TransPerfect Global, Inc. et al v. MotionPoint Corporation
Plaintiff: TransPerfect Global, Inc., TransPerfect Translations International, Inc. and Translations.com, Inc.
Defendant: MotionPoint Corporation
Case Number: 4:2010cv02590
Filed: June 11, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 621 ORDER FOR FURTHER BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/6/15. (napS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2015)
April 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 597 ORDER FOR FURTHER BRIEFING ON CONTEMPT MOTION. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 04/16/2015. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2015)
January 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 577 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken REGARDING 573 MOTION TO SEAL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2015)
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 571 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken REGARDING ( 559 , 561 , 566 ) MOTIONS TO SEAL(Granting 559 , 561 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; Denying 566 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal). (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2014)
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 551 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS 547 MOTION TO STAY THE PERMANENT INJUNCTION AND DENYING DEFENDANTS 546 MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME AS MOOT. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2014)
November 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 545 FIRST AMENDED 467 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/13/2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2014) Modified on 11/13/2014 (ndr, COURT STAFF).
September 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 538 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken on ( 489 , 494 , 509 , 518 , 522 ) Motions to Seal. (granting 489 ; granting in part and denying in part 494 ; granting 509 ; granting 518 ; granting 522 ) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2014)
April 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 535 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on Plaintiffs' 521 Motion for Review of Costs.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2014)
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 534 ORDER Taking 521 MOTION for Review of Clerk's Taxation of Costs filed by TransPerfect Global, Inc., TransPerfect Translations International, Inc., Translations.com, Inc. Under Submission Without Oral Argument. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 03/07/2014. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2014)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 483 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 477 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Joseph B. Shear terminated. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2013)
November 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 469 ORDER REGARDING POST-TRIAL MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/15/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2013)
September 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 458 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 457 Motion to Reschedule October 10, 2013 Motion Hearing. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
September 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 455 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING DATES. Set/Reset Deadlines as to: ( 439 , 440 , 444 ,) Motion Hearing set for 10/10/2013 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/11/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2013)
July 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 429 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Motions due by 8/8/2013. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/29/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2013)
July 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 418 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 417 Second Amended Stipulation re Admitted Exhibits. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2013)
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 414 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 413 Stipulation TO ADMIT FURTHER EXHIBITS INTO EVIDENCE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2013)
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 371 AMENDED 347 ORDER GRANTING IN PART 316 TRANSPERFECTS MOTION TO SEAL; DENYING 314 MOTIONPOINTS MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/25/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2013)
June 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING 332 MOTION IN LIMINE; TERMINATING AGREED 341 MOTIONS. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2013)
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 349 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING JOINT 346 MOTION REGARDING TRIAL PREPARATION. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2013)
June 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING IN PART 316 TRANSPERFECTS MOTION TO SEAL;DENYING MOTIONPOINTS 314 MOTION TO SEAL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2013)
June 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER by Judge Claudia WilkenRESOLVING ( 289 , 290 ) MOTIONS IN LIMINE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2013)
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING IN PART TRANSPERFECTS 288 MOTION TO SEAL; DENYING MOTIONPOINTS 296 MOTION TO SEAL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2013)
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 275 Stipulation MODIFYING PRETRIAL AND TRIAL SCHEDULE. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2013)
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE JOINT STATEMENT REGARDING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/28/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2013)
February 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken RESOLVING ( 249 , 250 , 253 , 258 ) MOTIONS TO SEAL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2013)
February 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 257 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 256 Stipulation re reschedule of March 7, 2013 dispositive motion hearing date. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2013)
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING IN PART 244 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2013)
December 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 242 ORDER re 235 Letter Brief filed by TransPerfect Global, Inc., TransPerfect Translations International, Inc., Translations.com, Inc., MotionPoint Corporation Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on December 12, 2012. (jcslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2012)
October 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER for MotionPoint to Submit Declarations. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on October 31, 2012. (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2012)
September 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken 204 DENYING MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUNE 20, 2012 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR DISQUALIFICATION OF COUNSEL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2012)
July 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER regarding McDermott Will & Emery LLP and MotionPoint Corporation's motion for relief from order granting Transperfect's motion for disqualification, Docket No. 204. (cwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
June 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting 200 Stipulation Regarding Continuation of Stay of Fact Discovery and Stay of Expert Proceedings Pending Resolution. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2012)
