Myrette-Crosley v. Clarion Mortgage Capital, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Faye Myrette-Crosley
Defendant: Clarion Mortgage Capital, Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., MTC Financial, Inc., INDYMAC Federal Bank,. FSB, Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation and OneWest Bank, F.S.B.
Case Number: 4:2010cv03523
Filed: August 11, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: Oakland Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER DISMISSING CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT ONEWEST BANK FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE AND CLOSING CASE. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/3/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2011)
May 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DISMISSING CLAIMS AGAINST MERS AND DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SEEK DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST ONEWEST BANK. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/12/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2011)
May 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DISMISSING CLAIMS AGAINST CLARION MORTGAGE CAPITAL AND MTC FINANCIAL, AND CONCERNING PROOF OF SERVICE ON MERS. Clarion Mortgage Capital, Inc. and MTC Financial, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 5/5/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2011)
April 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 4/19/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2011)
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting 19 Stipulation For Dismissal Without Prejudice. Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation terminated. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 3/28/2011. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2011)
November 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS FAILURE TO RESPOND TO FDICS MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION AND REQUEST FOR STAY. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 11/2/2010. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2010)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Myrette-Crosley v. Clarion Mortgage Capital, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faye Myrette-Crosley
Represented By: Timothy Lee McCandless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clarion Mortgage Capital, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTC Financial, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDYMAC Federal Bank,. FSB
Represented By: Christopher H. Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OneWest Bank, F.S.B.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?