Berrien et al v. New Raintree Resorts International, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Curtis Berrien, Rose Huerta, Tina Musharbash, Fern Prosnitz, Michael Andler, Marcus Boness, Timothy Bonnell, Richard Buford, Elaine Cefola and Kenneth Davis
Defendant: New Raintree Resorts International, LLC, RVC Members, LLC and Douglas Y. Bech
Case Number: 4:2010cv03125
Filed: July 16, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Donna M. Ryu
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING 88 MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES, LITIGATION EXPENSES AND INCENTIVE PAYMENTS TO CLASS REPRESENTATIVES. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2012)
December 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER GRANTING 81 PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. Final Approval Hearing set for 3/8/2012 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 12/5/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
November 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Granting 79 Status Report regarding Settlement and Proposed Order Setting Briefing and Hearing Scheduling for Preliminary Approval Motion. Motions due by 11/15/2011. Motion Hearing set for 11/29/2011 02:00 PM before Hon. Claudia Wilken. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/2/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2011)
September 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER Granting 77 Stipulation Vacating Case Deadlines Pending Motion for Preliminary Settlement Approval. Case Management Statement due by 11/22/2011. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/29/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 9/29/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2011)
August 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken GRANTING PLAINTIFFS 44 MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2011)
June 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken Denying 64 DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO SEAL. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
May 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken 59 SEALING PORTIONS OF THE EXPERT REPORT OF KEITH R. UGONE, PH.D., FILED IN CONNECTION WITH DEFENDANTS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Judge Claudia Wilken granting 39 UNOPPOSED MOTION TO MODIFY NOVEMBER 26, 2010 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER TO CONTINUE THE PARTIES' DEADLINE TO COMPLETE MEDIATION. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2011)
January 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Granting 37 Stipulation re: Protective Order. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/24/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2011)
October 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER re 29 Granting Stipulation Selecting Private ADR. Case referred to Private ADR. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 10/28/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berrien et al v. New Raintree Resorts International, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Berrien
Represented By: Todd Isaac Espinosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Huerta
Represented By: Todd Isaac Espinosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Musharbash
Represented By: Todd Isaac Espinosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fern Prosnitz
Represented By: Todd Isaac Espinosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Andler
Represented By: Todd Isaac Espinosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Boness
Represented By: Todd Isaac Espinosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Bonnell
Represented By: Todd Isaac Espinosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Buford
Represented By: Todd Isaac Espinosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Cefola
Represented By: Todd Isaac Espinosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Davis
Represented By: Todd Isaac Espinosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Raintree Resorts International, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RVC Members, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Y. Bech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?