Boykin v. Potter et al
Plaintiff: Jesse J. Boykin
Defendant: John E. Potter, Anthony Caravelli and Jose Arana
Case Number: 4:2010cv02517
Filed: June 8, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 64 Motion for Summary Judgment (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2012)
December 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 81 STIPULATION AND CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 3/6/2012 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 12/15/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2011)
November 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER VACATING MOTION HEARING. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 11/30/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2011)
November 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 64 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 12/6/2011 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 11/8/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2011)
October 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER, Motions terminated: 70 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time on Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Patrick Donahoe., Set/Reset Deadlines as to 70 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time on Motion for Summary Judgment, 64 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 10/24/2011. Replies due by 10/31/2011. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2011 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 10/6/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2011)
September 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 51 Motion for Leave to File (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2011)
August 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER re 52 Stipulation, filed by Jesse J. Boykin, Patrick Donahoe. MOTION for Leave to File FIRST AMENDED ANSWER. Responses due by 8/22/2011. Replies due by 8/29/2011. Motion Hearing set for 9/20/2011 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 8/11/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2011) Modified on 8/12/2011 (kc, COURT STAFF).
July 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE OF REFERENCE FOR DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/15/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
June 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING MEDIATION DEADLINE. The Mediation deadline is EXTENDED to 07/28/11. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 6/7/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011) Modified on 6/14/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
March 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 3/28/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2011)
February 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE PROPER DEFENDANT: That Patrick Donahoe, Postmaster General, is substituted as Defendant for John E. Potter, former Postsmaster General and that Defendants Anthony Caravelli and Jose Arana are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong, on 02/02/11. (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2011)
December 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 4/7/2011 03:45 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 12/14/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boykin v. Potter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse J. Boykin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John E. Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Caravelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Arana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?