Haines v. Pinnacle Financial Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: George Haines
Defendant: Pinnacle Financial Group, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2010cv03439
Filed: August 5, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re 31 Stipulation filed by George Haines. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/29/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2011)
March 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER OF DISMISSAL, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/29/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2011)
December 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re 24 Case Management Conference - Initial. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/3/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2010)
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS (MEDIATION) re 20 Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Mediation filed by Pinnacle Financial Group, Inc., George Haines, Case referred to mediation. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/12/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2010)
November 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/24/2010. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/2/2010 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/9/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2010)
October 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION FORM BY NOVEMBER 5, 2010. Signed by Judge Beeler on 10/28/10. (lblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haines v. Pinnacle Financial Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Haines
Represented By: Michael S Agruss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinnacle Financial Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?