Pinel v. Aurora Loan Services LLC
Plaintiff: Maritz Pinel
Defendant: Aurora Loan Services LLC
Case Number: 4:2010cv03118
Filed: July 16, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Saundra Brown Armstrong
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 268 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 1/21/2015. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2015)
January 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong DENYING AS MOOT 256 Stipulation to Amend Restitution Settlement Class List. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2015)
January 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 251 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2015)
January 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 249 Motion to Appear by Telephone. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2015)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 244 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed 242 Document. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2015)
September 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 227 Stipulation TO AMEND CLASS NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2014)
September 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 225 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 218 Motion for Settlement for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2014)
May 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 220 Stipulation For Continuance of Status Conference and Case Management Statement Due to Settlement. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2014)
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER RE DEADLINE TO FILE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Case Management Statement due by noon on 12/18/2013. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 12/11/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2013)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong DENYING DEFENDANTS 140 MOTION TO DISMISS IN PART THE AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND TO STRIKE THE CLASS DEFINITION (terminating 174 Motion to Certify Class; terminating 179 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; terminating 185 Motion for Leave to File). (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2013)
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting 196 Stipulation (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2013)
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER CONTINUING Settlement Conference to 5/21/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nathanael Cousins on 4/12/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2013)
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER re 189 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Deogeneso Palugod, Alice Chao, Mauder Chao, Maritz Pinel, Glorina Palugod. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 3/18/2013. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2013)
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying (107) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 4:10-cv-03118-SBA (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2013)
January 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting (148) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 4:10-cv-03118-SBA (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2013)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER Re Motion for Reconsideration and Joint Letter Brief (lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2012)
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG denying 97 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2012)
December 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 162 STIPULATION AND ORDER, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 149 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiffs' Renewed Motion for Class Certification - PUBLIC VERSION. Responses due by 1/7/2013. Replies due by 1/30/2013. Motion Hearing set for 2/12/2013 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 12/13/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2012)
October 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER by Judge ARMSTRONG granting (130) Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document in case 4:10-cv-03118-SBA (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2012)
October 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 136 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 132 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Modify Pre-Trial Schedule filed by Deogeneso Palugod, Alice Chao, Mauder Chao, Aurora Loan Services LLC, Glorina Palugod, CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Motion Hearing set for 1/29/2013 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 10/11/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2012)
October 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER regarding discovery dispute (with instructions to efile emails for a clear record) (JUDGE BEELER, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2012)
September 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 114 STIPULATION AND ORDER, Motions terminated: (104 in 4:10-cv-03118-SBA) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Page Limit for Class Certification Briefing filed by Deogeneso Palugod, Alice Chao, Mauder Chao, Maritz Pinel, Aurora Loan S ervices LLC, Glorina Palugod, (76 in 4:10-cv-03383-SBA) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Page Limit for Class Certification Briefing filed by Aurora Loan Services, LLC, Deogeneso Palugod, Alice Chao, Mauder Chao, Glorina Palugod.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 9/18/12. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2012)
August 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 100 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 8/29/2012. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2012)
March 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER CONTINUING Telephonic Settlement Conference Call to 4/23/2013 at 9:30 AM with counsel re 89 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 3/16/12. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2012)
December 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER re (68 in 4:10-cv-03383-SBA) Stipulation, filed by Aurora Loan Services, LLC, Deogeneso Palugod, Alice Chao, Mauder Chao, Glorina Palugod. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 12/20/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2011)
November 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER re (63 in 4:10-cv-03118-SBA) Stipulation, filed by Maritz Pinel. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 11/14/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2011)
October 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER re 57 Stipulation filed by Maritz Pinel, Aurora Loan Services LLC. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 10/6/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2011)
August 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER, Motions terminated: 39 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Maritz Pinel, 25 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Aurora Loan Services LLC. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/26/2011 03:00 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 8/29/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2011)
March 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 25 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 4/26/2011 01:00 PM before Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 3/9/11. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2011)
December 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER re 28 Stipulation, filed by Maritz Pinel, Aurora Loan Services LLC, CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 5/4/2011 02:30 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 12/6/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2010)
October 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re 20 Stipulation filed by Maritz Pinel, Aurora Loan Services LLC Case Management Conference set for 1/19/2011 02:45 PM. VIA TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 10/12/10. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pinel v. Aurora Loan Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maritz Pinel
Represented By: Ali Abtahi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Loan Services LLC
Represented By: Wendy M. Garbers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?