Represented By: Brian Stephen Kabateck
Represented By: Eric David Freed
Represented By: Howard Judd Hirsch
Represented By: Jonathan Shub
Represented By: Mark N. Todzo
Represented By: Seth Michael Lehrman
Represented By: Richard Kellner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denae Zamora
Represented By: Michael Vincent Storti
Represented By: Alfredo Torrijos
Represented By: Brian Stephen Kabateck
Represented By: Eric David Freed
Represented By: Howard Judd Hirsch
Represented By: Jonathan Shub
Represented By: Mark N. Todzo
Represented By: Seth Michael Lehrman
Represented By: Richard Kellner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Lavanga
Represented By: Michael Vincent Storti
Represented By: Alfredo Torrijos
Represented By: Brian Stephen Kabateck
Represented By: Eric David Freed
Represented By: Howard Judd Hirsch
Represented By: Jonathan Shub
Represented By: Mark N. Todzo
Represented By: Seth Michael Lehrman
Represented By: Richard Kellner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Miller
Represented By: Michael Vincent Storti
Represented By: Alfredo Torrijos
Represented By: Brian Stephen Kabateck
Represented By: Eric David Freed
Represented By: Howard Judd Hirsch
Represented By: Jonathan Shub
Represented By: Mark N. Todzo
Represented By: Seth Michael Lehrman
Represented By: Richard Kellner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devinda Fernando
Represented By: David Keith Hicks
Represented By: Marina Trubitsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vadim Tsigel
Represented By: Marina Trubitsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Zinger
Represented By: Marina Trubitsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Rickel
Represented By: David Keith Hicks
Represented By: Garrett Eugene Skelly
Represented By: Marina Trubitsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Rickel
Represented By: Garrett Eugene Skelly
Represented By: Marina Trubitsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ira Gilman
Represented By: Marina Trubitsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lacy Reintsma
Represented By: Garrett Eugene Skelly
Represented By: Marina Trubitsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaul Behr
Represented By: David Keith Hicks
Represented By: Marina Trubitsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dale J. Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Reginald Burgess
Represented By: Garrett Eugene Skelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PayPal Inc
Represented By: Benjamin Taylor Potter
Represented By: David Wesley Moon
Represented By: George Stephen Azadian
Represented By: Julia B. Strickland
Represented By: Lisa Marie Simonetti
Represented By: Wesley Michael Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Regina Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Rob Rawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Evgenia Jansen
Represented By: Evgenia Jansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Dan Jansen
Represented By: Evgenia Jansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interpleader: Zoho Corporation
Represented By: Allison Ara Manov
Represented By: Stephanie O. Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Larry A. Guess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Frank Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Steve Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Paula Leach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Carmen M. DeBellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Walley Collins
Represented By: Anthony Albert Ferrigno
Represented By: John David Franklin
Represented By: Pamela Elizabeth Havird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Lucinda Christian
Represented By: Anthony Albert Ferrigno
Represented By: John David Franklin
Represented By: Pamela Elizabeth Havird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Tammy Perkins
Represented By: Caroline Victoria Tucker
Represented By: Matt Kurilich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Sam A. Miorelli, E.I., Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Glenn Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Melanie Cantanese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?