June 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 198 Order by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 168 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. (jcslc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2012)
June 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 196 STIPULATION AND ORDER ADVANCING JUNE 18, 2012 HEARING TIME as to 168 First MOTION to Disqualify Counsel. Motion Hearing re-set for 6/18/2012 at 12:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/18/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2012)
June 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER GRANTING re 178 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of MotionPoints Opposition to TransPerfects Motion for Disqualification filed by McDermott Will & Emery LLP, MotionPoint Corporation.NOTE: Motion was already granted by way of stipulation, see Order No. 181. Order reposted to this order as counsel can't e-file sealed documents.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/4/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2012)
May 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 173 DISCOVERY ORDER re 165 Letter Brief Re: Effect of June 18 Hearing Date, filed by TransPerfect Global, Inc., TransPerfect Translations International, Inc., Translations.com, Inc., MotionPoint Corporation. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/30/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2012)
May 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER GRANTING IN PART re 156 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order to Stay Discovery and Setting Briefing Schedule filed by McDermott Will & Emery LLP, MotionPoint Corporation. Responses due by 6/1/2 012. Replies due by 6/6/2012. Motion Hearing set for 6/18/2012 03:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Motion to Disqualify due by 5/25/2012. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 05/25/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2012)
May 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 155 AMENDED STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: MOTION TO SEAL PORTIONS OF RESPONSE TO TRANSPERFECT'S MOTION FOR STAY. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/24/12. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2012)
May 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 140 STIPULATION AND ORDER AGREEING TO TRANSPERFECT'S MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME as to 134 Emergency MOTION to Stay Discovery. Responses due by 5/22/2012. Replies due by 5/23/2012. Motion Hearing set for 5/25/2012 AT 09:00 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/22/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2012)
May 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE re 129 Letter filed by TransPerfect Global, Inc., TransPerfect Translations International, Inc., Translations.com, Inc. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/18/12. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2012)
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER re 123 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re Sixth Meet and Confer filed by TransPerfect Global, Inc., TransPerfect Translations International, Inc., Translations.com, Inc., MotionPoint Corporation. Court adopts in its entirety TransPerfect's proposed compromise on page 9 of the Joint Letter. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/1/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2012)
January 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 111 DISCOVERY ORDER re 108 Joint Letter filed by TransPerfect Global, Inc., TransPerfect Translations International, Inc., Translations.com, Inc. Signed by Judge Joseph C.Spero on 1/18/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2012)
October 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER Granting 94 Stipulation Granting Leave to Amend and Modifying the Case Schedule and Discovery Limits. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/6/2012 02:00 PM. Motions due by 7/26/2012. Responses due by 8/9/2012. Replies due by 8/23/201 2. Motion Hearing set for 9/6/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/21/2012 02:00 PM. Jury Selection set for 12/3/2012 08:30 AM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Jury Trial (10 day) set for 12/3/2012 08:30 AM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/11/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2011)
July 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER Granting 84 Stipulation Modifying the Case Schedule. Case Management Statement due by 5/17/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/24/2012 02:00 PM. Motion Hearing set for 5/24/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Final Pret rial Conference set for 8/7/2012 02:00 PM. Jury Selection set for 8/20/2012 08:30 AM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Jury Trial (8 day)set for 8/20/2012 08:30 AM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 7/21/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2011)
July 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Granting Plaintiff's 64 Motion for Leave to File (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
June 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Granting 74 Stipulation Motion for Leave to Withdraw by Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP. Attorney Jacob Adam Snow; George Hopkins Guy, III and Jacob Marcus Heath terminated. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/20/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER re 72 Letter filed by MotionPoint Corporation. Court adopts Motionpoint's Compromise listed on Page 9-10 of the Joint Letter (see Page 11). Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/14/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2011)
April 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Granting 55 Stipulation for an Extension of Time for Parties to Hold the ADR Session. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/21/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2011)
April 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 NOTICE OF REFERENCE; ORDER TO MEET AND CONFER AND FILE JOINT LETTER re 53 MOTION to Compel Defendant MotionPoint Corporation's Motion to Compel Production of Source Code in Native Format filed by MotionPoint Corporation. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/20/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2011)
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE for Discovery purposes re 53 MOTION to Compel. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/5/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2011)
December 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Granting re 45 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/7/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2010)
September 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken DENYING 14 Defendant's Motion to Transfer Case (cwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2010)
August 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER re 20 Granting Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 11/9/2010. Case Management Conference set for 11/16/2010 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/24/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TransPerfect Global, Inc. et al v. MotionPoint Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TransPerfect Global, Inc.
Represented By: George Hopkins Guy, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TransPerfect Translations International, Inc.
Represented By: George Hopkins Guy, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Translations.com, Inc.
Represented By: George Hopkins Guy, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MotionPoint Corporation
Represented By: Joel Mark Freed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?